Prints Plus, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 1:08-ap-1213
District Judge Joan N. Feeney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2017 at 12:06 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo General Growth Management, Inc., Creditor Committee Chair

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen N. Pate +1 312 960 2940 +1 312 442 6374

Toggle Switch Represented by Casner & Edwards, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Goldberg +1 617 426 5900 +1 617 426 8810 goldberg@casneredwards.com

Toggle Switch Represented by cwg11.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Dildine +1 617 951 2505 dildine@cwg11.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James S. Carr +1 212 808 7800 +1 212 808 7897 jcarr@kelleydrye.com
Space Robert L. LeHane +1 212 808 7800 +1 212 808 7897 rlehane@kelleydrye.com
No Logo John Fitzgerald, U.S. Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paula R.C. Bachtell +1 617 788 0406 +1 617 565 6368 paula.bachtell@usdoj.gov
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William R. Baldiga +1 617 856 8200 +1 212 209 4801
Space Sunni Beville +1 617 856 8200

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven D. Pohl +1 617 856 8200 +1 617 856 8201 spohl@brownrudnick.com
No Logo Prints Plus, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John G. Loughnane +1 617 570 1000 +1 617 310 9521
Space Alex F. Mattera +1 617 263 2300
No Logo Stewart F. Grossman, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Looney & Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore W. Connolly +1 617 235 8666
Space Stewart F. Grossman +1 617 951 2800 sgrossman@lgllp.com
Space Pamela A. Harbeson +1 617 951 2800 pharbeson@lgllp.com
Space Perry A. Henderson +1 617 951 2800 +1 617 951 2819 ahenderson@lgllp.com
Space Adam J. Ruttenberg +1 617 951 2800 +1 617 951 2819 aruttenberg@lgllp.com
  Entries (96) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1214 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order Dated 12/27/2013 Approving 1213 Trustee's Final Report and Account After Distribution and Request for Discharge and Closing Case (Case Closed) . (mem) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1213 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Trustee's Final Report and Account After Distribution and Request for Discharge with UST Certificate of Review filed by US Trustee on behalf of Stewart Grossman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Zero Ending Bank Statement # 3 Certificate of Review)(Bachtell, Paula) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 1212 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Unclaimed Funds Paid to Court in the amount of $ 571.08. (Grossman, Stewart) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None
        Order dated 1/27/2005 RE: 70 Debtor's Motion For Authority To (A) Conduct Going-Out-of-Business Sales for the Sale of the Debtors' Personalty in Sixty Store Locations Free and Clear of Any and All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; (B) Enter into Store Closing Agreement with The Ozer Group, LLC; and (C) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice in Limiting and Shortening Time Therefor. THE PARTIES REPORTED THAT THE OBJECTIONS WERE RESOLVED AND A SEPARATE AGREED ORDER WAS ENTERED. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None
          Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Mark B. Conlan with certificate of service for Interested Parties Mack-Cali CW Realty Associates LLC, Mack-Cali Realty Corporation. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None
            Endorsed Order dated 1/27/2005 RE: 71 Motion For Order Authorizing Rejection of Certain Unexpired Leases w/exhibits and proposed Order filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. THE DEBTOR SHALL GIVE NOTICE THAT FOR ANY LEASE WHICH IS SOUGHT TO BE REJECTED PRIOR TO 2/1/05 THAT OBJECTIONS MUST BE FILED BY 1/31/05 AT 4:30PM. FOR ANY OTHER LEASES, OBJECTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 2/8/05 AT 4:30PM AND A HEARING ON ANY OBJECTIONS WILL BE HELD ON 2/15/05 AT 10:15AM. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: None
              Hearing scheduled for 2/15/2005 at 10:15 AM Boston Courtroom 1 - JNF,Objections due by 2/8/2005 at 04:30 PM. RE: 71 Motion For Order Authorizing Rejection of Certain Unexpired Leases. (See order entered 1/27/05 re: objection deadlines) (mnd, ) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                Order dated 1/26/2005 Granting 11 Debtor's Motion For Order Establishing Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving Form and Manner of Notice. (Proof of Claim Bar Date set: April 18, 2005; Government Proof of Claim Bar Date set: July 18, 2005) (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT). (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                  Endorsed Order dated 1/26/2005 Allowing 76 Motion for James S. Carr and Robert L. LeHane to Appear pro hac vice filed by Creditors Jones Lang LaSalle America's Inc., Gregory Greenfield & Associates, General Growth Management, Inc. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                    Endorsed Order dated 1/26/2005 Approving 8 Debtor's Application to Employ Gadsby Hannah LLP as Counsel with Affidavit. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                      Hearing scheduled for 2/15/2005 at 10:15 AM Boston Courtroom 1 - JNF, Objections due by 2/14/2005 at 12:00 Noon. RE: 62 Motion filed by Creditor Taubman Landlords to Require Debtor's Immediate Payment of Post-Petition Rent and to Compel Assumption or Rejection of Leases. (mnd, ) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                        Objection by Creditors Crystal Run Company, LP, Pyramid Walden Company, LP, Sangertown Square, LLC Re: 70 Debtor's Motion For Authority To (A) Conduct Going-Out-of-Business Sales for the Sale of the Debtors' Personalty in Sixty Store Locations Free and Clear of Any and All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; (B) Enter into Store Closing Agreement with The Ozer Group, LLC; and (C) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice in Limiting and Shortening Time Therefor(Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Certificate of Service) (Newman, Kevin) CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Created linkage to document #70. Removed linkage to document #72. Modified on 1/26/2005 (chy, usbc). (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                          Certificate of Service Re: 81 Notice of Appearance and 83 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Filed by Creditors Kravco Simon Company, New Plan Excel Realty Trust, Inc. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                            Motion to Appear pro hac vice of David L. Pollack filed by Creditor Kravco Simon Company and New Plan Excel Realty Trust, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order) (Pollack, David) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
                              Endorsed Order dated 1/25/2005 RE: 10 Debtor's Application to Employ Clear Thinking Group, LLC as Financial Advisors. THE US TRUSTEE'S OBJECTION IS SUSTAINED. THE MOTION IS ALLOWED ON THE CONDITION THAT THE EMPLOYMENT OF CLEAR THINKING GROUP, LLC SATISFIES THE CONCERNS RAISED BY THE US TRUSTEE IN HER LIMITED OBJECTION. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by David L. Pollack. filed by Creditor Kravco Simon Company and New Plan Excel Realty Trust, Inc. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
                                  Limited Objection with certificate of service by Creditor Simon Property Group, L.P. Re: 70 Debtor's Motion For Authority To (A) Conduct Going-Out-of-Business Sales for the Sale of the Debtors' Personalty in Sixty Store Locations Free and Clear of Any and All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; (B) Enter into Store Closing Agreement with The Ozer (Attachments: 1 Exhibit "A") (Tucker, Ronald) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of Service of Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. on (Re: 70 Debtor's Motion For Authority To (A) Conduct Going-Out-of-Business Sales for the Sale of the Debtors' Personalty in Sixty Store Locations Free and Clear of Any and All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; (B) Enter into Store Closing Agreement with The Ozer Group, LLC; and (C) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice in Limiting and Shortening Time Therefor). (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
                                      Hearing Scheduled for 1/27/2005 at 12:00 PM Boston Courtroom 1 - JNF RE: 70 Motion For Authority To (A) Conduct Going-Out-of-Business Sales for the Sale of the Debtors' Personalty in Sixty Store Locations Free and Clear of Any and All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; (B) Enter into Store Closing Agreement with The Ozer Group, LLC; and (C) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice in Limiting and Shortening Time Therefor. (CHY - Telephonic notice given to Attorney Alex Mattera). (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None
                                        Endorsed Order dated 1/25/2005 RE: 72 Motion For Expedited Hearing (Re: 70 Motion for Authority To (A) Conduct Going-Out-Of-Business Sales For The Sale Of The Debtors' Personalty In Sixty Store Locations Free And Clear Of Any And All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances; (B) Enter Into Store Closing Agreement With The Ozer Group, Llc; And (C) Approving The Form And Manner Of Notice In Limiting And Shortening Time Therefor). filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. MOTION FOR EXPEDITED HEARING GRANTED. THE COURT SHALL HEAR THE DEBTOR'S MOTION PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 105 AND 363(b) ON THURSDAY, JANUARY 27, 2005 AT NOON. THE DEBTOR SHALL GIVE NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES IN INTEREST AFFECTED BY THE MOTION. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                          Motion for James S. Carr and Robert L. LeHane to Appear pro hac vice with certificate of service filed by Creditors Jones Lang LaSalle America's Inc., Gregory Greenfield & Associates, General Growth Management, Inc. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/23/2005, Entered: None
