Salix Capital US Inc. v. Bank Of America Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06116

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 1:50 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Salix Capital US Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald Judah Aranoff +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 aranoff@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Hays & Marsh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P. Butterfield +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 wbutterfield@hausfeldllp.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED REENA GAMBHIR +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 rgambhir@hausfeldllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hausfeld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael David Hausfeld +1 202 540 7200 +1 202 540 7201 MHausfeld@hausfeld.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy Andersen +1 213 624 7707 jeremyandersen@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Andersen +1 213 624 7707 jeremyandersen@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Lawrence Brockett +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 danbrockett@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
Space Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steig David Olson +1 212 849 7152 +1 212 849 7100 steigolson@quinnemanuel.com
Space Steig David Olson +1 212 849 7152 +1 212 849 7100 steigolson@quinnemanuel.com
v.
Bank of America Corporation Bank of America Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy Todd Adler +1 212 450 4363 +1 212 701 5363 jeremy.adler@davispolk.com
Space Arthur Joseph Burke +1 212 450 4352 +1 212 701 5352 arthur.burke@davispolk.com
Space Michael Robert G. Posada +1 212 450 4411 +1 212 701 5411 michael.posada@davispolk.com
Space Robert Frank Wise, Jr. +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3512 rwise@dpw.com
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp
Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Bank PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Allen & Overy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Svetkey Feldberg +1 212 610 6360 +1 212 610 6399 michael.feldberg@newyork.allenovery.com
Space TODD STEVEN FISHMAN +1 212 610 6300 +1 212 610 6399 todd.fishman@newyork.allenovery.com
Space Mary Elaine Johnston +1 212 610 6388 elaine.johnston@allenovery.com
BNP Paribas, SA BNP Paribas, SA, Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.
Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse AG, Defendant
Credit Suisse Group AG Credit Suisse Group AG, Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
Unknown Role, Nrp, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Briazz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Dsl.net, Inc.
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Brazil Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Solv Ex Corp
Unknown Role, Newmark Homes Corp
Unknown Role, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Unknown Role, Doblique Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emachines Inc /de/
Unknown Role, Rreef America L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Id Arizona Corp.
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman, Sachs & Co."
HSBC Bank PLC HSBC Bank PLC, Defendant
HSBC Bank USA, NA HSBC Bank USA, NA, Defendant
HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Holdings PLC, Defendant
No Logo International Swaps & Derivatives Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin James Arquit +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 karquit@stblaw.com
Space Abram J. Ellis +1 202 636 5579 aellis@stblaw.com
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "J.P. Morgan Chase & Co"
No Logo Markit Group Ltd., Defendant
Morgan Stanley & Company LLC Morgan Stanley & Company LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Robert Chesler +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 echesler@cravath.com
Space Vanessa A Lavely +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 vlavely@cravath.com
Space Michael A Paskin +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 mpaskin@cravath.com
Space Daniel Slifkin +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 dslifkin@cravath.com
No Logo Morgan Stanley Bank, NA, Defendant
Royal Bank of Scotland NV Royal Bank of Scotland NV, Defendant
Royal Bank of Scotland PLC Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Defendant
No Logo The Royal Bank Of Scotland Group Plc, Defendant
UBS AG UBS AG, Defendant
Unknown Role, Impsat Corp
Unknown Role, Ubs Capital II Inc
Unknown Role, Ip Factory Inc
Unknown Role, Muniyield Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund Inc
UBS Securities LLC UBS Securities LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (280) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
CORRECTED OPINION & ORDER....For the reasons stated herein and during the Fairness Hearing, Class Counsels petition for approval of the Settlement and Plan of Distribution was granted, with the Court retaining jurisdiction to hear any disputes arising from the claims administration process. Class Counsels application for attorneys fees and expenses for the Settlement was also granted. Class Counsels application for incentive awards for Class representatives LACERA and Salix was denied. (Signed by Judge Denise Cote on 4/26/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al. (rr) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Steig D. Olson dated April 26, 2016 re: Request for corrections to the Court's April 25, 2016 Opinion and Order and the transcript of the April 15, 2016 Fairness Hearing. ENDORSEMENT: The Court reporter shall correct the transcript as requested. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/26/2016) Copy Forwarded by Chambers to the SDNY Court Reporter's Office.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Steig D. Olson dated April 26, 2016 re: Request for corrections to the Court's April 25, 2016 Opinion and Order. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Olson, Steig) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        OPINION & ORDER.....For the reasons stated herein and during the Fairness Hearing, Class Counsels petition for approval of the Settlement and Plan of Distribution was granted, with the Court retaining jurisdiction to hear any disputes arising from the claims administration process. Class Counsels application for attorneys fees and expenses for the Settlement was also granted. Class Counsels application for incentive awards for Class representatives LACERA and Salix was denied. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/25/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Steig D. Olson dated 04/22/2016 re: Data Concern Raised by Silver Point. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Olson, Steig) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER GRANTING CLASS COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES, AND INCENTIVE AWARDS FOR CLASS REPRESENTATIVES... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER APPROVING PLAN OF DISTRIBUTION, OVERRULING OBJECTIONS, AND RETAINING JURISDICTION.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with International Swaps and Derivatives Association dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.9, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Markit Group Ltd. and Markit Group Holdings Ltd., dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.11, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                    FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with UBS AG and UBS Securities LLC, dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.14, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                      FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Royal Bank of Scotland PLC and Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.13, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                        FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.12, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                          FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.10, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                            FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with HSBC Bank PLC and HSBC Bank USA, N.A., dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.8, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Goldman, Sachs & Co. dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.7, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Deutsche Bank AG dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.6, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Credit Suisse AG, dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.5, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Global Markets Inc., dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.4, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with BNP Paribas dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.2, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Barclays Bank PLC dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.1, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL....The settlements addressed in the Preliminary Approval Order and foregoing motions include the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A. dated September 30, 2015 (the "Agreement), seek Dkt No.445, Ex.3, that is the subject of this Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal.... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/18/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                                            COURT EXHIBIT 1 - "Monthly Weighted-Average Bid-Ask Spreads CDX.IG (5-Year Tenor, On-The-Run Series) marked at the April 15, 2016 Fairness hearing. Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert A. Skinner dated April 14, 2016 re: the Fairness Hearing. ENDORSEMENT: To be heard on any of the requested modifications, counsel must be present at tomorrow's Hearing. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION of Sanjay Unni in Support re: (231 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 502 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 218 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 152 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 358 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 228 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 259 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 161 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 130 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 241 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 232 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC) MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Settlement With All Defendants, Approval of Plan of Distribution, and Certification of Settlement Class.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (231 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 502 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 218 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 152 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 358 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 228 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 259 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 161 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 130 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 241 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 232 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC) MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Settlement With All Defendants, Approval of Plan of Distribution, and Certification of Settlement Class. . Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:13-cv-04928-DLC; granting (526) Notice of Motion By Objector Saba Capital Management, L.P. For Leave to File the Declaration of Kyle Cecchini in Opposition to Motion for Final Approval of Plan of Distribution in case 1:13-md-02476-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al. (gr) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall be prepared to address at tomorrows Fairness Hearing: (1) whether an inflation rate other than 20% should be applied to the portion of the class period following the implementation of the Dodd-Frank reforms and, if so, what that rate should be; and (2) whether there should be an appeal right to this Court from the Administrators rejection of a proposed Covered Transaction. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/14/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated April 13, 2016 re: Request for permission to file a reply memorandum of law exceeding 10 pages. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER in case 1:13-cv-04928-DLC; granting (520) Motion for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:13-md-02476-DLC. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al. (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT GRANTING Objector MF Global LLC NOTICE of Motion for Leave to File a Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Settlement re: 491 Objection (non-motion). (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/13/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER: Paragraphs 14 and 15 of the March 29, 2016 Cirami Declaration describe undeliverable notice packets. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that class counsel shall be prepared to explain at the Fairness Hearing its understanding as to how many of the 13,923 settlement class members identified at the time of the January 11 mailing have received a mailed notice of the settlement. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/12/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association (LACERA) shall submit an ex parte copy of its fee agreement with Pearson, Simon & Warshaw, LLP. LACERA shall submit a digital copy by email to the Courts Chambers e-mail address, cotenysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/12/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:13-cv-04928-DLC; granting (511) Letter Motion by Objector Silver Point for leave to file a memorandum of law in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for final approval of plan of distribution and supplemental brief in further support of its objection. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/12/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al. (gr) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re: (231 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 502 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 218 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 152 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 358 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 228 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 259 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 161 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 130 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 241 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 232 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC) MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Settlement With All Defendants, Approval of Plan of Distribution, and Certification of Settlement Class. ("Defendants' Statement in Connection with the Proposed Settlement"). Document filed by BNP Paribas, Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N. A., Barclays Bank PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Bank, PLC, JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Markit Group Holdings Ltd., Markit Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, UBS AG, UBS Securities, LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Slifkin, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      DECLARATION of Bruce L. Simon in Support re: (246 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 215 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 228 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 218 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 219 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 345 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 480 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 205 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 139 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 116 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 148 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brockett in Support re: (219 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 246 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 345 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 480 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 205 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 215 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 228 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 218 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 139 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 116 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 148 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: (246 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 215 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 228 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 218 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 219 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 345 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 480 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 205 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 139 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 116 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 148 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards. . Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami in Support re: (152 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 228 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 161 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 241 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 232 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 231 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 502 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 218 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 358 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 259 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 130 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC) MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Settlement With All Defendants, Approval of Plan of Distribution, and Certification of Settlement Class.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit C-1, # 5 Exhibit C-2, # 6 Exhibit C-3, # 7 Exhibit C-4, # 8 Exhibit C-5, # 9 Exhibit C-6, # 10 Exhibit C-7, # 11 Exhibit C-8)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              DECLARATION of Sanjay Unni in Support re: (152 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 228 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 161 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 241 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 232 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 231 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 502 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 218 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 358 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 259 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 130 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC) MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Settlement With All Defendants, Approval of Plan of Distribution, and Certification of Settlement Class.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10.1, # 11 Exhibit 10.2, # 12 Exhibit 11)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (152 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 228 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 161 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 241 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 232 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 231 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 502 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 218 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 358 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 259 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 130 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC) MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Settlement With All Defendants, Approval of Plan of Distribution, and Certification of Settlement Class. . Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for Settlement for Final Approval of Settlement With All Defendants, Approval of Plan of Distribution, and Certification of Settlement Class. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated March 28, 2016 re: Request for permission to file a memorandum of law exceeding 25 pages. ENDORSEMENT: Granted, nunc pro tunc. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/1/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for John Benjamin King to Appear Pro Hac Vice with COGS attached. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12125501. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P., Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P., Silver Point Capital Offshore, Ltd., Silver Point Capital, L.P.,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(King, John) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated March 28, 2016 re: Request for permission to file a memorandum of law exceeding 25 pages. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                          Objection re: 465 Order, Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice to Settlement Class. Document by Saba Capital Management, L.P. (gr) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                            DECLARATION of Elizabeth Kroger Davis in Support re: (148 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                              DECLARATION of Eric Grannan in Support re: (148 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION of Daniel Donovan in Support re: (148 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Thomas Felgner in Support re: (148 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Michael Herrera in Support re: (148 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Bruce L. Simon in Support re: (148 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brockett in Support re: (148 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (148 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC) MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards. . Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated January 19, 2016 re: Request for permission to file a memorandum of law exceeding 25 pages. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/19/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated January 19, 2016 re: Request for permission to file a memorandum of law exceeding 25 pages. