In re: Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., et al v. Marie Gryphon
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 12-15782

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 7:36 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3380 - TORTS PERSONAL PROPERTY-Other
  Entries (96) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 Correspondence: Circuit Rule 36-4 request to publish opinion.. Date of service: 04/30/2014 [9078228] [12-15757, 12-15782] (THF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
    FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (BARRY G. SILVERMAN, WILLIAM A. FLETCHER and JAY S. BYBEE) The district court’s judgment is REVERSED. The district court’s March 8, 2012, order approving the settlement agreement and attorneys’ fee award; its May 29, 2012, order requiring the objectors to post appeal bonds; and its August 22, 2012, order striking Gaudet’s objection are VACATED. The case is REMANDED for proceedings consistent with this memorandum. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [9070985] [12-15757, 12-15782] (PH)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Wendy Sabina Dowse for Appellees Michael Martin, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Timothy J. Broad, Jesse Reisman and Tracey Hackwith in 12-15757, 12-15782. [9047624] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WSD)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Wendy S. Dowse for Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15757, 12-15782. Date of service: 04/07/2014. [9047043] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WSD)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/5/2014, Entered: None
          Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782, Appellee Marie Newhouse in 12-15757 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/05/2014. [9046018] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) Appellee Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr. in 12-15757 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 04/03/2014. [9043935] [12-15757, 12-15782] (ACA)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: WL): Appellant Marie E. Newhouse’s motion to allocate oral argument time is GRANTED IN PART. Oral argument time shall be allocated as follows. Appellant Newhouse’s appeal (No. 12-15782) will be heard first. Appellant Newhouse will be allowed ten minutes of oral argument time, including time reserved for rebuttal. Appellees will then be permitted ten minutes to respond to Appellant Newhouse’s argument. Appellant Robert J. Gaudet, Jr.’s appeal (No. 12-15757) will be heard second. Appellant Gaudet will be allowed ten minutes of oral argument time, including time reserved for rebuttal. Appellees will then be permitted ten minutes to respond to Appellant Gaudet’s argument. These cases shall remain consolidated for all other purposes. [9027537] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten response to motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies),motion for summary disposition). Date of service: 03/19/2014. [9023176]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15782. Resent NDA. 03/19/2014 by RY] (HIZ)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 112 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757 response to motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies),motion for summary disposition). Date of service: 03/14/2014. [9016387] [12-15757, 12-15782] (DM)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                    Filed (ECF) Appellee Marie Newhouse in 12-15757, Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 Motion for miscellaneous relief [to Allocate Oral Argument Time; or in the Alternative, to Dismiss Appeal No. 12-15757; or in the Alternative, to Sever Appeal No. 12-15757 for Oral Argument], Motion for summary disposition. Date of service: 03/10/2014. [9010015] [12-15757, 12-15782] (THF)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse reply to response (,motion for sanctions, ). Date of service: 02/10/2014. [8973426]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15757. Resent NDA. 02/11/2014 by RY] (THF)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                        Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Theodore H. Frank for Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782. [8969578] [12-15757, 12-15782] (THF)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                          Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Helen I. Zeldes, Esquire for Appellees Michael Martin, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Timothy J. Broad, Jesse Reisman, Tracey Hackwith and Maxx Scholten. [8969515]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread entry to 12-15782, resent notice. 02/06/2014 by ASW] (HIZ)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                            Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Angela Christine Agrusa, Esquire for Appellees Michael Martin, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Timothy J. Broad, Jesse Reisman and Tracey Hackwith in 12-15757. [8969252] [12-15757, 12-15782] (ACA)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                              Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782. Date of service: 10/29/2012. [8969049] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15757 response opposing motion (,motion for sanctions). Date of service: 02/06/2014. [8968787] [12-15782, 12-15757] (CLB)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
                                  Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Party Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr.. [8968004]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread to cons case 12-15782, resent notice. 02/06/2014 by ASW] (RJG)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: San Francisco. Filed by Attorney Ms. Deanne Maynard for Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757, 12-15782. [8968030] [12-15757, 12-15782] (DM)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 Motion for sanctions. Date of service: 01/31/2014. [8961067] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None
