ACUMED LLC v. ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-02711
District Judge Juan R. Sanchez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 20, 2019 at 2:45 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Acumed LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ansa Assuncao LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. O'Neill +1 267 528 0750 michael.oneill@ansalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael L. Eidel +1 215 918 3568 +1 215 345 7507 meidel@foxrothschild.com
No Logo SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rawle & Henderson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED WILLIAM C. MCGOVERN +1 215 575 4236 wmcgovern@rawle.com
No Logo ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., Counter-Claimant
No Logo PRESIDENT ROBERT C. MORRIS, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by AGINS HAAZ & SEIDEL, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARY GREEN +1 215 574 0600 +1 215 574 0310 ggreen@focusers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Forry, Ullman, Ullman & Forry, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/18/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY MICHAEL F. SCHLEIGH +1 610 977 4103 +1 610 977 2980 mschleigh@forryullman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SIDKOFF PINCUS & GREEN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LARRY M. KELLER +1 215 574 0600 +1 215 574 0310 lmk@sidkoffpincusgreen.com
No Logo PRESIDENT ROBERT C. MORRIS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/12/2007 SEBASTIAN M. RAINONE +1 610 941 7222 +1 610 941 0577
No Logo Acumed LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION Michael L. Eidel +1 215 918 3568 +1 215 345 7507 meidel@foxrothschild.com
No Logo SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael L. Eidel +1 215 918 3568 +1 215 345 7507 meidel@foxrothschild.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (185) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None
Withdrawal of Bill of Cost by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (EIDEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 6/29/2010 (afm, ). (Entered: 06/29/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
    ORDER THAT JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. AND ROBERT C. MORRIS ON JURY INTERRGATORY 15. THE JURYS JUDGMENT OF DAMAGES AT INTERROGATORY 16 AWARDED IS BY THIS ORDER SET ASIDE AND JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS. THE JURYS AWARD OF PUNITIVE AND COMPENSATORY DAMAGES IS BY THIS ORDER ALSO SET ASIDE AND JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS. INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF IS LIFTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/24/09. 4/27/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(rf, ) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
      ORDER OF USCA THAT THE ORDER OF THE DISTRICT COURT ENTERED 5/21/07 IS REVERSED IN PART AND THE CASE IS REMANDED TO THE DISTRICT COURT FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. (rf, ) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/12/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
          STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS, ADVANCED AND MORRIS SHALL POST AND FILE WITH THE COURT A BOND IN THE AMOUNT OF $327,000 NO LATER THAN 6/22/2007, ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/4/07. 6/4/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/4/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
              Copy of TPO Form re 174 Notice of Appeal, 175 Notice of Appeal, : (le, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                STIPULATION for Posting of Supersedeas Bond to Stay Enforcement of Monetary Judgment Pending Appeal, and for Stay of Portion of Injunction; [Proposed] Order by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
                  Clerk's Notice to USCA re 175 Notice of Appeal, : (le, ) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
                    Clerk's Notice to USCA re 174 Notice of Appeal, : (le, ) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                      AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 100 Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, 79 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, 115 Order,,, Judgment,, 114 Order,,,,, Judgment,,,, 167 Memorandum & Opinion,,, 134 Judgment,, by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS(AN INDIVIDUAL). Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and LARRY M. KELLER, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (KELLER, LARRY) Modified on 5/23/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 05/22/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 167 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS, Certificate of Service. Filing fee NOT PAID. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and LARRY M. KELLER (KELLER, LARRY) Modified on 5/22/2007 (fh) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                          Certification of Michael F. Schleigh, Esquire re 153 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS with Certificate of Service. (for pdf, see # 160) (le, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                            Memorandum in Support re 135 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Lanham Act filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS with Certificate of Service. (for pdf, see # 159) (le, ) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                              Reply to Response to 128 Motion to Set Aside Judgment and for Judgment NOV or New Trial, Amendment of Judgment and/or Remittitur pursuantto FRCivP 50(b) and 59 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment and for Judgment NOV or New Trial, Amendment of Judgment and/or Remittitur pursuantto FRCivP 50(b) and 59 filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS with Certificate of Service. (for pdf, see #158) (le, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                Reply to Response to 129 Motion for Attorney Fees pursuant to FRCivP 54 filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS with Certificate of Service. (for pdf, see # 157) (le, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                  Reply to Response to 128 Motion to Set Aside Judgment and for Judgment NOV or New Trial, Amendment of Judgment and/or Remittitur pursuantto FRCivP 50(b) and 59 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment and for Judgment NOV or New Trial, Amendment of Judgment and/or Remittitur pursuantto FRCivP 50(b) and 59 filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS with Certificate of Service. (for pdf, see #156)(le, ) Modified on 5/21/2007 (le, ). (bp, ). (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                    Reply Memorandum in Support of 123 Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. with Certificate of Service. (for pdf, see #155) (le, ) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS, MOTION TO SET ASIDE JUDGMENT, MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES UNDER RULE 54(d)(2), MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES UNDER THE LANHAM ACT AND MOTION FOR JUDGMENT NOV ON PUNITIVE DAMAGES ARE DENIED. PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMETNS ARE GRANTED AND EXHIBITS A TO DOCUMENTS 155-160 SHALL BE DOCKETED AT THE NEXT DOCKET NUMBERS. