Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. Chrysler Group LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00278
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 11:15 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
No Logo Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Nissan North America, Inc. Nissan North America, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Chrysler Group LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank Charles Cimino, Jr. +1 202 420 3601 +1 202 379 9508 ciminof@dicksteinshapiro.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
No Logo FIAT U.S.A., INC., Defendant
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Honda North America, Inc. Honda North America, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 allengardner@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Paul Biddinger +1 650 617 4000 +1 212 596 9090 bbiddinger@fishneave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com
No Logo Hyundai Motor America Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D James Pak +1 858 523 6227 +1 415 576 3099 d.james.pak@bakermckenzie.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Forrest Utley +1 214 978 3036 +1 214 978 3099 jay.utley@bakermckenzie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Vincent Wells +1 214 978 3006 +1 214 978 3099 richard.wells@bakermckenzie.com
No Logo Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew John Moore +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 matt.moore@lw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clement Joseph Naples +1 212 906 1331 +1 212 751 4864 clement.naples@lw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cassius Kirkpatrick Sims +1 212 906 1200 +1 212 906 4848 cassius.sims@lw.com
Kia Motors America, Inc. Kia Motors America, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Mazda Motor Of America, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R Barney +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 james.barney@finnegan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rajeev Gupta +20240435 202 240 4352 raj.gupta@finnegan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED P. Andrew Riley andrew.riley@finnegan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas William Winland +1 202 408 4085 +1 202 408 4400 tom.winland@finnegan.com
No Logo Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Birch Stewart Kolasch & Birch, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Gorenstein +1 703 205 8000 +1 703 205 8050 cg@bskb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ali M Imam +1 703 205 8000 +1 703 205 8050 ami@bskb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder msmith@bskb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Charles Smith +1 903 938 8900 +1 972 767 4620 michaelsmith@siebman.com
Nissan North America, Inc. Nissan North America, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer & Kern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Joseph Cox +1 214 346 3713 +1 214 369 2118 jcox@hdbdk.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean Hsu +1 214 369 2100 +1 214 369 2118 shsu@hdbdlaw.com
Subaru Of America, Inc. Subaru Of America, Inc., Consol Defendant
Toyota Motor North America, Inc. Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Consol Defendant
No Logo Volvo Cars of North America, LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dawn Michelle Jenkins +1 713 425 8454 +1 713 300 6054 dawn.jenkins@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Satchwell +1 312 862 2111 +1 312 251 2168 matthew.satchwell@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Richard Steadman +1 312 368 2135 +1 312 251 2850 Paul.Steadman@DLAPiper.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1127
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (284) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/31/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. regarding Final Board Decisions in IPRs (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Final Decision in 2014-00563, # 2 Exhibit B - Final Decision in 2014-00564)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 278 Motion to Stay. This civil action is STAYED pending the completion of the initial IPR proceeding as to claim 6 of the '597 patent filed by Nissan. As such, this action is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED until the PTO has issued its final decisions on the inter partes review of claim 6 of the '597 Patent. The Court ORDERS the parties to file a status report within ten days of issuance of the IPR decision of claim 6 of the '597 Patent. The parties may either file an agreed upon status report or individual motions which inform the court of the ruling of the IPR and how the parties would like to proceed with the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/08/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Stay
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 275 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant Chrysler Group LLC are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/21/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Defendant Chrysler Group LLC by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/1/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 150 Order for limitations on depositions of expert witnesses by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Discovery Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting 271 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Chester Jianbon Shiu terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/26/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Chester J. Shiu by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER TO PAY TECHINICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/4/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. re 250 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness - Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Nautilus v. Biosig)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2014 re 250 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Nissan North America, Inc., Volvo Cars of North America, LLC, Chrysler Group LLC. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, ) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 266 Motion to Withdraw Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Defendants' Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/29/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
                                      MOTION to Withdraw 265 Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 250 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by Chrysler Group LLC, Nissan North America, Inc., Norman IP Holdings, LLC Joint Agreement of Parties to Constructions of Disputed of Terms (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Gorenstein, Charles) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Swedlow, Deborah) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER OF DISMISSAL GRANTING 257 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendant Volvo Cars of North America, LLC filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. Volvo Cars of North America, LLC (Consolidated Civil Action 6:13cv286) terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/20/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 250 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY to 252 Claim Construction Brief filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Compliance Regarding the Parties Estimated Time for Markman Hearing (Price, Adam) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Defendant Volvo Cars of North America, LLC by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 249 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc are hereby, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 248 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 213 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct and for Leave to Incorporate Indefiniteness Summary Judgment Briefing from a Prior Case Before this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              FOURTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 253 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                SEALED SUR-REPLY in Opposition to 234 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint or, Alternatively, to Transfer the Case filed by Nissan North America, Inc. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSIVE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Chrysler Group LLC, Nissan North America, Inc., Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - Reexam Final Office Action, #(2) Exhibit B - Notice of Reexam Certificate)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 251 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    SEALED Third Party Defendant Robert Bosch, LLC's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint or, Alternatively, To Transfer The Case To the Eastern District of Michigan by Robert Bosch LLC to 247 Sealed Response to Motion filed by Robert Bosch, LLC. (Lavenue, Lionel) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 250 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by Chrysler Group LLC, Nissan North America, Inc., Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Lexmark MSJ Brief (Filed Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit B - Lexmark MSJ Reply Brief, # 3 Exhibit C - Non-final Office Action, # 4 Exhibit D - Final Office Action, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice Defendant Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 213 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct and for Leave to Incorporate Indefiniteness Summary Judgment Briefing from a Prior Case Before this Court by Chrysler Group LLC, Nissan North America, Inc., Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Fourth Amended Docket Control Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 247 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            SEALED RESPONSE filed by Nissan North America, Inc., to 234 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint or, Alternatively, to Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of Michigan. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              PLAINTIFFS OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER re 227 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Nissan North America, Inc, Volvo Cars of North America, LLC, Chrysler Group LLC, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. Having reviewed the briefing, Defendants are GRANTED permission to file a motion for summary judgment of invalidity based on indefiniteness as described in their letter brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/24/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 242 Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED that the P.R. 4-5(a) opening claim construction brief will be due April 28, 2014 and the P.R. 4-5(b) responsive claim construction brief will be due May 12, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/24/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    REPLY Letter Brief in Support of 227 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Nissan North America, Inc., Chrysler Group LLC, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Reply Letter Brief)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Chrysler Group LLC, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re 227 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Nissan North America, Inc., Volvo Cars of North America, LLC, Chrysler Group LLC, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. Filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief to Court)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER APPOINTING TECHNICAL ADVISOR. David Keyzer added as technical advisor. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/16/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices for James R. Barney, P. Andrew Riley, Rajeev Gupta, and Thomas W. Winland (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 233 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/16/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Nissan North America, Inc.)(Folsom, David) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: suspended (Chrysler Group LLC)(Folsom, David) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 229 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 234 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SEALED PATENT MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint or, Alternatively, to Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of Michigan by Robert Bosch LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint or, Alternatively, To Transfer the Case to the Eastern District of Michigan by Robert Bosch LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 230 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Third-party Defendant Robert Bosch LLC shall have to 4-15-2014 to respond to the Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/11/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lionel Marks Lavenue on behalf of Robert Bosch LLC (Lavenue, Lionel) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 183 Third Party Complaint by Robert Bosch LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to 183 Third Party Complaint by Continental Automotive Systems, Inc..(Cleland, James) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Letter Brief filed by Chrysler Group LLC, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Volvo Cars of North America, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Brief)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER adopting 216 Report & Recommendations of the US Magistrate Judge; granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion to Dismiss First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/31/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 224 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Third Party Defendant Continental Automotive Systems, Inc. shall respond to Nissan's third party complaint by 4-07-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/24/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 183 Third Party Complaint against Continental Automotive Systems, Inc. by Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 219 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice of all claims by Norman IP Holdings, LLC against Subaru of America, Inc. pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a). Additionally, Subaru's Motion to Dismiss Norman's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim 112 is denied as moot. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/13/14. (mjc, ) Modified on 3/17/2014 (mjc, ). (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 220 Motion to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Visteon Corporation without prejudice filed by Third Party Plaintiff Nissan North America, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/13/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to P.R. 4-3 by Chrysler Group LLC, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Norman IP Holdings, LLC, TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC., Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit PR 4-3(b) Proposed Constructions)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Defendant Visteon Corp. without Prejudice by Nissan North America, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice of Defendant Subaru of America, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Third Party Defendant Robert Bosch LLC's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.'s Third Party Complaint (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Third Party Defendant Continental Automotive Systems Inc.'s Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant Nissan North America Inc.'s Third Party Complaint (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 110 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc., recommending the motion be granted-in-part and denied-in-part. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/5/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chrysler Group LLC identifying Other Affiliate Fiat North America LLC for Chrysler Group LLC. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 111 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mazda Motor of America, Inc. Following the filing of the motion, Mazda was dismissed from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/25/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                THIRD AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/19/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Third Party Defendant Visteon Corp.'s Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Nissan North America Inc.'s Third Party Complaint. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 188 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct to Extend First Mediation Deadline by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order for Third Amended DCO)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 209 Motion to Amend/Correct Second Amended Docket Control Order. The deadline for Defendant Chrysler Group LLC to complete its first mediation is extended to 3/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 2/18/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 188 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct to Extend First Mediation Deadline by Chrysler Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Third Party Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.'s Third Party Complaint re Robert Bosch LLC. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Third Party Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Third Party Complaint re Continental Automotive Systems, Inc. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. of Compliance Regarding No Current Disputes As To Claims of Privileged Documents (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Chrysler Group LLC Notice of Compliance Regarding No Current Disputes As To Claims of Privileged Documents (Falkler, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC. OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING NO CURRENT DISPUTES AS TO CLAIMS OF PRIVILEGED DOCUMENTS (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Compliance Regarding Privilege Logs (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Compliance with Preliminary Claim Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-2 (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. re no current disputes as to claims of privileged documents (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC. of Compliance with Preliminary Constructions and Extrinsic Evidence Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-2 filed on behalf of Defendants Chrysler Group LLC, Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., and Volvo Cars of North America, LLC (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 194 Motion to Stay. All proceedings, as between Norman and Subaru are STAYED to 3-07-2014. Norman and Subaru are to submit closing documents by 3-07-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/07/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 195 Motion for Leave to Incorporate by Reference Claim Construction Positions from a Prior Case Before the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/07/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC Request For Termination of Electronic Notices (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Third Party Defendant Visteon Corporation's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Nissan North America Inc.'s Third Party Complaint(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Leave to Incorporate by Reference Claim Construction Positions from a Case Before This Court by Subaru of America, Inc., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Stay Deadlines Between Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC and Defendant Subaru of America, Inc. by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 190 Motion to Dismiss. All claims by Plaintiff against Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. All costs and expenses shall be borne by the party incurring same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/29/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 189 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Mazda Motor of America Inc in this action are dismissed with prejudice. Each party is to bear its own costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/29/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Hyundai Motor America Inc., Kia Motors America, Inc. Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Wells, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) ( (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/16/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 153 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Second Amended Docket Control Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 185 Motion to Extend Stay. All proceedings, including deadlines and related motions, as between Norman and Jaguar are STAYED up to andincluding 2-07-2014. All other deadlines as to other defendants in related cases remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 01/15/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Extend Stay of Deadlines by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued as to Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC, Visteon Corporation and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Continental Automotive Systems, Inc., Robert Bosch LLC, Visteon Corporation, filed by Nissan North America, Inc..(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 180 Motion to Stay Deadlines. All proceedings, including deadlines and related motions, as between Norman and Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America LLC are STAYED to 1-13-2014. Norman and Jaguar are ORDERED to submit closing documents no later than 1-13-2014. All other deadlines as to other defendants in related cases remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/23/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. of Compliance with Order 173 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION To Stay All Deadlines by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 4-1 (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC. Defendants' Notice of Compliance with Proposed Terms and Claim Elements for Construction Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 4-1 (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC Notice re Additional Disclosures (Satchwell, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-4 (Satchwell, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 168 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC against Defendant Hyundai Motor America are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 167 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC against Defendant Kia Motors America Inc are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 171 Motion to Amend/Correct/Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 12/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Norman IP Holdings, LLC (Price, Adam) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 153 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, to Extend Nissan's Deadline to Join Additional Parties by Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC. Defendants' Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-3 (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Satchwell, Matthew) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Defendant Hyundai Motor America by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 164 Motion to Substitute Party. TOYOTA MOTOR SALES, USA, INC. added. Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Consolidated Civil Action 6:13cv288) is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/19/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC Notice of Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Satchwell, Matthew) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Substitute Party and Reform Caption to include Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. in place of Defendant Toyota Motor North America, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC regarding Compliance with Initial Disclosures (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc. of Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 159 Motion for Extension of Time to File closing documents to 12/13/2013 for Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC and Defendant Kia Motors America, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/15/2013. (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 158 Motion for Extension of Time to File closing documents until 12/13/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/15/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Kia Motors America, Inc., Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Richard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Hyundai Motor America Inc., Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Richard) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Honda North America, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electroinc Notices (re Ropes & Gray LLP counsel) (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Falkler on behalf of Chrysler Group LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4365934. (Falkler, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Alan Noteware, Jr on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Noteware, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. David Folsom added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. First Mediation to be completed 2-03-2014; Second Mediation Completion due by 10/29/2015. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 5/29/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. First Mediation to be completed by 2-03-2014; Second Mediation Completion due by 10/29/2015. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2016 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 5/29/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2016 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Scheduling Conference held on 10/16/2013. (Court Reporter Mechele Morris.