Bajus, et al v. Wick Communications, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 4:97-cv-00437
District Judge Alfredo C. Marquez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 1:54 PM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Barbara Bajus, Plaintiff
No Logo Frank Bajus, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of Richard M Martinez

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Moreno Martinez +1 520 327 4797 +1 520 320 9090 richard@richardmartinezlaw.com
No Logo Southern Arizona Housing Center Incorporated, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Nick Novasic, Defendant

Represented by Good Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory E Good +1 520 628 8221 +1 520 547 0394 good@goodlaw.net

Represented by Karp & Weiss PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen M Weiss +1 520 325 4200 +1 520 325 4224 sweiss@karpweiss.com

Represented by King & Frisch PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/16/1997, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Charles Frisch +1 520 790 4061 +1 520 571 8148 jfrisch@kingfrischlaw.com

Represented by Schneider & Onofry PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/24/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon D Schneider +1 602 200 1288 +1 602 230 8985 jschneider@soarizonalaw.com
No Logo Unknown Novasic, Defendant
No Logo Wick Communications Company, Defendant

Represented by Fennemore Craig, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/23/1998, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald J Stolkin +1 602 916 5000 +1 602 916 5521 rstolkin@fclaw.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 405
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Alfredo C. Marquez granting stipulation for order of dismissal dismissing party Nick Novasic, party Nick Novasic Revocable Trust, party Nick Novasic, Trustee w/prej (cc: all counsel) (BAR) (Entered: 03/25/1998)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/23/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER by Judge Alfredo C. Marquez granting stipulation for order of dismissal for dft Wick Communications, Inc. terminating party Wick Communications (cc: all counsel) (BAR) (Entered: 03/24/1998)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/20/1998, Entered: None
      STIPULATION for Dismissal as to dfts Nick Novasic, Nick Novasic Revocable Trust, Nick Novasic Trustee (BAR) (Entered: 03/23/1998)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: None
        STIPULATION for Dismissal between plaintiffs and Wick Communications Inc (BAR) (Entered: 03/20/1998)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: None
          SECOND AMENDED NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF URSULA GUTTRY on the following date(s): 3/10/98 AT 10:00 (BAR) (Entered: 03/02/1998)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: None
            SECOND AMENDED NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF URSULA GUTTRY on the following date(s): 3/2/98 at 10:00 (BAR) (Entered: 02/24/1998)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Nick Novasic, Nick Novasic, Nick Novasic of Change of Firm - Gregory Good, Gregory E. Good & Asso; no longer with Karp, Heurlin & Weiss (BAR) (Entered: 02/05/1998)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/29/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge Alfredo C. Marquez that dft Novasic's obj is sustained, during the depositions of witnesses, pla's atty may not inquire into the conversations these witnesses may have had w/their atty; pla's grt lv of court to file a memorandum in support of its positions, any memo shall be filed by 2/6/98, dft Novasic will have 10 days to file a resp, pla may not file a reply (cc: all counsel) re: order [44-1] (BAR) (Entered: 02/02/1998)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by pla of service of Non-Uniform Interrogatories (First Set) (COG) (Entered: 01/09/1998)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by pla of service of Non-Uniform Interrogatories (Second Set) (COG) (Entered: 01/09/1998)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/6/1998, Entered: None
                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by pla [1-1] ;adding Nick Novasic, Nick Novasic and terminating Jane Doe Novasic (COG) (Entered: 01/07/1998)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Alfredo C. Marquez granting motion to file first amended complaint by pla [39-1]; further ord that dfts shall file their responsive pleading w/respect to pla's 1st amd cmp w/in 10 days after service of the same (cc: all counsel) (BAR) (Entered: 01/06/1998)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/23/1997, Entered: None, Terminated: 1/5/1998
                          MOTION to file first amended complaint by pla [39-1] (COG) (Entered: 01/05/1998)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/23/1997, Entered: None
                            FIRST AMENDED NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Ursula Guttry on the following date(s): 1/30/98, 10:00 a.m. (COG) (Entered: 12/29/1997)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: None
                              First Amended NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Montgomery Murray on the following date(s): 1/23/98, 8:30 a.m. (COG) (Entered: 12/22/1997)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: None
                                First Amended NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Russell Ritter on the following date(s): 1/23/98, 10:30 a.m. (COG) (Entered: 12/22/1997)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: None
                                  First Amended NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Peggy Volker on the following date(s): 1/23/98, 1:00 p.m. (COG) (Entered: 12/22/1997)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: None
                                    First Amended NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Sharon Epstein on the following date(s): 1/23/98, 3:30 p.m. (COG) (Entered: 12/22/1997)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/18/1997, Entered: None