                                        Sent Notice requesting electronic excerpts in 14 days. [8936365] [12-15757, 12-15782] (SS)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                          Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/25/2013. [8837234]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15757. Resent NDA. 10/25/2013 by RY] (DM)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                            Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15757 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/23/2013. [8833181] [12-15782, 12-15757]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct ECF event. Resent NDA. 10/23/2013 by RY] (CLB)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 10/17/2013. [8824582] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 09/04/2013. [8767276] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Marie Newhouse, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757, Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782 citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 08/16/2013. [8746051] [12-15757, 12-15782]--[COURT UPDATE: Edited docket text to reflect correct party filers (Appellees only). Resent NDA. 08/16/2013 by RY] (CLB)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Filed clerk order: The reply brief [90] submitted by Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. in 12-15757 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Optional cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8727949] [12-15757, 12-15782] (LA)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr.. Date of service: 07/31/2013. [8724869]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15782. Resent NDA. 08/01/2013 by RY] (RJG)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: lbs): Appellant Gaudet’s motion for leave to file an oversized reply brief consisting of 12,440 words is granted in part. Within 14 days after the date of this order, appellant Gaudet may file a reply brief that does not exceed 8,400 words. See 9th Cir. R. 28-4. [8707143] [12-15757, 12-15782] (MS)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Filed clerk order: The reply brief [86] submitted by Marie Newhouse is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8606298] [12-15757, 12-15782] (RH)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                            Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782, Appellee Marie Newhouse in 12-15757. Date of service: 04/24/2013. [8606026] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellant Gaudet’s opposed motion for an extension of time to file the reply brief is granted. The reply brief for appellant Gaudet is due May 28, 2013. The reply brief for appellant Newhouse remains due April 26, 2013. (Pro Mo) [8574682] [12-15757, 12-15782] (MS)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757, 12-15782 response opposing motion (,motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 03/26/2013. [8570131] [12-15757, 12-15782] (HIZ)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 05/28/2013 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 03/28/2013. [8569055]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15782. Resent NDA. 03/29/2013 by RY] (RJG)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Filed clerk order: The answering brief [72] submitted by Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [72] submitted by Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8561107] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WP)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellees Timothy J. Broad, et al.’s opposed motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The Clerk shall file the answering brief submitted on March 14, 2013 by appellees Timothy J. Broad, et al. Appellant Newhouse’s request for an extension of time to file the reply brief, as stated in the response of appellant Newhouse, is granted. The reply brief is due April 26, 2013. (Pro Mo) [8560545] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Filed clerk order: The answering brief [75] submitted by Apple, Inc. is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the supplemental excerpts of record [75] submitted by Apple, Inc. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [8554287] [12-15757, 12-15782] (JB)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757, 12-15782. Date of service: 03/15/2013. [8552959] [12-15757, 12-15782]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 03/18/2013 by RY] (DM)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Natalie R. Ram for Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757, 12-15782. Date of service: 03/15/2013. [8552484] [12-15757, 12-15782] (NR)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief and supplemental excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757, 12-15782. Date of service: 03/14/2013. [8551492] [12-15757, 12-15782]--[COURT UPDATE: Attached corrected brief. Resent NDA. 03/15/2013 by RY] (HIZ)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 response to motion (,motion to extend time to file response). Date of service: 03/10/2012. [8544184] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15757, 12-15782 Motion to extend time to file a response until 03/15/2013. Date of service: 03/01/2013. [8532976] [12-15757, 12-15782] (NSM)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Appellee Apple, Inc.’s motion for an extension of time to file the answering brief is granted. The answering brief for appellee Apple, Inc. is now due March 15, 2013. The reply brief for appellant Gaudet is due within 14 days after the last served answering brief. The reply brief for appellant Newhouse remains due April 12, 2013. [8531876] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757, 12-15782 Unopposed Motion to extend time to file a response until 03/15/2013. Date of service: 02/28/2013. [8530546] [12-15757, 12-15782] (DM)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Deanne E. Maynard for Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757, 12-15782. Date of service: 02/28/2013. [8530344] [12-15757, 12-15782] (DM)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Douglas D. Winter for Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. and Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Marie Newhouse, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757, Appellant Marie Newhouse and Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782. Date of service: 01/02/2013. [8457659] [12-15757, 12-15782] (DDW)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GSS): Appellee Apple, Inc.’s and appellees Broad, et al.’s opposed motions for an extension of time to file their answering briefs are granted. The answering briefs for appellee Apple, Inc. and appellees Broad, et al. are now due March 1, 2013. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after the last served answering brief. [8456568] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15757, 12-15782 Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 03/01/2013. Date of service: 12/17/2012. [8442157] [12-15757, 12-15782] (CLB)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. in 12-15757 Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 03/01/2013. Date of service: 12/13/2012. [8438538] [12-15757, 12-15782] (PAP)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Filed clerk order: The opening brief [55] submitted by Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. in 12-15757 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8421145] [12-15757, 12-15782] (LA)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr.. Date of service: 11/29/2012. [8420494]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15782. Resent NDA. 11/30/2012 by RY] (RJG)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Filed clerk order: The opening brief [50] submitted by Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, appellant is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [8379396] [12-15757, 12-15782] (GV)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: GS): Appellant Gaudet’s opposed motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted. The opening brief for appellant Gaudet is now due November 29, 2012. The opening brief for appellant Newhouse remains due October 29, 2012. The answering brief is due January 2, 2013. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8379067] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Submitted (ECF) Opening brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782, Appellee Marie Newhouse in 12-15757. Date of service: 10/29/2012. [8378941] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. reply to response (,motion to extend time to file brief, ). Date of service: 10/18/2012. [8365890]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread entry to 12-15782, resent notice. 10/18/2012 by ASW] (RJG)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 Correspondence: grant of 9th Cir. R. 31 oral motion (correcting inadvertently erroneous correspondence of October 17). Date of service: 10/17/2012 [8364614] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Newhouse in 12-15782 Correspondence: grant of 9th Cir. R. 31 oral motion. Date of service: 10/17/2012 [8364583] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15757, 12-15782 response opposing motion (,motion to extend time to file brief). Date of service: 10/11/2012. [8356225] [12-15757, 12-15782] (NSM)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 11/29/2012 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 10/07/2012. [8351103]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15782. Resent NDA. 10/10/2012 by RY] (RJG)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 Correspondence: name change of Appellant Marie Gryphon to Marie E. Newhouse due to marriage. Date of service: 09/12/2012 [8319955] [12-15782, 12-15757] (THF)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT and CARLOS T. BEA) The court’s September 5, 2012 order is amended as follows: Appellant Marie Gryphon’s motion to vacate the appeal bond order is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the opening brief. See Azizian v. Federated Dept. Stores, Inc., 499 F.3d 950 (9th Cir. 2007). The previously established briefing schedule remains in effect. [8312320] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Filed order (STEPHEN R. REINHARDT and CARLOS T. BEA) Plaintiffs - appellees’ motion to file an oversized reply to the motion to dismiss appeal No. 12-15782 is granted. The motion to strike is denied. Plaintiffs - appellees’ motion to dismiss appeal No. 12-15782 is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the answering brief. See Nat’l Indus. v. Republic Nat’l Life Ins. Co., 677 F.2d 1258, 1262 (9th Cir. 1982) (stating that merits panel may consider appellate jurisdiction despite earlier denial of motion to dismiss). Appellant Marie Gryphon’s motion to vacate the appeal bond order is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the answering brief. See Azizian v. Federated Dept. Stores, Inc., 499 F.3d 950 (9th Cir. 2007). The following briefing schedule shall govern these consolidated appeals: the opening briefs are due October 15, 2012; the consolidated answering brief is due November 14, 2012; and the optional reply brief is due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8311291] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Received copy of District Court order filed on 08/22/2012Order granting motion to holder objector Robert J. Gaudet Jr. in contempt of court; striking objector Gaudet's objection. [8300811] [12-15757, 12-15782] (JFF)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Filed order MEDIATION (LJ): Appellant Kerry Ann Sweeney’s unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal no. 12-16053 is granted. Appeal no. 12-16053 is severed from these consolidated appeals and dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal no. 12-16053 only. [8278524] [12-15757, 12-15782] (WL)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Kerry Ann Sweeney in 12-16053 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 07/25/2012. [8263824] [12-16053, 12-15757, 12-15782] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AKT): Appellant Jeremy Lee’s unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 12-15816 is granted. Appeal No. 12-15816 is severed from these consolidated petitions and dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). All other pending motions in these consolidated cases shall be addressed by separate order. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal No. 12-15816. [8257934] [12-15757, 12-15782, 12-16053] (WL)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 reply to response (, ,motion to strike portion or whole of document,motion for sanctions). Date of service: 07/13/2012. [8250470] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (THF)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Jeremy Lee in 12-15816 Motion to dismiss case voluntarily pursuant to FRAP 42(b). Date of service: 07/11/2012. [8248718] [12-15816, 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-16053] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 response opposing motion (,motion to strike portion or whole of document,motion for sanctions). Date of service: 07/06/2012. [8239963] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 reply to response (). Date of service: 07/06/2012. [8239960] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 response opposing motion (,motion to file oversized brief). Date of service: 07/05/2012. [8238644] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (THF)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 Motion to file oversized brief. Date of service: 07/05/2012. [8238217] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 Motion to strike whole of Class Counsel's "Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Appeal" filed in violation of Fed. R. App. Proc. 27(d)(2), Motion for sanctions. Date of service: 07/03/2012. [8237371] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053 reply to response (, ). Date of service: 07/02/2012. [8234627] [12-15782, 12-15757, 12-15816, 12-16053] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [8228713] (MT)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 response opposing motion (,motion to dismiss the case). Date of service: 06/25/2012. [8227530] [12-15782, 12-15757]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to cons cases 12-15816,12-16053; resent notice. 