Robicheaux v. Caldwell

Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-05090
District Judge Martin L.C. Feldman, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Martin L.C. Feldman
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 11:18 PM EST (6.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jonathan P. Robicheaux, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Entity H

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott J. Spivey +1 504 684 4904 +1 888 502 3935 scott@spiveyesq.com
v.
No Logo James D. Caldwell, Defendant

Represented by 1629 K Street, NW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stuart Kyle Duncan +1 202 714 9492 kduncan@duncanpllc.com

Represented by Louisiana Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as the Louisiana Attorney General

also known asBuddy Caldwell Jessica Marie Field Thornhill +1 225 326 6038 thornhillj@ag.state.la.us
Space Jessica Marie Field Thornhill +1 225 326 6038 thornhillj@ag.state.la.us
Space Angelique Duhon Freel +1 225 326 6029 freela@ag.state.la.us
in his official capacity as the Louisiana Attorney General

also known asBuddy Caldwell David Glen Sanders +1 225 326 6300 +1 225 326 6192 sandersd@ag.state.la.us

Represented by Meeks & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as the Louisiana Attorney General

also known asBuddy Caldwell Phyllis Esther Glazer +1 504 355 0020 +1 504 355 0024 pglazer@meekslawllc.com
Other Parties
No Logo Alan J Hawkins, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Perry, Atkinson, Balhoff, Mengis & Burns, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel R. Atkinson, Jr. +1 225 767 7730 atkinson@pabmb.com
No Logo Allen J. Hawkins, Jr., Amicus Curiae
No Logo American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Louisiana, Amicus Curiae

Represented by ACLU Foundation of Louisiana

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Paul Harrison +1 504 522 0628 jharrison@laaclu.org

Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of LA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Candice C. Sirmon +1 504 522 0628 csirmon@laaclu.org
No Logo American Military Partner Association, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Byron R. Johnson, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Catherine R. Pakaluk, Amicus Curiae
No Logo David J. Eggebeen, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Donaldson Adoption Institute, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur L. Stewart +1 318 387 1981 arthur@stewartlawllc.com
No Logo Douglas W. Allen, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Helen M. Alvare, Amicus Curiae

Represented by King Horsley & Lyons LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Bennett Wells +1 985 641 1855 +1 985 649 1536 JohnLawEsq@msn.com
No Logo Jason S. Carroll, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Perry, Atkinson, Balhoff, Mengis & Burns, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel R. Atkinson, Jr. +1 225 767 7730 atkinson@pabmb.com
No Logo John Randall Trahan, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Lukinovich Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Scott LaCour +1 504 818 0401 +1 504 818 0408 greg@lukinovichlaw.com
Space Amanda M. Pendleton +1 225 241 6789 amanda@lukinovichlaw.com
No Logo Joseph Price, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Katherine Shaw Spaht, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Represented by ACLU Foundation of Louisiana

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Justin Paul Harrison +1 504 522 0628 jharrison@laaclu.org
No Logo Mark D. Regnerus, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Felix J. Sternfels, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Felix J. Sternfels +1 985 369 1608

Represented by Koch & Schmidt, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space F. Evans Schmidt +1 504 208 9040 feschmidt@kochschmidt.com
No Logo Marriage Law Foundation, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ben E. Clayton +1 985 863 3065 benclayt@bellsouth.net
No Logo National Center for Lesbian Rights, Amicus Curiae
No Logo New Orleans City, Amicus Curiae

Represented by City Attorney's Office (New Orleans)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharonda R. Williams +1 504 658 9920 shrwilliams@nola.gov
No Logo Outserve-sldn Inc., Amicus Curiae

Represented by Delaney & Robb, Attorneys at Law, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ryan P. Delaney +1 504 267 9700 ryan@delaneyandrobb.com
No Logo Robert P. George, Amicus Curiae

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Warren L. Montgomery +1 985 893 6585 warrenmontgomery@bellsouth.net
No Logo Ryan T. Anderson, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Sherif Girgis, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Andrew S. Bond, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Courtney Blanchard, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Derek Penton, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Consol Plaintiff

Represented by Stone Pigman Walther Wittman LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maurine Wall +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0982 mwall@stonepigman.com

Represented by Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann & Hutchinson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Dalton Courson +1 504 581 3200 dcourson@stonepigman.com
Space Lesli D. Harris +1 504 581 3200 lharris@stonepigman.com
Space John M. Landis +1 504 581 3200 +1 504 596 0819 jlandis@stonepigman.com
Space Brooke C. Tigchelaar +1 504 593 0862 btigchelaar@stonepigman.com
No Logo Garth Beauregard, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by John D. Sileo, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(14-0097) John D. Sileo +1 504 486 4343 +1 504 297 1249 jack@johnsileolaw.com
No Logo Henry Lambert, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Jacqueline M. Brettner, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Jonathan P. Robicheaux, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo L Havard Scott, III, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo M. Lauren Brettner, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Nadine Blanchard, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Nicholas J. Van Sickels, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo R. Carey Bond, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Welles, Consol Plaintiff

Represented by John D. Sileo, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
(14-0097) John D. Sileo +1 504 486 4343 +1 504 297 1249 jack@johnsileolaw.com
No Logo Sergio March Prieto, Consol Plaintiff
No Logo Devin George, Consol Defendant

Represented by Louisiana Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Louisiana State Registrar (14-0327) David Glen Sanders +1 225 326 6300 +1 225 326 6192 sandersd@ag.state.la.us

