NESBITT v. HOLDER
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00717
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2016 at 3:04 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSHUA NESBITT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/09/2013, PRO HAC VICE Robert Neil Haferd +1 213 736 9900 +1 213 417 8800 rhaferd@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/01/2013 Rani V. Rolston +1 202 463 6036 +1 202 463 6067 rani.rolston@leschtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/14/2013 Alan Lescht +1 202 463 6036 +1 202 463 6067 alan.lescht@leschtlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by JOSHUA NESBITT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOSHUA NESBITT +1 301 573 3278

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/09/2013 Jonathan Edward Paikin +1 202 663 6000 jonathan.paikin@wilmerhale.com
v.
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "ERIC H. HOLDER, JR."

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2003
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 56 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Settlement by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. (See Image for Details) Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/24/14. (mpt) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
          Consent MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 52 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Alan R. Burch on behalf of ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
            LREF
            Blank 51 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            PRETRIAL ORDER denying as moot 37 Motion in Limine; denying 38 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion in Limine; granting 43 Motion in Limine; denying 50 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 16, 2014. (lcrcl4) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
              MOTION to Strike 49 Supplemental Memorandum by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 39 MOTION in Limine Supplemental Opposition filed by JOSHUA NESBITT. (Eubanks, Sharon) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 39 MOTION in Limine filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                    RESPONSE re 39 MOTION in Limine Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion In Limine filed by JOSHUA NESBITT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Edwards, Catharine) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Filing of Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Proposed Jury Instructions by JOSHUA NESBITT re 40 Pretrial Statement, (Eubanks, Sharon) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Filing of Joint Proposed Jury Instructions by JOSHUA NESBITT re 40 Pretrial Statement, (Eubanks, Sharon) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 44 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE re 37 First MOTION in Limine , 38 Second MOTION in Limine filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                            LREF
                            Blank 43 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2014 Kris Decl., # 2 Exhibit 2014 Carlin Decl.)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                            LREF
                            Blank 42 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding Motion to Strike Jury Trial Demand 29 . Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 2, 2014. (lcrcl4) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER denying 29 Motion Strike Jury Trial Demand. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on April 2, 2014. (lcrcl4) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                PRETRIAL STATEMENT by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab 2 - Voir Dire, # 2 Exhibit Tab 1 - Exhibit Table, # 3 Exhibit Tab 3a - Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Instructions, # 4 Exhibit Tab 3b - Defendant's Proposed Jury Instructions)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                  MOTION in Limine by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit 2014 Kaye Aff)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                  Second MOTION in Limine by JOSHUA NESBITT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eubanks, Sharon) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 37 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                    First MOTION in Limine by JOSHUA NESBITT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eubanks, Sharon) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Benton Gregory Peterson on behalf of ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand filed by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 29 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 32 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE re 29 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand Opposition filed by JOSHUA NESBITT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Eubanks, Sharon) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 31 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Catharine E. Edwards on behalf of JOSHUA NESBITT (Edwards, Catharine) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Yvette Eubanks on behalf of JOSHUA NESBITT (Eubanks, Sharon) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Strike Jury Demand Portion Only by ERIC H. HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Depo Transcripts, # 2 Exhibit B - Written Discovery Responses)(Momeni, Mercedeh) Modified on 12/8/2013 (jf, ). (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on November 6, 2013. (lcrcl4, ) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Order DENYING 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 5, 2013. (lcrcl4) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Memorandum Opinion DENYING 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on September 5, 2013. (lcrcl4) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by ERIC HOLDER. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by JOSHUA NESBITT. (rdj) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Case reassigned by consent to Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Judge Richard W. Roberts no longer assigned to the case. (gt, ) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER advising pro se plaintiff of his obligations under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the rules of this Court, ordering that plaintiff shall have until June 20, 2013 to file any supplemental response to the defendant's motion 20 for summary judgment that the plaintiff may wish to file, and extending the defendant's deadline to reply to the plaintiff's opposition 21 to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and any supplemental response to July 1, 2013. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 6/7/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) filed by JOSHUA NESBITT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A thru L, # 2 Exhibit M thru BB)(jf, ) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhs. 1 -2, # 2 Exhibit Exh. 3, # 3 Exhibit Exh. 4 -10)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOSHUA NESBITT. Attorney Robert Neil Haferd and Jonathan Edward Paikin terminated. (Haferd, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    STATUS REPORT by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 04/04/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard W. Roberts held on 02-01-13; Page Numbers: 1-12. Date of Issuance:03-04-13. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace 202-354-3196, Telephone number Scott Wallace 202-354-3196, Court Reporter Email Address : Scottlyn01@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/24/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2013.(Wallace, Scott) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Appointment of Counsel for the Limited Pirpose of Mediation by JOSHUA NESBITT (rdj) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert Neil Haferd, :Firm- Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP, :Address- 1875 Pennsylvania Ave. NW Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - (202) 663-6000. Fax No. - (202) 663-6363 by JOSHUA NESBITT (Paikin, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER appointing counsel for the limited purpose of mediation and referring case to mediation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 2/1/13. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4-10)(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              STATUS REPORT (Joint) by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JOSHUA NESBITT (Rolston, Rani) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER. See Order for further information. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 8/16/12. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 08/16/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Rani V. Rolston on behalf of JOSHUA NESBITT (Rolston, Rani) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER setting initial scheduling conference for August 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Richard W. Roberts on 7/10/12. (lcrwr2) (Entered: 07/10/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR.(Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Mercedeh Momeni on behalf of ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR (Momeni, Mercedeh) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR served on 5/9/2012 (Rolston, Rani) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 5/9/2012. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 5/30/2012. (Rolston, Rani) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General May 9, 2012. (Rolston, Rani) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against ERIC HIMPTON HOLDER, JR ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616047923) filed by JOSHUA NESBITT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td, ) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 417 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?