                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 69 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice Service Date 01/23/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 50 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice Service Date 01/21/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/22/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                Certificate of Service (Re: 70 Motion for Order/Authority,, 71 Motion for Order/Authority, 72 Motion For Emergency/Expedited Hearing, ). filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Motion For Expedited Hearing (Re: 70 Motion for Authority To (A) Conduct Going-Out-Of-Business Sales For The Sale Of The Debtors' Personalty In Sixty Store Locations Free And Clear Of Any And All Liens, Claims And Encumbrances; (B) Enter Into Store Closing Agreement With The Ozer Group, Llc; And (C) Approving The Form And Manner Of Notice In Limiting And Shortening Time Therefor). filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                    Motion For Order Authorizing Rejection of Certain Unexpired Leases w/exhibits and proposed Order filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                      Motion For Authority To (A) Conduct Going-Out-of-Business Sales for the Sale of the Debtors' Personalty in Sixty Store Locations Free and Clear of Any and All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; (B) Enter into Store Closing Agreement with The Ozer Group, LLC; and (C) Approving the Form and Manner of Notice in Limiting and Shortening Time Therefor (Expedited Hearing Requested) filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                        Order dated 1/21/2005 Granting 61 Application to Practice before the Court pro hac vice. Filed by Andrew S. Conway, counsel for Creditor Taubman Landlords. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                          Motion to Appear pro hac vice with certificate of service filed by Ronald M. Tucker for Creditor Simon Property Group, L.P. (Tucker, Ronald) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Charles R. Corbin for Creditors Meadowood Mall LLC, Broward Mall Limited Partnership, Del Amo Mills Limited Partnership. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                              Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with certificate of service by William R. Baldiga, Steven D. Pohl and Sunni P. Beville of the law firm of Brown Rudnick Berlack Israels LLP for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Baldiga, William) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 49 Order Service Date 01/20/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. RE: 47 Court's Notice of 341 sent - 11 Corporation Service Date 01/20/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/21/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    Certificate of Service filed by Andrew S. Conway Re: 59 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Andrew S. Conway for Creditor Taubman Landlords, 60 Notice of Filing of General Power of Attorney. Filed by Andrew S. Conway, attorney for Creditor Taubman Landlords, 61 Application to to Practice before the Court pro hac vice. Filed by Andrew S. Conway, counsel for Creditor Taubman Landlords, 62 Motion filed by Creditor Taubman Landlords to Require Debtor's Immediate Payment of Post-Petition Rent and to Compel Assumption or Rejection of Lease. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      Motion filed by Creditor Taubman Landlords to Require Debtor's Immediate Payment of Post-Petition Rent and to Compel Assumption or Rejection of Leases. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        Application to to Practice before the Court pro hac vice. Filed by Andrew S. Conway, counsel for Creditor Taubman Landlords. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          Notice of Filing of General Power of Attorney. Filed by Andrew S. Conway, attorney for Creditor Taubman Landlords. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice with certificate of service by Andrew S. Conway for Creditor Taubman Landlords. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Creditor Royal Mouldings Limited. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/20/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Jason J. DeJonker with certificate of service for Creditor Consumer Programs Incorporated. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Christina M. Thompson, Jeffrey C. Wisler with certificate of service for Creditor The Mills Corporation. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Samuel B. Garber with certificate of service filed by Creditor General Growth Management, Inc. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      Motion for Entry of Order Admitting Ronald E. Gold to Appear pro hac vice with certificate of service filed by Creditors CBL and Associates Management, Inc., Glimcher Properties Limited Partnership. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Ronald E. Gold with certificate of service for Creditors Glimcher Properties Limited Partnership, CBL and Associates Management, Inc. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                          Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Nancy E. Everett with certificate of service for Towson TC, LLC, Willowbrook Mall LLC, Ridgedale Center, LLC , Paramus Park Shopping Center Limited Partnership , Lakeside Mall Property LLC , Rouse-Fashion Place, LLC , The Mall in Columbia Business Trust (kmp, ) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Thomas W. Daniels with certificate of service for The Marketplace (Marketplace Mall), Great Northern SPE, LLC (Great Northern Mall), Freemall Associates, LLC (Freehold Raceway Mall) and Danbury Mall, LLC (Danbury Fair Mall). (kmp, ) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              Endorsed Order dated 1/19/2005 Allowing 36 Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Niclas A. Ferland and Ilan Markus filed by Creditors Westfield America, Inc., Westfield Corporation, Inc. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/19/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order dated 1/18/2005 Granting RE: 4 Debtor's Motion For Order Authorizing Maintenance of Debtor's Cash Management Systems and Bank Accounts, and Continued Use of Existing Forms. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/18/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Notice of Appointment of Creditors' Committee with certificate of service. Jurgen Van Dijk added to case as Chairperson. (Bachtell, Paula) (Entered: 01/18/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Court's Notice of 341 sent. (admin, ) (Entered: 01/18/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 26 Order Service Date 01/14/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 25 Order on Motion for Order/Authority, Service Date 01/14/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 24 Order Service Date 01/14/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 23 Order on Motion for Order/Authority Service Date 01/14/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 22 Order on Motion to Extend, Service Date 01/14/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 21 Order on Motion for Order/Authority, Service Date 01/14/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 20 Order on Motion for Order/Authority, Service Date 01/14/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 19 Order on Motion to Pay, Service Date 01/14/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. RE: 16 Order on Motion for Emergency/Expedited Determination, Service Date 01/14/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing. RE: 17 Hearing Scheduled, , , Service Date 01/14/2005. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                          Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Niclas A. Ferland and Ilan Markus with certificate of service filed by Creditors Westfield America, Inc., Westfield Corporation, Inc. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Niclas Ferland and Ilan Markus of Tyler Cooper & Alcorn, LLP with certificate of service. Filed by Creditors Westfield Corporation, Inc., Westfield America, Inc. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Dustin P. Branch, Katten Muchin, Zavis Rosenman with certificate of service. Filed by Creditors The Forbes Company, The Macerich Company. (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Michael J. Goldberg with certificate of service. filed by Creditors University Mall Realty Trust, University Mall Joint Venture (Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 01/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Limited Objection and certificate of service by Assistant U.S. Trustee John Fitzgerald Re: 10 Debtor's Application to Employ Clear Thinking Group, LLC as Financial Advisors. (Bachtell, Paula) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(Attorney)(05-10220) [misc,volp11at] ( 839.00). Receipt Number 1105060, amount $ 839.00. (U.S. Treasury) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Paul W. Carey with certificate of service. filed by Creditor CambridgeSide Galleria Associates Trust (Carey, Paul) (Entered: 01/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice and Service of Papers by Ronald M. Tucker with certificate of service. filed by Creditor Simon Property Group, L.P. (Tucker, Ronald) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service RE: 25 Allowed Order (I) Prohibiting Utilities From Altering, Refusing Or Discontinuing Services, and (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance. Filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Kevin M. Newman with certificate of service. filed by Creditor Carousel Center Co. LP, Pyramid Walden Co. LP, Crystal Run Co. LP, Holyoke Mall Co. LP, Crossgates Mall Co. LP, Sangertown Square LLC and Poughkeepsie Galleria Co. (Newman, Kevin) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Order dated 1/12/2005 Granting 6 Motion For Order Authorizing the Debtor to Honor Certain Prepetition Customer Obligations filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Order dated 1/12/2005 Granting 3 Motion For Order Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services, and (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Order dated 1/12/2005 Authorizing RE: 2 Motion to Pay PrePetition Wages, Salaries and Employee Benefits; and (II) Payment of Other Employee Related Amounts filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. (SEE ORDER FOR FULL TEXT) (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Order dated 1/12/2005 RE: 6 Motion For Order Authorizing the Debtor to Honor Certain Prepetition Customer Obligations filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. #6 GRANTED. A SEPARATE ORDER WAS ENTERED. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Order dated 1/12/2005 RE: 5 Motion to Extend Time to February 25, 2005 to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. #5 GRANTED. DECISION SET OUT MORE FULLY BY COURT AS FOLLOWS: THE DEBTOR SHALL FILE THE SCHEDULES AND STATEMENTS BY FEBRUARY 16, 2005. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Order dated 1/12/2005 RE: 4 Motion For Order Authorizing Maintenance of Debtor's Cash Management Systems and Bank Accounts, and Continued Use of Existing Forms filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. #4 GRANTED. THE MOTION WAS MODIFIED IN OPEN COURT BASED UPON THE DEBTOR'S AGREEMENT WITH THE US TRUSTEE. A PROPOSED AGREED ORDER SHALL BE SUBMITTED. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Order dated 1/12/2005 RE: 3 Motion For Order Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services, and (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. #3 GRANTED. A SEPARATE ORDER WAS ENTERED. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Order dated 1/12/2005 RE: 2 Motion to Pay PrePetition Wages, Salaries and Employee Benefits; and (II) Payment of Other Employee Related Amounts filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. #2 GRANTED. THE DEBTOR SHALL PROVIDE AN ITEMIZATION OF THE PAID EMPLOYEES TO THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by James S. Carr for Creditor General Growth Management, Inc. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Scheduled for 1/12/2005 at 10:30 AM Boston Courtroom 1 - JNF RE: 2 Debtor's Motion to Pay PrePetition Wages, Salaries and Employee Benefits; and (II) Payment of Other Employee Related Amounts, 3 Debtor's Motion For Order Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services, and (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance, 4 Debtor's Motion For Order Authorizing Maintenance of Debtor's Cash Management Systems and Bank Accounts, and Continued Use of Existing Forms, 5 Debtor's Motion to Extend Time to February 25, 2005 to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs, 6 Debtor's Motion For Order Authorizing the Debtor to Honor Certain Prepetition Customer Obligations. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Endorsed Order dated 1/11/2005 RE: 7 Motion For Emergency Determination (Re:4 Motion for Order/Authority, 5 Motion to Extend, 6 Motion for Order/Authority, 2 Motion to Pay, 3 Motion for Order/Authority) filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. MOTION ALLOWED. AN EMERGENCY HEARING WILL BE HELD ON JANUARY 12, 2005 AT 10:30AM. (chy, usbc) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service w/ Notice of Hearing (Re: 8 Application to Employ, 10 Application to Employ, 11 Motion for Order/Authority, 12 Motion for Order/Authority, 13 Affidavit/Declaration,, 4 Motion for Order/Authority,, 5 Motion to Extend, 6 Motion for Order/Authority, 7 Motion for Emergency/Expedited Determination, 2 Motion to Pay, 3 Motion for Order/Authority, ). filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Loughnane, John) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Verified Declaration Verification of Matrix with Declaration re Electronic Filing. filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Loughnane, John) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Theodore R. Upland III In Support of First Day Motions (Re: 8 Application to Employ, 10 Application to Employ, 11 Motion for Order/Authority, 12 Motion for Order/Authority, 4 Motion for Order/Authority, 5 Motion to Extend, 6 Motion for Order/Authority, 7 Motion for Emergency/Expedited Determination, 2 Motion to Pay, 3 Motion for Order/Authority, ). filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Motion For Order Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Motion For Order Establishing Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving Form and Manner of Notice filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Employ Clear Thinking Group, LLC as Financial Advisors with Affidavit and. filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Order to Update : Matrix Due 1/18/2005. Atty Disclosure Statement due 1/26/2005. Schedules A-H due 1/26/2005. Statement of Financial Affairs due 1/26/2005. Exhibit A due 1/26/2005. (kpm, USBC) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Application to Employ Gadsby Hannah LLP as Counsel with Affidavit and. filed by Debtor Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion For Emergency Determination (Re:4 Motion for Order/Authority, 5 Motion to Extend, 6 Motion for Order/Authority, 2 Motion to Pay, 3 Motion for Order/Authority, ) filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion For Order Authorizing the Debtor to Honor Certain Prepetition Customer Obligations filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. (Mattera, Alex) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Extend Time to February 25, 2005 to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. (Loughnane, John) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion For Order Authorizing Maintenance of Debtor's Cash Management Systems and Bank Accounts, and Continued Use of Existing Forms filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. (Loughnane, John) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2005 (chy, usbc). CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Wrong PDF attached. Corrected PDF. Modified on 1/11/2005 (chy, usbc). (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion For Order Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Services, and (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Requests for Additional Adequate Assurance filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. (Loughnane, John) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Pay PrePetition Wages, Salaries and Employee Benefits; and (II) Payment of Other Employee Related Amounts filed by Debtor In Possession Prints Plus, Inc. (Loughnane, John) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Filing Fee in the Amount of $839 Filed by Prints Plus, Inc.. (Attachments: 1 Declaration of Electronic Filing w/ Statement Regarding Authority and corporate vote2 List of 20 Largest Creditors w/ Declaration re Electronic Filing) (Loughnane, John) (Entered: 01/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?