IN RE: Wright Medical Technology, Inc., Conserve Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:12-md-02329
District Judge William S. Duffey, JR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 2:45 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alan M. Morales, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com
No Logo Alexander Petrovic, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 303

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth P. Kagan +1 239 466 1161 +1 239 466 7226 liz@kagan-law.com
No Logo Alvera Wheeler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Amber Wagner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker & Waichman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C Burke +1 516 466 6500 +1 516 466 6665 dburke@yourlawyer.com
No Logo Amy Fine, Plaintiff
No Logo Ana Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by VAN WEY LAW

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kay L. Van Wey +1 214 329 1350 +1 800 582 1042 kay@vanweylaw.com
No Logo Andlle Naeter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Houssiere Durant Houssiere, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Rene Houssiere, III +1 713 626 3700 +1 713 626 3709 choussiere@hdhtex.com
No Logo Andrew Maizner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey D. Eisenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D. Eisenberg

Toggle Switch Represented by Parkside Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan P. Kendell +1 801 366 9100 jkendell@egclegal.com
No Logo Angela Pokorny, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Angela Y. Warren, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Angelia Moore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Houssiere Durant Houssiere, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Rene Houssiere, III +1 713 626 3700 +1 713 626 3709 choussiere@hdhtex.com
TERMINATED: 05/14/2014 Neeley G. Morgan +1 713 626 3700 +1 713 626 3709 nmorgan@hdhtex.com
No Logo Angelika Black, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Talley +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 stalley@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Anita McGrady, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dugan Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Robert Plymale +1 504 648 0180 +1 504 648 0181 dplymale@dugan-lawfirm.com
No Logo Ann Fillmore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Brooks Cutter +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 bcutter@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Ann Spencer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary Lowe +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 pete@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Anna L. Workman, Plaintiff
No Logo Anna Risilia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Anne L. Dickerson, Plaintiff
No Logo Annette Childs, Plaintiff
No Logo Anthony Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Capretz and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James T Capretz +1 949 724 3000 +1 949 757 2635 jcapretz@capretz.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don K Ledgard +1 949 724 3000 +1 949 757 2635 dledgard@capretz.com
No Logo Arthur, Bruce, Plaintiff
No Logo Arthur E. Elliott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Authelia Gallman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Loncar & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian U. Loncar +1 214 747 0422 +1 469 484 7184 jcoveney@brianloncar.com
No Logo Bacilio L. Trujillo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Barbara A. Alexander, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendleton, Friedberg, Wilson & Hennessey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com
No Logo Barbara Joann Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Barbara Truelick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Houssiere Durant Houssiere, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Charles Rene Houssiere, III +1 713 626 3700 +1 713 626 3709 choussiere@hdhtex.com
No Logo Barbara Woodley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Simon Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan A. Keane +1 314 241 2929 +1 314 241 2029 rkeane@simonlawpc.com
No Logo Barry A. Cochran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ladendorf.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy F. Devereux +1 317 842 5800 Tim@Ladendorf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lance R. Ladendorf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance R. Ladendorf
No Logo Barry Mang, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker & Waichman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C Burke +1 516 466 6500 +1 516 466 6665 dburke@yourlawyer.com
No Logo Barry Wilk, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Beatrice Rotondi, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurley McKenna & Mertz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Mertz +1 312 553 4900 mike@hurley-law.com
No Logo Ben Fillmore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Brooks Cutter +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 bcutter@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Ben Sanders, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Benjamin Eisenberg, Plaintiff
No Logo Betty L. Hall, Plaintiff
No Logo Betty Moore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Beverly A. Wagner, Plaintiff
No Logo Beverly Marshall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Richardson Patrick Westbrook & Brickman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Brickman , +1 843 727 6520 +1 843 727 3103 mbrickman@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina H. Fields +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 nfields@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Keevers Palmer +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 kkeevers@rpwb.com
No Logo Beverly Morrison, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 704

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED B.A. Tyler +1 248 458 6600 assist@tyler-legal.com
No Logo Billie Chlo Scheel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush & Rottier, S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Anthony Rottier +1 608 255 6663
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter M Young +1 414 271 0900

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush, Davis & Rottier

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Jaskulski +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 rjaskulski@habush.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy S. Trecek +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 ttrecek@habush.com
No Logo Billy Eugene Cox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/18/2012 William B. Raiford, III +1 662 627 9641

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Billy Marshall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Richardson Patrick Westbrook & Brickman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Brickman , +1 843 727 6520 +1 843 727 3103 mbrickman@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina H. Fields +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 nfields@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Keevers Palmer +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 kkeevers@rpwb.com
No Logo Billy Thomas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/29/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie A. Conzo +1 954 467 8800 +1 954 523 4803 VConzo@schlesingerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles B. Patrick +1 954 320 9507 +1 954 320 9509 CPatrick@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Bobbie Patterson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Bobby Gene Horine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Bobby J. Proctor, Plaintiff
No Logo Bobby Reppond, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bobby Dean Davidson +1 501 551 3649 +1 501 379 8462 bob.davidson@sbcglobal.net
No Logo Brad G. Warren, Plaintiff
No Logo Bradley N. Tufts, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly Dolejsi +1 612 349 8295 hhdolejsi@rkmc.com
TERMINATED: 08/13/2014 Vincent J Moccio +1 612 349 8754 +1 612 339 4181 vjmoccio@rkmc.com
No Logo Brenda Shores, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sommers, Schwartz, Silver & Schwartz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B. Sickels +1 248 355 0300 +1 248 746 4001 rsickels@sommerspc.com
No Logo Brenda Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bachus & Schanker, LLC-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jere Kyle Bachus +1 303 893 9800 +1 303 893 9900 kbachus@coloradolaw.net
No Logo Brian K. Dameron, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Doyle Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Victor Doyle, Jr. +1 205 533 9500 +1 205 332 1362 jimmy@doylefirm.com
No Logo Brian M. Day, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Johnson. Larson & Schaller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas G. Schaller +1 541 484 2434 +1 541 484 0882 dschaller@jclslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michele C. Smith +1 541 484 2434 +1 541 484 0882 msmith@jjlslaw.com
No Logo Brian McCormick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Jeffrey S. Glassman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D'Isola +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Glassman +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 jeff@jeffreysglassman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T. Naumes, Jr. +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 bnaumes@jeffreysglassman.com
No Logo Brian Riedell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Baughman +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 lbaughman@baronbudd.com
No Logo Bruce MacGurn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Bruce Stevenson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Carl Prange, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Walker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Hubbard Saunders +1 727 579 4500 +1 727 577 9696 joe@saunderslawyers.com
No Logo Carl Proehl, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C Brooks Cutter +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 bcutter@kcrlegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kerrie D. Webb +1 916 448 9800 kwebb@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Carlodina J. Cruz, Plaintiff
No Logo Carmela Barone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DAVIS, SAPERSTEIN & SALOMON, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TERRENCE SMITH +1 201 907 5000 tsmith@dsslaw.com
No Logo Carol Hutchinson, Plaintiff
No Logo Carol Setterdahl, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Carol Sue Meyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carol Sue Meyer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carol Sue Meyer
No Logo Carol Teig, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartimus Frickleton Robertson & Gorny, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk J. Goza +1 913 451 3433 +1 913 273 0509 kgoza@bflawfirm.com
No Logo Carole Kearn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCune Wright LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2012 Kristy M Arevalo +1 909 335 1250 +1 909 557 1275 kma@mwtriallawyers.com
No Logo Carolyn Sheets, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Carolyn Zackin, Plaintiff
No Logo Catherine Allen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don P. McKenna +1 205 328 5330 +1 205 324 2165 don@hwnn.com
No Logo Cathleen Claussenius, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Houssiere Durant Houssiere, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Rene Houssiere, III +1 713 626 3700 +1 713 626 3709 choussiere@hdhtex.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neeley G. Morgan +1 713 626 3700 +1 713 626 3709 nmorgan@hdhtex.com
No Logo Cathy Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cathy Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cathy Adams
No Logo Cathy MacGurn, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Cathy Ryan, Plaintiff
No Logo Cecil Burnett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cecil Burnett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cecil Burnett
No Logo Cecilia Schmidt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Celeste Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Celeste Johnson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Celeste Johnson
No Logo Celia E. Cox, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Edwin Shirko, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Charles Hutchinson, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Palmer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Charles Plungis, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles Schwartz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Charles Schwartz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Schwartz
No Logo Charles Speed, Plaintiff
No Logo Charles W. Buettenmuller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Walker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Hubbard Saunders +1 727 579 4500 +1 727 577 9696 joe@saunderslawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen I Leshner PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen I Leshner +1 602 266 9000 +1 602 266 9134 steve@steveleshner.com
No Logo Cheri A. Meyerhofer, Plaintiff
No Logo Cheri Dees, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill L. Cassert +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 350 5840 jillcassert@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Jean Johnson +1 404 523 7706 +1 404 524 1648 kimjohnson@pmkm.com
No Logo Cherie M. Hanks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eisenberg Gilchrist & Cutt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D. Eisenberg +1 801 366 9100 +1 801 350 0065

