Adirondack Medical Center, et al v. Kathleen Sebelius
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 12-5366

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 26, 2016 at 5:45 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 2151 - Contract: Medicare Act Overpay
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207564605 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER filed [1476524] withholding issuance of the mandate. [12-5366]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207564602 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    OPINION filed [1476522] (Pages: 15) for the Court by Judge Brown [12-5366]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207564596 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      PER CURIAM JUDGMENT filed [1476519] that the judgment of the District Court appealed from in this cause is hereby affirmed for the reasons in the accompanying opinion . Before Judges: Rogers, Brown and Williams. [12-5366]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207534303 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Rogers, Brown and Williams. [12-5366]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207533914 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1459062] denying appellee's motion to postpone oral argument in light of lapse of appropriations [1458920-2] Before Judges: Rogers, Brown and Williams. [12-5366]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207533650 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
            MOTION filed [1458920] by Kathleen Sebelius to postpone oral argument (Response to Motion served by mail due on 10/15/2013) [Service Date: 10/01/2013 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [12-5366] (Wright, Abby)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207531696 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
              PER CURIAM ORDER filed [1457834] allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants -- 10 Minutes, Appellee -- 10 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney - due 09/26/2013 [12-5366]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207515180 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1448313] scheduling oral argument before Judges ROGERS, BROWN, WILLIAMS Thursday, 10/03/2013 AM [12-5366]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207490081 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                  APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1432880] filed by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 04/26/2013 ] Length of Brief: 8,930 words. [12-5366] (Wright, Abby)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207488935 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                    MODIFIED EVENT--APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1432243] filed by Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County District Hospital, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services and Yampa Valley Medical Center [Service Date: 04/23/2013 ] Length of Brief: 3,612 words. [12-5366]--[Edited 04/24/2013 by LMC] (Baker, M.)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207488932 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                      MODIFIED EVENT--APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1432242] filed by Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County District Hospital, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services and Yampa Valley Medical Center [Service Date: 04/23/2013 ] Length of Brief: 7624 Words. [12-5366]--[Edited 04/24/2013 by LMC] (Baker, M.)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207488461 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                        JOINT APPENDIX [1431998] filed [Volumes: 1] [Service Date: 04/22/2013 ] [12-5366] (Walker, Johnny)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207486492 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                          APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1430905] filed by Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County District Hospital, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services and Yampa Valley Medical Center [Service Date: 04/15/2013 ] Length of Brief: 3,591 words. [12-5366] (Baker, M.)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207481686 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                            APPELLEE BRIEF [1428275] filed by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 04/01/2013 ] Length of Brief: 8,930 words. [12-5366] (Wright, Abby)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 01207473579 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: None
                              CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF [1423759] filed by Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County District Hospital, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services and Yampa Valley Medical Center [Service Date: 03/05/2013 ] Length of Brief: 8,140 Words. [12-5366] (Baker, M.)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207459044 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
                                CLERK'S ORDER filed [1415581] setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 02/28/2013. APPELLEE Brief due on 04/01/2013. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 04/15/2013. Deferred Appendix due 04/22/2013. Final Briefs due 05/06/2013. [12-5366]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207452186 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                  UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE submitted [1411256] by Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County District Hospital, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services and Yampa Valley Medical Center [12-5366] (Walker, Johnny)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207452183 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                    TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1411255] by Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County District Hospital, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services and Yampa Valley Medical Center [Service Date: 12/20/2012 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [12-5366] (Walker, Johnny)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207452180 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                      STATEMENT OF ISSUES FILED [1411254] by Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County District Hospital, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services, Yampa Valley Medical Center and Corning Hospital, Sid Peterson Memorial Hospital and Via Christi Hospital Pittsburg, Inc. [Service Date: 12/20/2012 ] [12-5366] (Walker, Johnny)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207452175 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                        STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL FILED [1411252] by Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County District Hospital, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services, Yampa Valley Medical Center and Corning Hospital, Sid Peterson Memorial Hospital and Via Christi Hospital Pittsburg, Inc. [Service Date: 12/20/2012 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [12-5366] (Walker, Johnny)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207452170 