Represented by Meeks & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Louisiana State Registrar (14-0327) Phyllis Esther Glazer +1 504 355 0020 +1 504 355 0024 pglazer@meekslawllc.com
No Logo Kathy Kliebert, Consol Defendant

Represented by Louisiana Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in her official capacity as the Louisiana Secretary of Health  and Hospitals (14-0097) David Glen Sanders +1 225 326 6300 +1 225 326 6192 sandersd@ag.state.la.us

Represented by Meeks & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in her official capacity as the Louisiana Secretary of Health  and Hospitals (14-0097) Phyllis Esther Glazer +1 504 355 0020 +1 504 355 0024 pglazer@meekslawllc.com
No Logo Tim Barfield, Consol Defendant

Represented by Louisiana Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue (14-0327) David Glen Sanders +1 225 326 6300 +1 225 326 6192 sandersd@ag.state.la.us

Represented by Meeks & Associates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue (14-0327) Phyllis Esther Glazer +1 504 355 0020 +1 504 355 0024 pglazer@meekslawllc.com
Attributes
Citation Unknown
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Timeline
  Entries (172) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 166 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Settlement Conference held on 10/8/2015. As a result of ongoing negotiations among the Court and the parties, a settlement agreement was reached with respect to all claims for attorneys fees and costs in this matter. (NEF: Judge Feldman's Chambers) (Reference: All Cases)(bwn) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Settlement Conference held on 9/29/2015. (Reference: All Cases)(bwn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Set Hearings
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE for 9/29/2015 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael North. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 8/10/2015.(Reference: All Cases)(bwn) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs Taxed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
Bill of Costs Taxed in amount of $620.00. Signed by Clerk (Reference: 13-5090, 14-97)(cml) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Bill of Costs Taxed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
Bill of Costs Taxed in amount of $960.23. Signed by Clerk (Reference: 14-327)(cml) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
Bill of Costs Taxed in amount of $620.00. Signed by Clerk (Reference: 13-5090, 14-97, 14-327,)(cms)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: 8/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
Bill of Costs Taxed in amount of $960.23. Signed by Clerk (Reference: 13-5090, 14-97, 14-327)(cms)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael North: Status Conference held on 7/29/2015. In light of the parties efforts to amicably resolve the attorneys fee issue, the deadline of August 17, 2015 within which Plaintiffs were to file their fee applications is continued without date. (Reference: All Cases)(bwn) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 154 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney John D. Sileo for Garth Beauregard & Robert Welles. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/29/2015. (Reference: 13-5090, 14-0097)(caa)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 155 Response/Reply. 1) Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is " Exparte/Consent Motion for Leave to File". 2) However,a Motion for Leave of Court is not required to file this Response. Filing attorney should have filed the Response into the Record. 3) Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action and filed the Response into the Record as Rec Doc.156. No further action required. (Reference: 13-5090)(cml) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
Reply Memorandum in Support by Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Sergio March Prieto, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels to 149 Bill of Costs (before Clerk), (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(cml)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
**ERROR: DOCUMENT DOES NOT REQUIRE LEAVE OF COURT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Response/Reply by Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Sergio March Prieto, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels to 152 Response/Reply, 149 Bill of Costs (before Clerk), (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of J. Dalton Courson, # 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Bill of Costs(Reference: 14-327)(Wall, Maurine) Modified on 7/29/2015 (cml). Modified on 7/29/2015 (cml).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Garth Beauregard, Robert Welles. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 13-05090)(Spivey, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
Response/Reply by Garth Beauregard, Robert Welles to 152 Response/Reply, 151 Memorandum, 150 Bill of Costs (before Clerk), (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit IRS FOIA Guidelines)(Reference: 14-cv-0097)(Spivey, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
Response/Reply by Tim Barfield(in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue (14-0327)), James D. Caldwell, Devin George(in his official capacity as the State Registrar and Center Director of Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals (14-0097)), Kathy Kliebert to 149 Bill of Costs (before Clerk), 150 Bill of Costs (before Clerk), (Reference: All Cases)(Glazer, Phyllis)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
Memorandum by Garth Beauregard, Robert Welles re 150 Bill of Costs (before Clerk), (Reference: 14-cv-0097)(Spivey, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
BILL OF COSTS by Garth Beauregard, Robert Welles. Matter to be submitted on 07/30/2015 before Clerk of Court. Any opposition should be filed within 14 days of the filing of this document. (Reference: 13-5090)(Spivey, Scott) Modified submission date on 7/20/2015 (cml).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
BILL OF COSTS by Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Sergio March Prieto, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels. Matter to be submitted on 7/30/2015 at 7/30/2015 before Clerk of Court. Any opposition should be filed within 14 days of the filing of this document. (Attachments: # 1 Documentation for Bill of Costs)(Reference: 14-327)(Wall, Maurine)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 147 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Set Quantum for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Related Nontaxable Expenses. Plaintiffs are granted a thirty (30) day extension until Monday, August 17, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North. (Reference: All Cases)(bwn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Set Quantum for Reasonable Attorneys' Fees and Related Nontaxable Expenses by Garth Beauregard, Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Derek Penton, Sergio March Prieto, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels, Robert Welles. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Courson, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 145 Motion to Appear for Attorneys David Glen Sanders & Phyllis Esther Glazer for Tim Barfield, James D. Caldwell, Devin George & Kathy Kliebert. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/7/2015. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record by Tim Barfield(in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue (14-0327)), James D. Caldwell, Devin George(in his official capacity as the State Registrar and Center Director of Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals (14-0097)), Kathy Kliebert. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: All Cases)Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer added to party Tim Barfield(pty:condft), Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer added to party James D. Caldwell(pty:dft), Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer added to party Devin George(pty:condft), Attorney Phyllis Esther Glazer added to party Kathy Kliebert(pty:condft).(Glazer, Phyllis)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