Toggle Switch Represented by Parkside Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan P. Kendell +1 801 366 9100 jkendell@egclegal.com
No Logo Cheryl D. Yoakum, Plaintiff
No Logo Cheryl K. Doebrick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Cheryl K. Prange, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Walker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Hubbard Saunders +1 727 579 4500 +1 727 577 9696 joe@saunderslawyers.com
No Logo Cheryl Lachance, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Christa Poindexter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Baughman +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 lbaughman@baronbudd.com
No Logo Christine Catherine Brooks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 303

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth P. Kagan +1 239 466 1161 +1 239 466 7226 liz@kagan-law.com
No Logo Christine Minton, Plaintiff
No Logo Christine Piper, Plaintiff
No Logo Christine Powell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Christopher J. Tsaltas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary Lowe +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 pete@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Clifton Short, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Cne' Seals, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Joseph Preuss +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tjpreuss@wcllp.com
No Logo Coleman Jarrett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Legal Services, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Charles Lewis +1 317 623 3030 +1 317 623 3062 cmecf.lewislegal@live.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Alan Travers +1 540 672 4224 +6723 672 672 3055 jtravers@millerfirmllc.com
No Logo Colleen Amirr, Plaintiff
No Logo Corey S. Barnard, Plaintiff
No Logo Craig A. Proffitt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Craig Steven Wilkinson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Chester Wilkinson +1 614 224 6527 +1 614 224 6529 wilkinwc@hotmail.com
No Logo Cresencio DeJesus, Plaintiff
No Logo Cynthia Gandy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo D. Scott McIntosh, Plaintiff
No Logo Dale Yocum, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann & Potter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ted L. Mann +1 205 879 9661 +1 205 879 9663 ted@mannpotter.com
No Logo Dan Offrell, Plaintiff
No Logo Danny L. James, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DAVIS, SAPERSTEIN & SALOMON, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TERRENCE SMITH +1 201 907 5000 tsmith@dsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/2012 Wallace E. Harrell, III +1 912 279 1010 +1 912 264 0453 weh@wallaceharrelllaw.com
No Logo Danny Ray Allen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Beasley Allen Crow Methvin Portis & Miles, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Navan Ward, Jr. +1 334 269 2343 +1 334 954 7555 navan.ward@beasleyallen.com
No Logo Darius Perez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartimus Frickleton Robertson & Gorny, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk J. Goza +1 913 451 3433 +1 913 273 0509 kgoza@bflawfirm.com
No Logo Darrell Hirsch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Vujasinovic & Beckcom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Augustus Beckcom +1 713 224 7800 +1 713 224 7801 brian@vbattorneys.com
No Logo Darren Peterson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Darren Peterson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darren Peterson
No Logo Dave Currens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dave Currens
No Logo David A. Sylvester, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DEBRINCAT PADGETT KOBLISKA & ZICK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Zick +1 248 489 1447 +1 248 489 1453 jzick@dpkzlaw.com
No Logo David Albright, Plaintiff
No Logo David Barton, Plaintiff
No Logo David, Burns, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com
No Logo David Dockerty, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo David F. Piper, Plaintiff
No Logo David Herold, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Richardson Patrick Westbrook & Brickman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Brickman , +1 843 727 6520 +1 843 727 3103 mbrickman@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina H. Fields +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 nfields@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Keevers Palmer +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 kkeevers@rpwb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of David L. Hood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Hood +1 843 527 8010 +1 843 436 3330
No Logo David Ishmael, Plaintiff
No Logo David Kirkley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo David L. Bonham, Plaintiff
No Logo David L. Mulcahy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Cleere +1 631 224 1133 tcleere@napolibern.com
No Logo David L. Ranson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo David L. Summers, Plaintiff
No Logo David Lavares, Plaintiff
No Logo David R. Leitner, Plaintiff
No Logo David True, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston and Cashatt, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Trevor Howard +1 509 838 6131 +1 509 838 1416 mth@winstoncashatt.com
No Logo Dawn Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Dayl Waters, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Deborah Aldrich, Plaintiff
No Logo Deborah L. Giasson, Plaintiff
No Logo Deborah Lee Tymer, Plaintiff
No Logo Deborah Newton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lanier Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Cordella +1 212 421 2800 +1 212 421 2878
No Logo Debra Korszeniewski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Panish +1 310 477 1700 +1 310 477 1699
No Logo Debra Schneiderman, Plaintiff
No Logo Delbert Solsma, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Delores Thames, Plaintiff
No Logo Denise Calzada, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Khorrami Pollard & Abrir LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bahar Dejban +1 213 596 6000 +1 213 596 6010 bdejban@kbsslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn Khorrami , +1 213 596 6000 +1 213 596 6010 skhorrami@kpalawyers.com
No Logo Denise Carnegie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Denise Davis-Reno, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Odner, Shelton, O'Leary & Peterson, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James G. Onder +1 314 963 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by Onder, Shelton et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS +1 314 963 9000 rados@onderlaw.com
No Logo Denise Kabisch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sommers, Schwartz, Silver & Schwartz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B. Sickels +1 248 355 0300 +1 248 746 4001 rsickels@sommerspc.com
No Logo Dennis Abts, Plaintiff
No Logo Dennis Christensen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Dennis M. Doyle, Plaintiff
No Logo Diana C. Cochran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lance R. Ladendorf

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy F. Devereux +1 317 842 5800 Tim@Ladendorf.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lance R. Ladendorf
No Logo Diana Taylor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Khorrami Pollard & Abrir LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fontaine Yuk +1 310 854 4444 +1 310 854 0812 fyuk@kbsslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kiesel Boucher & Larson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven D Archer +1 310 854 4444 +1 310 854 0812 archer@kbla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Paul Boucher +1 310 854 4444 +1 310 854 0812 boucher@kbla.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Robert Kiesel +1 310 854 4444 +1 310 854 0812 kiesel@kbla.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Peters +1 310 854 4444 +1 310 854 0812 thom.peters@lacity.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen E Zukin +1 310 854 4444 +1 310 854 0812 zukin@kbla.com
No Logo Diane C. Sylvester, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DEBRINCAT PADGETT KOBLISKA & ZICK

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Zick +1 248 489 1447 +1 248 489 1453 jzick@dpkzlaw.com
No Logo Diane Deville, Plaintiff
No Logo Diane Gebhart, Plaintiff
No Logo Diane Lattimore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Diane Plungis, Plaintiff
No Logo Dianna Kirkley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Dianne A. Hall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 303

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth P. Kagan +1 239 466 1161 +1 239 466 7226 liz@kagan-law.com
No Logo Dierdre Williamson, Plaintiff
No Logo Diona Davis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bachus & Schanker, LLC-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jere Kyle Bachus +1 303 893 9800 +1 303 893 9900 kbachus@coloradolaw.net
No Logo Dolores Lentine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dolores Lentine
No Logo Don Palow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berke & Lubell, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bill B. Berke +1 239 549 6689 +1 239 549 3331 berkelaw@yahoo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pogust, Braslow, & Millrood, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek T Braslow +1 610 941 4204 +1 610 941 4245 dbraslow@pbmattorneys.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bharati O. Sharma +1 610 941 4204 +1 610 941 4245 bsharma@pbmattorneys.com
No Logo Donald Bonkosky, Plaintiff
No Logo Donald Bowers, Plaintiff
No Logo Donald Friend, Plaintiff
No Logo Donald Gobel, Plaintiff
No Logo Donald Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Loncar & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian U. Loncar +1 214 747 0422 +1 469 484 7184 jcoveney@brianloncar.com
No Logo Donald Roberts, Plaintiff
No Logo Donald Schneiderman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bachus & Schanker, LLC-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jere Kyle Bachus +1 303 893 9800 +1 303 893 9900 kbachus@coloradolaw.net
No Logo Donna M. Lalk, Plaintiff
No Logo Doris Jean Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com
No Logo Dorothea McCormick, Plaintiff
No Logo Dorothy Ann Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendleton, Friedberg, Wilson & Hennessey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas R. Rockforte +1 225 687 6396 nrockforte@pbc1awfirm.com
No Logo Dorothy Bruce, Plaintiff
No Logo Dorothy J. Hardy, Plaintiff
No Logo Dorothy Jean Barnhouse, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Odner, Shelton, O'Leary & Peterson, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James G. Onder +1 314 963 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by Onder, Shelton et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS +1 314 963 9000 rados@onderlaw.com
No Logo Douglas Armstrong, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Jeffrey S. Glassman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D'Isola +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Glassman +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 jeff@jeffreysglassman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T. Naumes, Jr. +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 bnaumes@jeffreysglassman.com
No Logo Douglas Feld, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Duane Robbins, Plaintiff
No Logo Duke Spitzer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Earl Douglas Skaggs, Plaintiff
No Logo Edgar Ray Satterthwait, Plaintiff
No Logo Edith Carnes, Plaintiff
No Logo Edna Lopez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Edward C. Rainville, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus W. Viles +1 239 334 3933 +1 239 334 7105
No Logo Edward J. Cherveny, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com
No Logo Edward Rubin, Plaintiff
No Logo Elaine Albright, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wilcoxen, Daniel +1 916 442 2777

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilcoxen Callahan Montgomery & Deacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn A. Gyermek +1 916 442 2777 cgyermek@wilcoxenlaw.com
No Logo Eleda Cohen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Aarons Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin Isaac Aarons +1 818 304 2719 +1 818 302 2072 maarons@aaronslawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Vartazarian Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steve R. Vartazarian +1 818 990 9949 +1 818 990 6124 steve@thevlf.com
No Logo Elie M. Mims, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson, Kraeuter & Dunn, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/13/2012 Robert Scot Kraeuter +1 912 721 9844 +1 912 721 9849 scot@johnsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brent J. Savage

