Fortinet Inc. v. FireEye Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:13-cv-02496-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Davila, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 9:03 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Fortinet, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Owen Cooper +1 925 984 3225 +1 415 875 6700 willcooper@quinnemanuel.com
Space Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
Space John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
v.
No Logo Fireeye, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Connolly Bove Lodge & Hutz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis DiGiovanni +1 302 658 9141 frank.digiovanni@novakdruce.com

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Bettinger +1 415 882 8002 +1 415 882 8220 mike.bettinger@klgates.com
Space David Shane Brun +1 415 882 8023 +1 415 882 8220 Shane.brun@klgates.com
Space Jason Nathaniel Haycock +1 415 882 8200 +1 415 882 8220 jason.haycock@klgates.com
Space Meghana Chandrakant RaoRane +1 415 882 8015 +1 415 882 8220 Meghana.RaoRane@klgates.com
Space Eric Christopher Rusnak +1 202 778 9000 +1 202 778 9100 eric.rusnak@klgates.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Office San Jose
Filed 6/5/2013
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 1:12-cv-01066[Delaware]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP,E-Filing,MEDIATION
  Entries (248) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Statement of Non-Opposition
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                RESPONSE (re 182 MOTION Relief from Nondispositive Order of Magistrate Judge (Re: Docket No. 173), Order Granting Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order re 173 Motion Hearing,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, ) filed byFireEye Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Brun, David) (Filed on 9/9/2015) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE (re 187 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Invalidity Contentions ) filed byFortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathan Hamstra in Support of Fortinet's Response to FireEye's Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/8/2015) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/7/2015, Entered: None
                                          RESPONSE (re 184 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Case Schedule for the Limited Purpose of Serving Third Party Subpoenas to Fortinet Customers ) filed byFortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathan Hamstra in Support of Opposition to Motion to Amend the Case Schedule, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/7/2015) (Entered: 09/07/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/5/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FireEye Inc. re 202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of FireEye, Inc.'s Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions (Kilgour, Laurel) (Filed on 9/4/2015) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/5/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct Infringement Contentions filed by FireEye Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/13/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 9/18/2015. Replies due by 9/25/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laurel Kilgour, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B-Part 1, # 4 Exhibit B-Part 2, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D-M, # 7 Proposed Order)(Kilgour, Laurel) (Filed on 9/4/2015) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/5/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Support of FireEye, Inc.'s Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions filed by FireEye Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laurel Kilgour in support of Unopposed Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT A SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 4 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT A SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 5 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT B SOUGHT TO BE SEALED-PART 1, # 6 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT B SOUGHT TO BE SEALED-PART 1, # 7 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT B SOUGHT TO BE SEALED-PART 2, # 8 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT B SOUGHT TO BE SEALED-PART 2, # 9 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT C SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 10 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT C SOUGHT TO BE SEALED)(Kilgour, Laurel) (Filed on 9/4/2015) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 193 Motion to Shorten Time. Any opposition to Fortinet's Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Order of Magistrate Judge 182 shall be due by September 9, 2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(hsglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2015) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Shorten Time
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Shorten Time
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Shorten Time
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Shorten Time
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION to Shorten Time re 184 Motion to Amend the Case Schedule filed by FireEye Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shane Brun, # 2 Proposed Order)(Brun, David) (Filed on 8/31/2015) Modified on 9/1/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct the Case Schedule for the Limited Purpose of Serving Third Party Subpoenas to Fortinet Customers filed by FireEye Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 9/14/2015. Replies due by 9/21/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kilgour Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Proposed Order)(Kilgour, Laurel) (Filed on 8/31/2015) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in support of FireEye Inc.'s Motion to Amend Case Schedule for Limited Purpose of Serving Third Party Subpoenas to Fortinet Customers filed by FireEye Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Laurel Kilgour in Support of Stipulated Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order on Stipulated Administrative Motion to Seal, # 3 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT A SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 4 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT A SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 5 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT B SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 6 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT B SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 7 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT C SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 8 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT C SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 9 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT G SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 10 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT H SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 11 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION OF EXHIBIT H SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 12 Declaration REDACTED VERSION OF DECLARATION SOUGHT TO BE SEALED, # 13 Declaration UNREDACTED VERSION OF DECLARATION SOUGHT TO BE SEALED)(Kilgour, Laurel) (Filed on 8/31/2015) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER GRANTING 177 MOTION TO TAKE DEPOSITION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Take Deposition