                                      2nd AMENEDE NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Nick Novasic on the following date(s): 12/22/97 (PAB) (Entered: 12/19/1997)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/12/1997, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Montgomery Murray on the following date(s): 1/6/98, 8:30 a.m. (COG) (Entered: 12/15/1997)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/12/1997, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Sharon Epstein on the following date(s): 1/6/98, 3:30 p.m. (COG) (Entered: 12/15/1997)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/12/1997, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Peggy Volker on the following date(s): 1/6/98, 1:00 p.m. (COG) (Entered: 12/15/1997)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/12/1997, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Russell Ritter on the following date(s): 1/6/98, 10:30 a.m. (COG) (Entered: 12/15/1997)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF JoAnne Goodhue on the following date(s): 1/6/98, 1:00 pm (COG) (Entered: 12/09/1997)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/2/1997, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Ursula Guttry on the following date(s): 1/6/98, 9:00 am (COG) (Entered: 12/09/1997)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Wick Communications of Service of Discovery Papers (BAR) (Entered: 11/28/1997)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Alfredo C. Marquez ; discovery due 6/8/98 ; dispositive motions due 7/8/98 ; pretrial order due 8/7/98 ; Pretrial conference set for 11:00 8/24/98 (cc: all counsel) (BAR) (Entered: 11/28/1997)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/26/1997, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by pla (BAR) (Entered: 11/28/1997)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by dft Nick Novasic (PAB) (Entered: 11/24/1997)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/21/1997, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of compliance of initial disclosure statement pursuant to FRCivP 26(a) by Nick Novasic (PAB) (Entered: 11/24/1997)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/20/1997, Entered: None
                                                              1ST AMD NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF Nick Novasic on the following date(s): 12/19/97 at 9:00 am (former emp) (Entered: 11/21/1997)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge Alfredo C. Marquez ; prel scheduling conf set for 9:30 11/20/97 (cc: all counsel) (BAR) (Entered: 11/18/1997)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/6/1997, Entered: None
                                                                  JOINT REPORT by plas (former emp) (Entered: 11/07/1997)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE by pla OF TAKING DEPO OF NICK NOVASIC on the following date(s): 12/1/97 at 10:00 (BAR) (Entered: 10/28/1997)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/16/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Alfredo C. Marquez granting motion to substitute attorney James C Frisch with Stephen M Weiss & Gregory E Good by dft Nick Novasic [14-1] attorney James C Frisch for Nick Novasic and substituting attorney Stephen M Weiss, Gregory E Good (cc: all counsel) (BAR) (Entered: 10/16/1997)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/16/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Alfredo C. Marquez granting motion to continue Rule 16 scheduling conf by dft Nick Novasic [15-1] ;telephonic scheduling conf set for 9:30 11/13/97 (cc: all counsel) (BAR) (Entered: 10/16/1997)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/16/1997
                                                                          MOTION to continue Rule 16 scheduling conf by dft Nick Novasic [15-1] (former emp) (Entered: 10/10/1997)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: None, Terminated: 10/16/1997
                                                                            MOTION to substitute attorney James C Frisch with Stephen M Weiss & Gregory E Good by dft Nick Novasic [14-1] (former emp) (Entered: 10/10/1997)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER by Judge Alfredo C. Marquez ; prel scheduling conf set for 9:30 11/4/97 before law clerk (cc: all counsel) (BAR) (Entered: 09/11/1997)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                REQUEST by plas for scheduling conference purs to Rule 26 FRCP (BAR) (Entered: 09/09/1997)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                  ANSWER by Nick Novasic (BAR) (Entered: 09/02/1997)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by pla's atty of change of address: Richard Martinez, 3131 E. Second Street, Tucson, AZ 85716 (BAR) (Entered: 08/28/1997)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/25/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER by Wick Communications (BAR) (Entered: 08/26/1997)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/7/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Alfredo C. Marquez granting stipulation to extend time to answer by dft Nick & Jane Doe Novasic through 8/29/97 (cc: all counsel) (BAR) (Entered: 08/08/1997)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Alfredo C. Marquez granting stipulation that Wick Communications Co has until 8/25/97 to file an answer (cc: all counsel) (BAR) (Entered: 08/08/1997)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                            STIPULATION to ext time for answer by dft Nick & Jane Doe Novasic through 8/29/97 (BAR) (Entered: 08/08/1997)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                              STIPULATION to extend time for filing answer (BAR) (Entered: 08/06/1997)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED personally upon dft Wick Communications on 7/16/97 (BAR) (Entered: 07/25/1997)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED personally upon dft Nick Novasic on 7/19/97 (BAR) (Entered: 07/25/1997)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DEMAND for jury trial by pla's (BAR) (Entered: 07/16/1997)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT FILED (BAR) (Entered: 07/16/1997)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?