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUR-REPLY IS DENIED. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PREMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF IS GRANTED AS FULLY OUTLINED HEREIN. THE CLERK IS DIRECTED TO TAX PLAINTIFF'S BILL OF COSTS AFTER WHICH BY RULE DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE FIVE DAYS TO RESPOND. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/18/07. (Attachments: # 1 Order) 5/21/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 05/21/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by LARRY M. KELLER on behalf of ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS(AN INDIVIDUAL) with Certificate of Service(KELLER, LARRY) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by MICHAEL F. SCHLEIGH on behalf of ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : ORAL ARGUMENT ON MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS held on 5/4/07. (jl, ) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                              AMENDED ORDER THAT 90 MINUTES OF ORAL ARGUMENT ON OUTSTANDING MOTIONS WILL BE HEARD ON 5/4/2007 AT 1:00 PM IN COURTROOM 5D BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/1/07. 5/2/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 148 MOTION for Judgment NOV or in the Alternative for Remittitur or New Trial on Punitive Damages on Verdict docketed on April 4, 2007 filed by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY TO DEFENDANTS REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL FILED BY SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.((SUR-REPLY ATTACHED)le, ) Modified on 5/1/2007 (le, ). (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Sanctions Plaintiffs Pusuant to F.R.Civ.P. 11(c)(1)(A) Nunc Pro Tunc re 153 Reply to Response to Motion filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. and ROBERT C. MORRIS. with Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Counsel# 2 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/27/2007 (le, ). (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Leave to File REPLY to Response to Motion re 135 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Lanham Act with Motion for Leave to File same filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Reply Memorandum# 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-12# 3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/26/2007 (np). (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File REPLY to Response to Motion re 128 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment and for Judgment NOV or New Trial, Amendment of Judgment and/or Remittitur pursuantto FRCivP 50(b) and 59 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment and for Judgment NOV or New Trial, Amendment of Judgment and/or Remittitur pursuantto FRCivP 50(b) and 59 with Motion for Leave to File Same filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Reply Memorandum# 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service# 3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2) (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/26/2007 (np). (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                          Motion for Leave to File REPLY to Response to 129 MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to FRCivP 54 filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. and ROBERT C. MORRIS with Certificate of Service. (Reply Brief attached hereto) (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Reply Memorandum# 2 Supplement Certificate of Service# 3 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 5)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/25/2007 (le, ). (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                            Motion for Leave to File Reply to Response to 128 MOTION for Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 50(b) or in the Alternative for Amended Judgment, Remittitur of Damages filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. and ROBERT C. MORRIS with Certificate of Service. (Reply Brief attached hereto.) (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Reply Memorandum# 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-6# 3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/25/2007 (le, ). (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Permanent Injunctive Relief filed by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (REPLY MEMORANDUM ATTACHED) (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Reply Memorandum of Law)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 135 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Lanham Act filed by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Declaration of Michael Eidel, Esquire)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 111 First MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11(c) filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 10)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/19/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 151 Response by PLAINTIFFS' ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. to DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 50(b), ETC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/23/2007 (fh) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      Response by PLAINTIFFS' ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. to DEFENDANTS' 128 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 50(b) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AMENDED JUDGMENT REMITTITUR OF DAMAGES, AND/OR NEW TRIAL PURSUANT TO FRCP 59 RELATING TO JURY VERDICT AND ORDER ENTERED MARCH 22, 2007, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/23/2007 (fh) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 129 MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to FRCivP 54 filed by ACUMED LLC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/18/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          