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                          DOCKETING STATEMENT FILED [1411250] by Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County District Hospital, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services, Yampa Valley Medical Center and Corning Hospital, Sid Peterson Memorial Hospital and Via Christi Hospital Pittsburg, Inc. [Service Date: 12/20/2012 ] [12-5366] (Walker, Johnny)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207452167 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1411249] by Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County District Hospital, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services, Yampa Valley Medical Center and Corning Hospital, Sid Peterson Memorial Hospital and Via Christi Hospital Pittsburg, Inc. [Service Date: 12/20/2012 ] [12-5366] (Walker, Johnny)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207452164 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1411248] by Ankur J. Goel and co-counsel M. Miller Baker and Johnny H. Walker on behalf of Appellants Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County District Hospital, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services, Yampa Valley Medical Center and Appellees Corning Hospital, Sid Peterson Memorial Hospital and Via Christi Hospital Pittsburg, Inc.. [12-5366] (Walker, Johnny)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207452152 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES FILED [1411242] by Kathleen Sebelius [Service Date: 12/20/2012 ] [12-5366] (Wright, Abby)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207452079 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                  ENTRY OF APPEARANCE filed [1411201] by Abby C. Wright and co-counsel Michael S. Raab on behalf of Appellee Kathleen Sebelius. [12-5366] (Wright, Abby)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207442779 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                    CLERK'S ORDER filed [1405999] directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/20/2012. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 12/20/2012. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/20/2012. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/20/2012. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/20/2012. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 12/20/2012. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/20/2012. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/20/2012. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 01/04/2013; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 12/20/2012. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/20/2012. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/20/2012. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 01/04/2013 [12-5366]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207442755 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1405989] by Adirondack Medical Center, Alice Hyde Medical Center, Ashtabula County Medical Center, Audrain Health Care, Inc., Aurelia Osburn Fox Memorial Hospital, Baptist Health Hospitals, Baptist Memorial Hospital-Booneville, Inc., Bassett Hospital Of Schoharie County, Bay Area Hospital District, Benefis Hospitals, Inc., Blessing Hospital, Bothwell Regional Health Center, CGH Medical Center, Campbell County Memorial Hospital, Cape Cod Healthcare Inc., Capital Region Medical Center, CarolinaEast Medical Center, Catskill Regional Medical Center, Champlain Valley Physicians Hospital, Chesapeake Hospital Corporation, Cheshire Medical Center, Chippewa County War Memorial Hospital Inc., Citizens Memorial Hospital District, Clallam County Public Hospital District 2, Clarion Hospital, Coffey County Hospital, Community Memorial Health Center, Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., Davis Memorial Hospital, Essent Healthcare - Waynesburg LLC, Essent Healthcare Of Connecticut, Inc., Flagstaff Medical Center, Freeport Memorial Hospital, Fremont Area Medical Center, Golden Valley Memorial Hospital District, Grenada Lake Medical Center, Hannibal Regional Hospital, Harrisburg Medical Center Inc., Hays Medical Center Inc., Heartland Regional Medical Center, IHC Health Services Inc., Illinois Valley Community Hospital, Indiana Regional Medical Center, Jackson County Memorial Hospital Authority, Jefferson Hospital Association Inc., John Tolfree Health System Corporation, Keokuk Area Hospital, King's Daughters Medical Center, Knox Community Hospital, LRG Healthcare, La Paz Regional Hospital, Inc., Labette County Medical Center, Lake Regional Health System, Lawrence Memorial Hospital, Lewis County General Hospital, Maine Coast Regional Health Facilities, Marquette General Hospital, Inc., Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Mary Imogene Bassett Hospital, Mary Lanning Memorial Hospital, Mary Rutan Hospital, McDonough County Hospital District, Meadville Medical Center, Memorial Hospital, Inc., Mercy Hospital of Tiffin, Ohio, MidMichigan Medical Center-Midland, Mile Bluff Medical Center Inc., Miles Memorial Hospital, Montrose Memorial Hospital, Munson Medical Center, Nathan Littauer Hospital & Nursing Home, Newberry County Memorial Hospital, Newman Memorial County Hospital, Northeast Arkansas Baptist Memorial Health Care, LLC, Northwestern Medical Center, Onslow Memorial Hospital, Inc., Otero County Hospital Association, Ottumwa Regional Health Center Inc., Owensboro Medical Health System, Inc., Passavant Memorial Area Hospital Association, Penobscot Bay Medical Center, Perry Memorial Hospital Authority, Phelps County Regional Medical Center, Pikeville Medical Center Inc., Pocatello Hospital, LLC, Pocono Medical Center, Portage Health Inc., Promise Regional Medical Center-Hutchinson, Inc., Rapid City Regional Hospital Inc., Regional Health Network Inc., Regional West Medical Center, Reid Hospital & Health Care Services Inc., Rice Memorial Hospital, Ridgecrest Regional Hospital, SSM Regional Health Services, Sacred Heart Health Services, Saint James Hospital, Salina Regional Health Center, Inc., Sarah Bush Lincoln Health Center, Skiff Medical Center, Smyth County Community Hospital, Somerset Community Hospital, Sonora Community Hospital, Southeastern Ohio Regional Medical Center Inc., Southeastern Regional Medical Center, Southern Illinois Hospital Services, Southern Monterey County Memorial Hospital, Southern Ohio Medical Center, Southwestern Vermont Medical Center Inc., St. Francis Hospital, St. Joseph's Medical Center, St. Margaret's Hospital, St. Mary Medical Center, St. Mary's Hospital, St. Mary's Hospital & Medical Center, Inc., St. Mary's Hospital Streator Hospital, Stillwater medical Center Authority, Sutter Central Valley Hospitals, Sutter Coast Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, Tahlequah Hospital Authority, The Carbon-Schuylkill Community Hospital, Inc., The Rutland Hospital, Inc., The Trover Clinic Foundation Incorporated, Trinity Regional Medical Center, Twin County Regional Healthcare, Inc, Unity Healthcare, Valley View Hospital Association, Van Wert County Hospital Association, Verde Valley Medical Center, Wayne Memorial Hospital, Inc., Waynesboro Hospital, Winona Health Services and Yampa Valley Medical Center seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:11-cv-01671-RMC. Assigned USCA Case Number [12-5366]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?