USCA JUDGMENT issued as mandate on 7/1/2015. It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court is REVERESED, and the cause is REMANDED to the District Court for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this Court. FURTHER ORDERED that appellees pay to appellants the costson appeal to be taxed by the Clerk of this Court. USCA judge name: HIGGINBOTHAM, SMITH, and GRAVES. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion, # 2 Transmittal Letter)(Reference: All Cases)(cml)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE re The issue of the quantum of costs, expenses, and reasonable attorneys fees due to the Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North.(Reference: All Cases)(bwn)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 142 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Andrew S. Bond, Courtney Blanchard, Derek Penton, Garth Beauregard, Henry Lambert, Jacqueline M. Brettner, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, Katherine Shaw Spaht, L Havard Scott, III, M. Lauren Brettner, Nadine Blanchard, Nicholas J. Van Sickels, R. Carey Bond, Robert Welles and Sergio March Prieto and against Devin George, James D. Caldwell, Kathy Kliebert and Tim Barfield, as stated herein. FURTHER ORDERED that this Court's Order and Reasons and the accompanying Judgment dated 9/3/2014, are hereby recalled and rescinded. ORDERED that Plaintiffs in each of these consolidated cases are awarded their costs, expenses, and reasonable attorneys' fees according to 42 U.S.C. 1988 and any other applicable laws. The question of quantum is referred to the magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/2/2015.(Reference: ALL CASES) (NEF: MAG-5) (caa)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Letter regarding Writ of Certiorari
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
Letter from U.S. Supreme Court denying Writ of Certiorari (Reference: 13-5090, 14-327, 14-97)(cml) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
APPEAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on March 14, 2014 before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504 589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2014. (Reference: 13-5090)(brd)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Unknown Document Type
APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux for proceedings held on 3/14/14, 6/25/14 re 134 Notice of Appeal,. (Transcript(s) ordered) (Court Reporter Toni Tusa noticed) (Reference: 14-0097)(Perque, Richard)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Unknown Document Type
APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by All Plaintiffs for proceedings held on 3/14/14, 6/25/14 re 135 Notice of Appeal,. (Transcript(s) ordered) (Court Reporter Toni Tusa noticed) (Reference: 13-5090)(Perque, Richard)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Sergio March Prieto, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels for proceedings held on 03/14/14 & 06/25/14 re 133 Notice of Appeal,. (Transcript(s) ordered) (Court Reporter Toni Tusa noticed) (Reference: 14-327)(Courson, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Garth Beauregard, Robert Welles as to 132 Judgment, 131 Order & Reasons. (Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 053L-4580870.) (Reference: 14-cv-00097)(Spivey, Scott)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Courtney Blanchard, Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, Jonathan P. Robicheaux as to 132 Judgment, 131 Order & Reasons. (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) (Reference: 13-5090)(Perque, Richard)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Courtney Blanchard, Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, Jonathan P. Robicheaux as to 132 Judgment, 131 Order & Reasons. (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) (Reference: 14-0097)(Perque, Richard)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/4/2014 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Sergio March Prieto, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels as to 132 Judgment, 131 Order & Reasons. (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) (Reference: 14-327)(Harris, Lesli)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: 9/3/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Devin George, James D. Caldwell, Kathy Kliebert, Tim Barfield and against Andrew S. Bond, Courtney Blanchard, Derek Penton, Garth Beauregard, Henry Lambert, Jacqueline M. Brettner, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III, M. Lauren Brettner, Nadine Blanchard, Nicholas J. Van Sickels, R. Carey Bond, Robert Welles, Sergio March Prieto. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/3/2014.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: 9/3/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER & REASONS granting 84 Motion for Summary Judgment & denying 86 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment & 117 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/3/2014. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Tim Barfield, Devin George, Kathy Kliebert . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Authority)(Reference: 14-97, 14-327)(Duncan, Stuart)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on June 25, 2014 before Judge Martin L. C. Feldman. Court Reporter/Recorder Toni Tusa, Telephone number 504-589-7778. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 21 days from the filing of this transcript to file with the Court a Redaction Request. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2014. (Reference: All Cases)(rsg)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 127 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Justin Paul Harrison terminated. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/31/2014. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Unknown Document Type
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Candice C. Sirmon to be substituted in place of Justin P. Harrison by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Louisiana. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-00097)Attorney Candice C. Sirmon added to party American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Louisiana(pty:am).(Sirmon, Candice)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: 7/28/2014 Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Garth Beauregard, Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Derek Penton, Sergio March Prieto, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels, Robert Welles re 117 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 86 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Supplemental Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Bostic v. Schaefer))(Reference: ALL CASES)(Courson, James)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 118 Request/Statement of Oral Argument filed by Robert Welles & Garth Beauregard. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/21/2014.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting without prejudice, 119 Motion to Dismiss the claim for violation of Full Faith and Credit Clause of the United States Constitution. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/17/2014. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
