TCYK, LLC v. Doe 1-37
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00688

Tags
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 10:48 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS - The Court RECOMMENDS that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 4/8/14. (jr1)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
    OPINION AND ORDER denying [12] and [14] Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 11/25/2013. (pes1)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [16] Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 11/13/2013. (pes1)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: 11/13/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
        First MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 3/13/2014. To serve defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: 10/18/2013 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
          ORDER striking [6] Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 10/18/2013. (er1)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Motion to Quash
            MOTION to Quash Subpoena (signed copy) by Movant Alex C Sheeley. (pes1)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER re [12] MOTION to Quash: The movant shall submit for filing a signed copy of the Motion to Quash Subpoena within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 10/11/2013. (er1)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Motion to Quash
                MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Movant Alex C Sheeley (kk2)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying [10] Motion for Protective Order. Within fourteen (14) days of this order, the movant shall submit for filing a signed copy of the Motion to Quash, Doc. No. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 10/1/13. (jcw1)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Motion for Protective Order
                    MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Doe 32. (jcw1)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Abraham Bahgat for Defendant Doe 31 (Bahgat, Joseph)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [6] MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant "John Doe's" Anonymously Filed Motion to Quash filed by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Bass, Leon)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER re [6] MOTION to Quash: The movant shall submit for filing a signed copy of the Motion to Quash which contains the information required by Rule 11(a) within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 9/18/2013. (er1)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Motion to Quash
                            ***STRICKEN 10/18/2013*** - MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Defendant John Doe. (Unknown as to which John Doe #) (er1) Modified on 10/21/2013 (kk2).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013 Related Case MemorandumCourt Filing
                              RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case numbers 2:13-cv-525 and 2:13-cv-534 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Judge Michael H. Watson on 8/8/2013. (er1)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [3] the Motion for leave to take discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terence P Kemp on 7/23/2013. (er1)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013, Terminated: 7/23/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                  Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Bass, Leon)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Complaint
                                      COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Doe 1-37 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4182159), filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 109 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?