Lauritzen Bulkers A/S v. JIT International Corporation Limited et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01275
District Judge Alvin W. Thompson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 3, 2016 at 6:11 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lauritzen Bulkers A/S, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Sweeney +1 212 513 3547 +1 212 341 7122 patrick.sweeney@hklaw.com
Space Patrick Joseph Sweeney +1 212 513 3547 +1 212 341 7122 patrick.sweeney@hklaw.com
v.
No Logo JIT International Corporation Limited, Defendant
No Logo Palmaille Holdings Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Torm USA LLC, Garnishee

Toggle Switch Represented by Tisdale Law Offices LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Cozzolino Davies +1 212 354 0025 +1 212 869 0067 ldavies@tisdale-law.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333
Nature of Suit 120 - Contract: Marine
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE to PJO James R. Hawkins II for a status conference. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/21/2013. (Lamb, D.) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
    AFFIDAVIT Signed By Claus Albrektsen filed by Torm USA LLC. (Davies, Lauren) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
      ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Torm USA LLC.(Davies, Lauren) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None
        WRIT OF ATTACHMENT GARNISHMENT issued (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER granting 2 Motion for Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Garnishment. See attached. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 10/4/13. (Attachments: # 1 Writ of Attachment and Garnishment) (Nichols, J.) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: The Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Order (Doc. No. 2 ) is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Donna F. Martinez. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 10/4/2013. (Lamb, D.) (Entered: 10/04/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *JIT International Corporation Limited, Palmaille Holdings Ltd.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patrick J. Sweeney* *Holland & Knight LLp* *31 West 52nd Street* *New York, NY 10019*. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint, filed by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S, 2 MOTION for an Order for the Issuance of a Writ of Attachment and Garnishment Order filed by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S, 6 Electronic Filing Order, 4 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S, 5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 7 Standing Protective Order, 3 Affidavit filed by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S. Signed by Clerk on 8/30/13.(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/29/13.(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/29/13.(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                        Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 11/29/13. Amended Pleadings due by 10/28/2013 Discovery due by 2/28/2014 Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2014. Signed by Clerk on 8/29/13.(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                          Memorandum in Support re 2 MOTION for an Order for the Issuance of a Writ of Attachment and Garnishment Order filed by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT re 2 MOTION for an Order for the Issuance of a Writ of Attachment and Garnishment Order (IN SUPPORT OF) Signed By Patrick J. Sweeney filed by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION for an Order for the Issuance of a Writ of Attachment and Garnishment Order by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S. (Attachments: # 1 Writ of Attachment and Garnishment, # 2 Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Garnishment)(Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                                COMPLAINT (with exhibits 1-4) against JIT International Corporation Limited, Palmaille Holdings Ltd. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-2987477.), filed by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 7.1 Statement)(Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 139 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?