Schwarz v. Jensen Farms
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 4:11-cv-04280
District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2019 at 5:22 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mathews, Shepherd, McKay & Bruneau, PA, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Paul A. Schwarz"

Toggle Switch Represented by Aleshire Robb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory W. Aleshire +1 417 869 3737 +1 417 869 5678 galeshire@aleshirerobb.com
TERMINATED: 04/25/2012 Gregory W. Aleshire +1 417 869 3737 +1 417 869 5678 galeshire@aleshirerobb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory W. Aleshire +1 417 869 3737 +1 417 869 5678 galeshire@aleshirerobb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Marler Clark LLP PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R Drew Falkenstein +1 206 346 1888 dfalkenstein@marlerclark.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William D Marler +1 206 346 1888 +3461 346 346 1898 bmarler@marlerclark.com
No Logo Paul F Schwarz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Aleshire Robb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
as substituted party for Paul A. Schwarz, deceased Gregory W. Aleshire +1 417 869 3737 +1 417 869 5678 galeshire@aleshirerobb.com
v.
No Logo C.h. Robinson Worldwide, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong Teasdale LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tyson H. Ketchum +1 816 472 3136 tketchum@armstrongteasdale.com
No Logo First Watch Restaurants, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frontera Produce, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Franke Schultz & Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin D. Brooks +1 816 421 7100 +1 816 421 7915 kbrooks@fsmlawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John E. Franke +1 816 421 7100 +1 816 421 7915 jfranke@fsmlawfirm.com
No Logo Geo. A. Heimos Produce Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & James, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John P. Rahoy +1 314 242 5336 +1 314 242 5536 jrahoy@BJPC.com
No Logo Jensen Farms, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allmayer & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel N. Allmayer +1 816 221 2262 +1 816 221 6273 DNA@allmayerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lloyd W Raber +1 816 221 2262 +1 816 221 6273 lwr@allmayerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Litchfield Cavo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas J. Parolisi +1 312 781 6665 parolisi@litchfieldcavo.com
No Logo Liberty Fruit Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by STYLIADES, MEZZANOTTE & HASSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Stephanie Warmund +1 816 361 7917 +1 603 334 7445 jstephanie.warmund@libertymutual.com
No Logo Bio Food Safety, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Pepper Equipment, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Primus Group, Third Party Defendant
No Logo Frontera Produce, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Jensen Farms, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Frontera Produce, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Jensen Farms, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Litchfield Cavo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas J. Parolisi +1 312 781 6665 parolisi@litchfieldcavo.com
TERMINATED: 03/22/2013 Nicholas J. Parolisi +1 312 781 6665 parolisi@litchfieldcavo.com
No Logo Frontera Produce, Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo Primus Group, Cross Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (166) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Terminate Motions
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Status report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Motion for order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Motion to strike
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Motion for order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claimCourt Filing
                        ORDER - Primus Group Inc.'s Amended Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint 141 is DENIED; and Primus Group Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File Reply on Motion to Dismiss One Day Out of Time and to Exceed Page Limit 148 is GRANTED. Signed on 11/7/14 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Reply Suggestions to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Amended Scheduling Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Answer to Crossclaim
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Suggestions in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Motion for order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Suggestions in Support of Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Answer to Crossclaim
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Status report
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to continue
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None protective order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Motion for order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Notice of voluntary dismissal
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Motion to dismiss party
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Return of Service of Complaint Executed
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Disclosure of corporate interests
