TCYK, LLC v. Doe 193
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-02212

Tags
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 9:54 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Order on motion to extend time
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Response to order to show cause
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Motion To Extend Time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 8 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None order on motion for miscellaneous relief
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None motion for miscellaneous relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/5/2013 Notice of designation of track
                NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (TKD)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Copyright Report
                  Copyright Report sent to Washington. (DMS)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                    CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TCYK, LLC. (DMS)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against Doe 193 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400 receipt number TPA19053) filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet) (DMS)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 81 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?