06/26/2012 by ASW] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon in 12-15782 reply to response (, ,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 06/25/2012. [8227529] [12-15782, 12-15757]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread filing to cons cases 12-15816,12-16053; resent notice. 06/26/2012 by ASW] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: AT): Appellant Dale Funk’s unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal No. 12-15740 is granted. Appeal No. 12-15740 is dismissed. See Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). The court sua sponte consolidates appeal No. 12-16053 with appeal Nos. 12- 15757, 12-15782, and 12-15816. The pending motion to vacate or modify the appeal bond and motion to dismiss filed in appeal No. 12-15782 shall be addressed by separate order. This order served on the district court shall act as and for the mandate of this court for appeal No. 12-15740. [8220145] [12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816, 12-16053] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816 response opposing motion (,motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 06/18/2012. [8218788] [12-15782, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816] (HIZ)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten in 12-15782, Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816 Motion to dismiss the case. Date of service: 06/15/2012. [8216413] [12-15782, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816] (CLB)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Nick S. Movaghar for - MagSafe Apple Power Adapter Litigation and Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman in 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816. Date of service: 06/14/2012. [8215215] [12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816] (NSM)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Joseph Darrell Palmer for Appellant Jeremy Lee in 12-15816. Date of service: 06/13/2012. [8213442] [12-15816, 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782] (JDP)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) - MagSafe Apple Power Adapter Litigation and Appellees Apple, Inc., Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman Joint Motion to dismiss party from case. Date of service: 06/11/2012. [8209941]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816. Resent NDA. 06/11/2012 by RY] (ACA)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon Motion for miscellaneous relief [Vacate or modify appeal bond (Dkt. No. 161)]. Date of service: 06/08/2012. [8207780]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15740, 12-15816, 12-15757. Resent NDA. 06/11/2012 by RY] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Filed order (EDWARD LEAVY and MICHAEL DALY HAWKINS) Appellant Gaudet’s motion, filed in appeal No. 12-15757, to stay the district court’s May 29, 2012 order is denied. See Hilton v. Braunskill, 481 U.S. 770, 776 (1987). The briefing schedule established previously in these consolidated appeals shall remain in effect. [8206637] [12-15757, 12-15740, 12-15782, 12-15816] (KD)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [8206579] [12-15757, 12-15740, 12-15782, 12-15816] (JFF)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellees Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa, Jr., Michael Martin and Jesse Reisman response opposing motion (,motion to stay lower court action). Date of service: 06/07/2012. [8205823]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15740, 12-15782, 12-15816. Resent NDA. 06/07/2012 by RY] (ACA)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellant Robert Joseph Gaudet, Jr. Motion to stay lower court action. Date of service: 06/05/2012. [8203410]--[COURT UPDATE: Spread docket text to 12-15740, 12-15782, 12-15816. Resent NDA. 06/06/2012 by RY] (RJG)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court. [8201999] (MT)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): Appellee Apple, Inc.’s motions to consolidate case Nos. 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782, and 12-15816 are granted. The following consolidated briefing schedule shall govern: The opening briefs are due July 16, 2012. The consolidated answering brief is due August 15, 2012. The optional reply briefs are due within 14 days after service of the answering brief. The parties are reminded of the court’s preference for joint briefing. 9th Cir. R. 28-4. [8167660] [12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15782, 12-15816] (WL)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. Supplemental Motion to consolidate cases. Date of service: 05/03/2012. [8164536] (PAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. Corrected Motion to consolidate cases 12-15740, 12-15757, 12-15816. Date of service: 05/02/2012. [8162605] (PAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/16/2012. [8141793] (PAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon Correspondence: Notice pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1. Date of service: 04/12/2012 [8137652] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Filed (ECF) Appellant Marie Gryphon Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 04/12/2012. [8137648] (THF)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee Apple, Inc. Correspondence: Request for removal of attorney from docket. Date of service: 04/10/2012 [8134797] (ADM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 04/16/2012. Transcript ordered by 05/07/2012. Transcript due 06/05/2012. Appellant Marie Gryphon opening brief due 07/16/2012. Appellees Apple, Inc., Timothy J. Broad, Tracey Hackwith, Naotaka Kitagawa Jr., Michael Martin, Jesse Reisman and Maxx Scholten answering brief due 08/15/2012. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8131491] (GR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?