FindTheBest.com, Inc. v. Lumen View Technology LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06521

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo FindTheBest.com, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Daman L.L.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Keith Daman +1 267 934 6916 +1 462 645 0754 jeffrey.daman@damanllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Leventhal Law Firm, Apc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Samuel Leventhal +1 619 356 3518 +1 619 615 2082 jleventhal@leventhallaw.com
v.
No Logo Dalton Sentry, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Decision-Sorter LLC, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 through 50, Defendant
No Logo Eileen C. Shapiro, Defendant
No Logo Lumen View Technology, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Steven J. Mintz, Defendant
No Logo The Hillcrest Group Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Firm Name Change. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/1/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/1/2013 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Melissa Mormile, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 67 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL from 66 Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-9730755. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
          LREF
          Blank 66 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          OPINION & ORDER #104361: The Defendants' December 16 and December 23 motions to dismiss agree granted. The Clerk of Court shall close the case. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/19/2014) (gr) Modified on 5/22/2014 (ca). (Entered: 05/19/2014)
            LREF
            Blank 65 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Mark P. Goodman dated 3/31/14 re: Notification pursuant to the Court's Individual Practices In Civil Cases. Document filed by Decisionsorter, LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc..(Goodman, Mark) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Lumen View Technology LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6).. Document filed by Dalton Sentry, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Crisona, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6).. Document filed by Decisionsorter, LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc.. (Riehl, Carl) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 60 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint... Document filed by Lumen View Technology LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 2/19/2014 (db). (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Lumen View Technology LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 2/19/2014 (db). (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 59 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint served on Dalton Sentry LLC, Steven Mintz, Lumen View Technology LLC, The Hillcrest Group, Inc., DecisionSorter, LLC, Eileen Shapiro on 01/20/2014. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 01/20/2014)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/20/2014, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6)., 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint., 56 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6).. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 01/20/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6).. Document filed by Dalton Sentry, LLC. (Crisona, Richard) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 56 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6). Document filed by Dalton Sentry, LLC.(Crisona, Richard) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                LREF
                                Blank 55 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                DECLARATION of Carl Riehl in Support re: 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6).. Document filed by Decisionsorter, LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Riehl, Carl) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 54 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6).. Document filed by Decisionsorter, LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc.. (Riehl, Carl) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6). Document filed by Decisionsorter, LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc..(Riehl, Carl) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 51 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Lumen View Technology LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 51 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Document filed by Lumen View Technology LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 50 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 49 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to move to dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 12/4/2013) (gr) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 49 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to move to dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Compaint addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Mark P. Goodman dated 12/04/2013. Document filed by Decisionsorter, LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc..(Goodman, Mark) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 48 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Amended Complaint served on Steven J. Mintz on 11/22/2013. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 47 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Amended Complaint served on Eileen C. Shapiro on 11/22/2013. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Amended Complaint served on The Hillcrest Group, Inc. on 11/22/2013. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Amended Complaint served on Decisionsorter, LLC on 11/22/2013. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Amended Complaint served on Dalton Sentry, LLC on 11/22/2013. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Amended Complaint served on Stamatios Stamoulis on 11/22/2013. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                          FIRST BRIEF Amended Complaint. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Patent, # 2 Aeton Letter)(Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: Pursuant to a conference of November 1, 2013, it is hereby ORDERED that if plaintiff wishes to amend the complaint in response to the defendants' motions to dismiss, the plaintiff must do so by 11/22/2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the plaintiff wishes to oppose the motions to dismiss, any opposition is due by 11/22/2013. Any reply is due by 12/13/2013. At the time any Reply is served the moving party shall supply two courtesy copies of all motion papers to Chambers by mail or delivery to the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery in this litigation is stayed pending resolution of the defendants' motions to dismiss this case. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/1/2013) (gr) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 39 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Dalton Sentry, LLC to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6).. Document filed by Dalton Sentry, LLC. (Rambaud, Dennis) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion of Defendant Dalton Sentry, LLC to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(B)(6). Document filed by Dalton Sentry, LLC.(Rambaud, Dennis) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 37 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Decisionsorter, LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc.. (Goodman, Mark) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Decisionsorter, LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Complaint Part 1), # 2 Exhibit (Complaint Part 2))(Goodman, Mark) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis Andrew Rambaud on behalf of Dalton Sentry, LLC. (Rambaud, Dennis) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard L. Crisona on behalf of Dalton Sentry, LLC. (Crisona, Richard) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Adam Berger on behalf of Dalton Sentry, LLC. (Berger, David) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: On October 30, 2013, the defendants filed a motion to dismiss this case. It is hereby ORDERED that any opposition is due by 11/15/2013. Any reply is due by 11/22/2013. At the time any Reply is served the moving party shall supply two courtesy copies of all motion papers to Chambers by mail or delivery to the U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/30/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carl Riehl on behalf of Decisionsorter, LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc.. (Riehl, Carl) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark P. Goodman on behalf of Decisionsorter, LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc.. (Goodman, Mark) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  DECLARATION in Support re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Lumen View Technology LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Lumen View Technology LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Lumen View Technology LLC. Responses due by 11/12/2013 Return Date set for 11/12/2013 at 12:00 PM.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons In A Civil Action served on Steven J. Mintz on 10/02/2013. Service was accepted by Steven J. Mintz. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          STIPULATION EXTENDING ALL DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. Dalton Sentry, LLC answer due 10/31/2013; Decisionsorter, LLC answer due 10/31/2013; Lumen View Technology LLC answer due 10/31/2013; Steven J. Mintz answer due 10/31/2013; Eileen C. Shapiro answer due 10/31/2013; The Hillcrest Group, Inc. answer due 10/31/2013. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 10/15/2013) (gr) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Mark P. Goodman dated October 11, 2013 re: transmittal of courtesy copy of stipulation already submitted this date to the Orders & Judgment Clerk. Document filed by Decisionsorter, LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc..(Goodman, Mark) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE served on Lumen View Technology, LLC on September 24, 2013. Service was accepted by Darsey Bernabe, Authorized Person to Accept Service. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons In A Civil Action served on Dalton Sentry, LLC on September 24, 2013. Service was accepted by Paul Mathews, Process Specialist for Corporation Service Company. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013 Letter
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 6
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          FIRST MOTION for Joseph S. Leventhal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-8892881. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Supplement Certificate of the Clerk of the Supreme Court of the State of California)(Leventhal, Joseph) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ("NOTICE"): Initial Conference set for 10/4/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. Please follow the procedures described in the Notice. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/19/2013) (gr) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Dalton Sentry, LLC, Decisionsorter, LLC, Does 1 through 50, Lumen View Technology LLC, Steven J. Mintz, Eileen C. Shapiro, The Hillcrest Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401076863)Document filed by FindTheBest.com, Inc.(jom) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 260 times.

                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?