SCOTT v. BURKE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Western District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00278-MRH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 1:20 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT C. SCOTT, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by EDGAR SNYDER & ASSOCIATES, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard M. Rosenthal +1 412 394 1000 rrosenthal@edgarsnyder.com
Space Christine L. Zaremski-Young +1 412 394 1000 +1 412 391 1827 czaremski-young@edgarsnyder.com
v.
No Logo THOMAS P. BURKE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ansa Assuncao LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan R. Corkery +1 267 528 0733 +1 267 528 0726 ryan.corkery@ansalaw.com
Space Michael J. O'Neill +1 267 528 0750 michael.oneill@ansalaw.com
No Logo United Parcel Service, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit Motor Vehicle
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Withdraw
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Documents Under Seal
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Leave to File
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Compel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Hornak: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/10/13. (Court Reporter: Sandra Wenger) (jad) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER GRANTING 39 Joint Motion for Protective Order. The parties agree to the following Protective Order as stated within. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/27/13. (bdb) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                Joint MOTION for Protective Order by THOMAS P. BURKE, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service) (Corkery, Ryan) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by THOMAS P. BURKE, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Corkery, Ryan) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                    ANSWER to 34 Amended Complaint by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Corkery, Ryan) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                      ANSWER to 34 Amended Complaint by THOMAS P. BURKE. (Corkery, Ryan) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Hornak: Telephone Status Conference held on 9/5/13. (Court Reporter: Rick Ford) (jad) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT IN A CIVIL ACTION against All Defendants, filed by ROBERT C. SCOTT, JR. (Rosenthal, Richard) Modified on 9/3/2013 to edit docket text. (ksa) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 27 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may amend his Complaint to allege such proferred new facts as he can in good faith allege, along with claims for the recovery of punitive damages as a form of relief, except as to claims under the Wrongful Death Act. 20 Defendants Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/29/13. (jad) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 32 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/29/13. (jad) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to 27 Motion for Leave to File, filed by THOMAS P. BURKE, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Exhibit) (Corkery, Ryan) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY in support re 20 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Complaint, filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Corkery, Ryan) Modified on 8/13/2013 to edit docket text. (ksa) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                    BRIEF in Opposition re 20 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by ROBERT C. SCOTT, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit) (Rosenthal, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Complaint filed by ROBERT C. SCOTT, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit) (Rosenthal, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT by ROBERT C. SCOTT, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit, # 15 Exhibit, # 16 Exhibit, # 17 Exhibit) (Rosenthal, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                          REPORT of Mediation: Case has not been resolved. JOHN M. NOBLE terminated. Attorney John M. Noble terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and return same to the Clerk of Court within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 6/26/2013. (Noble, John) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            SECOND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 26(a) shall be made on or before 3/26/13; Joinder of Parties due by 6/3/13; Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/13; Discovery due by 11/12/13; Plaintiffs Expert Reports due by 12/13/13; Defendants Expert Reports due by 1/17/14; Defendant shall depose Plaintiff's expert on or before 2/14/14; Plaintiff shall depose Defendant's expert on or before 3/21/14; A Telephonic Status Conference is SCHEDULED for 9/5/13 at 10:30 AM before Judge Mark R. Hornak. Participating counsel shall contact Chambers at 412-208-7433 by 4:00 PM on 9/3/13 with their preferred contact number for the conference. The Court will initiate the call. A Post-Discovery Status Conference is SCHEDULED for 11/13/13 at 9:30 AM before Judge Mark R. Hornak. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/24/13. (bdb) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Hornak: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/24/2013. (Court Reporter: Virginia Pease) (jad) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Errata re 22 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by ROBERT C. SCOTT, JR. Reason for Correction: Signature vs. Filing Atty Were Different. (Zaremski-Young, Christine) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Complaint filed by ROBERT C. SCOTT, JR. (Rosenthal, Richard) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    BRIEF in Support re 20 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings to Dismiss Counts III and IV of the Complaint filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (Corkery, Ryan) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Complaint by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service) (Corkery, Ryan) Modified on 4/15/2013 to edit docket text. (ksa2) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Disclosure Statement identifying United Parcel Service, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (Corkery, Ryan) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. This case is referred to Mediation. John M. Noble is appointed to serve as Mediator. The ADR Conference shall be concluded before 7/15/13, unless extended by Order of Court. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 4/5/13. (bdb) (Main Document 18 replaced on 4/8/13) (bdb). Modified on 4/8/13 to correct ADR Conference date. (bdb) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 26(a) shall be made on or before 3/26/13; Joinder of Parties due by 6/3/13; Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/13; Discovery due by 9/13/13; Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 10/15/13; Defendant's Expert Reports due by 11/20/13; Defendant shall depose Plaintiff's expert on or before 12/16/13; Plaintiff shall depose Defendant's expert on or before 1/20/14; A Telephonic Status Conference is SCHEDULED for 7/30/13 at 3:30 PM before Judge Mark R. Hornak. A Post-Discovery Status Conference is SCHEDULED for 1/28/14 at 9:30 AM before Judge Mark R. Hornak. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 4/4/13. (bdb) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark R. Hornak: Case Management Conference held on 4/4/13. (Court Reporter: Karen Earley) (bdb) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Proposed Case Management Order by THOMAS P. BURKE, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (Corkery, Ryan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Corkery, Ryan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    STIPULATION selecting ADR process by THOMAS P. BURKE, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (Corkery, Ryan) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT C. SCOTT, JR. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. waiver sent on 3/12/2013, answer due 5/13/2013. (Rosenthal, Richard) Modified on 3/28/2013 to indicate correct date waiver was sent and answer is due. (ksa2) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT C. SCOTT, JR. THOMAS P. BURKE waiver sent on 3/12/2013, answer due 5/13/2013. (Rosenthal, Richard) Modified on 3/28/2013 to indicate correct date waiver sent and answer is due. (ksa2) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney Appearance by Ryan R. Corkery on behalf of THOMAS P. BURKE, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. Attorney Michael J. O'Neill terminated. (Corkery, Ryan) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Christine L. Zaremski-Young on behalf of ROBERT C. SCOTT, JR. (Zaremski-Young, Christine) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference Telephonically by THOMAS P. BURKE, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (O'Neill, Michael) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Initial Case Management Conference will be held on 4/4/13 at 1:30 PM. Rule 26(f) Report and stipulation selecting ADR process due on or before 3/28/13. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 3/4/13. (bdb) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by THOMAS P. BURKE. (O'Neill, Michael) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint of Plaintiff by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (O'Neill, Michael) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 2/27/13. (bdb) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (ksa) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/29/13. (jad)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette County, case number 292 of 2013 Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee $350, receipt number 0315-2688029), filed by THOMAS P. BURKE, UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Certificate of Service) (ksa) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?