COMMON et al v. APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-00921
District Judge William T. Lawrence, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 4:18 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo ALAN VANBIBBER, Plaintiff
No Logo ALLEN BOLDEN, SR., Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ALLEN BOLDEN, SR.
No Logo BARRY WOODRUFF, Plaintiff
No Logo BRIAN STARR, Plaintiff
No Logo CHARLES FIEDLER, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES FIEDLER
No Logo CHRISTOPHER HINDS, Plaintiff
No Logo DANIEL MOULTON, Plaintiff
No Logo DARREN HIGHBAUGH, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DARREN HIGHBAUGH
No Logo DARRYL COTTON, Plaintiff
No Logo DAVID FELTNER, Plaintiff
No Logo DAVID GILLEY, Plaintiff
No Logo DENNIS BONTE, Plaintiff
No Logo DENNIS BRENNAN, Plaintiff
No Logo DENNIS HALE, Plaintiff
No Logo EDWARD KERSAGE, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space EDWARD KERSAGE
No Logo ERNEST GREEN, Plaintiff
No Logo Dorsey & Whitney, LLP, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "EUGENE JOHNSON"
No Logo GABLE COMMON, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jairus M Gilden +1 312 286 1427 +1 952 591 5806 jgilden@sbcglobal.net

Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Llezlie Green Coleman +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 lgreen@cohenmilstein.com
No Logo HAROLD HARGRAVE, JR., Plaintiff
No Logo JACK PRUSELL, Plaintiff
No Logo JAMES BURNS, Plaintiff
No Logo JAMES JONES, Plaintiff
No Logo JAMES RIVERS, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES RIVERS
No Logo JESSIE MONK, JR., Plaintiff
No Logo JIMMIE KING, Plaintiff
No Logo JOHN BOOTH, IV, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Booth +1 850 432 1500
No Logo JOHN RISCH, Plaintiff
No Logo JOSEPH JOHNSTON, JR., Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOSEPH JOHNSTON, JR. 1 +11 +11 1111
No Logo JUAN ECHEVERRIA, JR., Plaintiff
No Logo KARL CRICK, Plaintiff
No Logo KENNETH CARTER, Plaintiff
No Logo KENNETH WALSH, Plaintiff
No Logo KEVIN MACY, Plaintiff
No Logo KEVIN WOODS, Plaintiff
No Logo LARRY CORBIN, Plaintiff
No Logo LOREN DUFF, II, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LOREN DUFF, II
No Logo MARVIN MONTGOMERY, SR., Plaintiff
No Logo MATTHEW PEARMAN, Plaintiff
No Logo MICHAEL MILLS, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mills, Michael mrm4500@gmail.com
No Logo MICHAEL STONE, Plaintiff
No Logo NARINE PRAGG, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space NARINE PRAGG
No Logo PATRICK LYNCH, Plaintiff
No Logo PAUL SHARP, Plaintiff
No Logo RAYMOND GARRETT, Plaintiff
No Logo ROBERT ADKISSON, Plaintiff
No Logo ROBERT LEDMAN, Plaintiff
No Logo RUFUS DOWNEY, Plaintiff
No Logo SAMUEL BECKETT, Plaintiff
No Logo SHAINE VOLLE, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SHAINE VOLLE
No Logo SHAWNA BREEDING, Plaintiff
No Logo THOMAS BLESSING, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS BLESSING
No Logo TIMOTHY PHELAN, Plaintiff
No Logo TODD HOWARD, Plaintiff
No Logo TYREE CARTER, Plaintiff
No Logo WILLIAM METTLER, JR., Plaintiff
No Logo WILLIAM TEMPLIN, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM TEMPLIN
No Logo WILLIE STRONG, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo AIMCO Properties, LP, Defendant
Officer/Director, Century Properties Fund Xvi
Officer/Director, Angeles Partners Xi
Officer/Director, CENTURY PROPERTIES FUND XIX
Officer/Director, Aimco OP L.P.
