Elf-Man LLC v. Doe
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-04293

Tags
Last Updated September 19, 2016 at 8:19 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Elf-Man LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
v.
No Logo Doe, Defendant
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Copyright Report
MAILED closing copyright report to Register of Copyrights in Washington, D.C. (tlm)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: 3/27/2014 Terminate Hearings
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Pursuant to Notice, the case is dismissed without prejudice against all the Doe Defendant associated with Internet Protocol address 98.227.107.19. Status hearing set for 3/27/2014 stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (etv, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: 3/26/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Elf-Man LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Doe Defendant (Hierl, Michael)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 2/27/2014 and continued to 3/27/2014 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (tlp, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: 1/9/2014 status hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: 12/11/2013 Terminate Hearings
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 status hearing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 status hearing
                MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Status hearing held on 8/28/2013. Status hearing set for 10/31/2013 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion for leave to take discovery prior to Rule 26(f) conference [6] granted. Status hearing set for 8/28/2013 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: 7/19/2013 Notice of Motion
                    NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[6] before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/24/2013 at 08:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 assigning/reassigning Case
                      EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/16/13.(ea, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery [6] Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference is taken under advisement. Mailed notice (tbk, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Notice of Motion
                          NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[6] before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 7/16/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM by Elf-Man LLC in support of motion for discovery[6] Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 Motion for Discovery
                              MOTION by Plaintiff Elf-Man LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013 Copyright Report
                                MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (et, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ELF-MAN LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Attorney Appearance
                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ELF-MAN LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 civil cover sheet
                                      CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Complaint
                                        COMPLAINT filed by ELF-MAN LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8431831. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?