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (mjm, ) (Main Document 148 replaced on 10/16/2013) (mjm, ). (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 142 Motion to Stay all deadlines pending between Norman and KMA in this action for 30 days. Closing documents are due by 11/14/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/15/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 143 Motion to Stay all deadlines pending between Norman and HMA in this action for 30 days. Closing documents are due by 11/14/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/15/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION For Entry of Protective Order, Docket Control Order, ESI Order, and Discovery Order by Chrysler Group LLC, Hyundai Motor America Inc., Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, Kia Motors America, Inc., Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit Docket Control Order, # 3 Exhibit ESI Order, # 4 Exhibit Discovery Order)(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Judge David Folsom, filed by Chrysler Group LLC, Hyundai Motor America Inc., Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, Kia Motors America, Inc., Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Subaru of America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 30 Days by Hyundai Motor America Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 30 Days by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wells, Richard) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 138 Motion to Dismiss. All claims between Plaintiff and Defendant Honda North American Inc are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/10/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 139 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline by which Plaintiff will submit its P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures is now 10-11-2013. The deadline by which Defendants will submit their P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 disclosures is now 12-13-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/09/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE Defendant Honda North American Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Financially Interested Parties (Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. of Financially Interested Parties (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Nissan North America, Inc. Certificate of Financially Interested Parties (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Kia Motors America, Inc. re 127 Order, Set Hearings Certificate of Financially Interested Parties (Wells, Richard) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Hyundai Motor America Inc. re 127 Order, Set Hearings Certificate of Financially Interested Parties (Wells, Richard) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC Certificate of Interested Parties (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC Certificate of Financially Interested Parties (Satchwell, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 110 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 112 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 111 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Price, Adam) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 10/16/2013 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/13/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 112 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 111 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 110 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Charles W Duncan, Jr on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4313843. (Duncan, Charles) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Deborah J Swedlow on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4313569. (Swedlow, Deborah) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by J Michael Huget on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4313525. (Huget, J) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 110 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Soverain Software v. J.C. Penney, # 2 Exhibit Patent Harbor v. Dreamworks, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 112 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Soverain Software v. J.C. Penney, # 2 Exhibit Patent Harbor v. Dreamworks, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 111 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Soverain Software v. J.C. Penney, # 2 Exhibit Patent Harbor v. Dreamworks, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,, by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Kia Motors America ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,, Answer to First Consolidated Complaint by Kia Motors America, Inc..(Wells, Richard) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hyundai Motor America ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,, Answer to First Consolidated Complaint by Hyundai Motor America Inc..(Wells, Richard) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant Chrysler Group LLC's ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,, by Chrysler Group LLC.(Cimino, Frank) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,, Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's First Consolidated Complaint by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC.(Satchwell, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC's First Consolidated Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Norman's ANSWER to 99 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Nissan by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Norman's ANSWER to 97 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Mitsubishi by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew D. Satchwell on behalf of Volvo Cars of North America, LLC (Satchwell, Matthew) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,, by Honda North America, Inc..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 103 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 103 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 78 Amended Complaint. Answer due by 8/19/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 7/17/13. (mjc, ) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC has to 8-29-2013 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/17/2013
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 78 Amended Complaint,, by Chrysler Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 100 Motion for Extension of Time. Volvo Cars of North America, LLC's deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Consolidated Complaint is extended until 8-19-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hyundai Motor America and Kia Motors America, Inc.'s deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the First Consolidated Complaint 78 is extended to 8-19-2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/16/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steadman, Paul) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Nissan North America, Inc..(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to First Consolidated Complaint by Hyundai Motor America Inc., Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Wells, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint,, (Consolidated), COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc..(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 93 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc. and Mazda Motor of America, Inc. shall have to 8-19-2013 to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/12/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 53 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 54 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 62 Motion to Dismiss. Motions are DENIED as moot without prejudice to re-urging on Norman's amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/12/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 78 Amended Complaint,, or Otherwise Respond by Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 85 Motion to Dismiss. All claims of Plaintiff against Defendant FIAT are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cassius Kirkpatrick Sims on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Sims, Cassius) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clement Naples on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Naples, Clement) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew J Moore on behalf of Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Moore, Matthew) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Fiat Without Prejudice by FIAT U.S.A., INC., Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Fiat With Prejudice by FIAT U.S.A., INC., Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) Modified on 7/2/2013 (mjc, ). (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank C Cimino, Jr on behalf of FIAT U.S.A., INC. (Cimino, Frank) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff Norman IP Holdings, LLC ANSWER to 66 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT (Consolidated) against Chrysler Group LLC, FIAT U.S.A., INC., Honda North America, Inc., Hyundai Motor America Inc., Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC, Kia Motors America, Inc., Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc., Nissan North America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc., Volvo Cars of North America, LLC, filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Rajeev Gupta on behalf of Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4197059. (Gupta, Rajeev) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 06/24/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 62 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 53 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, 54 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shiu, Chester) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Norman's ANSWER to Complaint and Counterclaims of Mitsubishi by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(Price, Adam) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Hyundai Motor America Inc. on 5/1/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James R Barney on behalf of Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4180611. (Barney, James) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by P Andrew Riley on behalf of Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4180523. (Riley, P) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas W Winland on behalf of Mazda Motor of America, Inc., Subaru of America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4180492. (Winland, Thomas) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank C Cimino, Jr on behalf of Chrysler Group LLC (Cimino, Frank) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Subaru of America, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nissan North America, Inc. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by Nissan North America, Inc..(Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Hsu on behalf of Nissan North America, Inc. (Hsu, Sean) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Toyota Motor North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Toyota Motor Corporation of Japan for Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Toyota Motor North America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Jaguar Land Rover North America, LLC.(Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kia Motors America, Inc. (Wells, Richard) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Kia Motors America, Inc. ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Kia Motors America, Inc..(Wells, Richard) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hyundai Motor America Inc. (Wells, Richard) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hyundai ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Hyundai Motor America Inc..(Wells, Richard) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Subaru of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mazda Motor of America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael T Smith on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ali M Imam on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Imam, Ali) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Gorenstein on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Gorenstein, Charles) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Chrysler Group LLC. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Chrysler Group LLC identifying Other Affiliate Fiat North America LLC, Other Affiliate UAW Retiree Medical Benefits Trust for Chrysler Group LLC. (Heartfield, J) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Chrysler Group LLC.(Heartfield, J) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nissan North America, Inc..( Cox, Jeffrey) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Steadman, Paul) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Volvo Car Corporation for Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Steadman, Paul) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC.(Steadman, Paul) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Honda North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Honda Motor Co. Ltd. for Honda North America, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Honda North America, Inc.. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint 1 in 6:13cv279 by Honda North America, Inc..(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to FIAT U.S.A., INC. on 4/16/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to Subaru of America, Inc. on 4/1/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Motors Corporation for Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. of Answer filed in Originating Case 2:13-cv-284 (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian P Biddinger on behalf of Honda North America, Inc. (Biddinger, Brian) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julian Moore on behalf of Honda North America, Inc. (Moore, Julian) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Charles Smith on behalf of Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. (Smith, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toyota Motor North America, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Subaru of America, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Honda North America, Inc. (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Honda North America, Inc. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. Chrysler Group LLC served on 4/1/2013, answer due 4/22/2013. (gsg) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by D James Pak on behalf of Hyundai Motor America Inc., Kia Motors America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4123269. (Pak, D) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Kia Motors America, Inc.( Wells, Richard) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hyundai Motor America Inc.( Wells, Richard) (Entered: 05/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay Forrest Utley on behalf of Hyundai Motor America Inc., Kia Motors America, Inc. (Utley, Jay) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Vincent Wells on behalf of Hyundai Motor America Inc., Kia Motors America, Inc. (Wells, Richard) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service to Kia (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service to Toyota (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service to Nissan (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service to Jaguar Land Rover (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service to Mitsubishi (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service to Honda (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service to Mazda (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service to Volvo (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** NOTICE by Norman IP Holdings, LLC of Return of Service to Chrysler (DiNovo, Andrew) Modified on 5/3/2013 (gsg). (Entered: 05/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dawn Michelle Jenkins on behalf of Volvo Cars of North America, LLC (Jenkins, Dawn) (Entered: 04/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nissan North America, Inc.(Cox, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Chrysler Group LLC.( Heartfield, J) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Volvo Cars of North America, LLC.( Steadman, Paul) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Subaru of America, Inc.(Findlay, Eric). (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toyota Motor North America, Inc.(Findlay, Eric). (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:13cv278 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The individual cases will remain active for trial. All motions shall be filed in the consolidated case. The Clerk of the Court shall add all consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as each defendants Lead and Local Counsel only. Should additional attorneys wish to appear in the consolidated case, they should file a Notice of Appearance in the lead case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/17/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Chrysler Group LLC, FIAT U.S.A., INC. and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Chrysler Group LLC, FIAT U.S.A., INC. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-4063146.), filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(DiNovo, Andrew) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 215 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?