Officer/Director, Century Properties Fund Xiv
Officer/Director, Century Properties Fund Xv
Officer/Director, Angeles Partners Xii
No Logo AIMCO/BETHESDA HOLDING, INC., Defendant
No Logo Apartment Investment & Management Company, Defendant

Represented by Holland & Hart LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christina Finzel Gomez +1 303 295 8366 +1 303 713 6304 cgomez@hollandhart.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E.J. Hazard +1 303 295 8280 +1 303 742 1694 tobie.hazard@gmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Husband +1 303 295 8228 +1 303 975 5381 jhusband@hollandhart.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tanya Eileen Milligan +1 303 295 8000 +1 303 295 8261 temilligan@hollandhart.com

Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig W. Wiley +1 317 489 6930 +1 317 610 3202 craig.wiley@jacksonlewis.com
No Logo NHP MANAGEMENT, INC, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
CLOSED DISMISSED - ORDER: Upon consideration of the Stipulation of Dismissal, and the entire record herein, IT IS this 20th day of February, by the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana ORDERED THAT: This action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 2/20/2009.(DWH) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: None
    STIPULATION Of Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff GABLE COMMON. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 02/12/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Change in Firm Name by Llezlie Lloren Green (Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 56 Motion approving settlement-Parties shall file their stipulation of dismissal no later than 175 days from the date of this order Signed by Judge William T. Lawrence on 8/21/08. (CBU) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
          Joint MOTION for Approval of Settlement, filed by Plaintiffs JAMES RIVERS, PAUL SHARP, BRIAN STARR, MICHAEL STONE, WILLIE STRONG, ALLEN BOLDEN, SR, WILLIAM TEMPLIN, ALAN VANBIBBER, SHAINE VOLLE, KENNETH WALSH, BARRY WOODRUFF, KEVIN WOODS, DENNIS BONTE, JOHN BOOTH, IV, SHAWNA BREEDING, DENNIS BRENNAN, JAMES BURNS, TYREE CARTER, KENNETH CARTER, GABLE COMMON, LARRY CORBIN, DARRYL COTTON, KARL CRICK, RUFUS DOWNEY, LOREN DUFF, II, JUAN ECHEVERRIA, JR, DAVID FELTNER, CHARLES FIEDLER, RAYMOND GARRETT, ROBERT ADKISSON, DAVID GILLEY, ERNEST GREEN, DENNIS HALE, HAROLD HARGRAVE, JR, DARREN HIGHBAUGH, CHRISTOPHER HINDS, TODD HOWARD, EUGENE JOHNSON, JOSEPH JOHNSTON, JR, JAMES JONES, SAMUEL BECKETT, EDWARD KERSAGE, JIMMIE KING, ROBERT LEDMAN, PATRICK LYNCH, KEVIN MACY, WILLIAM METTLER, JR, MICHAEL MILLS, JESSIE MONK, JR, MARVIN MONTGOMERY, SR, DANIEL MOULTON, THOMAS BLESSING, MATTHEW PEARMAN, TIMOTHY PHELAN, NARINE PRAGG, JACK PRUSELL, JOHN RISCH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Proposed Settlement Agreement, # (2) Affidavit Declaration of Llezlie L. Green, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Llezlie) Modified on 8/19/2008 (JHO). (Entered: 08/18/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER Directing Filing of a Pleading Authorizing Dismissal: The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that w/i thirty (30) days of this date, counsel for the pltf shall file a motion to dismiss or a stipulation of dismissal. Failure to comply with this order will result in DISMISSAL W/PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(b),Fed.R.Civ.P. (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/17/08.(SWM) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              Reassignment of Case to Judge William T. Lawrence. Judge Richard L. Young no longer assigned to the case. Please include the new case number (1:07-cv-921-WTL-JMS), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (WJC) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                REVIEWED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: 52 Joint Status Report filed by GABLE COMMON. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/8/08. (TMA) (Entered: 07/09/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None
