Cellular Communications Equipment LLC v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00568
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 2:56 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cellular Communications Equipment LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 bbumgardner@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Fagan, Jr. +1 817 806 3817 +1 817 377 3485 mfagan@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Brannon Latimer +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 blatimer@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
v.
Amazon.com, Inc. Amazon.com, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Drugstore.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, Audible, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Haltom & Doan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Haltom Doan +1 903 255 1000 +1 903 255 0800 jdoan@haltomdoan.com
AT&T Mobility LLC AT&T Mobility LLC, Defendant
AT&T, Inc. AT&T, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Ncr Corp
Unknown Role, At Home Corp
Unknown Role, Net2phone, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mail.com, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by AT&T, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Gaffney +1 214 757 3024 +1 214 746 2213 bg172e@att.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Order of Reference (Title 28 U.S.C. 636(c))
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 06/30/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Rodney Gilstrap for all further proceedings. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/28/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 46 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Debra Elaine Gunter terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Debby E. Gunter by AT&T Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER Withdrawing Counsel. Attorney S Christian Platt terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/9/2014. (gsg) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER denying as moot 28 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/25/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                            ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Joint MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For Failure To State A Claim by AT&T Mobility, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kennerly, Christopher) Modified on 4/8/2014 (sm, ). (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION consolidating cases 6:13cv507, 6:13cv508, 6:13cv509, 6:13cv510, 6:13cv511, 6:13cv568, 6:13cv569, 6:13cv584 and 6:13cv738 for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. Lead case is 6:13cv507. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. Individual cases remain active for venue motions and trial, and all pending motions will be considered as filed. All future motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control Order by 3/15/2014, and a single Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order by 3/21/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/27/14. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 38 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael James Fagan, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/20/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC REGARDING SPECIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER setting Initial Case Management Conference for 2/26/2014 02:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/03/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC Of Readiness For Scheduling Conference (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 28 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Nelson, Edward) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ). (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ravi R Ranganath on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Ranganath, Ravi) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Saina Shamilov on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Shamilov, Saina) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J David Hadden on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Hadden, J) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amazon.com, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by AT&T Mobility, LLC, Amazon.com, Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 10/14/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC (Gunter, Debra) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC (Yarbrough, Herbert) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Reed Thane on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Thane, Joshua) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 22 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by AT&T, Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. Defendant AT&T Inc is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/18/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant AT&T Inc. by AT&T, Inc., Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by S Christian Platt on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T, Inc. (Platt, S) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Wood Kennerly on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T, Inc. (Kennerly, Christopher) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            Return of Service Executed as to Amazon.com, Inc. on 8/9/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Mobility, LLC on 8/9/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Return of Service Executed as to AT&T, Inc. on 8/9/2013, by personal service. (mll, ) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T Inc.( Gaffney, Brian) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Amazon.com, Inc..( Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Haltom Doan on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc. (Doan, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Christopher Cecil on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Cecil, Thomas) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael James Fagan on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Fagan, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Brannon Latimer on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Latimer, Steven) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc.and emailed to pltf for service. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es), # 2 Summons(es))(klb) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Cellular Communications Equipment LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility, LLC, AT&T, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4250321.), filed by Cellular Communications Equipment LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - US 6,819,923, # 3 Exhibit B - US 7,215,962, # 4 Exhibit C - US 7,941,174, # 5 Exhibit D - US 8,055,820)(Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 146 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?