Garrett v. ReconTrust Company, N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, Case No. 12-4060

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 10:44 AM EDT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 01009160970 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
[10126898] Order filed by Judges Gorsuch, Ebel and O'Brien denying appellee's motion to publish opinion filed by ReconTrust Company, N.A. Served on 11/20/2013. [12-4060]
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009156174 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
    [10124443] Motion filed by Appellee ReconTrust Company, N.A. to publish opinion. Served on: 11/13/2013. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [12-4060] AEM
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009140536 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
      [10115828] Mandate issued. [12-4060]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009127693 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        [10109325] Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after oral hearing; Written, signed, unpublished; Judges Gorsuch, Ebel (authoring) and O'Brien. Mandate to issue. [12-4060]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009121854 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
          [10106336] Response filed by ReconTrust Company, N.A. to Appellant's August 29, 2013 Notice of Supplemental Authority. Served on 09/09/2013. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [12-4060] AEM
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009118778 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
            [10104747] Supplemental Amicus Curiae brief filed by State of Utah. Original and 7 copies. Served on 08/29/2013. Manner of Service: US mail. [12-4060]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009118327 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
              [10104530] Appellee/Respondent's supplemental brief filed by ReconTrust Company, N.A.. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 08/30/2013. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [12-4060] AEM
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009118005 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                [10104381] Supplemental authority filed by Garry Franklin Garrett. Served on 08/29/2013. Manner of Service: email. [12-4060] JCB
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009117995 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                  [10104377] Appellant's supplemental brief filed by Garry Franklin Garrett. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 08/29/2013. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [12-4060] JCB
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009117778 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                    [10104277] Amicus Curiae brief submitted by State of Utah. 7 paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on 08/29/2013. Manner of Service: email, US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [12-4060] TDR
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009111369 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      [10101060] Order filed by Judges O'Brien, Ebel and Gorsuch granting on the State of Utah's "Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time" to file a supplemental brief in this appeal. The supplemental brief shall be served and filed on or before August 30, 2013. Served on 08/19/2013. [12-4060]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009111345 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        [10101050] Order filed by Judges O'Brien, Ebel and Gorsuch granting appellant's motion for extension of time to file both parties' supplemental briefs in this appeal. The supplemental briefs shall be served and filed on or before August 30, 2013. Served on 08/19/2013. [12-4060]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009108740 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                          [10099728] Motion filed by Appellant Garry Franklin Garrett to extend time to file parties supplemental briefs until 08/30/2013. Served on: 08/13/2013. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes.--[Edited 08/14/2013 by BV to change the event relief code and edit the docket text to reflect proper relief requested] [12-4060] JCB
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009108214 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                            [10099463] Motion filed by Amicus Curiae State of Utah to extend time to file an amicus brief until 08/13/2013. Served on: 08/13/2013. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [12-4060] TDR
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009105732 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              [10098153] Order filed by Judges Gorsuch, Ebel and O'Brien granting the joint motion for leave to file supplemental briefs. Simultaneous supplemental briefs due 08/19/2013. The briefs are limited to 10 pages. Served on 08/07/2013. [12-4060] --[Edited 08/08/2013 by SLS to correct the panel.]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009102711 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                [10096616] Motion filed by Appellee ReconTrust Company, N.A. for leave to file a supplemental brief. Served on: 08/02/2013. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [12-4060] AEM
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009102207 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                  [10096376] Response filed by ReconTrust Company, N.A. to Appellant's July 29, 2013 Notice of Supplemental Authority. Served on 08/01/2013. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [12-4060] AEM
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?