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting (209) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliott Morris Bacon terminated in case 1:13-cv-04928-DLC; granting (222) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliott Morris Bacon terminated in case 1:13-cv-06116-DLC; granting (471) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliott Morris Bacon terminated in case 1:13-md-02476-DLC; granting (339) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliott Morris Bacon terminated in case 1:13-cv-07450-DLC; granting (240) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliott Morris Bacon terminated in case 1:13-cv-07465-DLC; granting (213) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliott Morris Bacon terminated in case 1:13-cv-07640-DLC; granting (199) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliott Morris Bacon terminated in case 1:13-cv-07647-DLC; granting (110) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliott Morris Bacon terminated in case 1:13-cv-07634-DLC; granting (212) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliott Morris Bacon terminated in case 1:13-cv-07752-DLC; granting (133) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliott Morris Bacon terminated in case 1:13-cv-07976-DLC; granting (142) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Elliott Morris Bacon terminated in case 1:13-cv-07964-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/4/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al. (gr) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting (210) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Todd Adler terminated in case 1:13-cv-04928-DLC; granting (223) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Todd Adler terminated in case 1:13-cv-06116-DLC; granting (472) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Todd Adler terminated in case 1:13-md-02476-DLC; granting (340) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Todd Adler terminated in case 1:13-cv-07450-DLC; granting (241) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Todd Adler terminated in case 1:13-cv-07465-DLC; granting (214) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Todd Adler terminated in case 1:13-cv-07640-DLC; granting (200) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Todd Adler terminated in case 1:13-cv-07647-DLC; granting (111) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Todd Adler terminated in case 1:13-cv-07634-DLC; granting (213) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Todd Adler terminated in case 1:13-cv-07752-DLC; granting (134) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Todd Adler terminated in case 1:13-cv-07976-DLC; granting (143) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jeremy Todd Adler terminated in case 1:13-cv-07964-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/4/2016) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al. (gr) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Jeremy T. Adler to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N. A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Adler, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Elliott M. Bacon to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by UBS AG, UBS Securities L.L.C..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bacon, Elliott) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated 11/3/2015 re: In accordance with the Court's October 29, 2015 Order, we submit the attached revised Notice of Proposed Settlement reflecting the changes suggested by the Court. As reflected in the revised Notice, we have clarified the language in the paragraph numbered 11 on page 8 of the Notice and made the other revisions suggested by the Court. A redline reflecting these changes is also attached for the Court's convenience. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/3/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated November 3, 2015 re: Revised Proposed Notice. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Notice, # 2 Exhibit Revised Notice (Redline))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER: Following a telephone conference with the parties conducted on the record on October 27, 2015, Class Counsel submitted on October 28 revised documents in connection with the settlement of this action. Having reviewed these documents, it is hereby ORDERED that the Preliminary Order shall be filed today with the amendments reflected on that Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice is approved with the Courts revisions reflected on the document that is being filed today, with the following exception. Class Counsel shall advise the Court by November 4, 2015, of its proposal regarding the clause [be submitted electronically or] contained in the paragraph numbered 11 on page 8 of the Notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Summary Notice, which is also being filed today, is approved without revision. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 218 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENTS AND PROVIDING FOR NOTICE TO THE SETTLEMENT CLASS....The Court hereby preliminarily approves the Agreements and the Settlements set forth therein, subject to further consideration at the Fairness Hearing...A hearing (the "Fairness Hearing") shall be held before the Court on April 15, 2016, at 2:00 p.m...... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/29/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated October 28, 2015 re: Preliminary Approval of Settlements. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order and Notices, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Order and Notices (Redline))Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Compliance with 28 U.S.C § 1715. Document filed by Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bial, Joseph) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Darrell Duffie in Support re: (227 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 196 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 120 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 97 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 129 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 200 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 186 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 326 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 209 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 199 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 443 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC) MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with All Defendants and Preliminary Certification of a Settlement Class.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re: (227 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 196 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 120 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 97 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 129 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 200 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 186 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 326 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 209 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 199 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 443 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC) MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with All Defendants and Preliminary Certification of a Settlement Class. {DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT IN CONNECTION WITH THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT}. Document filed by BNP Paribas, Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N. A., Barclays Bank PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Bank USA N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Markit Group Holdings Ltd., Markit Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley & Co. L.L.C., Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, HSBC Bank PLC, UBS Securities LLC, International Swaps and Derivatives Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Sperling, Robert) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Daniel Weinstein in Support re: (227 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 196 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 120 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 97 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 129 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 200 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 186 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 326 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 209 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 199 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 443 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC) MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with All Defendants and Preliminary Certification of a Settlement Class.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #449) DECLARATION of Darrell Duffie in Support re: (227 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 196 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 120 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 97 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 129 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 200 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 186 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 326 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 209 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 199 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 443 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC) MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with All Defendants and Preliminary Certification of a Settlement Class.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) Modified on 10/19/2015 (lb). (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brockett in Support re: (227 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 97 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 186 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 209 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 199 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 196 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 120 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 129 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 200 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 326 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 443 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC) MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with All Defendants and Preliminary Certification of a Settlement Class.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (227 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 196 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 120 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 97 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 200 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 186 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 326 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 209 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 199 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 443 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC) MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with All Defendants and Preliminary Certification of a Settlement Class. . Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Settlement Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement with All Defendants and Preliminary Certification of a Settlement Class. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel Brockett dated 10/15/2015 re: Request for permission to file a memorandum of law in excess of 25 pages. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/13/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel Brockett dated 10/15/2015 re: Request for permission to file a memorandum of law in excess of 25 pages. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Brockett, Daniel dated 09/25/2015 re: Settlement and Motion for Preliminary Approval. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is due 10/16/15. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/28/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Brockett, Daniel dated 09/25/2015 re: Settlement and Motion for Preliminary Approval. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc., Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth at the pretrial conference held on September 11, 2015, it is hereby ORDERED that the schedule for plaintiffs motion for class certification is revised as follows: Motion served by October 16, 2015; Opposition served by November 6, 2015; Reply served by November 20, 2015....IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that trial will begin at 9:30 a.m. on May 1, 2017. All other dates set forth in the February 2, 2015 Revised Pretrial Scheduling Order remain in place. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/14/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Dan Brockett dated 08/20/2015 re: Class Certification Filing Deadline. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, Salix Capital US Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER in case 1:13-cv-04928-DLC; granting (428) Motion for Elliott M. Bacon to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting (429) Motion for Kristin L. Coveney to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:13-md-02476-DLC (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al. (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, and Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger (collectively, "Unipension Funds"). (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Rachel Horvitz on behalf of International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Horvitz, Karen) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. Appendix A to a June 15, 2015 letter submitted by plaintiffs indicates that plaintiff Unipension is proposing to withdraw as a named plaintiff. No formal request for Unipension to withdraw has yet been filed. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, by June 29, 2015, plaintiffs shall submit a status report addressing Unipensions involvement in this action. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/16/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jonathan P. Shaub dated 5/29/2015 re: Withdrawal of Appearance on behalf of Defendants Markit Group Limited and Markit Group Holdings Limited. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/8/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING EXPERT DISCLOSURE PROTOCOL. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/8/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jonathan Oblak dated May 4, 2015 re: In Order that document and deposition discovery proceed expeditiously, the parties request that the Court set May 29, 2015 as Defendants' deadline for substantial completion of document production. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/5/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 194 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Jonathan Oblak dated May 4, 2015 re: Status of Defendants' Document Production. Document filed by Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Oblak, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: On April 28, 2015 plaintiffs submitted a letter requesting that defendants Markit Group Holdings Ltd. and Markit Group Ltd. (collectively Markit) be ordered to search the files of thirteen Markit custodians. On April 29, Markit submitted a responsive letter. Accordingly, it is herebyORDERED that an on-the-record telephone conference shall be held on April 30 at 3:30pm. The parties shall jointly call Chambers at (212) 805-0202. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/30/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Colin R. Kass dated April 29,2015 re: Discovery dispute concerning appropriate custodians for searches of Markit's documents. Document filed by Markit Group, Ltd., Markit Group Ltd., Markit Group Ltd., Markit Group, Ltd, Markit Group Holdings Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Kass, Colin) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Sascha N. Rand dated April 28, 2015 re: Discovery dispute concerning appropriate custodians for searches of Markit's documents. Document filed by Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:13-cv-04928-DLC; granting (394) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Molly Anne Kelley terminated in case 1:13-md-02476-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/17/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al. (gr) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Miles Hampson Plant on behalf of Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Plant, Miles) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Irving McClammy on behalf of Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N. A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(McClammy, James) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            REVISED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: At a January 22, 2015 pretrial conference, a Pretrial Scheduling Order was circulated as a draft, and the parties were given until January 30, 2015 to respond with any proposed revisions. No proposed revisions were received by January 30, and on February 2, the Court entered the Order. Thereafter, the parties submitted proposed revisions. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the following revised schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case. The Pretrial Scheduling Order entered earlier on February 2 is vacated to the extent that it is inconsistent with the following revised schedule. (See Revised Pretrial Scheduling Order for schedule.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/2/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel Brockett dated February 2, 2015 re: Parties Joint Proposed Revision to Draft Scheduling Order. Document filed by Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Joint red-line of Court's draft scheduling order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: At a January 22, 2015 pretrial conference, this Pretrial Scheduling Order was circulated as a draft, and the parties were given until January 30, 2015 to respond with any proposed revisions. No proposed revisions were received. On September 18, 2014, after holding a pretrial conference, the Court so ordered a Joint Initial Report that set a partial schedule in this case. That schedule refers to many deadlines not by their dates certain, but instead by their relation to the date the Joint Initial Report was entered. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern the further conduct of pretrial proceedings in this case. The September 18, 2014 Joint Initial Report is vacated to the extent that it is inconsistent with the following schedule. (See Pretrial Scheduling Order for the schedule.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/2/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Gil M. Soffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10550816. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by UBS AG, UBS Securities L.L.C., UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Soffer, Gil) Modified on 2/2/2015 (sdi). (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. An Order of January 20, 2015 scheduled a conference for January 22, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. It is hereby ORDERED that the conference is rescheduled to 9:00 a.m. on January 22 in Courtroom 15B at the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. In advance of the conference, the parties shall jointly email an appearance sheet to cotenysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/21/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: On January 13, 2015, plaintiffs submitted a letter requesting a conference to discuss defendants plan to contact class members. Defendants responded by letter dated January 16, 2015. Accordingly, it is herebyORDERED that a conference shall be held on Thursday, January 22, 2015 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 15B at the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. In advance of the conference, the parties shall jointly email an appearance sheet to cotenysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/20/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:13-cv-04928-DLC; granting (376) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Susan M. Razzano; Alexis Garmey Chardon and Nathan P. Eimer terminated in case 1:13-md-02476-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/15/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al. (gr) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel Brockett dated 01/13/2015 re: Defendants Contacting Class Members. Document filed by Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS Group AG for UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG; Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc. for UBS Securities L.L.C., UBS Securities L.L.C., UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities LLC., UBS Securities, LLC, UBS Securities, LLC, UBS Securities, LLC, UBS Securities, LLC. Document filed by UBS AG, UBS Securities L.L.C., UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bohan, David) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc. for UBS Securities, LLC; Corporate Parent UBS Group AG for UBS AG. Document filed by UBS AG, UBS Securities, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bohan, David) Modified on 12/22/2014 (lb). (Entered: 12/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Sascha N. Rand dated November 25, 2014 re: European Commission Production. Document filed by Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Rand, Sascha) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT. Defendants' European Commission Productions Document filed by Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Rand, Sascha) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Sascha N. Rand dated November 17, 2014 re: Extension Request Concerning European Commission Productions. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Sascha N. Rand dated November 17, 2014 re: Extension Request Concerning European Commission Productions. Document filed by Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Rand, Sascha) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that the law firm of Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP hereby is substituted for Allen & Overy LLP as counsel of record for Defendant Barclays Bank PLC ("Barclays") in the above-captioned action. Cahill Gordon & Reindel LLP requests that a copy of all papers henceforth filed or served in this action be served upon David G. Januszewski, a member of the firm, at the firm's office located at 80 Pine Street, New York, New York 10005. The supporting Affidavit of David O. Januszewski is attached hereto pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.A. This substitution does not waive or otherwise impair any claims or defenses that Barclays may have available to it. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/20/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al, Pursuant to instructions from Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING FOREIGN DOCUMENTS AND WITNESSES (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/20/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clinton Joseph Dockery on behalf of Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Dockery, Clinton) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Blair Alexander Adams on behalf of Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Adams, Blair) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting (168) Motion for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:13-cv-06116-DLC; granting (339) Motion for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:13-md-02476-DLC. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 1:13-cv-06116-DLC (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Jeremy D. Andersen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10176455. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc., Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 1:13-cv-06116-DLC(Andersen, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 9/18/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 9/18/2014 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2015.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Garrett McCarthy on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(McCarthy, John) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sascha Nicholas Rand on behalf of Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Rand, Sascha) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT INITIAL REPORT.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE PRODUCTION OF DISCOVERY MATERIAL. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Pursuant to the discussion at todays pretrial conference, it is herebyORDERED that a pretrial conference shall be held on Friday, September 11, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15B at the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The parties shall be prepared to discuss all topics appropriate for a pretrial conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16. The parties shall meet and confer before the conference. Following their meet-and-confer, the parties may make any necessary submissions to the Court by no later than noon on September 9, 2015. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Pursuant to the discussion at todays pretrial conference, it is herebyORDERED that by noon on Friday, December 12, 2014, the parties shall jointly file a letter with the Court reporting on whether there has been a meeting with a private mediator and/or whether any such meetings are scheduled in the future. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/18/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated September 16, 2014 re: September 18, 2014 Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Initial Report, # 2 Exhibit B - ESI Protocol, # 3 Exhibit C - [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER....a pretrial conference shall be held on September 18, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15B at the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street. The parties shall be prepared to discuss all topics appropriate for a pretrial conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, including discovery and settlement. The parties shall meet and confer before the conference to reach consensus on (1) scheduling, structuring, and limiting discovery, and (2) the preferred processes for settlement, whether they involve an outside mediator, a judicial officer, or any other method. The parties shall submit a letter to the Court by September 16 describing points of agreement and disagreement on the above. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/4/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          OPINION & ORDER #104696: Defendants' May 23, 2014 motions to dismiss are granted in part. Claims brought under Section 2 of the Sherman Act and claims for damages based on investments entered prior to the Fall of 2008 are dismissed. All other claims shall proceed. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/4/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) Modified on 9/9/2014 (ca). (Entered: 09/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE AND SETTING TIME FOR MARKIT GROUP HOLDINGS LTD. TO ANSWER. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/3/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert F. Wise dated 7/10/2014 re: Defendants request leave to allocate at their discretion among their joint and separate replies the previously approved several reply page limits. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 7/10/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT in case 1:13-cv-04928-DLC; granting (309) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ( Reply due by 7/15/2014) in case 1:13-md-02476-DLC. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/25/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al. (gr) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated June 20, 2014 re: Oral Argument on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (289 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC) JOINT MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Dealer-Defendants., (297 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint by Defendant International Swaps and Derivatives Association., (293 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss the Second Consolidated Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated 6/17/2014 re: Permission to File Single Consolidated Opposition Brief. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 6/17/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated June 17, 2014 re: Permission to File Single Consolidated Opposition Brief. Document filed by Arkitekternes Pensionskasse, Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Essex Regional Retirement System, Los Angeles County Employees Retirement Association, MP Pension - Pensionskassen for Magistre & Psykologer, Pensionskassen for Jordbrugsakademikere & Dyrlaeger, Salix Capital US Inc., Unipension Fondsmaeglerselskab A/S, Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 117 Motion for David C. Giardina to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 112 Motion for David F. Graham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 111 Motion for Charles F. Rule to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 96 Motion for Scott M. Abeles to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 83 Motion for Reena Gambhir to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 82 Motion for Colin R. Kass to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 81 Motion for Michael David Hausfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 80 Motion for William Peter Butterfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (Cote, Denise) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert F. Wise dated 3/26/2014 re: Letter from Defendants in response to Plaintiffs' letter of March 24, 2014 seeking the Court's permission to serve document production subpoenas on third parties. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs may serve document preservation notices on third parties. Third parties shall not be required to produce any documents pending further order of the Court. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/26/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert F. Wise dated 3/21/2014 re: Defendants' propose that the Court adopt a schedule consistent with the time intervals established in the Court's Case Management Order, dated 12/13/2013. Applying those intervals yield the following schedule: (1) any motions to dismiss would be due on or before 5/23/2014; (2) Plaintiffs' opposition(s) would be due on or before 6/20/2014; and (3) Defendants' replies would be due on or before 7/11/2014. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/25/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Michael J. Garvey (with Exhibits 1-8) in Support re: (163 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 135 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 122 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 128 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 258 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 56 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 274 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 136 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 67 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 32 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 136 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint by Defendant International Swaps and Derivatives Association.. Document filed by International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Garvey, Michael) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (122 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 128 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 258 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 274 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 67 in 1:13-cv-07964-DLC, 163 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 135 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 56 in 1:13-cv-07976-DLC, 136 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 32 in 1:13-cv-07634-DLC, 136 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC) MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint by Defendant International Swaps and Derivatives Association.. Document filed by International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Reilly, Matthew) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint by Defendant International Swaps and Derivatives Association. Document filed by International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Reilly, Matthew) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael John Garvey on behalf of International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Garvey, Michael) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Pamela Jarvis dated March 5, 2014 re: Discontinuation of ECF Notices. Document filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Jarvis, Pamela) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Michael Posada dated 1/31/2014 re: Letter from Michael Posada requesting that the Court instruct the docket clerk to remove him as counsel of record for the defendants Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A. The law firm of Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP will continue to represent the defendants. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 2/5/2014) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/11/2014. Motions due by 3/14/2014. Responses due by 4/11/2014 Replies due by 5/2/2014. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/13/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(djc) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated 12/12/2013 re: Letter pursuant to Judge Cote's instructions at the December 5 initial conference. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent Quinn Emmanuel comes to believe that it needs to retain the services of additional counsel to prepare witnesses for depositions, to interview witnesses, or to research or brief legal or expert issues it may apply ex parte to the Court for permission to do so. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/13/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated December 12, 2013 re: Co-Lead Counsel and Proposed Case Management Order. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. It it hereby ORDERED that any objection to the attached Proposed Case Management Order is due by December 12, 2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/11/2013) (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(gr) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Robert F. Wise dated 12/6/13 re: Designation of Liaison Counsel. Document filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corporation, Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N. A., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corp..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Wise, Robert) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian Trevor Stoll on behalf of LBBW Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Stoll, Ian) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Lovell on behalf of LBBW Asset Management Investmentgesellschaft mbH. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Lovell, Christopher) Modified on 12/9/2013 (db). (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Frederick Holt on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Holt, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Y. Razi on behalf of International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, International Swaps & Derivatives Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Razi, Sara) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc for Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. Document filed by Royal Bank of Scotland PLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bial, Joseph) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Lawrence Goheen on behalf of International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, International Swaps & Derivatives Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Goheen, John) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent RFS Holdings B.V., Corporate Parent RBS Holdings N.V., Corporate Parent The Royal Bank of Scotland Group plc for Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland N.V.. Document filed by Royal Bank of Scotland N.V..