Alexander, et al v. Albertson's, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-00189
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 3:52 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Angie Berens, Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Richardson, Plaintiff
No Logo Bill Logan, Plaintiff
No Logo Brian, Miller, Plaintiff
No Logo Carla Jackson, Plaintiff
No Logo Carol Gold, Plaintiff
No Logo Carol Jackson, Plaintiff
No Logo Christyne Wood, Plaintiff
No Logo Clifton Delaney, Plaintiff
No Logo Dave Augason, Plaintiff
No Logo Dawn Fosket, Plaintiff
No Logo Dennis Hawthorne, Plaintiff
No Logo Donald McBride, Plaintiff
No Logo Edward Tresh, Plaintiff
No Logo Eleanor Castenada, Plaintiff
No Logo Esperanza Ramirez, Plaintiff
No Logo Evelyn Tutein, Plaintiff
No Logo Glenda Phelan, Plaintiff
No Logo James Coats, IV, Plaintiff
No Logo James Kuns, Plaintiff
No Logo Janell Holder, Plaintiff
No Logo Jennifer Garcia, Plaintiff
No Logo Jessica Jones, Plaintiff
No Logo John, Alexander, Plaintiff

Represented by HERZFELD & PIOTROWSKI

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan C Herzfeld +1 208 331 9200 +1 208 331 9201 aherzfeld@hpllp.net

Represented by NEVIN BENJAMIN & MCKAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott McKay +1 208 343 1000 +1 208 345 8274 smckay@nbmlaw.com

Represented by WEBSTER MRAK & BLUMBERG

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P Blumberg +1 206 223 0344 rpblumberg@gmail.com
No Logo Joseph Chong, Plaintiff
No Logo Josh Eddy, Plaintiff
No Logo Kelli Davenport-Hall, Plaintiff
No Logo Kevin Duncan, Plaintiff
No Logo LARRY JONES., Plaintiff
No Logo Monique Farmer, Plaintiff
No Logo Law Offices of Patricia Brown (Unknown Firm), Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Patricia Brown"
No Logo Patricia Robledo, Plaintiff
No Logo Patrick Iman, Plaintiff
No Logo Paul Graziano, Plaintiff
No Logo Quintus Preacely, Plaintiff
No Logo Raul Leon, Plaintiff
No Logo Regina Lopez, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Louis Hoefler, Plaintiff
No Logo Rubin Vigil, Plaintiff
No Logo Samuel Yocum, Plaintiff
No Logo Sean Tyree, Plaintiff
No Logo Shane Camarena, Plaintiff
No Logo Sharon Brady, Plaintiff
No Logo Sharon Whittemore, Plaintiff
No Logo Sheryl Lonergan, Plaintiff
No Logo Stacey Roberts, Plaintiff
No Logo Switchcraft, Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Steven Cooper"
No Logo Steven Culbertson, Plaintiff
No Logo Terri Ann Paul, Plaintiff
No Logo William Heckathorn, Plaintiff
Attributes
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Timeline
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF CASE by pla (wm) (Entered: 09/11/2001)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Larry M. Boyle ; Teleconf set for 10/25/01 at 9:30 (cc: all counsel) (wm) (Entered: 08/30/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: None
RETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS executed upon def Albertson's, Inc. on 8/21/01 (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
FOURTH NOTICE OF FURTHER CONSENTS TO SUE by pla (wm) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: None
SECOND NOTICE by plas of further consents to sue (wm)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: None
SECOND NOTICE by pla of further consents due (wm) (Entered: 05/24/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: None
NOTICE by plas of further consents to sue (wm) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: None
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for plaintiffs re complaint [1-1] (jml)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: None
MOTION by plaintiffs AND ORDER for attorney Richard P. Blumberg to appear pro hac vice (cc: all counsel) (jml) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: None
NOTICE by plaintiffs of consents to sue (jml) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: None
COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (jml) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 60 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?