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/22/2012 Ashleigh Ruth Madison +1 912 231 1140 +1 912 231 0133 amadison@savagelawfirm.net
No Logo Eliel Cruz, Plaintiff
No Logo Elizabeth S. Neily, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey D. Eisenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey D. Eisenberg

Toggle Switch Represented by Parkside Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan P. Kendell +1 801 366 9100 jkendell@egclegal.com
No Logo Elizabeth Stone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Ella Reed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Victor Ayala +1 302 622 7112 tayala@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by M. Elizabeth Graham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Elizabeth Graham
No Logo Emma Jean Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 705

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlos G. Galliani +1 214 301 3400 +1 817 345 3522 cg@cgallianilaw.com
No Logo Enid Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Eric B. Snitkoff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/2012 Franklin R. Brussow +1 801 944 1065 ryngade@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Walton Walker, III +1 706 324 0050 +1 706 327 1536 wallywalker@pmkm.com
No Logo Eric C. Johnson, Plaintiff
No Logo Ernest Cummings, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Evelyn Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Evelyn Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Evelyn Pacheco, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendleton, Friedberg, Wilson & Hennessey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas R. Rockforte +1 225 687 6396 nrockforte@pbc1awfirm.com
No Logo Fabian Guillen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker & Waichman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C Burke +1 516 466 6500 +1 516 466 6665 dburke@yourlawyer.com
No Logo Farhad Shatti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Talley +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 stalley@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Floren Shivitz, Plaintiff
No Logo Florence Christensen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo France Clausen, Plaintiff
No Logo Frances C. Perkins, Plaintiff
No Logo Frances Harmon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson Crowder & DeGaris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley Hodges DeGaris +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 adegaris@cwcd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr. +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 ddellaccio@cwcd.com
No Logo Frances Sobek, Plaintiff
No Logo Frances Stagner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Frances Zeigler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Francine Degenhardt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush & Rottier, S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Anthony Rottier +1 608 255 6663
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter M Young +1 414 271 0900

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush, Davis & Rottier

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Jaskulski +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 rjaskulski@habush.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy S. Trecek +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 ttrecek@habush.com
No Logo Francine Mecca Jonas, Plaintiff
No Logo Frank L. Zwald, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schklar Wright & Henderson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Usher Wright +1 404 888 0100 rwright@robertwrightlaw.net
No Logo Frank Marin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Houssiere Durant Houssiere, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Rene Houssiere, III +1 713 626 3700 +1 713 626 3709 choussiere@hdhtex.com
No Logo Franklin Lester, Plaintiff
No Logo Fred Braasch, Plaintiff
No Logo Fred W. Fewell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fred W. Fewell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fred W. Fewell
No Logo Frederick W. Jones, Plaintiff
No Logo Fritz Karl Schmidt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Gabriella Mulcahy, Plaintiff
No Logo Gaetano Aiello, Plaintiff
No Logo Gail Jansen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert R. Cloar +1 478 783 1186 +1 479 783 1187
No Logo Gene Allan Presler, Plaintiff
No Logo Gene Arnold, Plaintiff
No Logo Gene Christiansen, Plaintiff
No Logo Genevieve Erin Wilkinson, Plaintiff
No Logo George A. Soderman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo George Albert Williamson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson Crowder & DeGaris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley Hodges DeGaris +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 adegaris@cwcd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr. +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 ddellaccio@cwcd.com
No Logo George David Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bell Legal Group, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron S. Jophlin +1 843 546 2408 +1 843 546 9604

Toggle Switch Represented by J Edward Bell III Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Edward Bell +1 843 546 2408 +1 843 546 9604 ebell@edbelllaw.com
No Logo George Fry, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Gerald Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gerald Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald Adams
No Logo Gerald Case, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Gerald G. Case, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Gerald Gubanski, Plaintiff
No Logo Gerald Soda, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew R. Mendelsohn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R. Mendelsohn
No Logo Gerald Zackin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Searcy Denney Scarola Barnhart & Shipley, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda S. Fulmer +1 561 686 6300 +1 561 383 9498 bsf@searcylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clell Calvin Warriner, III +1 561 686 6300 +6150 615 615 0915 ccw@searcylaw.com
No Logo Geraldine Mouyios, Plaintiff
No Logo Gina Bianckino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Maloney & Campolo, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/12/2012 Tim Maloney +1 210 922 2200 +1 210 923 1313 tmaloney@yahoo.com
No Logo Gina Friend, Plaintiff
No Logo Ginger Davis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Talley +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 stalley@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Giovanni Barone, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DAVIS, SAPERSTEIN & SALOMON, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TERRENCE SMITH +1 201 907 5000 tsmith@dsslaw.com
No Logo Glen Graves, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Capretz and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James T Capretz +1 949 724 3000 +1 949 757 2635 jcapretz@capretz.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don K Ledgard +1 949 724 3000 +1 949 757 2635 dledgard@capretz.com
No Logo Glenda G Walter, Plaintiff
No Logo Gloria Hollenbeck, Plaintiff
No Logo Glynn Zeigler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Gordon Thrall, Plaintiff
No Logo Grace Zimmerman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PETERSON & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Peterson +1 816 531 4440 +1 816 531 0660 dmp@petersonlawfirm.com
No Logo Greg M. Spalding, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Walker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Hubbard Saunders +1 727 579 4500 +1 727 577 9696 joe@saunderslawyers.com
No Logo Gregory Rothmere Hamlin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Guy P. Giasson, Plaintiff
No Logo Happy Harrington, Plaintiff
No Logo Harold L. Graves, Plaintiff
No Logo Harold Summers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don P. McKenna +1 205 328 5330 +1 205 324 2165 don@hwnn.com
No Logo Harry D Kinard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parham , Smith & Archenhold, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Jones +1 864 990 4581 +1 864 271 6155

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Blakely, Jr. +1 770 822 0900 +1 770 822 9680 mjblakely@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Harry Jacobs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by RIEDERS, TRAVIS, HUMPHREY, HARRIS, WATERS & WAFFENSCHMIDT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford Alan Rieders +1 570 323 8711 +1 570 567 1025 crieders@riederstravis.com
No Logo Harry Sakjas, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Zakaria Mahdi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kassem M. Dakhlallah +1 313 846 6400 +1 313 846 3200 kassemdakhlallah@aol.com
No Logo Harvey Arnold, Plaintiff
No Logo Heather A. Musmanno, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Helen Crocker-Pope, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sundeep S. Grewal +1 713 425 7100 +1 713 425 7101

Toggle Switch Represented by Bailey, Perrin & Bailey, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam D. Peavy +1 713 425 7100 +1 713 425 7101 apeavy@bpblaw.com
No Logo Helen Morales, Plaintiff
No Logo Helen R. Hribar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Helen Soda, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew R. Mendelsohn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew R. Mendelsohn
No Logo Hendrick Meuzelaar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio, Christopher and Toale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilyas Sayeg +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042
No Logo Henry Earl O'Cain, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Henry Gross, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Houssiere Durant Houssiere, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Rene Houssiere, III +1 713 626 3700 +1 713 626 3709 choussiere@hdhtex.com
No Logo Henry R. Hooker, Plaintiff
No Logo Herman Phillips, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson Crowder & DeGaris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley Hodges DeGaris +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 adegaris@cwcd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr. +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 ddellaccio@cwcd.com
No Logo Hilda Blount, Plaintiff
No Logo Hiram Glenn, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise A. Vinet +1 225 928 8800 +1 225 928 8802

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Law Firm, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peyton Patrick Murphy +1 225 928 8800 pmurphy@murphylfirm.com
No Logo Hope Briggs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hope Briggs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hope Briggs
No Logo Hope C. Vogel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Walker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Hubbard Saunders +1 727 579 4500 +1 727 577 9696 joe@saunderslawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen I Leshner PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen I Leshner +1 602 266 9000 +1 602 266 9134 steve@steveleshner.com
No Logo Horace Dewayne Morgan, Plaintiff
No Logo Irwin Hoffman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Irwin Rosmarin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Teal, Montgomery & Henderson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S. Henderson +1 707 525 1212 mhenderson@teallaw.com
No Logo Jace Dees, Plaintiff
No Logo Jackie Wallace, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Walker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Hubbard Saunders +1 727 579 4500 +1 727 577 9696 joe@saunderslawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephen I Leshner PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen I Leshner +1 602 266 9000 +1 602 266 9134 steve@steveleshner.com
No Logo Jacqueline A. Hoffman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Jacqueline Ames, Plaintiff
No Logo Jacqueline Ann Stanley Tumey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jacqueline Ann Stanley Tumey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacqueline Ann Stanley Tumey
No Logo James Henry Garcia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo James Aldrich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 Stephen C. Ryan +1 480 661 3977 +1 480 661 3997
No Logo James Button, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bachus & Schanker, LLC-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jere Kyle Bachus +1 303 893 9800 +1 303 893 9900 kbachus@coloradolaw.net
No Logo James Carter Hamilton, Plaintiff
No Logo James Dirk Owens, Plaintiff
No Logo JAMES E. DAVIS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bachus & Schanker, LLC-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jere Kyle Bachus +1 303 893 9800 +1 303 893 9900 kbachus@coloradolaw.net
No Logo James Fields, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bobby Dean Davidson +1 501 551 3649 +1 501 379 8462 bob.davidson@sbcglobal.net
No Logo James G. Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo James Harris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartimus Frickleton Robertson & Gorny, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk J. Goza +1 913 451 3433 +1 913 273 0509 kgoza@bflawfirm.com
No Logo James Igoe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roy M. Doppelt +1 858 618 5510 +1 858 615 5511