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bial, Joseph) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alex Peter Middleton on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Middleton, Alex) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paula W. Render on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Render, Paula) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David P. Wales on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Wales, David) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for David C. Giardina to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9132370. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citigroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup, Inc., CitiGroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.,, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Giardina, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Royal Bank of Scotland PLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bial, Joseph) Modified on 12/3/2013 (lb). (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Royal Bank of Scotland N.V..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bial, Joseph) Modified on 12/3/2013 (lb). (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph J Bial on behalf of Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bial, Joseph) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy Wilkie Ray on behalf of Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Ray, Amy) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for David F. Graham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9132324. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Citigroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup, Inc., CitiGroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.,, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Graham, David) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Charles F. Rule to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9132330. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Rule, Charles) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc.. Document filed by International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Reilly, Matthew) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Opposition to Motion to Disqualify served on ISDA on 11/25/13. Document filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Jarvis, Pamela) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Global Market Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup, Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products Inc for Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.,; Corporate Parent Citicorp for Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A.; Corporate Parent Citigroup for CitiGroup, Inc., CitiGroup, Inc., Citigroup, Inc, Citigroup, Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Citigroup, Inc.. Document filed by Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup, Inc., CitiGroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.,, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup, Inc, CitiGroup Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Nagin, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply to New Arguments Made by the Scott-Korein-Robbins Group. Document filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, Salix Capital US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 REPLY OF QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN, LLP TO NEW ARGUMENTS MADE BY THE SCOTT-KOREIN-ROBBINS GROUP, # 2 Expert Declaration of Stephen R. Greene, # 3 Declaration of Daniel L. Brockett)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Gregory O. Tuttle in Opposition re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc.. Document filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 6, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 7, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 8, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 9, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 10, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 11, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 12, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 13, # 14 Exhibit Ex. 14, # 15 Exhibit Ex. 15, # 16 Exhibit Ex. 16, # 17 Exhibit Ex. 17, # 18 Exhibit Ex. 18, # 19 Exhibit Ex. 19, # 20 Exhibit Ex. 20, # 21 Exhibit Ex. 21, # 22 Exhibit Ex. 22, # 23 Exhibit Ex. 23, # 24 Exhibit Ex. 24, # 25 Exhibit Ex. 25, # 26 Exhibit Ex. 26, # 27 Exhibit Ex. 27, # 28 Exhibit Ex. 28, # 29 Exhibit Ex. 29, # 30 Exhibit Ex. 30, # 31 Exhibit Ex. 31, # 32 Exhibit Ex. 32, # 33 Exhibit Ex. 33, # 34 Exhibit Ex. 34, # 35 Exhibit Ex. 35, # 36 Exhibit Ex. 36, # 37 Exhibit Ex. 37, # 38 Exhibit Ex. 38, # 39 Exhibit Ex. 39, # 40 Exhibit Ex. 40, # 41 Exhibit Ex. 41, # 42 Exhibit Ex. 42, # 43 Exhibit Ex. 43, # 44 Exhibit Ex. 44, # 45 Exhibit Ex. 45, # 46 Exhibit Ex. 46)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Daniel Donovan in Opposition re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc.. Document filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of David M. Eskanos in Opposition re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc.. Document filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Steig D. Olson in Opposition re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc.. Document filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brockett in Opposition re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc.. Document filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Bruce A. Green in Opposition re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc.. Document filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Daniel P. Cunningham in Opposition re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc.. Document filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc.. Document filed by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eamon Paul Joyce on behalf of Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup, Inc., CitiGroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.,, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., CitiGroup Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Joyce, Eamon) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Paul Francis Novak to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9115462. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - State of Michigan, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Novak, Paul) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Scott M. Abeles to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9115098. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Markit Group Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Abeles, Scott) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra M. Lipsman on behalf of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Lipsman, Sandra) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pamela H. Jarvis on behalf of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Jarvis, Pamela) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory P. Joseph on behalf of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re: (42 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 92 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 49 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 82 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 55 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 63 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 56 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 179 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel The CDS Institutional Investor Group's Application for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel., (87 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 87 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC) JOINT MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Sheet Metal Worker Local No. 33 Cleveland District Pension Plan, State Universities Ret. Sys. of Illinois, MF Global Capital LLC, Unipension Plaintiffs to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Sheet Metal Worker Local No. 33 Cleveland District Pension Plan, State Universities Ret. Sys. of Illinois, MF Global Capital LLC, Unipension Plaintiffs to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Sheet Metal Worker Local No. 33 Cleveland District Pension Plan, State Universities Ret. Sys. of Illinois, MF Global Capital LLC, Unipension Plaintiffs to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., (85 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application for Appointment of Interim Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Bruce Simon in Opposition. Document filed by Los Angeles County Retirement Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Simon, Bruce) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion for Appointment of Lead Counsel and Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Los Angeles County Retirement Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Simon, Bruce) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 1:13-cv-06116-DLC(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: (80 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 52 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 46 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 176 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 59 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 53 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 39 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 79 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP Interim Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Reilly, Matthew) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Markit Group Ltd..(Kusinitz, Alan) Modified on 11/26/2013 (lb). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Markit Group Ltd..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Kusinitz, Alan) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Peter Shaub on behalf of Markit Group Ltd., Markit Group Ltd., Markit Group, Ltd, Markit Group, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Shaub, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Colin Ryle Kass on behalf of Markit Group Ltd., Markit Group Ltd., Markit Group, Ltd, Markit Group, Ltd.. New Address: Proskauer Rose LLP, 1001 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W., Washington, D.C., 20004, 202-416-6800. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Kass, Colin) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reena Gambhir to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of good standing., # 2 Exhibit B-Certificate of good standing., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Butterfield, William) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Colin R. Kass to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9111148. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Markit Group Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-DC, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing-IL, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kass, Colin) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Michael David Hausfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of good standing., # 2 Exhibit B-Certificate of good standing., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Butterfield, William) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for William Peter Butterfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of good standing., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Butterfield, William) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Reena Gambhir to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9110861. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of good standing., # 2 Exhibit B-certificate of good standing., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Butterfield, William) Modified on 11/22/2013 (bcu). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael David Hausfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9110822. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of good standing., # 2 Exhibit B-Certificate of good standing., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Butterfield, William) Modified on 11/22/2013 (bcu). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for William Peter Butterfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9110714. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certificate of good standing., # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Butterfield, William) Modified on 11/22/2013 (bcu). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan R. Kusinitz on behalf of Markit Group Ltd., Markit Group Ltd., Markit Group, Ltd, Markit Group, Ltd.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Kusinitz, Alan) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Robert Nagin on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Nagin, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. The obligations to confer on subjects to be considered at the Rule 16 conference, as described in an Order of October 18, 2013 issues in VALUE RECOVERING FUND LLC, et al., v. JPMORGAN CHASE & CO, et al., 13 Civ. 4928 (DLC), are stayed for all actions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a schedule for filing and responding to any consolidated complaint will be determined at the December 5 conference. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/19/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Merrill G. Davidoff and K. Craig Wildfang dated 11/19/2013 re: We write with the consent of all parties regarding the December 5 Initial Pretrial Conference and certain other scheduling matters.. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel shall comply with this district's ECF rules regarding letters. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/19/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(gr) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate UBS Americas Inc. for UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG, UBS AG; Corporate Parent UBS AG, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc. for UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities, LLC, UBS Securities, LLC, UBS Securities, LLC. Document filed by UBS AG, UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities, LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bohan, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Bohan on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bohan, David) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Joseph Calder on behalf of UBS AG, UBS Securities L.L.C., UBS Securities LLC, UBS Securities, LLC, UBS Securities LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Calder, James) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse AG.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Robertson, John) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: ORDERED that counsel for all parties for cases in this MDL action pending in this Court as of December 5, 2013, shall attend the Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for December 5, 2013 at 2 P.M. in Courtroom 15B at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007.(Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote). (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/15/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(djc) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Abram J. Ellis in Support of Motion to Disqualify Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan LLP as Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc. in Support re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc.. Document filed by International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Ellis, Abram) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Katherine Tew Darras in Support of Motion to Disqualify Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan LLP as Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc. in Support re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc.. Document filed by International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Reilly, Matthew) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (131 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 194 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 64 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 98 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 54 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 78 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 70 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Disqualify Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan LLP as Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc. Document filed by International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Reilly, Matthew) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff Salix Capital US Inc. Document filed by International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Reilly, Matthew) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse AG. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Robertson, John) Modified on 11/18/2013 (lb). (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc for HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Bank, PLC, HSBC Bank, PLC, HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Holdings plc. Document filed by HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Bank, PLC, HSBC Holdings plc, HSBC Bank USA, N.A..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holding plc for HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Bank, PLC, HSBC Holdings plc. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Bank, PLC, HSBC Holdings plc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Miller, Britt) Modified on 11/18/2013 (lb). (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Greene, Peter) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank AG.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Stephens, Eric) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent HSBC Holdings plc for HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Bank, PLC, HSBC Holdings plc. Document filed by HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Bank, PLC, HSBC Holdings plc.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Miller, Britt) Modified on 11/14/2013 (lb). (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc., International Swaps & Derivatives Association.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Reilly, Matthew) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Pepperman, Richard) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JP Morgan & Chase Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Greene, Peter) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. for Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC., Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC. Document filed by Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Slifkin, Daniel) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman, Sachs & Co.. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co., Goldman, Sachs & Co., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., The Goldman Sachs Group Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Pepperman, Richard) Modified on 11/12/2013 (lb). (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Bershteyn on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Bershteyn, Boris) (Entered: 11/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated November 8, 2013 re: Lead counsel applications. ENDORSEMENT: Any motion to disqualify Quinn Emanuel in any of these actions must be filed by 11/15; opposition is due 11/25; reply is due 11/27. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/9/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(abl) (Entered: 11/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (42 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 63 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 56 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 179 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 92 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 49 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 82 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 55 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel The CDS Institutional Investor Group's Application for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Value Recovery Fund LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Entwistle, Andrew) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Counsel The CDS Institutional Investor Group's Application for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of Entwistle & Cappucci LLP and Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Delta Institutional, LP, Delta Offshore, Ltd., Delta Onshore, LP, Delta Pleiades, LP, Value Recovery Fund LLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Entwistle, Andrew) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brockett in Support re: (46 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 59 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 39 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 79 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC, 80 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 52 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 176 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 53 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP Interim Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (80 in 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 52 in 1:13-cv-07640-DLC, 46 in 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 176 in 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 59 in 1:13-cv-07752-DLC, 53 in 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 39 in 1:13-cv-07647-DLC, 79 in 1:13-cv-07465-DLC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP Interim Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel Notice of Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP Interim Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate BANA Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N. A., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America, N.A.. Document filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N. A., Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corp..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Wise, Robert) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett dated November 8, 2013 re: November 7, 2013 Letter from Counsel for Defendant ISDA. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 1:13-cv-06116-DLC(Brockett, Daniel) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: On November 1, 2013, the class action LBBW ASSET MANAGEMENT INVESTMENTGELLSCHAFT MBH v. CITIBANK, N.A., et al., 13 Civ. 7752, which had been conditionally transferred to this Court by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, was officially transferred to be added to the above captioned Multidistrict Litigation (MDL) action. And on November 5, 2013, the class action LOS ANGELES COUNTY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION v. JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., et al., 13 Civ. 7634, was reassigned to this Court to be added to this MDL. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties for cases in this MDL action pending in this Court as of December 5, 2013, shall attend the Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for December 5, 2013 at 2 P.M. in Courtroom 15B at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any application for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel is due by November 8, 2013. Any opposition is due by November 22, 2013. Initial Conference set for 12/5/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/6/2013) (gr) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Seth C. Farber on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Farber, Seth) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Elizabeth P. Papez to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9048754. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - DC, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - NV, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Papez, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Robert Y. Sperling to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9048686. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Goldman, Sachs & Co., The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - IL, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Sperling, Robert) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Orth Ware on behalf of HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Bank, PLC, HSBC Holdings plc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Ware, Michael) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Spehr on behalf of HSBC Bank USA N.A., HSBC Bank, PLC, HSBC Holdings plc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Spehr, Richard) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vanessa Allen Lavely on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Lavely, Vanessa) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael A Paskin on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Paskin, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Slifkin on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Slifkin, Daniel) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evan R Chesler on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co., LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Chesler, Evan) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew S. Marovitz on behalf of HSBC Holdings plc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Marovitz, Andrew) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Britt Marie Miller on behalf of HSBC Holdings plc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Miller, Britt) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter S. Julian on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Julian, Peter) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Joseph Fitzgerald on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Fitzgerald, Patrick) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Edward Greene on behalf of JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Greene, Peter) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by M Elaine Johnston on behalf of Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Bank PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Johnston, M) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance. Document filed by Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Bank, PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Kriss, Bethany) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Bank, PLC. Document filed by Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Bank PLC.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Fishman, Todd) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Todd Steven Fishman on behalf of Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Bank PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Fishman, Todd) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Svetkey Feldberg on behalf of Barclays Bank plc, Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Bank PLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Feldberg, Michael) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tracy V. Schaffer on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Schaffer, Tracy) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Peter Stephens on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Stephens, Eric) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Counsel for all parties for cases pending in this Court as of December 5, 2013, shall attend the Initial Conference set for 12/5/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any application for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel is due 11/8/2013. Any opposition is due by 11/22/2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/29/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Robert Robertson on behalf of Credit Suisse AG. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Robertson, John) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David C. Giardina on behalf of Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Giardina, David) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David F. Graham on behalf of Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC et al.(Graham, David) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abram Jeremy Ellis on behalf of International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 1:13-cv-07465-DLC(Ellis, Abram) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin James Arquit on behalf of International Swaps and Derivatives Association, The International Swaps and Derivatives Association, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 1:13-cv-07465-DLC(Arquit, Kevin) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Robert G. Posada on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 1:13-cv-07465-DLC(Posada, Michael) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Todd Adler on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 1:13-cv-07465-DLC(Adler, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Frank Wise, Jr on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 1:13-cv-07465-DLC(Wise, Robert) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur J. Burke on behalf of Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:13-md-02476-DLC, 1:13-cv-04928-DLC, 1:13-cv-06116-DLC, 1:13-cv-07450-DLC, 1:13-cv-07465-DLC(Burke, Arthur) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: On October 16, 2013, the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (MDL Panel) issued a Transfer Order which provided that the above captioned class actions would be centralized in this Court. On October 18, 2013, the Clerk of the MDL Panel issued on behalf of the MDL Panel a Conditional Transfer Order that would centralize three other class actions currently pending in the Northern District of Illinois in this Court, following a waiting period of 7 days, and assuming no objections, per MDL Panel rules. Those actions are (with current Northern District of Illinois Docket Numbers): LBBW ASSET MANAGEMENT INVESTMENTGESELLSCHAFT MBH v. CITIBANK, N.A, et al., 13 Civ. 5413, MF GLOBAL CAPITAL LLC v. BANK OF AMERICA CO., et al., 13 Civ. 5417, and ESSEX REGIONAL RETIREMENT SYSTEM v. BANK OF AMERICA CO. et al., 13 Civ. 5725. Additionally, the Court has ordered the Clerk of Court of the Southern District of New York to add SALIX CAPITAL US INC. v. BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION et al., 13 Civ. 6116, currently pending in the Southern District of New York, to this multidistrict litigation action. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties for cases pending in this Court as of December 5, 2013, shall attend the Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for December 5, 2013 at 2 P.M. in Courtroom 15B at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any application for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel is due by November 8, 2013. Any opposition is due by November 22, 2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/24/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that the Clerk shall add SALIX CAPITAL US INC. v. BANK OF AMERICA CO. ET AL., 13 Civ. 6116, to this multidistrict litigation case entitled IN RE CREDIT DEFAULT SWAPS ANTITRUST LITIGATION, 13 MD 2476. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/23/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference and Individual Civil Practices of the Honorable Denise L. Cote served on Counsel for Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank plc, BNP Paribas, Citigroup, Inc., Citibank, N.A., Deutsche Bank AG, Goldman Sachs & Co., HSBC Bank plc and HSBC Bank USA, N.A., JP Morgan Chase & Co., JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Royal Bank of Scotland plc, UBS AG, International Swaps and Derivatives Association, and Markit Group Ltd. on October 22, 2013. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Olson, Steig) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against BNP Paribas S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Citigroup, Inc, Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, International Swaps and Derivatives Association, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Markit Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC., Morgan Stanley Bank N.A., Royal Bank of Scotland N.V., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, UBS Securities LLC. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint Part 2, # 2 Amended Complaint Part 3)(rsh) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 12/5/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. [Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.] (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/18/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Daniel L. Brockett & Andrew J. Entwistle dated 10/17/2013 re: JPML Transfer Order. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc..(Olson, Steig) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT. Plaintiffs' Joint Status Report Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Olson, Steig) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION SETTING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT....IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED: 1. The undersigned counsel accept service of the 8/29/13, Complaint in the Salix case on behalf of their respective clients, expressly reserving the right to contest whether any party in the Complaint is properly named, and without waiver of any defenses, including those related to personal jurisdiction and venue. 2. Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint in the Salix case is hereby suspended while proceedings before the JPML relating to the consolidation of the foregoing cases (And any Related Actions) are pending, provided that: (i) upon resolution of the JPML consolidation proceedings, the parties shall confer in good faith regarding a schedule for filing an responding to any consolidated complaint that is ultimately filed in the court designated by the JPML, with the filing to be not less than 45 days following such resolution by the JPML and any ensuing motion to dismiss such consolidated complaint being briefed pursuant to a 60-60-30 day schedule; and (ii) if defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to a complaint any any Related Action or other pending action is not similarly suspended pending the JPML proceedings, the suspension set forth herein shall end and the parties shall meet and confer in good faith concerning the schedule in this action, with the defendants preserving all rights to seek from the Court an order suspending the time for any response pending resolution of the JPML proceedings.So Ordered. (signature on page 4 of the Stipulation) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/27/2013) (gr) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of Stipulation Setting Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.. (Brockett, Daniel) Modified on 9/25/2013 (db). (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (jd) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against BNP Paribas S.A., Bank Of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup, Inc, Credit Suisse Group AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Goldman, Sachs & Co., HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, International Swaps and Derivatives Association, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co, J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Markit Group Ltd., Morgan Stanley Bank N.A., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401075677)Document filed by Salix Capital US Inc.(jd) (Main Document 1 replaced on 9/6/2013) (laq). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2013: # 1 part 2, # 2 part 3, # 3 part 4, # 4 part 5) (laq). (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 444 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?