American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company et al v. Cirrus Design Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-08357
District Judge Barbara S. Jones, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 1, 2017 at 10:00 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Brian Galligan +1 212 908 1276 +1 866 263 1335 jgalligan@cozen.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Izzo, Jr. +1 215 665 2030 +1 215 665 2013 mizzo@cozen.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark T. Mullen +1 215 665 2091 +1 215 665 2013 mmullen@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hunter J Shkolnik +1 212 684 1880 +1 212 689 8156 hshkolnik@rheingoldlaw.com
No Logo Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Cirrus Design Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oliver K. Beiersdorf +1 212 549 0415 +1 212 521 5450 obeiersdorf@reedsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Eugene Bradley +1 609 524 2044 +1 609 951 0824 pbradley@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GARY J. RUCKELSHAUS +1 609 897 0050 gruckelshaus@reedsmith.com
No Logo Cirrus Design Corporation, Third Party Plaintiff
No Logo Melanie Lidle, Third Party Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 245 - Real Property: Tort Product Liability
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between counsel for all parties that the above captioned action and all claims asserted therein are voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), without costs to any party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 1/3/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Barbara S. Jones from Oliver Beiersdorf dated 8/22/2011 re: We are counsel for defendant and are writing jointly with counsel for plaintiffs to request that this action be stayed pending the outcome of the Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial filed in Melanie Lidle et al. v. Cirrus Design Corporation, 08-CV-01253-BSJ-HBP ("Liddle Action"), and any appeal in the Lidle Action. Cirrus and Plaintiffs respectfully request that this action be stayed and placed in civil suspense. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 8/29/2011) (lmb) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 37 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
      STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Melanie Lidle, Stephanie Stanger and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation(4515 Taylor Circle, Duluth, Minnesota 55811).(Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None
        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Melanie Lidle, Stephanie Stanger and without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation(4515 Taylor Circle, Duluth, Minnesota 55811).(Bradley, Patrick) Modified on 6/22/2011 (ml). Modified on 6/22/2011 (ml). (Entered: 06/21/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT: It is hereby Stipulated and agreed that Melanie Lidle, personal representative of behalf of Cory Lidle, shall have until June 14, 2011 to respond to the third-party complaint. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 4/20/2011) (jfe) (Entered: 04/21/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to third party complaint. Document filed by Melanie Lidle. Return Date set for 6/14/2011 at 11:59 PM.(Shkolnik, Hunter) Modified on 4/15/2011 (db). (Entered: 04/14/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER denying 26 Motion to Consolidate Cases. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 3/15/11) (cd) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: None
                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-8357 and 1:08-cv-01253.. Document filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Mullen, Mark) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                  AMENDED ANSWER to with JURY DEMAND., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Melanie Lidle, Stephanie Stanger. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. (Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gary J. Ruckelshaus on behalf of Cirrus Design Corporation (Ruckelshaus, Gary) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION of Patrick E. Bradley in Opposition re: 26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-8357 and 1:08-cv-01253.. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-8357 and 1:08-cv-01253.. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. (Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 26 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-8357 and 1:08-cv-01253.. Document filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: 10/13/09 NEF, # 2 Exhibit B; 12/16/09 letter, # 3 Exhibit C: Affirmation of Mark T. Mullen, # 4 Certificate of Service)(Mullen, Mark) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                            MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-8357 and 1:08-cv-01253. Document filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company.(Mullen, Mark) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND., THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Melanie Lidle, Stephanie Stanger. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. Related document: 23 Amended Complaint, filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/11/2011, Entered: None
                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Cirrus Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation.(Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                  SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 11 Amended Complaint, against Cirrus Design Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company. Related document: 11 Amended Complaint, filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(mro) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    OPINION AND ORDER re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. Cirrus' motion to dismiss the amended complaint is GRANTED with leave to amend. For the reasons set forth above, Plaintiffs' Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend on or before 2/4/11. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 12/30/10) (cd) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER dismissing as moot 5 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 9/17/2010) (jar) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/2/2010, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hunter Jay Shkolnik on behalf of American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company (Shkolnik, Hunter) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting 17 Motion for Michael J. Izzo, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 3/12/2010) (tve) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting 16 Motion for Mark T. Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 3/12/2010) (tve) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                              MOTION for Michael J. Izzo, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(mro) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Mark T. Mullen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(mro) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. (Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 02/10/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint.. Document filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Galligan, John) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. (Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation.(Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Cirrus Design Corporation.Document filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(laq) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Oliver K. Beiersdorf on behalf of Cirrus Design Corporation (Beiersdorf, Oliver) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6).. Document filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Galligan, John) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Cirrus Design Corporation served on 12/14/2009, answer due 1/4/2010. Service was accepted by William King, Vice President. Document filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company; Fireman's Fund Insurance Company. (Galligan, John) (Entered: 01/07/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Cirrus Industries, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation.(Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Document filed by Cirrus Design Corporation.(Bradley, Patrick) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (Signed by Judge Barbara S. Jones on 11/2/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Barbara S. Jones. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying see enclosed pdf as Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(ama) (ama). (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              COMPLAINT against Cirrus Design Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 701924)Document filed by American Guarantee and Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.(ama) (ama). (Entered: 10/02/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 191 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?