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing Receipt of Settlement Funds by Paul F Schwarz, Paul A. Schwarz re 70 Satisfaction of Judgment (Aleshire, Gregory) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Paul F Schwarz, Paul A. Schwarz. (Aleshire, Gregory) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of dismissal by Paul F Schwarz, Paul A. Schwarz. (Aleshire, Gregory) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry - MOTION HEARING held on 8/15/2013 re 61 MOTION for Approval of Second Partial Compromise of Wrongful Death Claim. Proceedings held before Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr.: granting 61 motion for approval. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Gayle Wambolt, 816-512-5641. (Enss, Rhonda) (Wheeler, LaTandra). Modified on 8/16/2013 to add document to docket entry(Wheeler, LaTandra). (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of appearance by John P. Rahoy on behalf of Geo. A. Heimos Produce Company, Inc. (Rahoy, John) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appearance by J. Stephanie Warmund on behalf of Liberty Fruit Company, Inc. (Warmund, J.) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER staying all deadlines in the current scheduling order 38 due to the continuing mediation of this matter. Parties ORDERED to provide a status update on or before 10/07/13 advising as to the progress of settlement negotiations. Signed on 8/14/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER- partial settlement hearing to be held on 8/15/2013 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7C, Kansas City (FJG)). ( Motions terminated: 63 MOTION for hearing re 61 MOTION for order Approval of Second Partial Compromise of Wrongful Death Claim and 62 Amended MOTION for hearing re 61 MOTION for order Approval of Second Partial Compromise of Wrongful Death Claim. Signed on 8/13/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION for hearing re 61 MOTION for order Approval of Second Partial Compromise of Wrongful Death Claim: Paul A. Schwarz, Jr. and Suggestions in Support , 62 MOTION for hearing re 61 MOTION for order Approval of Second Partial Compromise of Wrongful Death Claim: Paul A. Schwarz, Jr. and Suggestions in Support filed by Gregory W. Aleshire on behalf of Paul F Schwarz, Paul A. Schwarz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 61 , 62 ) (Aleshire, Gregory) Modified on 8/9/2013 to reflect "amended" motion(Wheeler, LaTandra). (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for hearing re 61 MOTION for order Approval of Second Partial Compromise of Wrongful Death Claim: Paul A. Schwarz, Jr. and Suggestions in Support filed by Gregory W. Aleshire on behalf of Paul F Schwarz, Paul A. Schwarz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/26/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 61 ) (Aleshire, Gregory) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for order Approval of Second Partial Compromise of Wrongful Death Claim: Paul A. Schwarz, Jr. and Suggestions in Support filed by William D. Marler on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/5/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Marler, William) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 54 Amended Complaint, on behalf of CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc..(Ketchum, Tyson) (Entered: 06/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by Paul F Schwarz. (Marler, William) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Paul F Schwarz. Waiver sent to Primus Group on 4/26/2013, answer due 6/25/2013. (Marler, William) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Frontera Produce, Ltd.'s ANSWER to 54 Amended Complaint, Second of Plaintiff, CROSSCLAIM against Jensen Farms, Primus Group on behalf of Frontera Produce.(Brooks, Kevin) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Paul F Schwarz. Liberty Fruit Company, Inc. served on 5/1/2013, answer due 5/22/2013. (Marler, William) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Paul F Schwarz. Waiver sent to CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc. on 4/26/2013, answer due 6/25/2013. (Marler, William) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Frontera Produce, Jensen Farms, Primus Group, Geo. A. Heimos Produce Company, Inc., CH Robinson Worldwide, Inc., Liberty Fruit Company, Inc., First Watch Restaurants, Inc. filed by William D. Marler on behalf of All Plaintiffs.(Marler, William) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 50 plaintiff's motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint on or before April 24, 2013. Signed on 4/19/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Approving Partial Compromise of Wrongful Death Claim as to defendant Jensen Farms. Signed on 3/22/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry. Partial Wrongful Death Settlement Hearing held before Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. on 3/22/2013 and granting 48 MOTION for order Approval of Partial Compromise of Wrongful Death Claim as to defendant Jensen Farms. Written order to follow. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Gayle Wambolt, 816-512-5641. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Gregory W. Aleshire on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/8/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Aleshire, Gregory) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER with settlement hearing to be held on 3/22/2013, at 9:30 AM at Courtroom 7C, Kansas City (FJG) Signed on 3/14/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Shawver, Marylynn) (Entered: 03/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for order Approval of Partial Compromise of Wrongful Death Claim: Paul A. Schwarz Jr. and Suggestions in Support filed by Gregory W. Aleshire on behalf of Paul F Schwarz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/28/2013 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Aleshire, Gregory) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by Paul F Schwarz. (Aleshire, Gregory) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - parties' explanation due 1/30/2013 re: filing of status reports. Signed on 1/24/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Counsel's Motion for Withdrawal (Doc. No. 44 ) is PROVISIONALLY DENIED. Counsel shall be permitted to renew its Motion after replacement counsel for Defendant Jensen Farms has been retained. Signed on January 16, 2013, by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to withdraw as attorney all counsel of Individual party Jensen Farms filed by Lloyd W Raber on behalf of Jensen Farms. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/24/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Raber, Lloyd) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Daniel N. Allmayer (Allmayer, Daniel) Modified on 10/3/2012 to reflect that the address will be changed on 10/5/2012 (Wheeler, LaTandra). (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing Subpoena to Target Corporation by Frontera Produce (Franke, John) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by Paul F Schwarz. (Rapp, Kevin) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended ORDER (re 39 ) - further proceedings involving defendant Jensen Farms are automatically stayed. Signed on 7/30/12 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 34 Notice of Filing Bankruptcy filed by Jensen Farms. Further proceedings involving Defendant Jensen Farms are automatically stayed. Defendant Jensen Farms shall file a brief update with the Court on or before Monday, April 15, 2013 as to the status of its bankruptcy. Signed on 7/18/12 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: parties to file a status report on or before 07/30/12, 09/28/12 and every sixty (60) days thereafter until further order of thisCourt. The reports shall outline the progress of the case and advise the Court of any potential problems related to discovery or any other matters. Counsel shall note that this report will be filed in pleading format on ECF and not provided as a letter to the Court. Discovery due 8/26/2013. Summary judgment motions due 2/11/14. Signed on 7/5/12 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr: Scheduling TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 5/23/2012. (Text Entry Only. No Document Attached.) To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Gayle Wambolt, 816-512-5641. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Bio Food Safety, Primus Group, Pepper Equipment (Franke, John) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 28 motion for leave to file Third Amended Complaint. Defendant Frontera Produce, LTD. shall file its Third-Party Complaint on or before June 1, 2012. Defendant is to note that the Third-Party Complaint attached to its Motion shall not be deemed filed. Defendant must filethe Third-Party Complaint separately. Signed on May 29, 2012 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Rowland, Bonnie) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Bankruptcy by Jensen Farms (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Jensen Farms Bankruptcy Petition (First Page))(Raber, Lloyd) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Marler, William) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. The Court held a teleconference on May 23, 2012 at 9:30 a.m. (Doc. No. 31 ). Pursuant to discussions at the teleconference, the parties are to resubmit a Joint Rule 26(f) Report on or before 5/30/2012. Signed on May 24, 2012 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Moore, Terri) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - Scheduling Teleconference set for 5/23/2012 at 9:30 AM before Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan Jr. Counsel for defendant Jensen Farms shall initiate the call to the Court at 816-512-5630 after securing all parties on the line. Signed on 5/18/12 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of EAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Attachments: # 1 EAP General Order)(Jones, Robin) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. (Marler, William) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to file Third Party Complaint Against Primus Group, Inc. d/b/a Primus Labs, BIO Food Safety, Inc. and Pepper Equipment Corp. filed by John E. Franke on behalf of Frontera Produce. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 5/14/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Franke, John) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 11 plaintiff's MOTION to allow substitution of prospective plaintiff Paul F. Schwarz. The stay is lifted; and the parties are reminded that a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan is due in this action on or before May 3, 2012 19 . Signed on 4/25/12 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by Paul A. Schwarz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letters of Administration)(Rapp, Kevin) (Entered: 04/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Jensen Farms' ANSWER to 21 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim of Defendant Frontera Produce on behalf of Jensen Farms.