Response to 148 Motion for Judgment NOV or in the Alternative for Remittitur or New Trial on Punitive Damages on Verdict docketed on April 4, 2007 filed by SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. with Memorandum and Certificate of Service. (le, ) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for Judgment NOV or in the Alternative for Remittitur or New Trial on Punitive Damages on Verdict docketed on April 4, 2007 filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Supplement Certificate of Service# 4 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              BILL OF COSTS by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Erin L. Ginsberg, Esquire# 2 Exhibits 1 to 8# 3 Exhibits 9 to 17# 4 Exhibits 18 to 33# 5 Exhibits 34 to 39# 6 Certificate of Service)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/17/2007 (afm, ). Modified on 6/29/2010 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 111 First MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11(c) filed by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., DECLARATION, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Supplement # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 4/12/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/19/07 before Judge SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: ADRIENNE MANN. CIVIL JURY TRIAL DAY 6 (jl, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    AMENDED ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL OUTSTANDING MOTIONS WILL TAKE PLACE ON5/4/2007 AT 3:00 PM IN COURTROOM 5D BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/10/07. 4/11/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 123 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibit 1# 2 Supplement Certificate of Service# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/23/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/22/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/21/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/20/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/16/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/15/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ORDER THAT ORAL ARGUMENT ON ALL OUTSTANDING MOTIONS WILL TAKE PLACE ON 4/24/2007 AT 2:00 PM IN COURTROOM 5D BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/9/07. 4/10/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 04/10/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Lanham Act filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law# 2 Supplement Certificate of Service# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CIVIL JUDGMENT IS HEREBY ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFFS AND AGAINST DEFENDANTS, ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. AND ROBERT C. MORRIS AS TO INTERROGATORY 15. DAMAGES ARE AWARDED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1.00 TO ACUMED, LLC AND $20,000 TO SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. PUNITIVE DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $200,000 ARE AWARDED TO PLAINTIFFS. FIFTY PERCENT OF THE PUNITIVE DAMAGES IS AWARDED TO ACUMED LLC AND FIFTY PERCENT IS AWARDED TO SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/23/07. 4/4/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PA BE AND HE IS HEREBY DIRECTED TO FURNISH LUNCH FOR JURORS ENGAGED IN THE ABOVE ENTITLED CASE. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/21/07. (le, ) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Jury Trial completed on 3/23/07 Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann.Punitive damages case. Mr. Eidel and Mr. Green make closing statements. Mr. Eidel makes rebuttal statement. Jury charged. Jury retires to deliberate. Jury returnes with verdict. Jury instructed on nominal damages. First verdict slip: Interrogatory 1: $200,000, Interrogatory 2: Acumed 50% and Surgical Resources 50%. Second verdict slip: Interrogatory #1: $1.00. Verdict recorded and jury dismissed. (le, ) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Jury Trial held on 3/21/07. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann.Jury returns to deliberate. Jury reaches a verdict. Interrogatories answered. Verdict recorded. (le, ) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Jury Trial held on 3/20/07. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann.Closing Statements by Mr. Eidel and Mr. Green. Rebuttal by Mr. Eidel. Jury charged. Jury retires to deliberate. (le, ) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney Fees pursuant to FRCivP 54 filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Set Aside Judgment and for Judgment NOV or New Trial, Amendment of Judgment and/or Remittitur pursuantto FRCivP 50(b) and 59 filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.Memorandum, Certificate. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law# 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 3# 3 Text of Proposed Order # 4 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Jury Trial held on 3/19/07. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann.Deposition testimony of Michael Simpson read into evidence. Direct, cross and redirect of witnesses, Robert C. Morris and Todd Hydock. Direct testimony of witness, Jeanne Mikalauskas. Deposition testimony of Dipak Rajhansa and Michael Simpson read into evidence. (le, ) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Jury Trial held on 3/16/07. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann.Deposition testimony of Garvey Jonassaint read into evidence. Direct, Cross an Redirect of witnesses John Rafferty, Michael Patten and Virginia Melcer. Deposition of Robert E. Morris read into evidence.Direct, cross, redirect and recross of Randy Huebner. Deposition testimony of Michael Simpson read into evidence. Exhibit 188 was admitted into evidence. (le, ) (Entered: 04/03/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Verdict Slips including questions from Jury.