Supplemental Memorandum filed by Garth Beauregard, Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Derek Penton, Sergio March Prieto, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels, Robert Welles, in support of 117 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , 86 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Tables of Contents and Authorities, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Courson, James) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 116 First MOTION for Summary Judgment . Filing attorney erroneously filed incomplete document and will be noted as such. Document was correctly refiled as Rec. Doc. 117. No further action required. (cml) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Tim Barfield(in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue (14-0327)), Devin George(in his official capacity as the State Registrar and Center Director of Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals (14-0097)), Kathy Kliebert re 117 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts Response to Statement of Material Facts)(Reference: 14-97)(Duncan, Stuart) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
Supplemental Memorandum filed by Tim Barfield(in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue (14-0327)), Devin George(in his official capacity as the State Registrar and Center Director of Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals (14-0097)), Kathy Kliebert, in Support of 84 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tables of Contents and Authorities)(Reference: 14-97, 14-327)(Duncan, Stuart) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Dismiss Full Faith and Credit Claim by Courtney Blanchard, Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, Jonathan P. Robicheaux. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 13-5090, 14-0327, 14-0097)(Perque, Richard) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Garth Beauregard, Robert Welles regarding 117 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Reference: 14-cv-00097)(Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Garth Beauregard, Robert Welles. Motion set for 8/13/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 3 Exhibit Garth Beauregard Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit Robert Welles Affidavit, # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-cv-00097)(Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
**ERROR: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT - REFILED AS REC DOC. 117** First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Garth Beauregard, Robert Welles. Motion set for 8/13/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-cv-00097)(Spivey, Scott) Modified on 7/16/2014 (cml). (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Courtney Blanchard, Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Derek Penton, Derek Penton, Sergio March Prieto, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels of Supplemental Authority in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Reference: 13-5090; 14-327)(Harris, Lesli) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER directed both sides to submit additional briefing within 21 days, addressing the remaining outstanding issues. The plaintiffs and defendants will each have 25 pages for their respective briefs, which will be due no later than Wednesday, 7/16/2014. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/26/2014.(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman: Motion Hearing held on 6/25/2014 re 84 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kathy Kliebert, Devin George & Tim Barfield & 86 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Andrew S. Bond, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., L Havard Scott, III, Jacqueline M. Brettner, Nicholas J. Van Sickels, Henry Lambert, M. Lauren Brettner, Nadine Blanchard, Courtney Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, Sergio March Prieto & R. Carey Bond. (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Tim Barfield (14-0327), Devin George (14-0097), Kathy Kliebert . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Authority)(Reference: 14-97, 14-327)(Duncan, Stuart) Modified text on 6/25/2014 (cml). (Entered: 06/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 109 Motion to Appear for Attorney J. Michael Johnson for Tim Barfield, Devin George & Kathy Kliebert. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/11/2014. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 109 MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record. Filing attorney incorrectly selected filers in multiple party roles. When selecting a party with multiple party roles select only once. Multiple selections will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary at this time. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record J. Michael Johnson by Tim Barfield, James D. Caldwell, Devin George & Kathy Kliebert. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES) (Johnson, J.) Modified on 6/10/2014 (caa). (Entered: 06/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Tim Barfield, Devin George & Kathy Kliebert re 84 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents)(Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 103 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/4/2014. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Derek Penton, Sergio March Prieto, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III & Nicholas J. Van Sickels re 86 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 104 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 6/4/2014. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Derek Penton, Sergio March Prieto, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Courson, James) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Tim Barfield, Devin George, Kathy Kliebert. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Defendants' Reply Brief, # 3 Exhibit Defendants' Reply Brief Tables)(Reference: 14-97, 14-327)(Duncan, Stuart) Modified on 6/3/2014 (cml). (Entered: 06/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Tim Barfield(14-0327), Devin George(14-0097), Kathy Kliebert re 86 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tables of Contents and Authorities, # 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts)(Reference: 14-97, 14-327)(Duncan, Stuart) Modified text on 5/21/2014 (cml). (Entered: 05/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
**DEFICIENT** RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Tim Barfield(in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue (14-0327)), Devin George(in his official capacity as the State Registrar and Center Director of Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals (14-0097)), Kathy Kliebert re 86 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tables of Contents and Authorities)(Reference: 14-97, 14-327)(Duncan, Stuart) Modified on 5/20/2014 (cml). (Entered: 05/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Derek Penton, Sergio March Prieto, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels re 84 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents, # 2 Table of Authorities, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Courson, James) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Donaldson Adoption Institute (Reference: ALL CASES)Attorney Arthur L. Stewart added to party Arthur L. Stewart(pty:am).