Toggle Switch Represented by Verhine &Verhine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED E. Scott Verhine +1 601 636 0791
No Logo James, Jensen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DRIGGS BILLS & DAY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Tullis +1 801 363 9982 dtullis@lawdbd.com
No Logo James Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by James Johnson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Johnson
No Logo James L. Yarbrough, Plaintiff
No Logo James Stagner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo James Stogner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Law Firm, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peyton Patrick Murphy +1 225 928 8800 pmurphy@murphylfirm.com
No Logo James Tice, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bowersox Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey A. Bowersox +1 503 452 5858 +1 503 525 4833 jeffrey@blfpc.com
No Logo James Townsend, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendleton, Friedberg, Wilson & Hennessey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas R. Rockforte +1 225 687 6396 nrockforte@pbc1awfirm.com
No Logo James V. Holmes, Plaintiff
No Logo James Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendleton, Friedberg, Wilson & Hennessey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas R. Rockforte +1 225 687 6396 nrockforte@pbc1awfirm.com
No Logo James Wyly Watts, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Jammie McCovery, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Loncar & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian U. Loncar +1 214 747 0422 +1 469 484 7184 jcoveney@brianloncar.com
No Logo Jan Proehl, Plaintiff
No Logo Jane Duke, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise A. Vinet +1 225 928 8800 +1 225 928 8802

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Law Firm, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peyton Patrick Murphy +1 225 928 8800 pmurphy@murphylfirm.com
No Logo Jane Sprecher, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DAVIS, SAPERSTEIN & SALOMON, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TERRENCE SMITH +1 201 907 5000 tsmith@dsslaw.com
No Logo Janell Foster Bryson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Janet M. Gunter, Plaintiff
No Logo Janet Pommrehn, Plaintiff
No Logo Janice L. Hall, Plaintiff
No Logo Janne C. Gregoire, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Walker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Hubbard Saunders +1 727 579 4500 +1 727 577 9696 joe@saunderslawyers.com
No Logo Jean B. Hastings, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Anthony Rottier +1 608 255 6663 +1 608 255 0745

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush, Davis & Rottier

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Jaskulski +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 rjaskulski@habush.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy S. Trecek +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 ttrecek@habush.com
No Logo Jeanine Thrall, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeanne M. Schifano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Jeannie E. Presler, Plaintiff
No Logo Jeannie Lansdell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Talley +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 stalley@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Jeffery Butler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Jeffrey E. Butler, Plaintiff
No Logo Jennifer Murin, Plaintiff
No Logo Jerry Dennard, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clark Dean & Burnette GP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clayton A. Clark +1 713 757 1400 +1 713 759 1217 cclark@triallawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Love +1 713 757 1400 +1 713 759 1217 slove@triallawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Vaughan +1 713 757 1400 jvaughan@triallawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Markland Hanley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D Green +1 713 654 9222 +1 713 654 2155 green@greentexas.net
No Logo Jerry French, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Jerry L. Johnson , Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendleton, Friedberg, Wilson & Hennessey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas R. Rockforte +1 225 687 6396 nrockforte@pbc1awfirm.com
No Logo Jerry Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Jerry Trimble, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bachus & Schanker, LLC-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jere Kyle Bachus +1 303 893 9800 +1 303 893 9900 kbachus@coloradolaw.net
No Logo Jimmie Lee Baker, Plaintiff
No Logo Jimmy Horton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lanier Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Cordella +1 212 421 2800 +1 212 421 2878
No Logo Jo Dawn Danley, Plaintiff
No Logo Joan Arnold, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Simons & Slattery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David F. Miceli +1 404 915 8886 +1 618 259 2251 dmiceli@simonsfirm.com
No Logo Joan M. Leitner, Plaintiff
No Logo Joann Case, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Joann Daskivich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HANDLER HENNING & ROSENBERG LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory M. Feather +1 717 238 2000 +1 717 233 3029
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID H. ROSENBERG
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew P. Rosenberg +1 717 238 2000 +1 717 233 3029

Toggle Switch Represented by Pogust, Braslow, & Millrood, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek T Braslow +1 610 941 4204 +1 610 941 4245 dbraslow@pbmattorneys.com
No Logo Joanne P. Porter, Plaintiff
No Logo Joe A. Cienfuegos, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fine Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Fine +1 505 243 4541 +2422 242 242 2716 David@thefinelawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charlotte L. Itoh +1 505 243 4541 +1 505 242 2716 Charlotte@thefinelawfirm.com
No Logo Joe Council, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendleton, Friedberg, Wilson & Hennessey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas R. Rockforte +1 225 687 6396 nrockforte@pbc1awfirm.com
No Logo Joe F. Lopez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Joey Daigle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise A. Vinet +1 225 928 8800 +1 225 928 8802

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Law Firm, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peyton Patrick Murphy +1 225 928 8800 pmurphy@murphylfirm.com
No Logo John Calvin White, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kevin P. Riche, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin P. Riche +1 504 486 4343 +1 504 297 1249 kevin@johnsileolaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John D. Sileo +1 504 486 4343 +1 504 297 1249 jack@johnsileolaw.com
No Logo John Borg, Plaintiff
No Logo John C. Jurgerson, Plaintiff
No Logo John Campbell, Plaintiff
No Logo John Christy, Plaintiff
No Logo John E. Burger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of HECTOR EDUARDO PEDROSA LUNA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gary Harold Burger +1 602 291 4805 garyburger53@gmail.com
No Logo John Ming, Plaintiff
No Logo John Otey, Plaintiff
No Logo JOHN PAYNE, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Placer Sierra Bancshares

Toggle Switch Represented by CAREY & DANIS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J Rosemergy +1 312 649 0100 jrosemergy@careydanis.com
No Logo John Roberts, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendleton, Friedberg, Wilson & Hennessey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas R. Rockforte +1 225 687 6396 nrockforte@pbc1awfirm.com
No Logo John Robicheux, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurley McKenna & Mertz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Mertz +1 312 553 4900 mike@hurley-law.com
No Logo George C. Cox, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "John Smith"

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendleton, Friedberg, Wilson & Hennessey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas R. Rockforte +1 225 687 6396 nrockforte@pbc1awfirm.com
No Logo John W. Wallace, Jr., Plaintiff
No Logo Johnnie Alexander, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendleton, Friedberg, Wilson & Hennessey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com
No Logo Joseph Abel LaRue, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Joseph C. Ortega, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Joseph Amirr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KEEFE BARTELS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua S. Kincannon +1 732 224 9400 +1 732 224 9494 jkincannon@keefebartels.com
No Logo Joseph Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L. Wagstaff +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Joseph Preuss +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tjpreuss@wcllp.com
No Logo Joseph Richardson, Plaintiff
No Logo Joshua McIntosh, Plaintiff
No Logo Joyce Tebbe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartimus Frickleton Robertson & Gorny, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk J. Goza +1 913 451 3433 +1 913 273 0509 kgoza@bflawfirm.com
No Logo Judith Ann Hildebrand, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 303

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth P. Kagan +1 239 466 1161 +1 239 466 7226 liz@kagan-law.com
No Logo Judith Arvoy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush & Rottier, S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Anthony Rottier +1 608 255 6663
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter M Young +1 414 271 0900

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush, Davis & Rottier

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Jaskulski +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 rjaskulski@habush.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy S. Trecek +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 ttrecek@habush.com
No Logo Judith Marketos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bachus & Schanker, LLC-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jere Kyle Bachus +1 303 893 9800 +1 303 893 9900 kbachus@coloradolaw.net
No Logo Judith Richardson, Plaintiff
No Logo Judith Sauget, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Judy Yarbrough, Plaintiff
No Logo Julia Timothy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jonatha Paul Wilkerson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Raymond Cordella +1 212 421 2800 +1 917 546 0469 prc@lanierlawfirm.com
No Logo Julie Hobert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 62

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES H. COOK +1 319 234 4471 cookj@wloolaw.com
No Logo June Feldman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo June Harrison, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Jushonna Staten, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don P. McKenna +1 205 328 5330 +1 205 324 2165 don@hwnn.com
No Logo KAREN ARNOLD, Plaintiff
No Logo Karen Block, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don P. McKenna +1 205 328 5330 +1 205 324 2165 don@hwnn.com
No Logo Karen J. Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by David M. Weiler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Weiler

Toggle Switch Represented by Molly Honore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/01/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Molly Honore