(le, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Copy of TPO Form re 117 Notice of Appeal : (mas, ) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTIVE RELIEF FILED BY ACUMED LLC AND SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. WITH MEMORANDUM AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order# 2 Certificate of Service)(le, ) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Omnibus Filing of Correspondence with the Court as or record re: Stipulations, Witness Lists, Proposed Verdict Slips, etc by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Correspondence Part 1# 2 Exhibit Correspondence Part 2)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/27/2007 (np). (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Questions to Jurors with answers thereof. (le, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Notice to USCA re 117 Notice of Appeal : (le, ) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION FOR PURSUAN TO F.R.C.P. 50(a) REGARDING PUNITIVE DAMAGES ASSESSMENT RELATING TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNT EIGH-INTEREFERENCE WITH EXISTING AND PROSPECTIVE CONTRACTUAL OR BUSINESS RELATIONS WITH CUSTOMERS by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Supplement Certificate of Service# 3)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/23/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION FOR Preclusion of Allowing Jury to Assess Punitive Damages for Plantiff Acumed filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/23/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. Copies to Judge, Clerk USCA, Appeals Clerk and MICHAEL F. SCHLEIGH (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/23/2007 (np). (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Points for Charge for Punitive Damages Hearing by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/23/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT JUDGMENT ON COUNT VII OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF ACUMED LLC AND AGAINST ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. AND ROBERT C. MORRIS WITH ZERO DOLLARS IN COMPENSATORY DAMAGES. JUDGMENT ON COUNT VII OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. AND AGAINST ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. AND ROBERT C. MORRIS WITH DAMAGES OF $20,000 IN COMPENSATORY DAMAGES. A HEARING WILL BE HELD ON 3/23/2007 AT 9:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3B FOR JURY DETERMINATION OF PUNITIVE DAMAGES CONSISTENT WITH THE JURY'S VERDICT AS TO LIABILITY ON INTERROGATORY 17 OF THE VERDICT SLIP. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/21/07. 3/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED INSTRUCTIONS 35, 37, 38, 44, 45, 46, 47, 48, 49, 50, 51, 52, 53, 54 AND 55 ARE SUSTAINED. PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED INSTRUCTION 31 IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED INSTRUCTIONS NUMBERED 20, 22, 24, 25 AND 26 ARE DENIED. INSTRUCTION NUMBERED 20A IS ADDED AT DEFENDANTS' REQUEST; INSTRUCTION AT PAGE 66A IS ADDED AT PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST. NONE OF DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED INSTRUCTIONS NUMBERED 75 TO 86 WILL BE GIVEN. OBJECTIONS TO THE CHARGE ARE PRESERVED. DEFENDANT SURGICAL RESOURCES' MOTION UNDER RULE 50(a) IS GRANTED AND JUDGMENT IS ENTERED IN FAVOR OF SURGICAL RESOURCES AND AGAINST ADVANCED SURGICAL RESOURCES AND ROBERT MORRIS ON ALL COUNTS OF THE COUNTERCLAIM BY ADVANCED SURGICAL RESOURCES AND ROBERT MORRIS. PLAINTIFF ACCUMED'S AND DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(a) ARE RESERVED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/20/07. 3/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS, ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. AND ROBERT MORRIS ARE TO DELIVER TO PLAINTIFFS, ACCUMED LLC AND SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. BY NOON ON 3/22/2007 THE DOCUMENTS LISTED HEREIN. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/20/07. 3/22/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct the Court's Order of Judgment dated March 21, 2007 filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Service# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/22/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Sanctions pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11(c) filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.See attachments. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Brief & Certificate of Service# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED DOCUMENT by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. Amendment to 105 Proposed Jury Instructions, 104 Amended Document Corresponding Certificate of Service. (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/14/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/13/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/12/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Jury Trial held on 3/15/07. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann.Robert C. Morris testimony resumed. J. Peterson, J. Ollila, M. Moore, S. Rainone, R. Crognale, D. Mitchell sworn. Deposition of D. Rjahansa played into evidence. Exhibits admitted into evidence. (le, ) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Requests for Jury Instructions by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Supplemental Charges) (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/20/2007 (np). (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/18/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED DOCUMENT by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. Amendment to 82 Witness List Amendment of F.R.C.P. 32 Deposition Deisgnations Supplement to Pre-Trial Statement. (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Jury Trial held on 3/14/07. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann.Conference with counsel in chambers. Plaintiff's case. Nancy Stout resumes. Fred Zullo, Larry Harkins and Robert C. Morris sworn. Exhibits admitted. (le, ) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Jury Trial held on 3/13/07. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann.Kelly Packard testimony resumed. Alan Kozlowski and Nancy Stout sworn. 2 Exhibits admitted. (le, ) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/12/07 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE IS DENIED IN ITS ENTIRETY, PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED DEFAMATORY STATEMENTS IS GRANTED, PLAINTIFF REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IS GRANTED, DEFENDANTS' MOTION ON PRESENTATION OF WITNESSES IS DENIED AS MOOT, PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PRECLUDE ARGUMENT AND EVIDENCE ON ABUSE OF PROCESS IS GRANTED, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO ADMIT WEBSITE PRINTOUTS IS DENIED, DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF NANCY STOUT AND JENNIFER OLLILA IS RESERVED FOR TRIAL AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO CORRECT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/12/07.3/14/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 03/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Civil Jury Trial - Day 1 held on 3/12/07 Court Reporter: ADRIENNE MANN.26 jurors called for voir dire, 8 jurors selected and swornAttorney's for Plaintiff and Defendant make opening statmentsExhibits admitted(mas, ) Modified on 3/14/2007 (mas, ). (Entered: 03/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Withdrawal of Appearance filed by SEBASTIAN M. RAINONE, Esquire on behalf of ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. and ROBERT C. MORRIS.