Clouding IP LLC v. EMC Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01455
District Judge Leonard P. Stark, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 2:22 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Clouding IP, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bayard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen B. Brauerman +1 302 429 4232 +1 302 658 6395 sbrauerman@bayardlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard D. Kirk +1 302 429 4208 +1 302 658 6395 rkirk@bayardlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vanessa Ribeiro Tiradentes +1 302 429 4228 vtiradentes@bayardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dorian S. Berger +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 dberger@raklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian David Ledahl +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 bledahl@raklaw.com
v.
No Logo EMC Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack B. Blumenfeld +1 302 658 9200 jbbefiling@mnat.com
No Logo EMC International US Holdings Inc., Defendant
VMware, Inc. VMware, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER re 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc., EMC Corporation is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/30/15. (ntl) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Ryan Micallef and Davis Doherty as co-counsel. Reason for request: no longer associated with Orrick, Herrington and no longer working on this action, respectively. (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
      REPLY BRIEF re 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
        REDACTED VERSION of 88 Declaration, by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redacted in its Entirety), # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D through F (Redacted in Their Entirety))(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None
          REDACTED VERSION of 87 Answering Brief in Opposition by Clouding IP LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to file their reply brief in support of their motion for award of attorneys' fees to January 22, 2015 - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 87 Answering Brief in Opposition / Declaration of Dorian Berger in Support of Clouding IP, LLC's Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Clouding IP LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/15/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/26/2014, Entered: None
                  Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendants' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees to January 5, 2015 - filed by Clouding IP LLC. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 12/26/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                    REDACTED VERSION of 84 Declaration re 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Bas de Blank) by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-C)(Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                      [SEALED] DECLARATION re 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Bas de Blank) by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                        OPENING BRIEF in Support re 82 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/26/2014. (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Attorney Fees - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MEMORANDUM OPINION: Motion for Reargument is DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/17/14. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01342-LPS, 1:13-cv-01454-LPS, 1:13-cv-01455-LPS, 1:13-cv-01458-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                              STATEMENT re (61 in 1:13-cv-01338-LPS, 178 in 1:12-cv-00639-LPS, 62 in 1:13-cv-01454-LPS, 205 in 1:12-cv-00675-LPS, 194 in 1:12-cv-00641-LPS, 59 in 1:13-cv-01342-LPS, 79 in 1:13-cv-01455-LPS, 59 in 1:13-cv-01341-LPS, 58 in 1:13-cv-01458-LPS, 65 in 1:13-cv-01456-LPS) Oral Order, /Clouding IP, LLC's Response to Defendants' Notice of Subsequent Events Relating to Clouding IP LLC's Motion for Reargument and Reconsideration Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.5 and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 59 and 60 by Clouding IP LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit a response to Defendants' letter (C.A. No. 12-639-LPS D.I. 177) regarding the status of Plaintiff's pending motion for reconsideration, no later than Tuesday, September 23, 2014. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/19/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00639-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                  Joint STATEMENT (Defendants' Notice of Subsequent Events Relating to Clouding IP's Motion for Reargument and Reconsideration Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.5 and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 59 and 60) by Hewlett-Packard Company, CA Technologies Inc., CA, Inc. d/b/a/ CA Technologies, SAP AG, SAP America Inc., Amazon Web Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, Google Inc., Jungle Disk LLC, Rackspace Hosting Inc., Rackspace US Inc., Terremark North America LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Online LLC, Dropbox Inc., EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                    ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 75 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to L.R. 7.1.5, and FRCP 59 and 60 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/8/2014. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                      OPENING BRIEF in Support re 75 MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to L.R. 7.1.5, and FRCP 59 and 60 filed by Clouding IP LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/28/2014. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Reconsideration Pursuant to L.R. 7.1.5, and FRCP 59 and 60 - filed by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                          Joint STIPULATION to extend deadline to file motions for attorney's fees and costs by Amazon Web Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc., Jungle Disk LLC, Rackspace Hosting Inc., Rackspace US Inc., Dropbox Inc.. (Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Redaction of (156 in 1:12-cv-00639-LPS, 185 in 1:12-cv-00675-LPS, 50 in 1:13-cv-01455-LPS, 144 in 1:12-cv-01078-LPS, 170 in 1:12-cv-00641-LPS) Transcript.ORAL ARGUMENT HEARING HELD ON JANUARY 31, 2014. Held before Chief Judge Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, (302) 573-6360. (bpg) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