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Motion Hearing held on 8/25/2015 re 111 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions, 114 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Regarding Inadequacy of Trade Secret Identification Under Cal. Code of Civ. Proc. Section 2019.210 and 123 Plaintiff's Cross Motion to Compel Trade Secret Discovery. Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions is granted. Defendant's Motion for Protective Order is granted. Plaintiff's Cross Motion to Compel is denied. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge (Time in Court: 10:14 to 11:02). Plaintiff Attorney(s) present: John Neukom and Patrick Burns. Also present: Todd Nelson. Defendant Attorney(s) present: Shane Brun and Laurel Kilgour. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/25/2015) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Take Deposition
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fortinet Inc. re 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Fortinet's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Declaration of Nathan Hamstra (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/19/2015) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration (Attestation) of John M. Neukom in Support of 156 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFortinet Inc.. (Related document(s) 156 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/19/2015) Modified on 8/20/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Motion Hearing held on 8/11/2015. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney John Jay Neukon; Caty Lacey. Defendant Attorney Rachel Walsh; Lana Shiferman. Motion to amend/correct the case schedule (docket no. 139 ) is argued and submitted by the parties and GRANTED in part by the Court. The discovery deadline is extended three weeks to September 4, 2015, for requests served before the original discovery deadline only. The Court will address the trade secret discovery issue after Magistrate Judge Grewal renders a ruling. (This is a text minute entry, there is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 139 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Case Schedule ) Fortinet's Opposition to FireEye's Motion to Amend the Case Schedule filed byFortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathan Hamstra in Support of Opposition, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Proposed Order Denying FireEye's Motion to Amend the Case Schedule)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/10/2015) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 8/7/2015. Court Reporter Name Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney John Neukom; Kristen Lovin; Nathan Hamstra. Defendant Attorney Lana Shiferman; Rachel Walsh; Shane Brun. Claim construction is argued and submitted by the parties, and taken under submission by the Court(This is a text minute entry, there is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/7/2015) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elizabeth Lovin on behalf of Fortinet, Inc. (Lovin, Kristen) (Filed on 8/6/2015) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY (re 123 MOTION to Compel ) in Support of Fortinet's Cross Motion to Compel Trade Secret Discovery filed byFortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathan Hamstra in Support of Fortinet's Reply, # 2 Exhibit 6, # 3 Exhibit 7, # 4 Exhibit 8)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/5/2015) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr: Tutorial Hearing held on 7/24/2015. Parties may submit a stipulation to extend the fact discovery cut-off for the Court's consideration. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. Plaintiff Attorney: Nathan Hamstra, John Neukom. Defendant Attorney: Lana Shiferman, Shane Brun, Rachel M. Walsh. Client Representative: Ashar Aziz (FireEye, Inc.)This is a text only Minute Entry (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/24/2015) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS FOLLOWING REFERRAL OF MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE PAUL S. GREWAL: Motion Hearing (In Re 111 MOTION for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions) is hereby set for 8/25/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2015) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2015. Defendant's 97 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support is argued and submitted by the parties, and taken under submission by the Court. A written order will issue. (Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan).Plaintiff Attorney: John Neukom. Defendant Attorney: Shane Brun. This is a text only Minute Entry (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/23/2015) Modified on 7/28/2015 (mklS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given that the hearing on 97 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support, previously scheduled for 7/23/2015 at 2:00 p.m., is changed to 02:30 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2015) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 114 MOTION for Protective Order ) and Fortinet's Cross Motion to Compel Trade Secret Discovery, filed byFortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nathan Hamstra, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Proposed Order Granting Fortinet's Cross Motion to Compel)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/15/2015) Modified on 7/16/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/16/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief re 112 Claim Construction Statement, Fortinet's Reply Claim Construction Brief filed byFortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Cannon, # 2 Exhibit 24)(Related document(s) 112 ) (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/6/2015) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 111 MOTION for Leave to File ) filed byFortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Cannon, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/6/2015) Modified on 7/7/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING AUGUST 11, 2015 MOTION HEARING, resetting 114 MOTION for Protective Order. 8/11/2015 Motion Hearing is reset to 8/25/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2015) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Fortinet's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/29/2015) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Opposition to Fortinet, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by FireEye Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shane Brun ISO Opposition to Fortinet, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H, # 5 Exhibit I, # 6 Exhibit J, # 7 Exhibit K, # 8 Exhibit L)(Brun, David) (Filed on 6/29/2015) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Fortinet's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Cannon, # 2 Exhibit 01, # 3 Exhibit 02, # 4 Exhibit 03, # 5 Exhibit 04, # 6 Exhibit 05, # 7 Exhibit 06, # 8 Exhibit 07, # 9 Exhibit 08, # 10 Exhibit 09, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/15/2015) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Fortinet Inc. re 104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Exhibit 11 to Fortinet's Opposition to FireEye's Motion to Strike Infringement Contentions (Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/11/2015) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (Redacted) RESPONSE (re 97 MOTION to Strike filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Cannon, # 2 Exhibit 01, # 3 Exhibit 02, # 4 Exhibit 03, # 5 Exhibit 04, # 6 Exhibit 05, # 7 Exhibit 06, # 8 Exhibit 07, # 9 Exhibit 08, # 10 Exhibit 09, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Proposed Order Denying FireEye's Motion to Strike)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/11/2015) Modified on 6/12/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Exhibit 11 to Fortinet's Opposition to FireEye's Motion to Strike Infringement Contentions filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Cannon in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 11, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/11/2015) (Entered: 06/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order granting 96 Stipulation entered by Hon. Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the tutorial, previously set for July 17, 2015, is continued to July 24, 2015, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. The claims construction hearing, previously set for July 24, 2015, is continued to August 7, 2015, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 1:00 p.m., in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Notice is hereby given that the hearing on defendant's 97 motion to strike, previously set for July 16, 2015, is continued to July 23, 2015, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by FireEye Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 6/11/2015. Replies due by 6/18/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shane Brun in Support of Motion to Strike, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D Part 1, # 6 Exhibit D Part 2, # 7 Exhibit E Part 1, # 8 Exhibit E Part 2, # 9 Exhibit E Part 3, # 10 Exhibit F part 1, # 11 Exhibit F Part 2, # 12 Exhibit F Part 3, # 13 Exhibit F Part 4, # 14 Exhibit F part 5, # 15 Exhibit G, # 16 Exhibit H Part 1, # 17 Exhibit H Part 2, # 18 Exhibit I Part 1, # 19 Exhibit I Part 2, # 20 Exhibit I Part 3, # 21 Exhibit I Part 4, # 22 Exhibit J, # 23 Exhibit K, # 24 Exhibit L, # 25 Exhibit M, # 26 Exhibit N, # 27 Exhibit O, # 28 Exhibit P, # 29 Exhibit Q, # 30 Exhibit R, # 31 Exhibit S, # 32 Exhibit T Part 1, # 33 Exhibit T Part 2, # 34 Exhibit U Part 1, # 35 Exhibit U Part 2, # 36 Exhibit U Part 3, # 37 Exhibit U Part 4, # 38 Proposed Order)(Brun, David) (Filed on 5/28/2015) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Case Management Conference held on 5/12/2015. FTR Time 2:51-3:11. Plaintiff Attorney John Jay Neukon; Matthew Cannon. Defendant Attorney Shane Brun. Parties are directed to meet and confer regarding proposed schedule for narrowing of claims. The Court sets the following dates: July 17, 2015 at 2:00 p.m.-tutorial (2:00 p.m.-3:30 p.m.); and July 24, 2015 at 11:00 a.m.-claims construction hearing (11 a.m.-1:30 p.m.). The Court maintains the following previously set deadlines (see docket no. 79): June 15, 2015-last day to file opening claims construction brief; June 29, 2015-last day to file responsive claims construction brief; and July 6, 2015-last day to file claims construction reply brief. The Court vacates the following dates: July 23, 2015 and September 24, 2015. Parties are reminded that discovery was previously referred to Magistrate Judge Grewal (see docket no. 38 ).(This is a text minute entry, there is no document associated with this entry.)(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/12/2015) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/5/2015) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for May 12, 2015, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., will be held on that date at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for May 12, 2015, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Case Management Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against FireEye Inc.. Filed byFortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/15/2014) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session 7/17/2014 (telephonic) case not settled, mediation complete. By Mediator, Robert B. Morrill,dated 7/17/2014. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session 3/20/2014, case not settled and further facilitated discussions are expected by 6/20/2014, mediation continuing. By Mediator, Robert B. Morrill, dated 3/20/2014. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court shall set a Case Management Conference, if necessary, in its forthcoming order on Defendant's Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. ***9/27/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Denying 65 Stipulation to Continue Mediation Deadline. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 3/12/2014.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION filed by FireEye Inc.. (Brun, David) (Filed on 3/11/2014) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. The Motion to Dismiss (Docket Item No. 45 ) before Judge Edward J. Davila previously noticed for 12/6/2013 at 9:00 AM has been taken under submission without oral argument pursuant to Civ. L.R. 7-1(b). The 12/6/2013 hearing is VACATED. The Court to issue further Order on the submitted motion. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting 62 Stipulation Extending Deadline for Mediation. Mediation Deadline 3/31/2014. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 11/25/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline to Complete Mediation filed by FireEye Inc.. (Brun, David) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re [45] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed byFireEye Inc.. (Brun, David) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Robert B. Morrill as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting [51] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael J. Flynn terminated. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/29/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jackson Hsin Ho (Ho, Jackson) (Filed on 10/1/2013) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Nathaniel Haycock (Haycock, Jason) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Court shall set a Case Management Conference, if necessary, in its forthcoming order on Defendant's Motion to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. ***9/27/2013 CMC Deadlines terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2013. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/29/2013 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Michael J. Flynn (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Cooper, William) (Filed on 7/26/2013) Modified on 7/29/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order as Modified by the Court Granting [57] Stipulation selecting Mediation. The parties shall participate hold the ADR by the presumptive deadline (90 days from the date of the referral order). Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 9/24/2013(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. The Motion previously set for 12/3/2013 has been noticed in error for a date unavailable for setting motions before this Court. Set/Reset Deadlines as to [45] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint: Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2013) Modified text on 7/25/2013 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Fortinet Inc. filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE (re [45] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed byFortinet Inc.. (Cooper, William) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by William Owen Cooper (Cooper, William) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Michael Holmes (Holmes, Andrew) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Neukom (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by FireEye Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 7/24/2013. Replies due by 7/31/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Defendant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, # (2) Proposed Order)(Brun, David) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting [42] Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Erick Rusnack for defendant. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 6/26/2013.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Clerks Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None, Terminated: 6/26/2013 Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7801387.) filed by FireEye Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing)(Rusnak, Eric) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Meghana Chandrakant RaoRane (RaoRane, Meghana) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Bettinger (Bettinger, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by David Shane Brun (Brun, David) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case Reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 6/25/2013. (gmS, ) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: None Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #[38]***ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 6/25/2013. (gmS, ) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/25/2013 (gmS, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Clerk's Notice of Impending ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: All matters presently set before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal are hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Fortinet Inc... (Cooper, William) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Clerks NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RE COURT DEADLINE FOR PARTIES TO EITHER CONSENT OR DECLINE TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: 9/10/2013 Case Management Conference advanced to 7/2/2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2013. Each party who has not already done so shall file either a Consent or Declination to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge no later than 6/25/2013. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:12-cv-01066. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None ADR Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order, # (2) Standing Order, # (3) Standing Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Order Transferring CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [12] Motion to Transfer Case; denying as moot [21] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/16/2013. (fms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 5/16/2013. (fms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT -- Citation of Subsequent Authority -- by Fortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT -- Defendant's Citation of Subsequent Authority by FireEye Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Stover, Chad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Firm Name Change by FireEye Inc. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re [21] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FireEye Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis) (Main Document 26 replaced on 12/11/2012) (nmfn, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [21] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fortinet Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 12/10/2012. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT -- CITATION OF SUBSEQUENT AUTHORITY -- by Fortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Request
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST for Oral Argument by FireEye Inc. re [12] MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California. (Stover, Chad)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPENING BRIEF in Support re [21] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FireEye Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 11/30/2012. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/16/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by FireEye Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service)(DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [18] Reply Brief Declaration of Bob Fehrenbach by FireEye Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [18] Reply Brief Declaration of Bill Diamond by FireEye Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re [12] MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by FireEye Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION re [16] Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Transfer (Declaration of John M. Neukom) by Fortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits A-M)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re [12] MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Fortinet Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/5/2012. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [13] Opening Brief in Support Declaration of Michael Sheridan by FireEye Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [13] Opening Brief in Support Declaration of Shane Brun by FireEye Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6)(DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re [12] MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by FireEye Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/25/2012. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/16/2013 Motion to Transfer Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California - filed by FireEye Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service)(DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by FireEye Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/3/2012 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint to November 12, 2012 - filed by FireEye Inc., Fortinet Inc.. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Copy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,056,135 B2; 8,204,933 B2; 7,580,974 B2; 7,979,543 B2; 8,051,483 B2; 8,276,205 B2; . (Blumenfeld, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First AMENDED COMPLAINT against FireEye Inc.- filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Blumenfeld, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/5/2012 Motion for Leave to Appear
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney John M. Neukom and Andrew M. Holmes - filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Flynn, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/6/2012 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to -- UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT - - filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fortinet Inc.. FireEye Inc. served on 8/23/2012, answer due 9/13/2012. (Blumenfeld, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Received Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Fortinet Inc. (rwc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Patent/Trademark Copy
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,056,135 B2; 8,204,933 B2. (rwc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Received DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (rwc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT - filed with Jury Demand against FireEye Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 0311-1127502.) - filed by Fortinet Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(rwc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 302 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?