Toggle Switch Represented by Tonkon Torp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael C Willes +1 503 802 5737 +1 503 274 8779 michael.willes@tonkon.com
No Logo Karen Michaels, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lanier Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Cordella +1 212 421 2800 +1 212 421 2878
No Logo Karyn Bentlin, Plaintiff
No Logo Katherine Douglas, Plaintiff
No Logo Katherine M. McClellan, Plaintiff
No Logo Kathleen A. Doyle, Plaintiff
No Logo Kathleen Dougherty, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Kathleen Herold, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Richardson Patrick Westbrook & Brickman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Brickman , +1 843 727 6520 +1 843 727 3103 mbrickman@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina H. Fields +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 nfields@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Keevers Palmer +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 kkeevers@rpwb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of David L. Hood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L. Hood +1 843 527 8010 +1 843 436 3330
No Logo Kathleen Minadeo Johnson, Plaintiff
No Logo Kathryn Cummings, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Kathy Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson Crowder & DeGaris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley Hodges DeGaris +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 adegaris@cwcd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr. +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 ddellaccio@cwcd.com
No Logo Kathy L. Eliason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Sean Jez +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 sean_jez@fleming-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rand P. Nolen +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 rand_nolen@fleming-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Fleming +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638
No Logo Kathy Morales, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Baughman +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 lbaughman@baronbudd.com
No Logo Kay Currens, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kay Currens
No Logo Kaylene Brock Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Keisha S. Zwald, Plaintiff
No Logo Kelley Renee Hamilton, Plaintiff
No Logo Kelly Warden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Levensten Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT D. LEVENSTEN +1 215 545 5600 +1 215 545 5156
No Logo Kenneth Francis Pribanic, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Kermit Walker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg & Osborne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J Diamond +1 520 909 0909 +1 520 620 3991 ddiamond40@aol.com
No Logo Kevin J. Spooner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Sean Jez +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 sean_jez@fleming-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rand P. Nolen +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 rand_nolen@fleming-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Fleming +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638
No Logo KEVIN JOHNSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 705

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carlos G. Galliani +1 214 301 3400 +1 817 345 3522 cg@cgallianilaw.com
No Logo Kevin L. Greenfield, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Kevin Shores, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sommers, Schwartz, Silver & Schwartz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert B. Sickels +1 248 355 0300 +1 248 746 4001 rsickels@sommerspc.com
No Logo Kim Elizabeth Manning, Plaintiff
No Logo Kristin A. Morrow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Wagner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David K. Miller +1 503 299 6116 +1 503 299 6106 dkm@miller-wagner.com
No Logo Kristine M. Mason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Lanny Long, Plaintiff
No Logo Larita Elias, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NASH AND FRANCISKATO LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian S. Franciskato +1 816 221 6600 +1 816 221 6612 bfranciskato@nashfranciskato.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Thompson Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Thompson, Jr. +1 816 471 3414 +1 816 471 3417
No Logo Larry A. Breeze, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Sean Jez +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 sean_jez@fleming-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rand P. Nolen +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 rand_nolen@fleming-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Fleming +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638
No Logo Larry Arnold, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark K. Gray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark K. Gray

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew L. White

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew L. White
No Logo Larry C. Dogs, Plaintiff
No Logo Larry Hawkins, Plaintiff
No Logo Larry Mason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bachus & Schanker, LLC-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jere Kyle Bachus +1 303 893 9800 +1 303 893 9900 kbachus@coloradolaw.net
No Logo Larry Parrish, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S. Mann +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2711 jonm@pittmandutton.com
No Logo Larry R. Dodd, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio, Christopher and Toale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilyas Sayeg +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042

Toggle Switch Represented by NASH AND FRANCISKATO LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian S. Franciskato +1 816 221 6600 +1 816 221 6612 bfranciskato@nashfranciskato.com
No Logo Larry Smart, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by David M. Peterson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Peterson

Toggle Switch Represented by PETERSON & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Peterson +1 816 531 4440 +1 816 531 0660 dmp@petersonlawfirm.com
No Logo Laurel Baker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dugan Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Robert Plymale +1 504 648 0180 +1 504 648 0181 dplymale@dugan-lawfirm.com
No Logo Lawrence Bachelder, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by BRANCH LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Turner Williamson Branch +1 505 243 3500 +1 505 243 3534 psanchez@branchlawfirm.com
No Logo Lawrence Dougherty, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Leah Elshaug, Plaintiff
No Logo Leilani Dow, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Leon, Thomas, Plaintiff
No Logo Lequata Montgomery, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thornton & Naumes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marilyn T. McGoldrick +1 617 720 1333 +1 617 720 2445 mmcgoldrick@tenlaw.com
No Logo Lesia Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Richardson Patrick Westbrook & Brickman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Brickman , +1 843 727 6520 +1 843 727 3103 mbrickman@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina H. Fields +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 nfields@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Keevers Palmer +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 kkeevers@rpwb.com
No Logo Leslee Cook, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Leslie J. Weed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Lester E. McDowell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Denise A. Vinet +1 225 928 8800 +1 225 928 8802

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Law Firm, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peyton Patrick Murphy +1 225 928 8800 pmurphy@murphylfirm.com
No Logo Letha Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo Linda D. Rogers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Sean Jez +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 sean_jez@fleming-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rand P. Nolen +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 rand_nolen@fleming-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Fleming +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638
No Logo Linda Fields, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bobby Dean Davidson +1 501 551 3649 +1 501 379 8462 bob.davidson@sbcglobal.net
No Logo Linda H. Scott, Plaintiff
No Logo Linda Hyde, Plaintiff
No Logo Linda K. Floyd, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Linda M. Fishel, Plaintiff
No Logo Linda R. Hepner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Holly Dolejsi +1 612 349 8295 hhdolejsi@rkmc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent J Moccio +1 612 349 8754 +1 612 339 4181 vjmoccio@rkmc.com
No Logo Linda Radach, Plaintiff
No Logo Linda Robicheux, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurley McKenna & Mertz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Mertz +1 312 553 4900 mike@hurley-law.com
No Logo Lisa Diercksen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Lisa Elston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & McKay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elliott N Kanter +1 619 231 1883 +1 619 234 4553 ekanter1@san.rr.com
No Logo Lisa Ishmael, Plaintiff
No Logo Lisa L. Webb, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pratt-Thomas Walker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas P. Gressette, Jr. tpg@p-tw.com
No Logo Lisa M. Kirk, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rawls & McNelis PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brewster S. Rawls +1 804 344 0038 +1 804 782 0133 brawls@rawlsmcnelis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glen H. Sturtevant +1 804 622 0675 +1 804 782 0133 gsturtevant@rawlsmcnelis.com
No Logo Lisa Owens, Plaintiff
No Logo Lois Thomas, Plaintiff
No Logo Lyle Huisinga, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 62

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Andrew Swanson +1 319 234 4471 +1 319 234 8029 swansonc@wloolaw.com
No Logo Mae Ellar Cowart, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Becnel, Jr. +1 985 536 1186

Toggle Switch Represented by Matthew B. Moreland, Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer L. Crose +1 985 536 1186 jcrose@becnellaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew B. Moreland +1 985 536 1186 +1 985 536 6445 mmoreland@becnellaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by MORRISBART, LTD - Gulfport

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mekel Smith Alvarez +1 504 599 3385 +1 504 599 3392 malvarez@morrisbart.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Morris Bart, III +1 504 525 8000 mbart@morrisbart.com
No Logo Marcola Powell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Margaret Curtis, Plaintiff
No Logo Margaret Groff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Jeffrey S. Glassman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D'Isola +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T. Naumes, Jr. +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 bnaumes@jeffreysglassman.com
No Logo Margie J. Fredrickson, Plaintiff
No Logo Marguerita C. McIntosh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Marguerita C. McIntosh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marguerita C. McIntosh
No Logo Maria Sajeski, Plaintiff
No Logo Marilyn Eisenberg, Plaintiff
No Logo Marilyn M. Palmer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Marina Shortley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Marjorie Aiello, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Young +1 414 271 0900
No Logo Marjorie Morgan Satterthwait, Plaintiff
No Logo Mark A. Clausen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Collmer Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W Collmer , +1 713 337 4040 +1 713 337 4044 mark@collmerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Conrad B. Guthrie +1 713 337 4040 +1 713 337 4044 conrad@collmerlaw.com
No Logo Mark Palmer, Plaintiff
No Logo Mark Ronald Nord, Plaintiff
No Logo Mark Sissom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Simon Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan A. Keane +1 314 241 2929 +1 314 241 2029 rkeane@simonlawpc.com
No Logo Marlene A. Jennings, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Marlene A. Jennings

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marlene A. Jennings
No Logo Martha J. Fewell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Martha J. Fewell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martha J. Fewell
No Logo Martin Mead, Plaintiff
No Logo Martin Metzger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saville & Flint LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew W. Callahan +1 618 288 4777 +1 618 288 2864 acallahan@toverdict.com
No Logo Marvin R. McIntosh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Marvin R. McIntosh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marvin R. McIntosh
No Logo Mary Baker, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Burgart, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 62

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES H. COOK +1 319 234 4471 cookj@wloolaw.com
No Logo Mary Grossbier, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Victor Ayala +1 302 622 7112 tayala@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by M. Elizabeth Graham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED M. Elizabeth Graham
No Logo Mary Heldenbrand, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary J. Proffitt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Mary Louise Proctor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Champ Crocker +1 205 322 8880

