TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-20
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00842
District Judge Algenon L. Marbley, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 12, 2017 at 11:48 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity AG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon David Bass +1 614 431 2277 +1 614 221 0554 ldb@lawbass.com
v.
No Logo Adam Sloan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adam Sloan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adam Sloan
No Logo John Does 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Richard Williams, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Status Report Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Default
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Default Judgment against Richard Williams by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. Responses due by 7/21/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2014 at 10:30 AM, before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King, should the case remain pending on that date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 6/25/2014. (pes1) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                            RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                              Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Richard Williams (pes1) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC re 14 Application to enter Default Certificate of Service (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                  Application to Clerk for entry of default against Richard Williams . (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    NOTICE of Hearing:Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/25/2014 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. (jr1) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                      ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint filed by Adam Sloan. (pes1) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Richard Williams. Richard Williams served on 4/26/2014, answer due 5/19/2014. (pes1) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Adam Sloan. Adam Sloan served on 4/25/2014, answer due 5/16/2014. (pes1) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE of Clerk. Certified mailing of summons and first amended complaint via the Clerk's Office as to Defendants Richard Williams and Adam Sloan. (pes1) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                              Summons Issued as to Adam Sloan, Richard Williams. (pes1) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adam Sloan, Richard Williams, filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Summons Form A. Sloan, # 3 Summons Form R. Williams) (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/26/2013. (pes1)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/25/2014. For Additional Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Leon Bass) (Bass, Leon)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [3] Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 8/30/2013. (er1)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 8/30/2013
                                                        Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-20 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4238144), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?