TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-16
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00843

Tags
Last Updated September 16, 2016 at 10:03 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
ORDER granting [5] Plaintiff's Motion to serve Defendants with the summons and a copy of the complaint by 4/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 12/26/2013. (er1)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
    MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/25/2014. For Additional Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Leon Bass, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [3] Plaintiff's Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/30/2013. (er1)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013, Terminated: 8/30/2013 Motion for Discovery
        Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Complaint
            COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against TCYK, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4238219), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 98 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?