TCYK, LLC v. Beltramea, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Iowa Northern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-01019

Tags
Last Updated September 11, 2016 at 8:22 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hamilton Ip Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Aaron Damschen +1 563 441 0207 +8234 823 823 4637 charlie@hamiltoniplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Ramon Hamilton +1 563 441 0207 +8234 823 823 4637 jay@hamiltoniplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander JSW Johnson +1 563 441 0207 +8234 823 823 4637 alex@hamiltoniplaw.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-13, Defendant
No Logo Kylie Klein, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Beltramea, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew Beltramea

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Beltramea
No Logo Travis Bursell, Defendant
No Logo William Harrington, Defendant
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Mailing AO 121 to Copyright Office with copies of Notice of Dismissals found at 14 , 15 , 16 , 21 , 22 , 23 , 24 , 25 , 26 , 34 , 35 , and 41 . (pac) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 42 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER Cancelling Hearing: The hearing on 38 Motion to Compel Compliance, previously scheduled for 5/29, is cancelled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 5/28/2014. (NEF and order mailed to Beltramea) (pac) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
      LREF
      Blank 41 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Mathew Beltramea by TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 5/28/2014 (pac). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
        LREF
        Blank 40 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander JSW Johnson on behalf of TCYK, LLC. (Johnson, Alexander) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
          LREF
          Blank 39 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re 38 MOTION to Compel Compliance: Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2014 9:00 AM in 111 7th Avenue SE, Courtroom 3, 4th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 5/20/14. (ksy)(Copy w/NEF to Def Beltramea) Modified to show service on 5/20/2014 (ksy). (Entered: 05/20/2014)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
            MOTION to Compel Compliance by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 37 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Dismissal: This action is dismissed pursuant to LR41 and LR16, copies of which are attached, unless action is taken by 5/15/2014. Signed by Clerk on 5/1/2014. (Attachments: # 1 LR 41, # 2 LR 16) (copy w/NEF mailed to pro se Dft) (skm) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
                PRO SE ANSWER with Jury Demand to 33 Amended Complaint by Matthew Beltramea. (NEF mailed to pro se party) (pac) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendants Kylie Klein and William Harrington by TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 3/7/2014 (pac). (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Travis Bursell by TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 2/26/2014 (pac). (Entered: 02/25/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                      AMENDED Complaint with Jury Demand against Matthew Beltramea, Travis Bursell, William Harrington, Kylie Klein filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B) (pac) Modified text on 4/11/2014 (pac). (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER denying 19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting 29 Second Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to detach and separately docket the Amended Complaint for Copyright Infringment. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 1/30/2014. (pac) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles: Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2014 re 19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by TCYK, LLC, and 29 SECOND MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by TCYK, LLC. 19 denied as moot; 29 granted. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR Gold) (pac) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                            SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM 29 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                              SECOND MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint) (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 1/30/2014 (pac). (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                WITHDRAWAL of Motion re 27 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                  Withdrawn per 28 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Complaint) (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 1/30/2014 (pac). (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Doe #13 by TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 1/30/2014 (pac). (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Doe #11 by TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 1/30/2014 (pac). (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Doe #5 by TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 1/30/2014 (pac). (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Doe #4 by TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 1/30/2014 (pac). (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Doe #3 by TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 1/30/2014 (pac). (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant Doe #2 by TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 1/30/2014 (pac). (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2014 10:00 AM in 111 7th Avenue SE, Courtroom 3, 4th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 1/22/14. (Stigler, Karo) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Amended Complaint) (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER denying 17 Second Motion for Extension of Time Limit for Service. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 1/20/14. (Stigler, Karo) (Entered: 01/20/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                      UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time Limit to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                        NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice Against Defendant Doe #9 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 12/5/2013 (pac).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                          NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice Against Defendant Doe #8 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 12/5/2013 (pac).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 Motion to Dismiss
                                                            NOTICE of Dismissal Without Prejudice Against Defendant Doe #7 by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC. (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 12/5/2013 (pac).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan filed by TCYK, LLC. The deadline to submit a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan is extended to 3/27/2014. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 11/21/2013. (skm)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013 Notice of Dismissal
                                                                  NOTICE of Dismissal: This action is dismissed pursuant to LR41 and LR16, copies of which are attached, unless action is taken by 12/3/2013. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2013. (Attachments: # (1) LR 41, # (2) LR 16) (skm)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Order on UNRESISTED MotionCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [9] Unresisted Motion for Extension of Time Limit for Service. The deadline within which to perfect service on Defendants is extended to 1/26/2014. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 10/4/2013. (pac)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 UNRESISTED MOTION
                                                                      UNRESISTED Motion for Extension of Time Limit for Service by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [7] Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 7/11/2013. (Stigler, Karo)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013, Terminated: 7/11/2013 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Brief Memorandum in Support, # (2) Exhibit A) (Hamilton, Jay)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Aaron Damschen on behalf of TCYK, LLC (Damschen, Charles)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: 7/8/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                              CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by TCYK, LLC (Hamilton, Jay)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE of mailing AO 121 (Copyright Report) with a copy of [2] Complaint to the Copyright Office in Washington DC. (pac) Modified text on 6/18/2013 (pac).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: 6/18/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                                  Summons Issued as to Does 1-13. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: # (1) New Civil Case Packet) (pac)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: 6/17/2013 Complaint
                                                                                    COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-13 (Filing fee $ 400), filed by TCYK, LLC. Scheduling Report Deadline 10/5/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Hamilton, Jay) Modified text on 6/18/2013 (pac).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: 6/17/2013 Notice of New Case Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE of New Case Filing by TCYK, LLC. (skm)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 89 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?