Pruitt et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oklahoma Western District Court, Case No. 5:13-cv-00726

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 25, 2016 at 9:13 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alan Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Alan Wilson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Wilson
No Logo Bill Schuette, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bill Schuette

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bill Schuette
No Logo Derek Schmidt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Derek Schmidt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derek Schmidt
No Logo Greg Abbott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greg Abbott

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Greg Abbott
No Logo John Swallow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by John E Swallow

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John E Swallow
No Logo Jon C Bruning, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jon Bruning

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon Bruning
No Logo Luther Strange, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Luther Strange

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luther Strange
No Logo Samuel S Olens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sam Olens

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sam Olens
No Logo Pruitt, Scott, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Scott Pruitt"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Alan Bates +1 405 522 1013 +1 405 522 0085 Tom.Bates@oag.ok.gov
Space Scott David Boughton +1 405 521 4274 +1 405 521 4518 fc_docket@oag.state.ok.us
Space Paul Clayton Eubanks +1 405 522 8992 +1 405 522 0608 clayton.eubanks@aog.ok.gov
Space E. Scott Pruitt +1 405 521 3921

Toggle Switch Represented by Seby Larsen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marian Camille Larsen +1 303 248 3779 mimi.larsen@sebylarsen.com
Space Paul M. Seby +1 303 248 3772 paul.seby@sebylarsen.com
No Logo Tom Horne, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tom C Horne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tom C Horne
No Logo Wayne Stenehjem, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wayne Stenehjem

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wayne Stenehjem
No Logo Wyoming State of, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jerde, Jay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay Jerde
v.
United States Environmental Protection Agency United States Environmental Protection Agency, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tamra Tyree Moore +1 202 514 8095 +1 202 616 8460 tamra.moore@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Schwartz +1 202 616 8267 +1 202 616 8202 james.schwartz@usdoj.gov
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
JUDGMENT - Pursuant to a separate order issued this same date, this action is hereby dismissed. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/18/2013. (ks) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
    ORDER granting 18 defendant's Motion to Dismiss and dismissing this action (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 12/18/2013. (ks) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
      REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Defendants. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
        ORDER granting 22 defendant's unopposed motion for extention of time to reply to plaintiffs' opposition to 18 defendant's motion to dismiss; Defendant shall file its reply on or before November 25, 2013. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 11/12/2013. (ks) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
          UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 Response in Opposition to Motion by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Schwartz, James) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
            RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit P. Clayton Eubanks)(Seby, Paul) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
              ORDER granting 19 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order Extending the Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file their response to defendants Motion to Dismiss on or before October 22, 2013. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 9/27/2013. (ks) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                FIRST MOTION for Extension of Time by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Seby, Paul) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None
                    ENTRY of Appearance by James J Schwartz on behalf of All Defendants (Schwartz, James) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None
                      ORDER granting 15 plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Order for Relief from Requirements of Local Civil Rules 83.2 and 83.3. The Attorneys General for plaintiffs States of Alabama, Arizona, Georgia, Kansas, Michigan, Nebraska, North Dakota, South Carolina, Texas, Utah, and Wyoming are relieved from complying with Local Civil Rules 83.2 and 83.3. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/26/2013. (ks) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                        UNOPPOSED MOTION for Order for Relief from Requirements of LCvR 83.2 and 83.3 and Brief in Support by Scott Pruitt. (Eubanks, Paul) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                          ORDER granting 13 defendant's Unopposed Motion for Order Extending the Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 17, 2013. Signed by Honorable Vicki Miles-LaGrange on 8/16/2013. (ks) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Moore, Tamra) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                              ENTRY of Appearance by Tamra T Moore on behalf of All Defendants (Moore, Tamra) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Scott Pruitt. Sanford C Coats served on 7/19/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Confirmation of Certified Delivery)(Eubanks, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Scott Pruitt. Eric H Holder, Jr served on 7/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Confirmation of Certified Delivery)(Eubanks, Paul) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Scott Pruitt. United States Environmental Protection Agency served on 7/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Return Receipt)(Eubanks, Paul) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                      Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (njr) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                        ENTRY of Appearance by Marian C Larsen on behalf of Scott Pruitt (Larsen, Marian) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None
                                          ENTRY of Appearance by Paul M Seby on behalf of Scott Pruitt (Seby, Paul) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                            Receipt for Money Received from Angie Brown on behalf of All Plaintiffs in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500033857 regarding 1 Complaint. (cpp) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                              ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Bates on behalf of Scott Pruitt (Bates, Thomas) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                ENTRY of Appearance by Paul C Eubanks on behalf of Scott Pruitt (Eubanks, Paul) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                  ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick R Wyrick on behalf of Scott Pruitt (Wyrick, Patrick) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                    COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against United States Environmental Protection Agency filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 2/6/13 FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - EPA Letter Denying Fee Waiver Request, # 3 Exhibit 3 FOIA Appeal of Fee Waiver Denial, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Email re Appeal Review, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Email re Appeal Review and Ext to 5/31/13, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Denial of Appeal of Fee Waiver, # 7 Exhibit 7 - EPA Emails, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(kw, ) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 1,116 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?