(Stewart, Arthur) Modified on 5/13/2014 (caa). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by New Orleans City (Reference: ALL CASES)Attorney Sharonda R. Williams added to party City of New Orleans(pty:am).(Williams, Sharonda) Modified on 5/13/2014 (caa). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by John Randall Trahan & Katherine Shaw Spaht (Reference: ALL CASES)Attorney Gregory Scott LaCour added to party John Randall Trahan(pty:selreq), Attorney Gregory Scott LaCour added to party Katherine Shaw Spaht(pty:selreq).(LaCour, Gregory) Modified on 5/13/2014 (caa). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Ryan T. Anderson, Robert P. George & Sherif Girgis. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Montgomery, Warren) Modified on 5/12/2014 (caa). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
**DUPLICATE FILING** Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Ryan T. Anderson, Sherif Girgis and Robert P. George. (Reference: ALL CASES)(Montgomery, Warren) Modified on 5/12/2014 (caa). Modified on 5/12/2014 (caa). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Alan J Hawkins & Jason S. Carroll (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit 1 -Table of Contents, # 2 Appendix Exhibit 2 - Table of Authorities)(Reference: ALL CASES)Attorney Daniel R. Atkinson, Jr added to party Alan J Hawkins(pty:am), Attorney Daniel R. Atkinson, Jr added to party Jason S Carol(pty:am).(Atkinson, Daniel) Modified on 5/13/2014 (caa). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Marriage Law Foundation (Reference: 13-5090, 14-00097)Attorney Ben E. Clayton added to party Marriage Law Foundation(pty:am).(Clayton, Ben) Modified on 5/12/2014 (caa). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Louisiana, Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc. & National Center for Lesbian Rights (Reference: ALL CASES)Attorney Justin Paul Harrison added to party American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Louisiana(pty:am), Attorney Justin Paul Harrison added to party Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.(pty:am), Attorney Justin Paul Harrison added to party National Center for Lesbian Rights(pty:am).(Harrison, Justin) Modified on 5/13/2014 (caa). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Mark D. Regnerus, Joseph Price, Catherine R. Pakaluk, Byron R. Johnson, Allen J. Hawkins, Jr, David J. Eggebeen, Douglas W. Allen (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Table of Authorities, # 2 Exhibit Tables of Contents)(Reference: 14-0097)Attorney F. Evans Schmidt added to party Mark D. Regnerus(pty:am), Attorney F. Evans Schmidt added to party Joseph Price (pty:am), Attorney F. Evans Schmidt added to party Catherine R. Pakaluk(pty:am), Attorney F. Evans Schmidt added to party Byron R. Johnson(pty:am), Attorney F. Evans Schmidt added to party Allen J. Hawkins, Jr(pty:am), Attorney F. Evans Schmidt added to party David J. Eggebeen(pty:am), Attorney F. Evans Schmidt added to party Douglas W. Allen(pty:am).(Schmidt, F.) Modified on 5/13/2014 (caa). (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 89 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is 'Amicus Curiae Appearance'. Clerk took corrective action by editing the text. In addition, Filing attorney incorrectly linked document to document 86 Motion. Clerk removed link. No further action required. (cml) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/10/2014, Entered: None
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Helen M. Alvare . (Reference: All)(Wells, John) Modified on 5/12/2014 (cml). (Entered: 05/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by American Military Partner Association and OutServe-SLDN Inc. (Attachments: # 2 Appendix Table of Contents, # 3 Appendix Table of Authorities)(Reference: ALL CASES)Attorney Ryan P. Delaney added to party Ryan P Delaney(pty:am).(Delaney, Ryan) (Main Document 88 replaced on 5/7/2014) (caa). Modified on 5/7/2014 (caa). Modified on 5/8/2014 (caa). (Entered: 05/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 82 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/21/2014. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 86 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Derek Penton, Sergio March Prieto, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels. Motion set for 6/25/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Table of Contents for Memorandum in Support, # 3 Table of Authorities for Memorandum in Support, # 4 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 5 Exhibit 1 - Robicheaux Decl., # 6 Exhibit 2 - Penton Decl., # 7 Exhibit 3 - C. Blanchard Decl., # 8 Exhibit 4 - N. Blanchard Decl., # 9 Exhibit 5 - Van Sickels Decl., # 10 Exhibit B to Exhibit 5 - birth certificate filed under seal, # 11 Exhibit 6 - A. Bond Decl., # 12 Exhibit B to Exhibit 6 - birth certificate filed under seal, # 13 Exhibit 7 - J. Brettner Decl., # 14 Exhibit B to Exhibit 7 - birth certificate filed under seal, # 15 Exhibit 8 - L. Brettner Decl., # 16 Exhibit B to Exhibit 8 - birth certificate filed under seal, # 17 Exhibit 9 - Lambert Decl., # 18 Exhibit 10 - C. Bond Decl., # 19 Exhibit 11 - Scott Decl., # 20 Exhibit 12 - March Prieto Decl., # 21 Exhibit 13 - Brady Decl., # 22 Exhibit 14 - Robb Decl., # 23 Exhibit 15 - Munster Decl., # 24 Exhibit 16 - Gates Decl., # 25 Exhibit 17 - McConnell Decl., # 26 Exhibit 18 - La. Rev. Info. Bulletin No. 13-024, # 27 Exhibit 19 - 2013 La. Individual Income Tax Return Instructions, # 28 Exhibit 20 - La. H.B. 12, # 29 Exhibit 21 - Henry v. Himes, # 30 Exhibit 22 - Baskin v. Bogan, # 31 Notice of Submission)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Courson, James) (Attachment 10 replaced on 4/22/2014) (caa). (Attachment 12 replaced on 4/22/2014) (caa). (Attachment 14 replaced on 4/22/2014) (caa). (Attachment 16 replaced on 4/22/2014) (caa). (Entered: 04/22/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 85 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
Manual Attachment Received (Sealed Docs) re 82 MOTION to Seal Document (Certain Exhibits to Declarations Submitted in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment). (Reference: All Cases)(cml) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by Tim Barfield(in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue (14-0327)), Devin George(in his official capacity as the State Registrar and Center Director of Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals (14-0097)), Kathy Kliebert. Motion set for 6/25/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix Table of Contents and Authorities, # 3 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 4 Affidavit Exhibit #1, # 5 Affidavit Exhibit #2, # 6 Affidavit Exhibit #3, # 7 Notice of Submission)(Reference: 14-97, 14-327)(Duncan, Stuart) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