(Raber, Lloyd) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 20 prospective plaintiff Paul F. Schwarz's motion for extension of time until 4/27/12 to file an updated status report. Action stayed until 4/27/12. Signed on 4/19/12 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by John E. Franke on behalf of Defendant Frontera Produce.(Franke, John) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant Frontera Produce, LTD's ANSWER to 13 Answer to Amended Complaint, Crossclaim on behalf of Frontera Produce.(Franke, John) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant Frontera Produce, LTD.'s ANSWER to 12 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Jensen Farms on behalf of Frontera Produce.(Franke, John) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT and MOTION for extension of time to Appoint Paul F. Schwarz as Personal Representative by Paul A. Schwarz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/2/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rapp, Kevin) Modified on 3/16/2012 to correct docket event (Moore, Terri). (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 18 joint motion for extension of time until 5/3/12 to file status report and proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. Signed on 3/15/12 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for extension of time to file status report and discovery plan filed by William D. Marler on behalf of Paul A. Schwarz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/23/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Marler, William) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Paul A. Schwarz. Waiver sent to Frontera Produce on 2/1/2012, answer due 4/2/2012. (Marler, William) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER provisionally denying 11 plaintiff's MOTION to allow substitution of plaintiff. Court will stay action for 30 days to allow time for Paul F. Schwarz to seek appointment as former Plaintiff's personal representative and/or time for Plaintiff Paul F. Schwarz to provide the Court with information denoting his qualification as a successor to former Plaintiff. A status report shall be filed on or before 03/26/12. Signed on 2/23/12 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - joint proposed discovery plan and scheduling order due 3/19/2012. Signed on 1/18/12 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Lloyd W Raber on behalf of Cross Claimant Jensen Farms, Defendant Jensen Farms.(Raber, Lloyd) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant Jensen Farms' ANSWER to 12 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand and, CROSSCLAIM against Frontera Produce on behalf of Jensen Farms.(Allmayer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gregory W. Aleshire on behalf of Paul A. Schwarz.(Aleshire, Gregory) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to substitute party filed by Gregory W. Aleshire on behalf of Paul A. Schwarz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/9/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Aleshire, Gregory) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 8 motion to appear pro hac vice, approved by Clerk of Court. Attorney Nicholas J. Parolisi, Jr., for Jensen Farms, allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. (Moore, Terri) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of appearance by Lloyd W Raber on behalf of Jensen Farms (Raber, Lloyd) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to allow Nicholas J. Parolisi, Jr. to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-2905925) filed by Daniel N. Allmayer on behalf of Jensen Farms. (Allmayer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of appearance by Daniel N. Allmayer on behalf of Jensen Farms (Allmayer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Paul A. Schwarz. Waiver sent to Jensen Farms on 11/3/2011, answer due 1/3/2012. (Marler, William) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 3 4 motions to appear pro hac vice, approved by Clerk of Court. Attorneys William D Marler and R. Drew Falkenstein allowed to appear pro hac vice for Paul A. Schwarz. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Moore, Terri) Modified on 11/8/2011 to note copy of ORDER and CM/ECF Registration Form mailed to attorneys (Moore, Terri). Modified on 11/9/2011 (Russel, Jeri). (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to allow R. Drew Falkenstein to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-2879961) filed by William R Robb on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Robb, William) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to allow William D. Marler to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $50 receipt number 0866-2879958) filed by William R Robb on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Robb, William) (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE to the correct division. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr for all further proceedings. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Bax, Laura) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Gregory W. Aleshire on behalf of Paul A. Schwarz. Filing fee $350, receipt number 0866-2861087. Service due by 2/21/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aleshire, Gregory) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Notice of docket modification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Notice of docket modification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Notice of docket modification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?