Osiris Entertainment, LLC v. Does 1-38
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-04901

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 12:42 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: 10/25/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Osiris Entertainment, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant No. 35 (Hierl, Michael)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Osiris Entertainment, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Certain Doe Defendants (Hierl, Michael)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Attorney Appearance
      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Doe 25 by Erin Kathryn Russell (Russell, Erin)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Memorandum, Opinion & Order
        MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 8/20/2013:Mailed notice(air, )
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
          MINUTE entry before Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Plaintiff's motion for leave to take early discovery [6] is granted. ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. (For further details see separate order) Mailed notice (air, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: 8/19/2013 Notice of Motion
            NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[6] before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/22/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: 8/19/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
              MEMORANDUM by Osiris Entertainment, LLC in support of motion for discovery[6] Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: 8/19/2013 Motion for Discovery
                MOTION by Plaintiff Osiris Entertainment, LLC for discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Copyright Report
                  MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (gcy, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Attorney Appearance
                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff OSIRIS ENTERTAINMENT, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Attorney Appearance
                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff OSIRIS ENTERTAINMENT, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 civil cover sheet
                        CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT filed by OSIRIS ENTERTAINMENT, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8520116. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 111 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?