BKGTH Productions, LLC v. Does 1-60
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-04711

Tags
Last Updated October 3, 2016 at 4:41 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
v.
No Logo DOES 1-60, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE 14, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THE RUSSELL FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Kathryn Russell +1 312 994 2424 +1 312 706 9766 erin@russellfirmchicago.com
No Logo John Doe 35, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Jeffrey Greco +1 312 222 0599 michaelgreco18@yahoo.com
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
MINUTE entry before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 9/5/2013. Plaintiff's motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) [6] is granted. Status hearing set for 11/4/2013 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (rth, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: 8/22/2013 Notice of Motion
    NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[6] before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/5/2013 at 08:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Notice of Motion
      NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[6] before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/29/2013 at 08:45 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
        MEMORANDUM by BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC in support of motion for discovery[6] Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-B)(Hierl, Michael)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: 8/20/2013 Motion for Discovery
          MOTION by Plaintiff BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC for discovery Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013 Copyright Report
            MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (gcy, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Attorney Appearance
              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Attorney Appearance
                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 civil cover sheet
                  CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Complaint
                    COMPLAINT filed by BKGTH PRODUCTIONS, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8495029. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 94 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?