Lauritzen Bulkers A/S v. JIT International Corporation Limited
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00852
District Judge Warren W. Eginton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 13, 2016 at 4:13 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lauritzen Bulkers A/S, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Joseph Sweeney +1 212 513 3547 +1 212 341 7122 patrick.sweeney@hklaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Joseph Sweeney +1 212 513 3547 +1 212 341 7122 patrick.sweeney@hklaw.com
v.
No Logo JIT International Corporation Limited, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1333
Nature of Suit 120 - Contract: Marine
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice, by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *JIT International Corporation Limited* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patrick J. Sweeney* *Holland & Knight LLP* *31 West 52nd Street* *New York, NY 10019*. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Summons) (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 4 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S, 1 Complaint, filed by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 6/14/2013.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Warren W. Eginton on 6/13/2013.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
          Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 9/13/2013. Amended Pleadings due by 8/12/2013. Discovery due by 12/13/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 1/12/2014 Signed by Clerk on 6/13/2013.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S. (Sweeney, Patrick) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against JIT International Corporation Limited (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-2910281.), filed by Lauritzen Bulkers A/S. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sweeney, Patrick) Modified on 6/14/2013 to edit filed against (Walker, J.). (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 126 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?