                                              REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION of 68 Memorandum Opinion. (ntl) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                [SEALED] Letter to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Proposed Redactions to July 28, 2014 Memorandum Opinion - re (49 in 1:13-cv-01458-LPS, 49 in 1:13-cv-01458-LPS) Order, Terminated Case. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit with Proposed Redactions to Opinion, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Motion for Reconsideration. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER re 68 Memorandum Opinion on the pending motions, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/28/14. (ntl) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      [SEALED] MEMORANDUM OPINION re Defendants' motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/28/14. This opinion has been emailed to local counsel. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00639-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Steven J. Balick regarding Defendants' request for a teleconference to discuss the structure of Markman proceedings. (Balick, Steven) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant VMware, Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatory Nos. 5 and 9 filed by VMware Inc..(Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant EMC Corporation and EMC International U.S. Holding, Inc.'s First Supplemental Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatory Nos. 5 and 9 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc..(Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Preliminary Invalidity Contentions filed by Amazon Web Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc., Jungle Disk LLC, Rackspace Hosting Inc., Rackspace US Inc., Dropbox Inc..(Maguire, Lauren) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                OPENING BRIEF in Support re 62 MOTION for Protective Order / Non-Parties IP Navigation Group, LLCs and Erich Spangenberg's Motion for Protection from Subpoenas filed by IP Navigation Group, LLC, Erich Spangenberg.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 7/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order / Non-Parties IP Navigation Group, LLCs and Erich Spangenberg's Motion for Protection from Subpoenas - filed by IP Navigation Group, LLC, Erich Spangenberg. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Joint Identification of Claim Terms filed by Amazon Web Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc., Jungle Disk LLC, Rackspace Hosting Inc., Rackspace US Inc., Dropbox Inc..(Maguire, Lauren) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Clouding IP, LLC's Identification of Claim Terms for Construction; and (2) this Notice of Service filed by Clouding IP LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF CLOUDING IP, LLCS AMENDED DISCLOSURE TO DEFENDANTS EMC CORP., EMC INTERNATIONAL U.S. HOLDINGS, INC. AND VMWARE, INC. PURSUANT TO 4(A) OF THE DELAWARE DEFAULT STANDARD FOR DISCOVERY and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Clouding IP LLC.(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Clouding IP LLC's Identification of Asserted Claims and (2) this Notice of Service filed by Clouding IP LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF CLOUDING IP, LLC'S PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS FOR EMC CORPORATION, EMC INTERNATIONAL U.S. HOLDINGS, INC., AND VMWARE, INC.; and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Clouding IP LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Notice of Third Party Subpoena to Paul L. Borrill to Testify at a Deposition filed by Amazon Web Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc..(Mayo, Andrew) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Responses and Objections to Defendants' Subpoena to Produce Documents in a Civil Action Directed to William J. Carter and (2) this Notice of Service filed by J William Carter.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Subpoenas by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc. (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-9); and 2) Defendant VMware, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-79) filed by VMware Inc..(Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendants EMC Corporation and EMC International U.S. Holdings, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-9); and 2) Defendants EMC Corporation and EMC International U.S. Holdings, Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production (Nos. 1-79) filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc..(Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF CLOUDING IP, LLC'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS TO DEFENDANTS; (2) PLAINTIFF CLOUDING IP, LLC'S FIRST SET OF COMMON INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANTS (NOS. 1 - 9); and (3) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Clouding IP LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          [SEALED] Transcript of Oral Argument Hearing held on January 31, 2014 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. (bpg) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman, Esquire regarding Redactions to Transcript. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Plaintiff Clouding IP, LLCs Amended Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26; (2) Plaintiff Clouding IP, LLCs Disclosures Pursuant to Paragraph 3 of the Default Standard for Discovery; and (3) Notice of Service filed by Clouding IP LLC.(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF SERVICE of 1) Defendant VmWare Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Delaware Default Standing for Discovery Paragraph 3; and 2) Defendants EMC Corporation and EMC International U.S. Holdings, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) and Delaware Default Standing for Discovery Paragraph 3 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF CLOUDING IP, LLC'S OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS' FIRST SET OF COMMON INTERROGATORIES and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Clouding IP LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    REDACTED VERSION of 42 Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Discovery due by 2/6/2015. Status Report due by 8/8/2014. Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 9/12/2014. Claim Construction Answering Brief due by 10/13/2014. A Markman Hearing is set for 11/12/2014 and 11/13/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 1/21/14. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00675-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        PROPOSED ORDER /[Proposed] Agreed Protective Order by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          [SEALED] REPLY BRIEF re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 34 MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Bifurcate filed by Clouding IP LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/17/2014. (Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              [SEALED] DECLARATION re 39 Answering Brief in Opposition, by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Certificate of Service)(Bussiere, Sara) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                [SEALED] ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing filed by Clouding IP LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/16/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) PLAINTIFF CLOUDING IP, LLC'S DISCLOSURES TO DEFENDANTS EMC CORP., EMC INTERNATIONAL U.S. HOLDINGS, INC. AND VMWARE, INC. PURSUANT TO 4(A) OF THE DELAWARE DEFAULT STANDARD FOR DISCOVERY; and (2) this NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Clouding IP LLC.(Tiradentes, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER /Proposed Scheduling Order by Clouding IP LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Official Transcript of Scheduling Telephone Conference held on December 20, 2013 before Judge Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian P. Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/23/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/2/2014. (bpg) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        REDACTED VERSION of 33 Opening Brief in Support, by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C)(Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Joinder in Motion to Bifurcate - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          [SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re 32 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A through C)(Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Lack of Standing - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Saindon, Paul) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              SO ORDERED, re ( 148 in 1:12-cv-00639-LPS) Proposed Order regarding filing of additional motions. (Defendants shall file any additional motions by 12/20/2013. Plaintiff shall file any answering briefs by 1/6/2014. Defendants shall file reply briefs by 1/15/2014). Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 12/18/2013. (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER Proposed Rule 16 Scheduling Order by Clouding IP LLC, Hewlett-Packard Company, CA Technologies Inc., CA, Inc. d/b/a/ CA Technologies, Motorola Mobility LLC, SAP AG, SAP America Inc., Amazon Web Services LLC, Amazon.com Inc., AT&T Corp., AT&T Mobility LLC, Citrix Systems Inc., Google Inc., Rackspace Hosting Inc., Rackspace US Inc., Siemens Enterprise Communications GmbH & Co KG, Siemens Enterprise Communications, Inc., Terremark North America LLC, Verizon Business Network Services Inc., Verizon Online LLC, Dropbox Inc., EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION /Stipulated [Proposed] Scheduling Order by Clouding IP LLC. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Official Transcript of Scheduling Conference held on November 18, 2013 before Leonard P. Stark. Court Reporter Brian Gaffigan, Telephone (302) 573-6360. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporterbefore the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2014. (bpg) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' letter relating to a discovery dispute (D.I. 15), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Clouding shall produce the materials it has already produced as well as the materials it has agreed to provide, which the Court agrees are, under the circumstances, more than sufficient to permit Defendants to meet the briefing deadlines set by the Court. Defendants' request for additional discovery, "to develop a complete record for the Court," is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/26/13. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-01338-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        [SEALED] Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding joint submission concerning dispute over discovery relevant to the standing issue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-2)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER: For the reasons stated and as explained in Court, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) the Court will hold Markman hearings in these related cases on November 12 and 13, 2014; (2) the Court will hear argument on the pending motions (relating to standing, bifurcation, and champerty) on January 31, 2014 at 10:00 a.m.; (3) the parties shall submit a joint letter on November 25, 2014 addressing any disputes relating to discovery relating to the pending motions; (4) all supplemental briefing relating to the pending motions shall be completed no later than January 15, 2014; (5) damages-related discovery is STAYED until January 31, 2014 or further order of the Court; (6) the parties shall submit a proposed coordinated scheduling order on December 13, 2013; (7) the Court will hold a telephonic scheduling conference on December 20, 2013 at 10:00 a.m.; and (8) all dates and deadlines in any scheduling orders in any of these related matters are VACATED. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 11/18/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00639-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Angela Padilla and Jessica Rossman - filed by VMware Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Krishnendu Gupta; William Clark; and Thomas A. Brown - filed by EMC Corporation. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORAL ORDER: Having reviewed the numerous recent letters raising multiple, difficult issues concerning scheduling of these related matters, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a coordinated IN-COURT scheduling conference on November 18, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/29/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00639-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Stephen B. Brauerman regarding EMC-VMWare Request. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to EMC and VMwares letter of October 21, 2013, relating to motions to dismiss for lack of standing, no later than October 23, 2013. ORDERED by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 10/22/13. Associated Cases: 1:12-cv-00641-LPS et al. (ntl) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding issue requiring coordination among the related cases. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EMC Corp. for EMC International US Holdings Inc.; Corporate Parent -- No Corporate Parent for EMC Corporation.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by VMware Inc. identifying Corporate Parent EMC Corp. for VMware Inc... (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by VMware Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding Verizon's position regarding case management issues. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 10, 2013 - filed by Clouding IP LLC, EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Benjamin J. Schladweiler regarding Markman Proceedings. (Schladweiler, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to The Honorable Leonard P. Stark from Jack B. Blumenfeld regarding scheduling of Markman proceedings. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Davis C. Doherty, Ryan C. Micallef, and Monte Cooper - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Karen G. Johnson-McKewan; Chris T. Ottenweller, Bas de Blank, Jason K. Yu, and Stacey E. Stillman - filed by EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond the Complaint to September 25, 2013 - filed by Clouding IP LLC, EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc.. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Marc A. Fenster, Brian Ledahl, and Dorian S. Berger - filed by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Marc A. Fenster, # 2 Certification of Brian Ledahl, # 3 Certification of Dorian S. Berger)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on EMC Corporation on August 20, 2013, filed by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clouding IP LLC. VMware Inc. served on 8/20/2013, answer due 9/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clouding IP LLC. EMC International US Holdings Inc. served on 8/20/2013, answer due 9/10/2013. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 5,495,607; 5,825,891; 5,944,839; 6,631,449; 6,738,799; 6,925,481; 7,254,621; 7,065,637; 7,272,708;7,032,089. (els) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (els) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against EMC Corporation, EMC International US Holdings Inc., VMware Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-1350534.) - filed by Clouding IP LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet)(els) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 279 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?