                  STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by GABLE COMMON. (Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/3/2008 and parties report on the status of discovery and negotiations. (See Dkt. #50). Parties to file additional status report by 6/30/08 advising as to outcome of June mediation. If case is not resolved, additional scheduling matters will be addressed by the parties in their June 30th report (SWM) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                      STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by GABLE COMMON. (Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ENTRY for 4/7/08 - Magistrate Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson: Pltfs' counsel and Defts' counsel appear for hearing on motion to withdraw. The Court grants Pltfs' counsel's 41 Motion to withdraw on behalf of certain named Pltfs. Defts advise of their intention to file a motion to dismiss with respect to the certain named Pltfs. The Court and parties also address pending dkt. entry #47. The Court denies the motion 47 to the extent it seeks a nunc pro tunc entry to deem tardy discovery timely filed. The Court advises, however, that the 20 day delay in the discovery response does not support further sanctions against said Pltf (See Entry.) (SWM) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting defts' 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to pltfs' first request for production of documents to 4/11/08. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/7/08. (SWM) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to April 11, 2008 to Respond to Discovery Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Extension of Time and Response to Defendants' Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to Discovery, filed by Plaintiffs JAMES RIVERS, PAUL SHARP, BRIAN STARR, MICHAEL STONE, WILLIE STRONG, ALLEN BOLDEN, SR, WILLIAM TEMPLIN, ALAN VANBIBBER, SHAINE VOLLE, KENNETH WALSH, BARRY WOODRUFF, KEVIN WOODS, DENNIS BONTE, JOHN BOOTH, IV, NEAL BRAUN, SHAWNA BREEDING, DENNIS BRENNAN, JAMES BURNS, TYREE CARTER, KENNETH CARTER, GABLE COMMON, JEROME CHAMBERS, LARRY CORBIN, DARRYL COTTON, KARL CRICK, RUFUS DOWNEY, LOREN DUFF, II, JUAN ECHEVERRIA, JR, DAVID FELTNER, CHARLES FIEDLER, RAYMOND GARRETT, ROBERT ADKISSON, DAVID GILLEY, ERNEST GREEN, DENNIS HALE, HAROLD HARGRAVE, JR, DARREN HIGHBAUGH, CHRISTOPHER HINDS, TODD HOWARD, EUGENE JOHNSON, JOSEPH JOHNSTON, JR, JAMES JONES, SAMUEL BECKETT, EDWARD KERSAGE, JIMMIE KING, ROBERT LEDMAN, PATRICK LYNCH, KEVIN MACY, WILLIAM METTLER, JR, MICHAEL MILLS, JESSIE MONK, JR, MARVIN MONTGOMERY, SR, DANIEL MOULTON, THOMAS BLESSING, MATTHEW PEARMAN, TIMOTHY PHELAN, NARINE PRAGG, JACK PRUSELL, JOHN RISCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Llezlie Green)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 04/03/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to April 11, 2008 to Respond to Discovery, filed by Defendants APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP, NHP MANAGEMENT, INC, AIMCO/BETHESDA HOLDING, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2009 09:15 AM in room #353 before Judge Richard L. Young. Jury Trial set for 8/24/2009 09:00 AM in room #349 before Judge Richard L. Young. The court allots 10 days to try this case. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/14/08.(CLL) (Entered: 03/24/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/14/08. (CLL) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                                    First MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiffs NEAL BRAUN, JEROME CHAMBERS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Llezlie L. Green, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER re 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. This matter is set for a hearing. SCHEDULING ORDER:( Hearing regarding motion to w/d set for 4/7/2008 03:00 PM in room #256 before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson.) Out-of-state counsel for pltfs may appear by telephone. See Order for further instructions. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 3/4/08.(SWM) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Plaintiffs JAMES RIVERS, PAUL SHARP, BRIAN STARR, MICHAEL STONE, WILLIE STRONG, ALLEN BOLDEN, SR, WILLIAM TEMPLIN, ALAN VANBIBBER, SHAINE VOLLE, KENNETH WALSH, BARRY WOODRUFF, KEVIN WOODS, DENNIS BONTE, JOHN BOOTH, IV, NEAL BRAUN, SHAWNA BREEDING, DENNIS BRENNAN, JAMES BURNS, TYREE CARTER, KENNETH CARTER, GABLE COMMON, JEROME CHAMBERS, LARRY CORBIN, DARRYL COTTON, KARL CRICK, RUFUS DOWNEY, LOREN DUFF, II, JUAN ECHEVERRIA, JR, DAVID FELTNER, CHARLES FIEDLER, RAYMOND GARRETT, ROBERT ADKISSON, DAVID GILLEY, ERNEST GREEN, DENNIS HALE, HAROLD HARGRAVE, JR, DARREN HIGHBAUGH, CHRISTOPHER HINDS, TODD HOWARD, EUGENE JOHNSON, JOSEPH JOHNSTON, JR, JAMES JONES, SAMUEL BECKETT, EDWARD KERSAGE, JIMMIE KING, ROBERT LEDMAN, PATRICK LYNCH, KEVIN MACY, WILLIAM METTLER, JR, MICHAEL MILLS, JESSIE MONK, JR, MARVIN MONTGOMERY, SR, DANIEL MOULTON, THOMAS BLESSING, MATTHEW PEARMAN, TIMOTHY PHELAN, NARINE PRAGG, JACK PRUSELL, JOHN RISCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Green Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ENTRY denying as moot pltfs' 35 Motion for an enlargement of Time to File a motion for extension of time to respond to discovery. Motion denied as moot due to the ruling on motion for extension of time. Docket No. 39 (Marginal Entry). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/25/08. (SWM) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting pltfs' 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to discovery to 2/19/08. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 1/25/08. (SWM) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                              EXHIBIT re 37 Response in Opposition to Motion by all defendants. (Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/17/2008 For Enlargement of Time in Which To Respond to Discovery, filed by Defendants APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP, NHP MANAGEMENT, INC, AIMCO/BETHESDA HOLDING, INC.. (Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/17/2008 For Enlargement of Time in Which To Respond to Discovery, filed by Plaintiffs JAMES RIVERS, PAUL SHARP, BRIAN STARR, MICHAEL STONE, WILLIE STRONG, ALLEN BOLDEN, SR, WILLIAM TEMPLIN, ALAN VANBIBBER, SHAINE VOLLE, KENNETH WALSH, BARRY WOODRUFF, KEVIN WOODS, DENNIS BONTE, JOHN BOOTH, IV, NEAL BRAUN, SHAWNA BREEDING, DENNIS BRENNAN, JAMES BURNS, TYREE CARTER, KENNETH CARTER, GABLE COMMON, JEROME CHAMBERS, LARRY CORBIN, DARRYL COTTON, KARL CRICK, RUFUS DOWNEY, LOREN DUFF, II, JUAN ECHEVERRIA, JR, DAVID FELTNER, CHARLES FIEDLER, RAYMOND GARRETT, ROBERT ADKISSON, DAVID GILLEY, ERNEST GREEN, DENNIS HALE, HAROLD HARGRAVE, JR, DARREN HIGHBAUGH, CHRISTOPHER HINDS, TODD HOWARD, EUGENE JOHNSON, JOSEPH JOHNSTON, JR, JAMES JONES, SAMUEL BECKETT, EDWARD KERSAGE, JIMMIE KING, ROBERT LEDMAN, PATRICK LYNCH, KEVIN MACY, WILLIAM METTLER, JR, MICHAEL MILLS, JESSIE MONK, JR, MARVIN MONTGOMERY, SR, DANIEL MOULTON, THOMAS BLESSING, MATTHEW PEARMAN, TIMOTHY PHELAN, NARINE PRAGG, JACK PRUSELL, JOHN RISCH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Llezlie Green, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Orders in related cases, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit C - MDL Hearing Notice, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D - Email from L. Green to J. Husband, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Transcript, Bishop v. AIMCO)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to January 17, 2008 for an Enlargement of Time to File a Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery, filed by Plaintiffs JAMES RIVERS, PAUL SHARP, BRIAN STARR, MICHAEL STONE, WILLIE STRONG, ALLEN BOLDEN, SR, WILLIAM TEMPLIN, ALAN VANBIBBER, SHAINE VOLLE, KENNETH WALSH, BARRY WOODRUFF, KEVIN WOODS, DENNIS BONTE, JOHN BOOTH, IV, NEAL BRAUN, SHAWNA BREEDING, DENNIS BRENNAN, JAMES BURNS, TYREE CARTER, KENNETH CARTER, GABLE COMMON, JEROME CHAMBERS, LARRY CORBIN, DARRYL COTTON, KARL CRICK, RUFUS DOWNEY, LOREN DUFF, II, JUAN ECHEVERRIA, JR, DAVID FELTNER, CHARLES FIEDLER, RAYMOND GARRETT, ROBERT ADKISSON, DAVID GILLEY, ERNEST GREEN, DENNIS HALE, HAROLD HARGRAVE, JR, DARREN HIGHBAUGH, CHRISTOPHER HINDS, TODD HOWARD, EUGENE JOHNSON, JOSEPH JOHNSTON, JR, JAMES JONES, SAMUEL BECKETT, EDWARD KERSAGE, JIMMIE KING, ROBERT LEDMAN, PATRICK LYNCH, KEVIN MACY, WILLIAM METTLER, JR, MICHAEL MILLS, JESSIE MONK, JR, MARVIN MONTGOMERY, SR, DANIEL MOULTON, THOMAS BLESSING, MATTHEW PEARMAN, TIMOTHY PHELAN, NARINE PRAGG, JACK PRUSELL, JOHN RISCH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Green, Llezlie) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ENTRY denying pltfs' 29 Motion to Stay; denying as moot pltfs' 31 Motion For Expedited Treatment Of Their Concurrently Filed Motion To Stay (see Entry). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/27/2007. (LSC) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY in Support of Motion re 29 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation (Revised), 31 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion For Expedited Treatment Of Their Concurrently Filed Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation Plaintiffs' Reply In Support Of Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Plaintiff GABLE COMMON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Gilden, Jairus) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 31 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion For Expedited Treatment Of Their Concurrently Filed Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation, 28 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation, 29 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation (Revised), filed by Defendants APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP, NHP MANAGEMENT, INC, AIMCO/BETHESDA HOLDING, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 12/12/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion For Expedited Treatment Of Their Concurrently Filed Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Plaintiff GABLE COMMON. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gilden, Jairus) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                              BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 29 MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation (Revised) Plaintiffs' Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Plaintiff GABLE COMMON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Gilden, Jairus) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation (Revised), filed by Plaintiff GABLE COMMON. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gilden, Jairus) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Stay Plaintiffs' Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending A Decision By The Judicial Panel On Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Plaintiff GABLE COMMON. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gilden, Jairus) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. The parties were advised to request a phone status conference prior to filing any motion to compel or for protective order (See Order). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/4/07.(SWM) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/4/2007 and CMP approved as amended. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Status Conference set for 6/3/2008 10:00 AM in Telephonic before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson.). (SWM) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 22 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Llezlie Lloren Green added on behalf of all plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/20/2007. c/m (LSC) (Entered: 11/21/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs JAMES RIVERS, PAUL SHARP, BRIAN STARR, MICHAEL STONE, WILLIE STRONG, ALLEN BOLDEN, SR, WILLIAM TEMPLIN, ALAN VANBIBBER, SHAINE VOLLE, KENNETH WALSH, BARRY WOODRUFF, KEVIN WOODS, DENNIS BONTE, JOHN BOOTH, IV, NEAL BRAUN, SHAWNA BREEDING, DENNIS BRENNAN, JAMES BURNS, TYREE CARTER, KENNETH CARTER, GABLE COMMON, JEROME CHAMBERS, LARRY CORBIN, DARRYL COTTON, KARL CRICK, RUFUS DOWNEY, LOREN DUFF, II, JUAN ECHEVERRIA, JR, DAVID FELTNER, CHARLES FIEDLER, RAYMOND GARRETT, ROBERT ADKISSON, DAVID GILLEY, ERNEST GREEN, DENNIS HALE, HAROLD HARGRAVE, JR, DARREN HIGHBAUGH, CHRISTOPHER HINDS, TODD HOWARD, EUGENE JOHNSON, JOSEPH JOHNSTON, JR, JAMES JONES, SAMUEL BECKETT, EDWARD KERSAGE, JIMMIE KING, ROBERT LEDMAN, PATRICK LYNCH, KEVIN MACY, WILLIAM METTLER, JR, MICHAEL MILLS, JESSIE MONK, JR, MARVIN MONTGOMERY, SR, DANIEL MOULTON, THOMAS BLESSING, MATTHEW PEARMAN, TIMOTHY PHELAN, NARINE PRAGG, JACK PRUSELL, JOHN RISCH, Defendants APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP, NHP MANAGEMENT, INC, AIMCO/BETHESDA HOLDING, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summary)(Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 11/20/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            RECEIPT #IP004367 in the amount of $ 30.00. (CLL) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                              MOTION to Appear pro hac vice, filed by Plaintiffs JAMES RIVERS, PAUL SHARP, BRIAN STARR, MICHAEL STONE, WILLIE STRONG, ALLEN BOLDEN, SR, WILLIAM TEMPLIN, ALAN VANBIBBER, SHAINE VOLLE, KENNETH WALSH, BARRY WOODRUFF, KEVIN WOODS, DENNIS BONTE, JOHN BOOTH, IV, NEAL BRAUN, SHAWNA BREEDING, DENNIS BRENNAN, JAMES BURNS, TYREE CARTER, KENNETH CARTER, GABLE COMMON, JEROME CHAMBERS, LARRY CORBIN, DARRYL COTTON, KARL CRICK, RUFUS DOWNEY, LOREN DUFF, II, JUAN ECHEVERRIA, JR, DAVID FELTNER, CHARLES FIEDLER, RAYMOND GARRETT, ROBERT ADKISSON, DAVID GILLEY, ERNEST GREEN, DENNIS HALE, HAROLD HARGRAVE, JR, DARREN HIGHBAUGH, CHRISTOPHER HINDS, TODD HOWARD, EUGENE JOHNSON, JOSEPH JOHNSTON, JR, JAMES JONES, SAMUEL BECKETT, EDWARD KERSAGE, JIMMIE KING, ROBERT LEDMAN, PATRICK LYNCH, KEVIN MACY, WILLIAM METTLER, JR, MICHAEL MILLS, JESSIE MONK, JR, MARVIN MONTGOMERY, SR, DANIEL MOULTON, THOMAS BLESSING, MATTHEW PEARMAN, TIMOTHY PHELAN, NARINE PRAGG, JACK PRUSELL, JOHN RISCH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CLL) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 15 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Tanya E. Milligan for DEFTS added. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/1/07. (SWM) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney John M. Husband for DEFTS added. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/1/07. (SWM) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Thomas E.J. Hazard for DEFTS added. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/1/07. (SWM) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Christina Gomez for DEFTS added. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 11/1/07. (SWM) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by JAMES RIVERS, PAUL SHARP, BRIAN STARR, MICHAEL STONE, WILLIE STRONG, ALLEN BOLDEN, SR, WILLIAM TEMPLIN, ALAN VANBIBBER, SHAINE VOLLE, KENNETH WALSH, BARRY WOODRUFF, KEVIN WOODS, DENNIS BONTE, JOHN BOOTH, IV, NEAL BRAUN, SHAWNA BREEDING, DENNIS BRENNAN, JAMES BURNS, TYREE CARTER, KENNETH CARTER, GABLE COMMON, JEROME CHAMBERS, LARRY CORBIN, DARRYL COTTON, KARL CRICK, RUFUS DOWNEY, LOREN DUFF, II, JUAN ECHEVERRIA, JR, DAVID FELTNER, CHARLES FIEDLER, RAYMOND GARRETT, ROBERT ADKISSON, DAVID GILLEY, ERNEST GREEN, DENNIS HALE, HAROLD HARGRAVE, JR, DARREN HIGHBAUGH, CHRISTOPHER HINDS, TODD HOWARD, EUGENE JOHNSON, JOSEPH JOHNSTON, JR, JAMES JONES, SAMUEL BECKETT, EDWARD KERSAGE, JIMMIE KING, ROBERT LEDMAN, PATRICK LYNCH, KEVIN MACY, WILLIAM METTLER, JR, MICHAEL MILLS, JESSIE MONK, JR, MARVIN MONTGOMERY, SR, DANIEL MOULTON, THOMAS BLESSING, MATTHEW PEARMAN, TIMOTHY PHELAN, NARINE PRAGG, JACK PRUSELL, JOHN RISCH. APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY waiver sent on 9/21/2007; AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP waiver sent on 9/21/2007; NHP MANAGEMENT, INC waiver sent on 9/21/2007; AIMCO/BETHESDA HOLDING, INC. waiver sent on 9/21/2007. (Gilden, Jairus) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          RECEIPT #IP004140 in the amount of $ 120.00. (CLL) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                            MOTION to Appear pro hac vice for Milligan, filed by Defendants APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP, NHP MANAGEMENT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                              MOTION to Appear pro hac vice for Husband, filed by Defendants APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP, NHP MANAGEMENT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                MOTION to Appear pro hac vice for Hazard, filed by Defendants APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP, NHP MANAGEMENT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                  MOTION to Appear pro hac vice for Gomez, filed by Defendants APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP, NHP MANAGEMENT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ENTRY regarding CMP and Initial Pretrial Conference. SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2007 02:00 PM in room #256 before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. The CMP is due no later than 14 days prior to the iptc (See Entry). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 10/26/07. (SWM) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Second Amended Complaint, filed by all defendants.(Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, filed by Defendants APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP, NHP MANAGEMENT, INC. (Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Warner Wiley on behalf of Defendants APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP, NHP MANAGEMENT, INC. (Wiley, Craig) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Complaint) against all defendants, filed by all plaintiffs.(Gilden, Jairus) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by all plaintiffs.(Gilden, Jairus) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (WJC) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                  Summons Issued as to APARTMENT INVESTMENT AND MANAGEMENT COMPANY, AIMCO PROPERTIES, LP, NHP MANAGEMENT, INC. (WJC) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RECEIPT #IP002384 in the amount of $ 350 for filing fee. (WJC) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET, filed by all Plaintiffs. (WJC) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against all defendants with Jury Demand, filed by all plaintiffs.(WJC) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 203 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?