Archdiocese of Milwa v. Enron Corp, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:01-cv-04071
District Judge Melinda Harmon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 24, 2016 at 4:29 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Archdiocese of Milwaukee Supporting Fund Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Rothstein +1 860 537 3818 +1 504 455 1498

Toggle Switch Represented by The Bilek Law Firm, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Emerson Bilek +1 713 227 7720 +1 713 227 9404 tbilek@hb-legal.com
v.
No Logo Andrew S Fastow, Defendant
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shepherd, Scott, Clawater & Houston, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George W Billy Shepherd, III +1 713 650 6600 +1 713 650 1720 bshepherd@sschlaw.com
No Logo Charles A LeMaistre, Defendant
No Logo Cindy K Olson, Defendant
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Enron Corp"
No Logo J Clifford Baxter, Defendant
No Logo J Mark Metts, Defendant
No Logo James V Derrick, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey K Skilling, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey McMahon, Defendant
No Logo Joe H Foy, Defendant
No Logo John H Duncan, Defendant
No Logo Joseph M Hirko, Defendant
No Logo Joseph W Sutton, Defendant
No Logo Ken L Harrison, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth D Rice, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Carrington, Coleman, Sloman & Blumenthal, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E Coleman, Jr. +1 214 855 3000 + 214 855 1333 jcoleman@ccsb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Richards Layton et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles F Richards, Jr. +1 302 651 7738
No Logo Lou L Pai, Defendant
No Logo Mark A Frevert, Defendant
No Logo Mark E Koenig, Defendant
No Logo Michael S McConnell, Defendant
No Logo Norman P Blake, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche, Defendant
No Logo Richard A Causey, Defendant
No Logo Richard B Buy, Defendant
No Logo Robert A Belfer, Defendant
No Logo Robert K Jaedicke, Defendant
No Logo Ronnie C Chan, Defendant
No Logo Stanley C Horton, Defendant
No Logo Steven J Kean, Defendant
No Logo Wendy L Gramm, Defendant
Amalgamated Bank Amalgamated Bank, Movant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER OF ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE and consolidation into CA H 01-3624 Newby et al vs Enron et al. Case terminated on 01/17/08.( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(kmurphy, ) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel, Attorney George W Billy Shepherd, III for Arthur Andersen LLP added .( Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon ) Parties notified.(mmar, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: None
      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ken L Harrison 2/8/02 , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: None
        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jeffrey K Skilling 12/5/01 Answer due on 2/3/02 for Jeffrey K Skilling , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: None
          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Andrew S Fastow 1/15/02 , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None
            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Richard A Causey 1/8/02 , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 01/16/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None
              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jeffrey McMahon 1/9/02 , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 01/16/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None
                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Stanley C Horton 1/9/02 , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 01/16/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None
                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to James V Derrick Jr 1/3/02 , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 01/16/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None
                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Rebecca Mark-Jusbasche 12/18/01 , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 01/16/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Cindy K Olson 12/19/01 Answer due on 2/17/02 for Cindy K Olson , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joseph W Sutton 12/19/01 Answer due on 2/17/02 for Joseph W Sutton , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to J Mark Metts 12/19/01 Answer due on 2/17/02 for J Mark Metts , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Michael S McConnell 12/19/01 Answer due on 2/17/02 for Michael S McConnell , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Steven J Kean 12/19/01 Answer due on 2/17/02 for Steven J Kean , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mark E Koenig 12/19/01 Answer due on 2/17/02 for Mark E Koenig , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joseph M Hirko 12/19/01 Answer due on 2/17/02 for Joseph M Hirko , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lou L Pai 12/19/01 Answer due on 2/17/02 for Lou L Pai , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kenneth D Rice 12/16/01 Answer due on 2/14/02 for Kenneth D Rice , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Arthur Andersen LLP 12/14/01 Answer due on 2/12/02 for Arthur Andersen LLP , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: None
