Jump Rope, Inc, v. Smart Options, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06333
District Judge John F. Grady, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 30, 2016 at 12:25 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jumprope, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox, Swibel, Levin & Carroll, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik J. Ives +1 312 224 1239 eives@fslc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erik J. Ives +1 312 224 1239 eives@fslc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler & Fussell PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/24/2013, PRO HAC VICE James A Fussell, III +1 903 753 9300 +1 903 553 0403 fussell@sfipfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
v.
No Logo Smart Options, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Smart Options, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geoffrey Andrew Baker +1 708 707 8778 geoffb@optionit.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/21/13 before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura Brennan, 312-435-5785, Laura_M_Brennan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/8/2014. (Brennan, Laura) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
    ENTERED JUDGMENT on 12/5/2013. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice.(pjg, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
      ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/5/2013. Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 12/5/2013 with attorneys for both sides. Plaintiff does not oppose defendant's motion to dismiss, and therefore the motion is granted 29 . The case is dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The status hearing set for 12/10/2013 is vacated. Mailed notice.(pjg, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the request of the parties, the motion hearing set for 12/5/2013 at 9:30 a.m. is reset to a telephone hearing, to be initiated by the parties, on 12/5/2013 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Motion by Geoffrey Andrew Baker for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 29 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 12/5/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Motion by Geoffrey Andrew Baker for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 29 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/27/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION by Defendant Smart Options, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to Rule 12(h)(3) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, Transcript of 11.21.2013 status hearing, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, Covenant Not to Sue)(Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 11/21/2013. Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 21 is denied for reasons stated in open court. Answer to complaint and a joint status report are due by 12/6/2013. Status hearing set for 12/10/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                  REPLY by Smart Options, LLC to response in opposition to motion 24 , MOTION by Defendant Smart Options, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION 21 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration McNally Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A to McNally Decl., # 3 Declaration Baker Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex. A to Baker Decl., # 5 Exhibit Ex. B to Baker Decl., # 6 Exhibit Ex. C to Baker Decl., # 7 Exhibit Ex. D to Baker Decl.)(Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                    DECLARATION of Erik J. Ives regarding response in opposition to motion 24 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Ives, Erik) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION of Peter K. Braxton regarding response in opposition to motion 24 (Ives, Erik) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                        RESPONSE by Jump Rope, Inc,in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Smart Options, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION 21 (Ives, Erik) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: As agreed by the parties, plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to dismiss is to be filed by 10/30/2013, and defendant's reply is to be filed by 11/11/2013. Status hearing set for 11/21/2013 at 9:30 AM. The hearing date of 10/9/2013 is vacated. (mk) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Motion by Geoffrey Andrew Baker for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction, 21 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/9/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION by Defendant Smart Options, LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Covenant Not to Sue, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - email exchange, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Revised Covenant Not to Sue)(Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Smart Options, LLC by Geoffrey Andrew Baker (Baker, Geoffrey) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                  ORDER: The motions of James A. Fussell III and Andrew Spangler to appear pro hac vice are all granted (dkt. nos. 7 & 8). Mr. Fussell's later-filed motion to withdraw is also granted (dkt. no. 14). For this reason, the Clerk should not add Mr. Fussell's appearance to the docket. Attorney Spangler is directed to promptly contact the Clerk's Office to establish an e-filing accountin this district Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/24/2013:(mb, ) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Motion by James A. Fussell, Iii for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 14 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/25/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Fussell, James) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Motion by James A. Fussell, Iii for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 7 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/25/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Fussell, James) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Motion by Andrew W. Spangler for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice 8 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/25/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                          EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that 13 C 6333, Jump Rope, Inc. v. Smart Options, LLC, pending before the Hon. Robert W. Gettleman, has been identified for transfer to the Patent Case Pilot Program in which this Court is participating, therefore It is hereby ordered that 13 C 6333, Jump Rope, Inc. v. Smart Options, LLC, is to be reassigned by lot to one of the district judges participating in the pilot program. Case reassigned to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/18/2013. (td, ) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                                            MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Jump Rope, Inc, to withdraw as attorney (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fussell, James) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                              ORDER signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 9/16/2013:The Clerk is to arrange for this case to be transferred to the Patent Case Pilot Program. Mailed notice (gds) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                Corrected Returned Summons Executed by Jump Rope, Inc, (Ives, Erik) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jump Rope, Inc, as to Jump Rope, Inc, on 9/11/2013, answer due 10/2/2013. (Ives, Erik) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                    EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/10/13.(mb, ) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                      MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (mb, ) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8711755. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION by Plaintiff JUMP ROPE, INC,for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Receipt No. 25C9J400) (Fussell, James) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-8710880. (Fussell, James) (Entered: 09/07/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff JUMP ROPE, INC, by Erik J. Ives (Ives, Erik) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                L.R. 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by JUMP ROPE, INC, (Ives, Erik) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  AO120 Form for Mailing by JUMP ROPE, INC, (Ives, Erik) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ives, Erik) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      COMPLAINT filed by JUMP ROPE, INC,; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8700548. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Ives, Erik) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 143 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?