(le, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 84 Fourth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Witnesses due to Incompetency and Irrelevancy filed by ACUMED LLC. (EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 Third MOTION in Limine regardig admissibility of certain website print-outs filed by ACUMED LLC. (EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/9/07.3/12/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Telephone Conference held on 3/9/07. (le, ) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Telephone Conference held on 2/27/07. (le, ) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Pre-Motion argument held on 2/23/07. (le, ) (Entered: 03/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/23/2007 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Support re 80 Second MOTION in Limine regarding Presentation of Issues Relevant to Defendants Contracts with Non-Parties, etc. Letter Brief filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Verdict Sheet by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/8/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 68 MOTION in Limine on Various Evidentiary Issues filed by ACUMED LLC(A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATION), SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 # 3)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/8/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 79 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, and Response to Defendants' Joint Motion in Limine on related issues filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/8/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List as Supplemented by Defendants by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.. Certificate of Service (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corrected Certificate of service RE: to Exclude Testimony of Witnesses due to Incompetency and Irrelevancy filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/8/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fourth MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony of Witnesses due to Incompetency and Irrelevancy filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit B# 3 Errata C# 4 Exhibit A)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/8/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Third MOTION in Limine regardig admissibility of certain website print-outs filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. Certificate of Service, Order. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A & B)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/8/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                DEFENDANT AND PLAINTIFF ON COUNTERCLAIM AMENDED PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. Certificate of Service (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/8/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Preclude Argument and Evidence Relating to Allegations of Abuse of Process, Wrongful Use of Civil Proceedings and Unfair Competition Predicated upon Plaintiffs' Privileged Statements and Conduct during this Litigation filed by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order# 2 Certificate of Service)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second MOTION in Limine regarding Presentation of Issues Relevant to Defendants Contracts with Non-Parties, etc. filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.Certificate of Service, Order, Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT ACUMED AND SURGICAL RESOURCESS REQUEST TO DISMISS COUNT IV OF THE COUNTERCLAIM IS GRANTED IN PART. COUNT IV IS DISMISSED AS TO INSTITUTING GROUNDLESS LITIGATION, ENGAGING IN DEFAMATION, AND UNLAWFUL RESTRAINT OF TRADE. ACUMED AND SURGICAL RESOURCES REQUEST IS DENIED SOLELY AS TO TORTIOUS INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACT. ANY EVIDENTIARY ISSUES REMAINING ARE RESERVED FOR TRIAL WHICH WILL BEGIN MARCH 12, 2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/6/07. 3/7/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) Modified on 3/8/2007 (np). (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION IN LIMINE OF PLAINTIFFS AS DEFENDANTS ON COUNTERCLAIM, ACUMED LLC AND SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OR EVIDENCE OF ALLEGED DEFAMATORY STATEMENTS WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(le, ) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Telephone Conference held on 2/12/07. (le, ) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge CHARLES B. SMITH : Settlement Conference held on 3/5/07. (le, ) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES B. SMITH FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES ONLY. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 3/2/07. 3/6/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED AND FAXED.(le, ) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement Proposed Neutral Statement of the Case by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Pretrial Memorandum Part 2)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. Certificate of Service (EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/2/07 Court Reporter: Connie S. Flores.Counsel addressed the Court on behalf of their clients. Counsel will will have until Wednesday to submit any additional matters to the Court. (le, ) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement Proposed Neural Statement of Facts by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine on Various Evidentiary Issues filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.Certificate of Service.(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE ON 3/5/2007 AT 1:00 PM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS ROOM 3000 BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES B. SMITH. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE ATTACHED SUMMARY SHEET SHOULD BE SUBMITTED VIA FAX BY NOON TWO DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY JUDGE CHARLES B. SMITH ON 3/1/07. 3/1/07 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND FAXED BY CHAMBERS.