Breaking Glass Pictures v. Does 1-32
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00849

Tags
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 8:12 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Default Judgment (Motion for)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Application to enter Default
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Default Judgment (Motion for)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Clerk
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Clerks Entry of Default
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Application to enter Default
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Application to enter Default
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Status Report Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None Status Report Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: 2/5/2014 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                        OPINION AND ORDER denying [5] Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 2/5/2014. (pes1)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: 1/13/2014 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [5] MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Doe 32's Motion to Quash or Modify Supboena filed by Plaintiff Breaking Glass Pictures. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Bass, Leon)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: 12/30/2013 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER denying [7] Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's response to [5] Motion to Quash due within fourteen (14) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/30/2013. (pes1)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/26/2013. (pes1)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/25/2014. For Additional Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff Breaking Glass Pictures. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Leon Bass, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Motion to Strike
                                                  MOTION to Strike [5] MOTION to Quash filed by John Doe 32 by Plaintiff Breaking Glass Pictures. Responses due by 12/12/2013 (Bass, Leon)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 Motion to Quash
                                                    MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena by Defendant John Doe #32. (pes1)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [3] Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 8/30/2013. (er1)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013, Terminated: 8/30/2013 Motion for Discovery
                                                        Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Application for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Breaking Glass Pictures. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Breaking Glass Pictures. (Bass, Leon)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Complaint
                                                            COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-32 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4239182), filed by Breaking Glass Pictures. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?