DEFICIENT: MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by Tim Barfield(in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue (14-0327)), Devin George(in his official capacity as Louisiana State Registrar (14-0327)), Kathy Kliebert. Motion set for 6/25/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 3 Affidavit Exhibit #1, # 4 Affidavit Exhibit #2, # 5 Affidavit Exhibit #3)(Reference: 14-97, 14-327)(Duncan, Stuart) Modified on 4/18/2014 (bbc). (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None
**AWAITING DELIVERY OF SEALED DOCS TO CLERK'S OFFICE*** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Document (Certain Exhibits to Declarations Submitted in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Derek Penton, Sergio March Prieto, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Courson, James) Modified on 4/18/2014 (bbc). (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
DEFICIENT: MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Henry Lambert, Derek Penton, Sergio March Prieto, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels. Motion set for 6/25/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Robicheaux Decl., # 4 Exhibit 2 - Penton Decl., # 5 Exhibit 3 - C. Blanchard Decl., # 6 Exhibit 4 - N. Blanchard Decl., # 7 Exhibit 5 - Van Sickels Decl., # 8 Exhibit 6 - A. Bond Decl., # 9 Exhibit 7 - J. Brettner Decl., # 10 Exhibit 8 - L. Brettner Decl., # 11 Exhibit 9 - Lambert Decl., # 12 Exhibit 10 - C. Bond Decl., # 13 Exhibit 11 - Scott Decl., # 14 Exhibit 12 - March Prieto Decl., # 15 Exhibit 13 - Brady Decl., # 16 Exhibit 14 - Robb Decl., # 17 Exhibit 15 - Munster Decl., # 18 Exhibit 16 - Gates Decl., # 19 Exhibit 17 - McConnell Decl., # 20 Exhibit 18 - RIB No. 13-024, # 21 Exhibit 19 - Instructions, # 22 Exhibit 20 - La. HB 12, # 23 Exhibit 21 - Henry v. Himes, # 24 Exhibit 22 - Baskin v. Bogan, # 25 Notice of Submission)(Reference: ALL CASES)(Courson, James) Modified on 4/18/2014 (bbc). (Entered: 04/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
ANSWER to 63 Amended Complaint, by Tim Barfield, Devin George, Kathy Kliebert.(Reference: 14-97)(Duncan, Stuart) Modified on 4/15/2014 (cml). (Entered: 04/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 78 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Richard Gerard Perque for Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, & Jonathan P. Robicheaux. Attorney Scott J. Spivey terminated. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/8/2014. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard G. Perque to be substituted in place of Scott Spivey by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 13-5090, 14-0327, 14-0097)Attorney Richard Gerard Perque added to party Courtney Blanchard(pty:conpla), Attorney Richard Gerard Perque added to party Nadine Blanchard(pty:conpla), Attorney Richard Gerard Perque added to party Derek Penton(pty:conpla), Attorney Richard Gerard Perque added to party Jonathan P. Robicheaux(pty:conpla).(Perque, Richard) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
**DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order to Appear as Counsel)(Reference: 13-5090, 14-0327, 14-0097)Attorney Richard Gerard Perque added to party Courtney Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Gerard Perque added to party Nadine Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Gerard Perque added to party Derek Penton(pty:conpla), Attorney Richard Gerard Perque added to party Jonathan P. Robicheaux(pty:conpla).(Perque, Richard) Modified on 4/4/2014 (caa). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint by Tim Barfield(in his official capacity as the Louisiana Secretary of Revenue (14-0097)), Devin George(in his official capacity as Louisiana State Registrar (14-0327)).(Reference: 14-327)(Duncan, Stuart) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 73 Motion for Hearing and To Set Briefing and Argument Schedule. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/20/2014. (Reference: ALL CASES)(caa) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 73 MOTION for Hearing MOTION to Set Briefing and Argument Schedule. Filing attorney incorrectly selected filers in multiple party roles. When selecting a party with multiple party roles select only one. Multiple selections will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary at this time. (Reference: 14-0097 & 14-0327)(caa) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Hearing and MOTION To Set Briefing and Argument Schedule by Tim Barfield(in his official capacity as Secretary of the Louisiana Department of Revenue (14-0097)), Garth Beauregard, Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Andrew S. Bond, R. Carey Bond, Jacqueline M. Brettner, M. Lauren Brettner, James D. Caldwell, Forum for Equality Louisiana, Inc., Devin George(in his official capacity as the State Registrar and Center Director of Louisiana Department of Health and Hospitals (14-0097)), Kathy Kliebert, Henry Lambert, Derek Penton, Sergio March Prieto, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, L Havard Scott, III, Nicholas J. Van Sickels & Robert Welles. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-97, 14-327). (Duncan, Stuart) Modified on 3/20/2014 (caa). (Entered: 03/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that 14-0327 is consolidated with 13-5090. FURTHER ORDER that Case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Michael North for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/18/2014.(Reference: 14-0327)(caa) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman: Status Conference held on 3/14/2014. (Court Reporter Toni Tusa.) (Reference: 14-0097)(caa) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 68 Motion to Appear for Attorney Stuart Kyle Duncan for Tim Barfield, James D. Caldwell, Devin George & Kathy Kliebert. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/28/2014. (Reference: BOTH CASES)(caa, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 69 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Status Conference set for 3/14/2014 10:30 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman.(Reference: 14-0097)(caa, ) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear as Counsel of Record by Tim Barfield, James D. Caldwell, Devin George, Kathy Kliebert. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Appearance as Counsel)(Reference: 14-cv-0097)Attorney Stuart Kyle Duncan added to party Tim Barfield(pty:condft), Attorney Stuart Kyle Duncan added to party James D. Caldwell(pty:dft), Attorney Stuart Kyle Duncan added to party Devin George(pty:condft), Attorney Stuart Kyle Duncan added to party Kathy Kliebert(pty:condft).(Duncan, Stuart) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Tim Barfield on 2/13/2014, answer due 4/14/2014. (Reference: 14-cv-00097)(Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Devin George on 2/13/2014, answer due 4/14/2014; Kathy Kliebert on 2/13/2014, answer due 4/14/2014. (Reference: 14-cv-00097)(Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER of USCA as to 51 Notice of Appeal. The appeal is dismissed as of 2/5/2014 pursuant to appellant's motion. USCA Judge Name: Clerk of Court (Attachments: # 1 Transmittal Letter)(cml, ) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to Tim Barfield, Devin George & Kathy Kliebert. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Reference: 14-0097)(caa, ) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Tim Barfield, Devin George & Kathy Kliebert filed by Derek Penton, Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Jonathan P. Robicheaux, Robert Welles & Garth Beauregard.(Reference: 14-0097)Attorney Scott J. Spivey added to party Robert Welles(pty:conpla), Attorney Scott J. Spivey added to party Garth Beauregard(pty:conpla).(caa, ) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 61 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/7/2014. (Reference: 14-0097)(caa, ) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Add Plaintiffs by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Pleading, # 4 Summons)(Reference: 14-cv-00097)(Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 60 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 58 Motion to De-consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/27/2014. (Reference: BOTH CASES)(caa, ) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 58 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases - unconsolidate cases. Multiple documents were incorrectly filed as one PDF. The Memorandum in Support should have been filed as attachment to Motion. All future filings should be entered this way. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is necessary. (Reference: 14-0097)(caa, ) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Consolidate Cases - unconsolidate cases by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Reference: 14-cv-00097)(Spivey, Scott) (Main Document 58 replaced on 1/24/2014) (caa, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2014: # 2 Memorandum in Support) (caa, ). (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 55 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/23/2014. (Reference: 14-0097)(caa, ) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 55 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to 14-cv-0097. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took correctiveaction. (Reference: 14-97)(cml, ) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Leave to Amend/Correct Complaint in 14-cv-0097 by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading, # 3 Summons)(Ref Modified on 1/23/2014 (cml, ). (Entered: 01/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 54 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT entered in favor of James D. Caldwell against Courtney Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux and Nadine Blanchard. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/21/2014.(Reference: 13-5090)(caa, ) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
LREF
Blank 53 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that 14-0097 is consolidated with 13-5090. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman.(caa, ) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
APPEAL TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux for proceedings held on n/a re 51 Notice of Appeal. (Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux as to 49 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Leave to File. (In Forma Pauperis status granted) (Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
**ERROR: DOCUMENT REFILED CORRECTLY AS REC. DOC. 51** NOTICE OF APPEAL by All Plaintiffs as to 49 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion for Leave to File. (In Forma Pauperis status granted) (Spivey, Scott) Modified on 1/16/2014 (cml, ). (Entered: 01/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 49 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER & REASONS denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration & 37 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/13/2014. (caa, ) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
LREF
Blank 48 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by James D. Caldwell re 45 First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration, 35 First MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction ; . (Thornhill, Jessica) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
Supplemental Memorandum filed by All Plaintiffs, in support of 35 First MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (caa, ) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 46 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 45 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/2/2014. (caa, ) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion for Reconsideration by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading - Supplement Memorandum )(Spivey, Scott) Modified text on 1/2/2014 (cml, ). (Entered: 12/31/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 44 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Resetting Hearing on 37 MOTION for Leave to File third amended complaint, for 1/15/2014, to be decided by the Court on the papers together with plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/30/2013.(caa, ) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 41 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on 37 MOTION for Leave to File ; Motion reset for 1/8/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alma L. Chasez via telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alma L. Chasez.(lag, ) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 41 First MOTION to Expedite hearing on Motion to Amend. Filing attorney did not include a proposed order. Proposed Order subsequently provided to Clerk and has now been attached to the motion. (cml, ) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Expedite hearing on Motion to Amend by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux. Motion(s) referred to Alma L. Chasez. (Spivey, Scott) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2013: # 1 Proposed Order) (cml, ). (Entered: 12/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 40 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Setting Oral Argument on 37 MOTION for Leave to File : Motion set for 1/15/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alma L. Chasez via telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alma L. Chasez.(lag, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 37 MOTION for Leave to File. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the magistrate judge. In addition, Filing attorney selected incorrect judicial officer for submission/hearing. When setting a motion for submission/hearing there is a reminder message 'Be sure to select the correct Judge or Magistrate Judge:'. Motion(s) referred to Alma L. Chasez. Motion set for 1/15/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alma L. Chasez.Clerk took corrective action. (clm, ) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
Amendment/Supplement to Document by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux re 37 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 22 Amended Complaint with Third Amended Complaint supplemental memorandum (Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
First MOTION to Amend/Correct 22 Amended Complaint with Third Amended Complaint by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux. Motion set for 1/15/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Notice of Submission, # 5 Summons)(Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