(le, ) (Entered: 03/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defndants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint Incorporating Previous Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims and Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  letter Memorandum pursuant to Court Instruction filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/27/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Brief in Support of Spoliation Sanctions filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/23/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Brief on Pre-Motion in support of Filing Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/23/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 02/22/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT 10 OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO ITS REASSERTATION AT THE CLOSE OF TESTIMONY. PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND ITS AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD A COUNT ALLEGING A VIOLATION OF THE RACKETEERING INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATIONS IS DENIED AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/16/07.2/20/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 02/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED DOCUMENT by ACUMED LLC. Amendment to 59 Response in Opposition to Motion, Executed Declaration of Michael Eidel. (EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 48 MOTION to Amend/Correct 34 Amended Complaint filed by ACUMED LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 57 MOTION to Strike 51 Response to Motion,, to Strike Declarations of Kelly Packard and Nancy Stout MOTION to Strike 51 Response to Motion,, to Strike Declarations of Kelly Packard and Nancy Stout filed by ACUMED LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Eidel# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Certificate of Service)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Telephone Conference held on 2/6/07. (le, ) (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike 51 Response to Motion,, to Strike Declarations of Kelly Packard and Nancy Stout filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Supplement Memorandum of Law# 10 Text of Proposed Order # 11 Supplement Certificate of service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 44 MOTION to Dismiss Count Ten of Plaintiffs? Amended Complaint (Exhibits to follow) MOTION to Dismiss Count Ten of Plaintiffs? Amended Complaint (Exhibits to follow) filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 25# 25 Exhibit 26# 26 Exhibit 27# 27 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Acumed Acquisition, Inc., Acumed Holding, Inc., Autonomy 4-PESP, Inc. by ACUMED LLC.(EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT PLFFS ACUMED & SURGICAL RESOURCES WILL RESPOND TO SO MANY OF THE INTERROGATORIES PROPOUNDED BY DEFT ROBERT MORRIS AS RELATE TO MORRIS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DEFT'S DEMAND FOR FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS FROM PLFF ACUMED IS DENIED UNLESS & UNTIL SUCH TIME AS A NET WORTH STATEMENT BECOMES RELEVANT, ETC. PRE-MOTION ARGUMENT IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/23/2007 IN COURTROOM 5D. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/6/07. 2/8/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 02/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC.(nda, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE in Opposition re 48 MOTION to Amend/Correct 34 Amended Complaint RICO Claims of Second Amended Complaint filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11a (Split due to size)# 12 Exhibit 11b (Split duue to size)# 13 Exhibit 12a (split due to size)# 14 Exhibit 12b (split due to size)# 15 Exhibit 13# 16 Exhibit 14# 17 Exhibit 15# 18 Exhibit 16# 19 Exhibit 17# 20 Exhibit 18# 21 Exhibit 19# 22 Exhibit 20# 23 Exhibit 21# 24 Exhibit 22# 25 Exhibit 23# 26 Supplement Certificate of Service# 27 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 2/5/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 02/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 44 MOTION to Dismiss Count Ten of Plaintiffs? Amended Complaint (Exhibits to follow) or in the Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment on Count Ten of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 56 filed by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Memorandum of Law# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C-F# 6 Exhibit G# 7 Exhibit H-I# 8 Exhibit J# 9 Exhibit K-P# 10 Exhibit Q)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Protective Order filed by ROBERT C. MORRIS, ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.Memorandum,Exhibits,Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit Certification# 5 Exhibit Certificate of service# 6 Text of Proposed Order Order)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 1/25/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Telephone Conference held on 1/3/07. (le, ) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct 34 Amended Complaint filed by ACUMED LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C-D# 4 Exhibit E# 5 Exhibit F# 6 Exhibit G# 7 Exhibit H-J# 8 Exhibit K# 9 Exhibit L-M)(EIDEL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibits to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count 10 of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. and ROBERT C. MORRIS.. (le, ) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Motion Hearing held on 12/13/06 re 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by ACUMED LLC,, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., (le, ) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS DENIED. THE DEPOSITION OF SEBASTIAN RAINONE, ESQUIRE SHALL BE SCHEDULED IN CONSULTATION WITH MR. RAINONE, BUT SHALL BE COMPLETED PRIOR TO THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY ON 2/1/2007. BOTH PLAINTIFFS' AND DEFENDANTS' REQUESTS FOR SANCTIONS ARE DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 1/10/07. 1/11/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Count Ten of Plaintiffs? Amended Complaint (Exhibits to follow) filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS, Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Text of Proposed Order # 4 Supplement Cerificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 1/12/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Applications for Sanctions Against Defendants for Third Party Sebastian Rainone's Failure to Appear for Deposition and in Support of Sanction Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to 28 USCA Section 1927 re 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Defendants were unable to select the appropriate item to respond to through the ECF system after numerous attempts) filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Supplement Memorandum of Law# 7 Text of Proposed Order # 8 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum re 28 Letter Brief RE: in Oppoistion and in response to Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC.. (RAINONE, SEBASTIAN) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. re 40 Reply to Response to Motion (RAINONE, SEBASTIAN) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 Letter Brief RE: in Oppoistion and in response to Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel filed by ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(RAINONE, SEBASTIAN) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/8/06 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA TO HARLEYSVILLE NATIONAL BANK IS DENIED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/27/2006. 