TCYK, LLC v. Does 48-98
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00540

Tags
Last Updated September 16, 2016 at 3:04 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Summons Returned Unexecuted
          Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Joseph Terrell. (pes1)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 Summons Returned Executed
            SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Steven McCabe. Steven McCabe served on 1/28/2014, answer due 2/18/2014. (pes1)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Summons Returned Executed
              SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Joe Snodgrass. Joe Snodgrass served on 1/22/2014, answer due 2/12/2014. (pes1)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: 1/24/2014 Summons Returned Executed
                SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Burl Childress, Vance Lockett. Burl Childress served on 1/23/2014, answer due 2/13/2014; Vance Lockett served on 1/21/2014, answer due 2/11/2014. (pes1)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Certificate of Clerk
                  CERTIFICATE of Clerk - certified mailing of summons and amended complaint via the Clerk's Office. (pes1)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Summons Issued
                    Summons Issued as to Burl Childress, Vance Lockett, Steven McCabe, Joe Snodgrass, Joseph Terrell. (pes1)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Amended Complaint
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Burl Childress, Vance Lockett, Steven McCabe, Joe Snodgrass, Joseph Terrell, filed by TCYK, LLC. (pes1)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                        ORDER striking [8] Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 10/30/2013. (pes1)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                          OPINION AND ORDER denying [11] Motion to Proceed Anonymously. Within fourteen days of the date of this Order, the movant shall submit for filing a signed copy of the [8] Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 10/11/2013. (er1)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Abraham Bahgat for Defendant Doe 62 (Bahgat, Joseph)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER re [8] MOTION to Quash: The movant shall submit for filing a signed copy of this motion which contains the information required by Rule 11(a). Alternatively, the movant may file, within fourteen days, a motion to proceed anonymously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/20/2013. (er1)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Motion to Quash
                                MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Defendant Doe 74. (er1)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [6] Plaintiff's Motion in which to effect service of process or waiver of service of process by 1/31/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/17/2013. (er1)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 1/31/2014. to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Bass, Leon)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Abraham Bahgat for Defendant Doe 63 (Bahgat, Joseph)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [3] motion for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 7/22/13. (rew)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013, Terminated: 7/22/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                          Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT FOr Copyright Infringement against John Does 48-98 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4131327), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?