TCYK, LLC v. Doe 180
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-02211
District Judge Mary S. Scriven, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 7:35 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fee & Jeffries, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Fee +1 813 229 8008 +1 813 229 0046 rfee@feejeffries.com
v.
No Logo Doe 180, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 Answer
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: 3/24/2014 Summons Returned Executed
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: 3/10/2014 Summons Issued
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/6/2014 Amended Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: 1/30/2014 Order on Motion to Extend Time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Interested persons order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Related case order and track 2 notice
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of pendency of related cases
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TCYK, LLC. (DG) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                              Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet) (DG) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: None
                                COMPLAINT against Doe 180 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA-19054) filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(DG) (Entered: 08/27/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?