12/27/2006 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. (nda, ) (Entered: 12/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT to Amended Complaint by ACUMED LLC.. (O'NEILL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 33 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Directed to Harleysville National Bank or in the Alternative for Protective Order filed by ACUMED LLC., Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through C# 2 Exhibit D through F# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(O'NEILL, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/27/2006 (np). (Entered: 12/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION/PETITION for Order to Show Cause Why Third Party Sebastian Rainon, Esq. Should Not Be Held in Contemp for Failure to Comply with Subpoena (FRCP 45(e)); Request for Costs and Expenses Against Third Party, and Sanctions Against Defendants by ACUMED LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through D# 2 Text of Proposed Order to Show Cause)(O'NEILL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS filed by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. with Certificate of Service.(le, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/2/2007 (bj, ). (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena Directed to Harleysville National Bank or in the Alternative for Protective Order filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7# 9 Exhibit 8# 10 Text of Proposed Order # 11 Supplement Certificate of service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Oral Argument) held on 12/13/06 before Judge JUAN SANCHEZ. Audio Operator: Adrienne Mann (jmp, ) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO COMPEL RELEASE OF A VIDEOTAPE FROM UNRELATED LITIGATION IS DENIED. PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO RE-OPEN THE DEPOSITION OF JOHN RAFFERTY IS GRANTED IN SO FAR AS QUESTIONS PERTAIN TO RAFFERTY'S DEALINGS WITH DEFENDANTS. DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' WITNESSES IN THE EDPA IS GRANTED IN PART. THE DEPOSITIONS OF OREGON-BASED KELLY PACKARD, CHAD CASEY AND THURMAN BALLARD SHALL BE TAKEN IN THIS FORUM ON CONVENIENT DATES WITH EACH PARTY BEARING ITS IWN COSTS. IF THE PARTIES AGREE TO CONDUCT THE DEPOSITIONS IN OREGON, PLAINTIFF SHALL PAY THE COST FOR AN ATTORNEY FOR THE DEFENSE TO ATTEND. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/13/06.12/13/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED.(le, ) Modified on 12/13/2006 (le, ). (Entered: 12/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Motion Hearing held on 11/30/06 re 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by ACUMED LLC,, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC., (le, ) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re 28 Letter Brief RE: in Oppoistion and in response to Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel Supplement: Complete Deposition Transcript of James Rafferty in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Brief RE: Opposition and in response to Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Affidavit, Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Text of Proposed Order Order# 19 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/8/2006 (np). (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/30/06 before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ. Court Reporter: Adrienne Mann. (le, ) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. WITH REGARD TO PLAINTFF, ACUMED'S SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES, PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO INTERROGATORIES 2 AND 6 ARE SUSTAINED. PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO INTERROGATORIES 9, 10, 12 AND 16 ARE OVERRULED AS MOOT. PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO INTERROGATORIES 13, 15 AND 17 ARE OVERRULED. PLAINTIFF, ACUMED SHALL PRODUCE THE AFFIDAVIT REFERENCED IN INTERROGATORY 11 WITHIN 5 DAYS OF THIS ORDER. WITH REGARD TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO DOCUMENT PRODUCTION, PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS TO REQUESTS # 2, 4, 5, 6, AND 7 ARE OVERRULED AS MOOT. PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO REQUEST # 3 IS SUSTAINED. ORAL ARGUMENT ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND AND DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER WILL BE HELD ON 12/13/2006 AT 8:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5D BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. FACT DISCOVERY WILL CLOSE ON 2/1/2007. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 2/9/2007. THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 3/2/2007 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5D. THE CASE WILL BE PLACED IN THE 3/6/2007 TRIAL POOL. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 12/4/06. 12/5/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Telephone Conference held on 11/20/06. (le, ) (Entered: 12/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 First MOTION to Compel Discovery, Overrule Objections, Award Sanctions, & Extend Discovery Period Supplement in Response to Matters Arising from the Court's Discovery Telephone Conference of NOvember 20, 2006 and in Further Support of Defendants' Motion filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Service# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of Appearance filed by WILLIAM C. MCGOVERN on behalf of SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (le, ) (Entered: 11/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 First MOTION to Compel Discovery, Overrule Objections, Award Sanctions, & Extend Discovery Period Supplemental Reply filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Supplement Certificate of Service)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER THAT A CONFERENCE REGARDING DOCUMENT NUMBERS 16 AND 17 IS SET FOR 11/30/2006 AT 10:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5D BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/13/06. 