                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to J Clifford Baxter 12/18/01 Answer due on 2/16/02 for J Clifford Baxter , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 12/20/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: None
                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Richard B Buy 12/13/01 Answer due on 2/11/02 for Richard B Buy , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 12/20/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: None
                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mark A Frevert 12/13/01 Answer due on 2/11/02 for Mark A Frevert , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 12/20/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER OF RECUSAL, deadlines in scheduling orders continue in effect, Court settings are vacated, entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt ) Case reassigned to Judge Lee H. Rosenthal (fmremp) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION : This case will be consolidated under Civil Action No. 01cv3624, Newby vs. Enron Corp., et al , as the lead case. If any party objects to the consolidation, that party must file an objection to consolidation with this court within 10 days of the filing of this Notice of Consolidation , entered; Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Lee H. Rosenthal ) (hlerma) (Entered: 12/12/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [8-1] motion to expedite consideration of Defendant Kenneth L. Lay's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, entered; A hearing on the Defendant Kenneth L. Lay's Motion for Enlargement of Tiem to Answer, Move to Dismiss, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is Moot. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt ) (fmremp) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [7-1] motion for enlargement of time to answer granting [7-2] motion to dismiss granting [7-3] motion otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint, entered; time for Defendant Lay to file answers, motions to dismiss or other responsive pleadings is enlarged until 30 days after the Motion to Consolidate all of the Enron-related litigation is ruled upon, or until such time as the Court determines, in a Case Management Order, is appropriate. Parties notified. ( signed by Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt ) (fmremp) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/11/2001
                                                        MOTION to expedite consideration of Defendant Kenneth L. Lay's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer, Move to Dismiss or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Kenneth L Lay, Motion Docket Date 12/27/01 [8-1] motion , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 12/11/2001
                                                          MOTION for enlargement of time to answer , MOVE to dismiss , or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by Kenneth L Lay, Motion Docket Date 12/27/01 [7-1] motion, 12/27/01 [7-2] motion, 12/27/01 [7-3] motion , filed. (fmremp) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                            FIRST AMENDED Class Action COMPLAINT For Violations Of The Federal Securities Laws, by Archdiocese of Milwakee (Answer due 12/16/01 for Arthur Andersen LLP, for Richard A Causey, for Andrew S Fastow, for Jeffrey K Skilling, for Kenneth L Lay amending [1-1] complaint adding James V Derrick Jr, J Clifford Baxter, Mark A Frevert, Stanley C Horton, Kenneth Rice, Richard B Buy, Lou L Pai, Robert A Belfer, Norman P Blake Jr, Ronnie C Chan, John H Duncan, Wendy L Gramm, Robert K Jaedicke, Charles A LeMaistre, Joe H Foy, Joseph M Hirko, Ken L Harrison, Mark E Koenig, Steven J Kean, Mark-Jusbasche, Michael S McConnell, Jeffrey McMahon, Cindy K Olson, J Mark Metts, Joseph W Sutton, filed. (psmith) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: None
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Archdiocese of Milwaukee, filed. (amontemayor) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Joinder in Amalgamated Bank's Ex Parte Application for 1) A Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injuction Should Not be Entered Freezing and Imposing a Constructive Trust Over Insider Trading Proceeds, 2) Accounting of Insider Trading Proceeds, and 3) Limited Expedited Discovery, by Archdiocese of Milwaukee Supporting Fund, Inc. , filed (fmremp) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                  AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT For Violations Of The Federal Securities Laws, by Archdiocese of Milwaukee (Answer due 12/8/01 for Arthur Andersen LLP, for Richard A Causey, for Andrew S Fastow, for Jeffrey K Skilling, for Kenneth L Lay, for Enron Corp ) amending [1-1] complaint , filed. (psmith) (Entered: 11/29/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Order setting Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference on 4:30 3/4/02 by telephone before Judge Kenneth M. Hoyt and Order to Disclose Interested Persons, filed. Parties notified. (bchurchill) (Entered: 11/28/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                                      COMPLAINT by Archdiocese of Milwa filed; FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 515550 (bchurchill) (Entered: 11/28/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?