**DEFICIENT** First MOTION to Amend/Correct 22 Amended Complaint with Third Amended Complaint by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux. Motion set for 1/15/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Notice of Submission, # 4 Summons)(Spivey, Scott) Modified on 12/3/2013 (clm, ). (Entered: 12/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
First MOTION for Reconsideration re 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss Case, Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction ; by Courtney Blanchard, Nadine Blanchard, Derek Penton, Jonathan P. Robicheaux. Motion set for 1/15/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 34 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 30 MOTION for Leave to File filed by James D. Caldwell. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/26/2013.(caa, ) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER & REASONS denying as moot 13 Motion to Dismiss or Transfer Case for improper venue and granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction based on sovereign immunity. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/26/2013. (caa, ) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
LREF
Blank 32 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 27 Request/Statement of Oral Argument filed by Nadine Blanchard, Courtney Blanchard, Derek Penton & Jonathan P. Robicheaux. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/27/2013.(caa, ) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 30 Response/Memorandum. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is 'Motion for Leave to File.' Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. (clm, ) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum filed by James D. Caldwell . (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading, # 2 Proposed Order)(Thornhill, Jessica) Modified on 11/26/2013 (clm, ). (Entered: 11/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Resetting Hearing on 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Louisiana for 11/27/2013, to be decided on the papers, unless otherwise ordered. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/13/2013.(caa, ) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 26 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Filing attorney attached a Request/Statement for Oral Argument to this motion instead of filing it as a separate entry. Clerk took corrective action by separating the request and docketing it as a separate entry. All future requests for oral argument must be filed separately. (clm, ) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (clm, ) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Attachments: # 1 Request for Oral Argument)(Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to James D. Caldwell on 11/5/2013, answer due 1/6/2014. (Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by James D. Caldwell. Motion set for 11/27/2013 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)(Thornhill, Jessica) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
Summons Issued as to James D. Caldwell. (caa, ) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against James D. Caldwell filed by Jonathan P. Robicheaux, Derek Penton, Nadine Blanchard & Courtney Blanchard.(caa, ) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 11/4/2013. (caa, ) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Document contains blank page. Filing attorney should remove any blank pages prior to filing future documents. No further action required. (clm, ) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jonathan P. Robicheaux. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Summons)(Spivey, Scott) Modified on 11/4/2013 (clm, ). (Entered: 11/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM filed by James D. Caldwell re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Louisiana in response to Rec. Doc. 15. (Thornhill, Jessica) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
**DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Jonathan P. Robicheaux. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Pleading, # 3 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Scott) Modified on 10/31/2013 (clm, ). (Entered: 10/30/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jonathan P. Robicheaux re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Louisiana First Supplemental. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that, no later than 10/30/2013, counsel for both sides must submit simultaneous suppl papers, supported by citation to legal authority and if relevant and necessary evidence, addressing whether venue is proper in the EDLA under either 28 USC 1391(b)(1) or (b)(2). FURTHER ORDERED Resetting Hearing on 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Improper Venue, MOTION to Transfer Case to MDLA for 11/13/2013, on the papers, unless otherwise ordered. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/16/2013.(caa, ) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jonathan P. Robicheaux re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case For Improper Venue MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Louisiana . (Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MOTION to Dismiss Case For Improper Venue, MOTION to Transfer Case to Middle District of Louisiana by James D. Caldwell. Motion set for 10/16/2013 10:00 AM before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Notice of Submission)Attorney Jessica M. P. Thornhill added to party James D. Caldwell(pty:dft).(Thornhill, Jessica) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to James D. Caldwell on 8/13/2013, answer due 10/15/2013. (Spivey, Scott) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to James D. Caldwell. (caa, ) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against James D. Caldwell filed by Jonathan P. Robicheaux.(caa, ) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 8/9/2013. (caa, ) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re 7 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?' and Document does not contain Case Number, Section or Magistrate Judge. This motion will be decided by the district judge and All future pleadings must reflect Case Number 13-5090, Section F & Magistrate Judge 5. Clerk took corrective action.(caa, ) Modified on 8/9/2013 (caa, ). (Entered: 08/09/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jonathan P. Robicheaux. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Proposed Pleading)(Spivey, Scott) Modified on 8/9/2013 (caa, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/13/2013: # 4 Summons) (caa, ). (Entered: 08/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to James D. Caldwell on 7/25/2013, answer due 9/23/2013. (Spivey, Scott) Modified on 7/30/2013 (caa, ). (Entered: 07/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to James D. Caldwell. (caa, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alma L. Chasez on 7/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Pauper Letter) (caa, ) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Alma L. Chasez. (mmv, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jonathan P. Robicheaux. Motion(s) referred to Alma L. Chasez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application, # 2 Proposed Order)(Spivey, Scott) Modified on 7/16/2013 (caa, ). (Entered: 07/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (In Forma Pauperis status requested) filed by Jonathan P. Robicheaux. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(Spivey, Scott) Modified on 7/16/2013 (caa, ). (Entered: 07/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 495 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?