11/14/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 11/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 First MOTION to Compel Discovery, Overrule Objections, Award Sanctions, & Extend Discovery Period filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Service# 2 Exhibit 1)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Supplement Certificate of Service# 4 Exhibit 2# 5 Exhibit 3# 6 Exhibit 4# 7 Exhibit 5# 8 Exhibit 6# 9 Exhibit 7# 10 Exhibit 8# 11 Exhibit 9# 12 Exhibit 10# 13 Exhibit 11# 14 Exhibit 12# 15 Exhibit 13# 16 Exhibit 15# 17 Exhibit 14# 18 Exhibit 16# 19 Exhibit 17# 20 Exhibit 18# 21 Exhibit 19# 22 Exhibit 20)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) Modified on 11/14/2006 (cdd, ). (Entered: 11/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 16 First MOTION to Compel Discovery, Overrule Objections, Award Sanctions, & Extend Discovery Period filed by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Order# 2 Memorandum of Law in Support# 3 Certificate of Service# 4 Exhibit A# 5 Exhibit B# 6 Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit D)(O'NEILL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Amended Complaint# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Original Complaint# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Letter from Gary Green)(O'NEILL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to Compel Discovery, Overrule Objections, Award Sanctions, & Extend Discovery Period filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS.Memorandum. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Good Faith# 2 Supplement Certificate of Service# 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 4 Exhibit A# 5 Exhibit B# 6 Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit E# 9 Exhibit F# 10 Exhibit G# 11 Exhibit H# 12 Exhibit I# 13 Exhibit J# 14 Exhibit K# 15 Exhibit L# 16 Exhibit M# 17 Exhibit N# 18 Supplement Memorandum of Law)(SCHLEIGH, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXENSION OF DISCOVERY & ALL CORRESPONDING DEADLINES IN THIS CASE FOR A PERIOD OF 45 DAYS WHILE PARTIES DISCUSS SETTLEMENT. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/15/06. 9/19/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(kw, ) (bp, ). (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED ORDER THAT THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER IN THIS MATTER IS AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 1/8/2007 AT 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 5D BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ, DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/6/2006, DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 11/3/2006, PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 12/22/2006, DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 12/29/2006 AND THE TRIAL POOL IS SET FOR 1/16/2007. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/26/06. 7/28/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(le, ) (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JUAN R. SANCHEZ : Scheduling Conference held on 5/8/06. (gs) (Entered: 05/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 12/4/2006 AT 09:30 AM ; DISCOVERY DUE BY 9/1/2006; DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 10/13/2006; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/22/2006; DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 11/29/2006; THIS MATTER WILL BE PLACED INTO THE COURT'S TRIAL POOL ON 12/5/2006.. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/8/06. 5/9/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(afm, ) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS, ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS. (GREEN, GARY) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Case Management Plan by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (O'NEILL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 05/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Counterclaim by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC..(O'NEILL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE AND ORAL ARGUMENT ON THE ISSUE OF JURISDICTION IS SET FOR 5/8/2006 AT 9:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. COUNSEL TO CALL CHAMBERS DAY PRIOR FOR LOCATION. COUNSEL IS DIRECTED TO CONSULT JUDGE SANCHEZ'S ONLINE PROCEDURES AT: HTTP://WWW.PAED.USCOURTS.GOV/DOCUMENTS/PROCEDURES/SANPOL.PDF. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 4/4/06. 4/6/06 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(le, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2006 (rs, ). (Entered: 04/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer to Complaint with Counterclaim against ACUMED LLC and SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. and Affirmative Defenses filed by ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC. and ROBERT C. MORRIS, Certificate of Service.(le, ) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 30 DAYS WHY DEFAULT SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED IN FAVOR OF PLFF ACUMED LLC; IF DEFT HAS NOT ANSWER THE COMPLAINT OR BY OTHER PLEADING RESPONDED BY APRIL 15, 2006, DEFAULT WILL BE ENTERED AND A MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ENTERTAINED. SIGNED BY JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. 3/20/06 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED.(sc, ) Modified on 3/20/2006 (sc, ). (Entered: 03/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service by Anthony Mita re: served Complaint and Summons upon Advanced Surgical Services, Inc. through Robert C. Morris by Hand Delivery on October 5, 2005 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service)(O'NEILL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service by Anthony Mita re: served Complaint and Summons upon Robert C. Morris by Personal Service on October 5, 2005 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service)(O'NEILL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. O'NEILL on behalf of ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. with Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(O'NEILL, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM JUDGE CLARENCE C. NEWCOMER TO JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT MICHAEL E. KUNZ ON 9/6/05. 9/7/05 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED.(stb, ) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against ADVANCED SURGICAL SERVICES, INC., ROBERT C. MORRIS ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 917894.), filed by ACUMED LLC, SURGICAL RESOURCES OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.(ti, ) (Entered: 06/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 292 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?