Angela Lea, et al v. Buy Direct, L.L.C.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 13-20281

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 19, 2016 at 12:56 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502459209 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
Attorney Mr. Aaron D. Radbil for Appellants Ms. Angela Lea and Mr. Darrel Lea is advised to update current address with pacer. [13-20281] (MAS)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502454883 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
    APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Ms. Angela Lea and Mr. Darrel Lea Date of service: 11/27/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Radbil; Attorney for Appellee: Odom; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Radbil [13-20281] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/09/2013 for Appellants Angela Lea and Darrel Lea. [13-20281] (Aaron D. Radbil )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502439948 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
      APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellee Buy Direct, L.L.C.. Date of service: 11/13/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Radbil, Radbil; Attorney for Appellee: Odom [13-20281] (Kendrick Lane Odom )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502399493 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
        CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellee Buy Direct, L.L.C. [7475235-2] Appellee's Brief due on 11/14/2013 for Appellee Buy Direct, L.L.C.. [13-20281] (PAC)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502399370 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
          UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Buy Direct, L.L.C. to extend time to file brief of appellee until 11/14/2013 at 05:00 pm [7475235-2]. Date of service: 10/07/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Radbil; Attorney for Appellee: Odom [13-20281] (Kendrick Lane Odom )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502378543 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
            RECORD EXCERPTS MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellants Ms. Angela Lea and Mr. Darrel Lea in 13-20281 [7455018-2]. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 09/23/2013 for Appellants Angela Lea and Darrel Lea. [13-20281] (LBM)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502378540 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
              BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellants Ms. Angela Lea and Mr. Darrel Lea in 13-20281 [7455004-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 09/23/2013 for Appellants Angela Lea and Darrel Lea. [13-20281] (LBM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502370217 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Ms. Angela Lea and Mr. Darrel Lea. Date of service: 09/11/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Radbil, Radbil; Attorney for Appellee: Odom [13-20281] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require CORRECTED CAPTION. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 10/02/2013 for Appellants Angela Lea and Darrel Lea [13-20281] (Aaron D. Radbil )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502370194 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Angela Lea and Mr. Darrel Lea. Date of service: 09/11/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Radbil, Radbil; Attorney for Appellee: Odom [13-20281] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.. Additionally the Brief requires CORRECTED CAPTION. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 10/02/2013 for Appellants Angela Lea and Darrel Lea.. Appellee's Brief due on 10/15/2013 for Appellee Buy Direct, L.L.C. [13-20281] (Aaron D. Radbil )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 00502310309 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                  CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Ms. Angela Lea and Mr. Darrel Lea [7412541-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 09/11/2013 for Appellants Angela Lea and Darrel Lea. [13-20281] (PAC)
                    LREF
                    Blank 00502310210 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                    UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Angela Lea and Mr. Darrel Lea to extend time to file brief as appellant until 09/11/2013 [7412541-2]. Date of service: 07/16/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Radbil; Attorney for Appellee: Odom; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Radbil [13-20281] (Aaron D. Radbil )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502295823 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                      BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/12/2013 for Appellants Angela Lea and Darrel Lea. [13-20281] (PAC)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 00502294122 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                        CLERK ORDER granting motion to reopen case filed by Appellants Ms. Angela Lea and Mr. Darrel Lea [7401267-2]. [13-20281] (PAC)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502293498 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                          OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Angela Lea and Mr. Darrel Lea to reopen case [7401267-2]. Date of service: 07/01/2013 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Radbil, Radbil; Attorney for Appellee: Odom; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Odom [13-20281] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED.OPPOSED MOTION to reopen case [7401267-2] Default Remedied. Date of service: 07/01/2013 [13-20281] (Aaron D. Radbil )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502292235 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                            Attorney Aaron Radbil for Appellant Aaron Radbil is advised to resubmit appearance form. Reason: No signature on appearance form. [13-20281] (MAS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502284903 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                              CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[7395015-2] [13-20281] (PAC)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502259304 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7376972-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/17/2013 for Appellants Angela Lea and Darrel Lea [13-20281] (LBM)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502250040 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                  PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Angela Lea and Mr. Darrel Lea [13-20281] (CAG)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 74 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?