Toggle Switch Represented by Pittman Dutton Kirby & Hellums, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Theo Hellums +1 205 322 8880 chrish@pittmandutton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S. Mann +1 205 322 8880 +1 205 328 2711 jonm@pittmandutton.com
No Logo Mary McClarity, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lanier Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul R. Cordella +1 212 421 2800 +1 212 421 2878
No Logo Mary Rehberger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Loncar & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian U. Loncar +1 214 747 0422 +1 469 484 7184 jcoveney@brianloncar.com
No Logo Mary Weed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Mathew Neelley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com
No Logo Mauryce Kennon, Plaintiff
No Logo Megan Mork, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart L. Goldenberg
No Logo Melinda Sissom, Plaintiff
No Logo Melvin Kruse, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PETERSON & ASSOCIATES, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Peterson +1 816 531 4440 +1 816 531 0660 dmp@petersonlawfirm.com
No Logo Melvin Ray Meyer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Melvin Ray Meyer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Ray Meyer
No Logo Merle Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bachus & Schanker, LLC-Denver

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jere Kyle Bachus +1 303 893 9800 +1 303 893 9900 kbachus@coloradolaw.net
No Logo Mervin Elias, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by NASH AND FRANCISKATO LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian S. Franciskato +1 816 221 6600 +1 816 221 6612 bfranciskato@nashfranciskato.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Thompson Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Thompson, Jr. +1 816 471 3414 +1 816 471 3417
No Logo Michael Daskivich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HANDLER HENNING & ROSENBERG LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory M. Feather +1 717 238 2000 +1 717 233 3029
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID H. ROSENBERG
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew P. Rosenberg +1 717 238 2000 +1 717 233 3029

Toggle Switch Represented by Pogust, Braslow, & Millrood, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek T Braslow +1 610 941 4204 +1 610 941 4245 dbraslow@pbmattorneys.com
No Logo Michael, Allen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael, Allen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Allen
No Logo Michael Glassco, Plaintiff
No Logo MICHAEL LEE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kiesel Boucher & Larson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Paul Boucher +1 310 854 4444 +1 310 854 0812 boucher@kbla.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen E Zukin +1 310 854 4444 +1 310 854 0812 zukin@kbla.com
No Logo Michael McGrady, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dugan Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Robert Plymale +1 504 648 0180 +1 504 648 0181 dplymale@dugan-lawfirm.com
No Logo Michael Minton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Douglas & London, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Virginia Eve Anello +1 212 566 7500 +1 212 566 7501 vanello@douglasandlondon.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Andrew London +1 212 566 7500 +1 212 566 7501 mlondon@douglasandlondon.com
No Logo MICHAEL P. SMITH, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Sean Jez +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 sean_jez@fleming-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rand P. Nolen +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 rand_nolen@fleming-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Fleming +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638
No Logo Michael Ragland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Deal, Cooper & Holton, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Berry Cooper, III +1 901 523 2222
No Logo Michael Shane Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Shane Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Shane Adams
No Logo Michael Widom, Plaintiff
No Logo Michael XX Allen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baron & Budd, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura Jean Baughman +1 214 521 3605 +1 214 520 1181 lbaughman@baronbudd.com
No Logo Michaela Braasch, Plaintiff
No Logo Monica Janet Pribanic, Plaintiff
No Logo Nancie Feld, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Nancy A. Gleim, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Walker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Hubbard Saunders +1 727 579 4500 +1 727 577 9696 joe@saunderslawyers.com
No Logo Nancy Atherton, Plaintiff
No Logo Nancy Cunningham, Plaintiff
No Logo Nancy Dolensek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Nancy Hoover, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Nancy L. Koul, Plaintiff
No Logo Nancy Stevenson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Nancy Summers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hare Wynn Newell & Newton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don P. McKenna +1 205 328 5330 +1 205 324 2165 don@hwnn.com
No Logo Naomi E. Hooker, Plaintiff
No Logo Naomi Kingery, Plaintiff
No Logo Naysa Mowell, Plaintiff
No Logo Nicholas Carl, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartimus Frickleton Robertson & Gorny, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk J. Goza +1 913 451 3433 +1 913 273 0509 kgoza@bflawfirm.com
No Logo Nicholas Meyerhofer, Plaintiff
No Logo Nicole Brooks, Plaintiff
No Logo Nicole M. Frey, Plaintiff
No Logo Nicole Reed-Olsen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fabian & Clendenin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas B. Cannon +1 801 531 8900 +1 801 531 1716 dcannon@fabianlaw.com
No Logo Nicole Trombley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farr Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George T. Williamson +1 941 639 1158 +1 941 639 0028 gwilliamson@farr.com
No Logo Nikki Kellogg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Nona Zwirnmann, Plaintiff
No Logo Noreen M. Dogs, Plaintiff
No Logo Norma C. Mims, Plaintiff
No Logo Norma Johnson, Plaintiff
No Logo Norma Sanders, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Norman Black, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Talley +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 stalley@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Norman Mills, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Blasingame, Burch, Garrard & Ashley, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Josh B. Wages +1 706 354 4000 +1 706 549 3545 jbw@bbgbalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by CAREY & DANIS, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J Rosemergy +1 312 649 0100 jrosemergy@careydanis.com
No Logo Olga L. Martin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Seth Alan Katz +1 303 792 5595 +1 303 708 0527 skatz@burgsimpson.com
No Logo Oscar C. Pokorny, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Oscar Watson, Jr., Plaintiff
No Logo Otto Herbert Barnhouse, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Odner, Shelton, O'Leary & Peterson, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James G. Onder +1 314 963 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by Onder, Shelton et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS +1 314 963 9000 rados@onderlaw.com
No Logo Pam Whitbeck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Pamela Jerzak, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LEVY, BALDANTE, FINNEY, RUBENSTEIN, COHEN & CHIZMAR, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin G Rubenstein +1 215 735 1616 +1 215 545 2642 mrubenstein@levyangstreich.com
No Logo Pamela Peterson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pamela Peterson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Peterson
No Logo Pamela Schwartz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pamela Schwartz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Schwartz
No Logo Patricia Bowers, Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia DeJesus, Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia Diane Horine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Patricia Hinrichs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Patricia Hinrichs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia Hinrichs
No Logo Patricia Jeffers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Talley +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 stalley@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Patricia M. Day, Plaintiff
No Logo Patricia Quiroz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Joseph Preuss +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tjpreuss@wcllp.com
No Logo Patricia Rook, Plaintiff
No Logo Patrick Gandy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Paul J. Marino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Charles H Johnson, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles H. Johnson +1 651 633 5685 +1 651 633 4442 bdehkes@charleshjohnsonlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan R Mencel +1 651 633 5685 +1 651 633 4442 jmencel@charleshjohnsonlaw.com
No Logo Paul Marino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartimus Frickleton Robertson & Gorny, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk J. Goza +1 913 451 3433 +1 913 273 0509 kgoza@bflawfirm.com
No Logo Paul Sajeski, Plaintiff
No Logo Paul Trombley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farr Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George T. Williamson +1 941 639 1158 +1 941 639 0028 gwilliamson@farr.com
No Logo Paula Jarrett, Plaintiff
No Logo Pauline Blair, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Loncar & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian U. Loncar +1 214 747 0422 +1 469 484 7184 jcoveney@brianloncar.com
No Logo Pauline Finstad, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pauline Finstad

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pauline Finstad
No Logo Peggy Rittenhouse, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Simmons Browder Gianaris Angelides & Barnerd LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID FRANCIS MICELI +1 404 915 8886 dmiceli@simmonsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simmons Hanly Conroy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric S. Johnson +1 618 259 2222 +1 618 259 2251
No Logo Peggy Wilson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Perry Lansdell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Talley +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 stalley@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Peter A. Hall, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter A. Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter A. Hall
No Logo Phillip Ray Moore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Phillip Groff, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Jeffrey S. Glassman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D'Isola +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T. Naumes, Jr. +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 bnaumes@jeffreysglassman.com
No Logo Phyllis Coleman, Plaintiff
No Logo Phyllis Susan Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Phyllis Susan Miller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phyllis Susan Miller
No Logo Pieternella Meuzelaar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio, Christopher and Toale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilyas Sayeg +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042
No Logo Rachel Ann Watilo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Swanson Lathen Alexander & McCann, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Travis S. Prestwich +1 503 581 2421 +1 503 588 7179 travis@slamlaw.com
No Logo Ralph Wheeler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Randy Scott Bradshaw, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Randy Scott Bradshaw

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randy Scott Bradshaw
No Logo Ray Anderson, Plaintiff
No Logo Ray Bradshaw, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Ray Eigenbrode, Plaintiff
No Logo Ray Z. Dissinger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Raymond E. Hall, Plaintiff
No Logo Reginald Harrison, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Reina Sandoval, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Langerman +1 602 240 5525 +1 602 266 0141
No Logo Renee L. Spalding, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Walker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Hubbard Saunders +1 727 579 4500 +1 727 577 9696 joe@saunderslawyers.com
No Logo Richard Bentlin, Plaintiff
No Logo Richard C. Hardy, Plaintiff
No Logo Richard Danley, Plaintiff
No Logo Richard E. Watson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Richard, Gregoire, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Walker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Hubbard Saunders +1 727 579 4500 +1 727 577 9696 joe@saunderslawyers.com
No Logo RICHARD MONTREUIL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Richard Paes, Plaintiff
No Logo Richard Robert Bourdeaux, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewsnup King & Olsen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan W. Mortensen +1 801 533 0400 +3634 363 363 4218 amort@dkolaw.com
No Logo Richard Sauget, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Richard Willing, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jeffrey S. Glassman, L.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Glassman +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 jeff@jeffreysglassman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Jeffrey S. Glassman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D'Isola +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Glassman +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 jeff@jeffreysglassman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T. Naumes, Jr. +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 bnaumes@jeffreysglassman.com
No Logo Rita L. Ortega, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Rita Nail, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mann & Potter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerry Trapp Crowell, III +1 205 879 9661 +1 205 879 9663 chip@mannpotter.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ted L. Mann +1 205 879 9661 +1 205 879 9663 ted@mannpotter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Robert Potter +1 205 879 9661 +1 205 879 9663 robert@mannpotter.com
No Logo Robert L. Brock, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush & Rottier, S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Anthony Rottier +1 608 255 6663
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter M Young +1 414 271 0900

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush, Davis & Rottier

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Jaskulski +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 rjaskulski@habush.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy S. Trecek +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 ttrecek@habush.com
No Logo Robert A. Gebhart, II, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Talley +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 stalley@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Robert Douglas, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert E. Whitbeck, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Robert Finstad, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert Finstad

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Finstad
No Logo Robert G. Yoakum, Jr., Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Giacometti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Seegers +1 407 649 4000 +1 407 841 0168 jseegers@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher A. Seeger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher A. Seeger

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sindhu S. Daniel +1 973 639 9100 +1 973 639 9393 sdaniel@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Robert J. Doebrick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Robert L. Hastings, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert L. Richards, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Sean Jez +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 sean_jez@fleming-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rand P. Nolen +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 rand_nolen@fleming-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Fleming +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638
No Logo Robert Lee Chisolm, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Robert Lentine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Lentine
No Logo Robert Leroy Snyder, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Milliron, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio, Christopher and Toale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilyas Sayeg +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042

Toggle Switch Represented by NASH AND FRANCISKATO LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian S. Franciskato +1 816 221 6600 +1 816 221 6612 bfranciskato@nashfranciskato.com
No Logo Robert Reno, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Odner, Shelton, O'Leary & Peterson, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James G. Onder +1 314 963 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by Onder, Shelton et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED STEPHANIE LYNN RADOS +1 314 963 9000 rados@onderlaw.com
No Logo Robert Schacker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parker & Waichman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel C Burke +1 516 466 6500 +1 516 466 6665 dburke@yourlawyer.com
No Logo Robert Sheets, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Robin Solsma, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Robin True, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston and Cashatt, PS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Trevor Howard +1 509 838 6131 +1 509 838 1416 mth@winstoncashatt.com
No Logo Robyn Christiansen, Plaintiff
No Logo Rod Olsen, Plaintiff
No Logo Roger Burgart, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 62

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES H. COOK +1 319 234 4471 cookj@wloolaw.com
No Logo Roger Kingery, Plaintiff
No Logo Roger Setterdahl, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Roman Deville, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Diercksen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Ronald Jonas, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Kimsey, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Radach, Plaintiff
No Logo Ronald Sires, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Rosemary Fry, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Rosie M. Young, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/2012, PRO HAC VICE George M. Fleming +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 george_fleming@fleming-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Sean Jez +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 sean_jez@fleming-law.com
TERMINATED: 10/22/2012, PRO HAC VICE Rand P. Nolen +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 rand_nolen@fleming-law.com
No Logo Ross Jennings, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Jennings

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ross Jennings
No Logo Roy Gene Lyles, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Victor Ayala +1 302 622 7112 tayala@gelaw.com
No Logo Royal Lee Hines, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Ruben Quiroz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Joseph Preuss +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tjpreuss@wcllp.com
No Logo Russell Meier, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartimus Frickleton Robertson & Gorny, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk J. Goza +1 913 451 3433 +1 913 273 0509 kgoza@bflawfirm.com
No Logo Ruth Ann Long, Plaintiff
No Logo Ruth M. Bader, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan R. Cox & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan R. Cox +1 636 946 6886 rrc@rrcandassociates.com
No Logo Ruth Ruiter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary Lowe +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 pete@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Ruth Ziegler, Plaintiff
No Logo S. Michael McCormick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Sally Giacometti, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W. Seegers +1 407 649 4000 +1 407 841 0168 jseegers@bakerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher A. Seeger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher A. Seeger

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sindhu S. Daniel +1 973 639 9100 +1 973 639 9393 sdaniel@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Sally Wilk, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Samantha Curran, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kabateck Kellner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lina B Melidonian +1 213 217 5000 +1 213 217 5010 lm@kbklawyers.com
No Logo Sammy Carnegie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Samuel Ambler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Ambler
No Logo Sandra B. Trujillo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Sandra R. Graves, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter W. Burg +1 303 792 5595 +1 303 708 0527 pburg@burgsimpson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of JOHN GEHLHAUSEN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/07/2012 George E McLaughlin +1 303 690 8197 gmclaughlin@tractorlaw.com
No Logo Sarah P. Watkins, Plaintiff
No Logo Saundra Burns, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com
No Logo Scott Jeffrey Porter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Commander & Pound

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori Eubanks Jolly +1 404 584 8002 +1 404 584 7002 lori@commanderpound.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Commander Pound Butler, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott C. Commander +1 404 584 8002 scott@commanderpoundbutler.com
No Logo Shalonda Bailey, Plaintiff
No Logo Shane Elshaug, Plaintiff
No Logo Shannon Strohm, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey S. Glassman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Glassman

Toggle Switch Represented by Margaret S. Weiss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Margaret S. Weiss

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert T. Naumes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T. Naumes
No Logo Sharlene Morgan, Plaintiff
No Logo Sharon Anderson, Plaintiff
No Logo Sharon D. Summers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Brown Law Firm PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas K. Brown +1 713 400 4020 tom@brownfirm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Thornton & Naumes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marilyn T. McGoldrick +1 617 720 1333 +1 617 720 2445 mmcgoldrick@tenlaw.com
No Logo Sharon Ginger Kinard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parham , Smith & Archenhold, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Jones +1 864 990 4581 +1 864 271 6155

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Blakely, Jr. +1 770 822 0900 +1 770 822 9680 mjblakely@pmkm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Sharon M. Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendleton, Friedberg, Wilson & Hennessey, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher L Coffin +1 225 687 6396 +1 225 687 6398 ccoffin@pbclawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pendley, Baudin & Coffin, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas R. Rockforte +1 225 687 6396 nrockforte@pbc1awfirm.com
No Logo Sharon McMahon, Plaintiff
No Logo Sharon Ming, Plaintiff
No Logo Sharron Palow, Plaintiff
No Logo Sheena Riley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Sheldon Buch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Klien & Frank, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carrie R. Frank +1 303 448 8884 +1 303 861 2449 carrie@kleinfrank.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beth A. Klein +1 303 448 8884 +1 303 861 2449 beth@kleinfrank.com
No Logo Sheri Woods, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Talley +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 stalley@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Sherri Bacovsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush & Rottier, S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Anthony Rottier +1 608 255 6663
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter M Young +1 414 271 0900

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush, Davis & Rottier

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Jaskulski +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 rjaskulski@habush.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy S. Trecek +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 ttrecek@habush.com
No Logo Sheryl Lawman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hurley McKenna & Mertz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Thomas Mertz +1 312 553 4900 mike@hurley-law.com
No Logo Shirley Ann McCright, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Shirley Fisher, Plaintiff
No Logo Stephanie Wharton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartimus Frickleton Robertson & Gorny, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk J. Goza +1 913 451 3433 +1 913 273 0509 kgoza@bflawfirm.com
No Logo Stephanie Bourdeaux, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dewsnup King & Olsen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan W. Mortensen +1 801 533 0400 +3634 363 363 4218 amort@dkolaw.com
No Logo Stephen M. Fishel, Plaintiff
No Logo Stephen Spencer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by LOWE LAW GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary Lowe +1 801 917 8500 +1 801 917 8484 pete@lowelawgroup.com
No Logo Stephen Warden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Levensten Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT D. LEVENSTEN +1 215 545 5600 +1 215 545 5156
No Logo Steven Birkson, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven Brown, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartimus Frickleton Robertson & Gorny, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk J. Goza +1 913 451 3433 +1 913 273 0509 kgoza@bflawfirm.com
No Logo Steven Cross, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gregory S. Malush

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory S. Malush

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael Phoenix

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Phoenix
No Logo Steven Fine, Plaintiff
No Logo Steven J. Bacovsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush & Rottier, S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Anthony Rottier +1 608 255 6663
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter M Young +1 414 271 0900

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush, Davis & Rottier

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Jaskulski +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 rjaskulski@habush.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy S. Trecek +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 ttrecek@habush.com
No Logo Steven L. Scott, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Altom M. Maglio +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042 amm@mctlawyers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Maglio, Christopher and Toale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ilyas Sayeg +1 888 952 5242 +1 877 952 5042
No Logo Steven Wacker, Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Case, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Susan L. Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Peil, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Susan Reuffer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marcus W. Viles +1 239 334 3933 +1 239 334 7105
No Logo Susan Willing, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Jeffrey S. Glassman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D'Isola +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Glassman +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 jeff@jeffreysglassman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T. Naumes, Jr. +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 bnaumes@jeffreysglassman.com
No Logo Sylvia Tate, Plaintiff
No Logo Taleeea Isaphine Kinsey, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Tamara Loosle, Plaintiff
No Logo Tammi Armstrong, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Jeffrey S. Glassman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D'Isola +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Glassman +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 jeff@jeffreysglassman.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert T. Naumes, Jr. +1 617 367 2900 +1 617 722 9999 bnaumes@jeffreysglassman.com
No Logo Tandra Speed, Plaintiff
No Logo Tandy Branham III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael J. Quillin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Quillin

Toggle Switch Represented by Odner, Shelton, O'Leary & Peterson, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James G. Onder +1 314 963 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephanie Lynn Rados

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Lynn Rados
No Logo Tareq T. Samaneh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED G. Sean Jez +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 sean_jez@fleming-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rand P. Nolen +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638 rand_nolen@fleming-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming, Nolen & Jez, L.l.p.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George M. Fleming +1 713 621 7944 +1 713 621 9638
No Logo Teresa Barwick, Plaintiff
No Logo Teresa E. Sellers, Plaintiff
No Logo Terry Borg, Plaintiff
No Logo Terry D. Martin, Plaintiff
No Logo Terry Leroy Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Terry Meza, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick D. Paschall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. Paschall

Toggle Switch Represented by Patrick J. Stark

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J. Stark
No Logo Tessa Cain, Plaintiff
No Logo Theresa Brunori, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com
No Logo Theresa J. Hohenberger, Plaintiff
No Logo Theresa Morton, Plaintiff
No Logo Thomas Degenhardt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush & Rottier, S.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Anthony Rottier +1 608 255 6663
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter M Young +1 414 271 0900

Toggle Switch Represented by Habush, Habush, Davis & Rottier

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert L. Jaskulski +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 rjaskulski@habush.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy S. Trecek +1 414 271 0900 +1 414 271 6854 ttrecek@habush.com
No Logo Thomas Gadbois, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kershaw, Cutter & Ratinoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Talley +1 916 448 9800 +1 916 669 4499 stalley@kcrlegal.com
No Logo Thomas Harward, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas Harward

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Harward
No Logo Thomas Marvin York, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Thomas Shortley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 230

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Louis Boohaker +1 817 717 5081 +1 817 717 5082 david@dwmlawfirm.com
No Logo Timothy A. Snider, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Timothy A. Snider

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy A. Snider
No Logo Timothy Hinrichs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Timothy Hinrichs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Hinrichs
No Logo Timothy J. Poling, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Rivers Office Park

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/22/2012 David M. Goldenberg +1 304 485 4516 +1 304 485 7222
No Logo Tina Marie Cien, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fine Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Fine +1 505 243 4541 +2422 242 242 2716 David@thefinelawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charlotte L. Itoh +1 505 243 4541 +1 505 242 2716 Charlotte@thefinelawfirm.com
No Logo Tolling Agreement Plaintiffs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tolling Agreement Plaintiffs

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tolling Agreement Plaintiffs
No Logo Tony Mark Sellers, Plaintiff
No Logo Tracey Huisinga, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Law Firm 62

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad Andrew Swanson +1 319 234 4471 +1 319 234 8029 swansonc@wloolaw.com
No Logo Tracy Sires, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Twyla Clarke, Plaintiff
No Logo Valerie Brennan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DAVIS, SAPERSTEIN & SALOMON, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TERRENCE SMITH +1 201 907 5000 tsmith@dsslaw.com
No Logo Valerie Harward, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Valerie Harward

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valerie Harward
No Logo Valerie Hasely, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Venetia Jarrett, Plaintiff
No Logo Vera McClelland, Plaintiff
No Logo Vickie Branham, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael J. Quillin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Quillin

Toggle Switch Represented by Odner, Shelton, O'Leary & Peterson, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James G. Onder +1 314 963 9000

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephanie Lynn Rados

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie Lynn Rados
No Logo Victor M. Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Vincent F. Zounek, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Virginia Ann Snyder, Plaintiff
No Logo Virginia M Welch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Steen & Harrison

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/15/2012 Paul David Friedman +1 602 252 8888 +1 602 274 1209 pfriedman@vanosteen.com
TERMINATED: 06/15/2012 Jonathan Van OSteen +1 602 252 8888 +1 602 274 1209 josteen@vanosteen.com
No Logo Vivian Neelley, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com
No Logo Vivian Petrovic, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 303

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth P. Kagan +1 239 466 1161 +1 239 466 7226 liz@kagan-law.com
No Logo Wanda Carter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Christopher S. Warren Attorney At Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laura L. Voght +1 404 885 1983 +1 404 872 7562 lvoght@attorneykennugent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Wanda Greenfield, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo Wanda Phillips, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cory Watson Crowder & DeGaris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annesley Hodges DeGaris +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 adegaris@cwcd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr. +1 205 328 2200 +1 205 324 7896 ddellaccio@cwcd.com
No Logo Wayne Baker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dugan Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Robert Plymale +1 504 648 0180 +1 504 648 0181 dplymale@dugan-lawfirm.com
No Logo Wendy Lynne Snider, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wendy Lynne Snider

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendy Lynne Snider
No Logo Wendy Reppond, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bobby Dean Davidson +1 501 551 3649 +1 501 379 8462 bob.davidson@sbcglobal.net
No Logo Wilda J. Harbison, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dugan Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas Robert Plymale +1 504 648 0180 +1 504 648 0181 dplymale@dugan-lawfirm.com
No Logo Willa J. Allen, Plaintiff
No Logo William R. Gleim, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saunders & Walker PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Hubbard Saunders +1 727 579 4500 +1 727 577 9696 joe@saunderslawyers.com
No Logo William Allan Menne, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo William Cain, Plaintiff
No Logo William Chrostowski, Plaintiff
No Logo William Duvall, Plaintiff
No Logo William Earl Cook, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo William Joseph Workman, Plaintiff
No Logo William Kellogg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Franklin D Azar And Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Melnichenko +1 303 757 3300 +1 303 757 3206 melnichenkot@fdazar.com
No Logo William L. Watkins, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Richardson Patrick Westbrook & Brickman, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Joseph Brickman , +1 843 727 6520 +1 843 727 3103 mbrickman@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nina H. Fields +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 nfields@rpwb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Keevers Palmer +1 843 727 6500 +1 843 727 3103 kkeevers@rpwb.com
No Logo William Montgomery, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thornton & Naumes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marilyn T. McGoldrick +1 617 720 1333 +1 617 720 2445 mmcgoldrick@tenlaw.com
No Logo William Mowell, Plaintiff
No Logo William Sobek, Plaintiff
No Logo Willie Alexander, Plaintiff
No Logo Willie Seals, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Joseph Preuss +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tjpreuss@wcllp.com
No Logo Winfred Warren, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pope, McGlamry, Kilpatrick, Morrison & Norwood, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Neal Pope +1 706 324 0050 nealpope@pmkm.com
No Logo Winnie Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Capretz and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James T Capretz +1 949 724 3000 +1 949 757 2635 jcapretz@capretz.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Don K Ledgard +1 949 724 3000 +1 949 757 2635 dledgard@capretz.com
No Logo Yefim Milter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark S. Baumkel & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Baumkel +1 248 642 0444 +1 248 642 6661 markbaumkel@classlaw.info
v.
No Logo Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Yukevich Calfo & Cavanaugh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander G Calfo +1 213 362 7777 +1 213 362 7788 acalfo@yukelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kelley S. Olah +1 213 362 7777 +1 213 362 7788
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Harlan C Amstutz M D A Medical Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Harlan C Amstutz, MD, Defendant
No Logo JOHN DOE COMPANY, Defendant
No Logo Rosemary Duvall, Defendant
No Logo Steve Birnbaum, Defendant
No Logo Wright Medical Europe S.A., Defendant
No Logo Wright Medical Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Wright Medical Group Incorporated"
Officer/Director, Tornier B.V.
No Logo Wright Medical Technology, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Wright Medical Technology Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 Donn Christopher Alexander +1 602 235 7152
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 Carla M. Bennett +1 215 979 1129 +1 215 689 0844
TERMINATED: 10/22/2012 R. Brandon Bundren +1 713 402 3900
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012, PRO HAC VICE Timothy M. Considine +1 801 578 6917
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 Richard P. Darke +1 312 499 6700 +1 312 499 6701
TERMINATED: 10/22/2012 Bryan G. Hale +1 205 868 6000 +1 205 868 6099
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 David Wayne Kash +1 602 707 1383 +1 602 385 6713
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 Julie E. Maurer +1 602 440 4861 +1 602 257 6961
TERMINATED: 10/22/2012 Elizabeth M. Norton +1 614 464 1211 +1 614 464 1737
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 Audra Lynn Thompson +1 213 689 7400 +1 213 689 7401
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 Christopher B. Yeh +1 213 689 7400

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullivant Houser Bailey PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 Emilie K. Edling +1 503 228 6351 +1 503 295 0915 emilie.edling@bullivant.com
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 Jeanne F. Loftis +1 503 499 4601 +1 503 295 0915 jeanne.loftis@bullivant.com
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 Jamie L. Pfeiffer +1 503 499 4416 +1 503 339 6351 jamie.pfeiffer@bullivant.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Clisham, Satriana & Biscan, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/03/2012 Matthew Y. Biscan +1 303 468 5403 +1 303 942 7360 biscanm@csbattorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dana Jeffrey Ash +1 215 979 1197 +1 215 979 1020 djash@duanemorris.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Durham Barwick +1 404 253 6970 +1 404 506 9228 wdbarwick@duanemorris.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean K. Burke +1 215 979 7352 sburke@duanemorris.com