TCYK, LLC v. Doe
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06657

Tags
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 6:39 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
Space Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
v.
No Logo Doe, Defendant
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: On the court's own motion, status hearing set for 11/19/2013 at 9:30 a.m. is stricken and reset to 11/22/2013 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (meg, ) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
    ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 10/1/2013:Mailed notice(rj, ) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
      MINUTE entry before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall: Plaintiff's motion to take discovery before Rule 26 conference 8 is granted in part. No appearance is required on 10/02/2013. For further details see separate order. Mailed notice (rj, ) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery 8 before Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 10/2/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in support of motion for discovery 8 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
            MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
              NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                ORDER: Status Hearing set for 11/19/13 at 9:30 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendant of the status hearing forthwith. Pursuant to LR 5.2(f), a stapled and/or bound paper copy of all electronically filed documents must be delivered to chambers (2356) within one business day. Noncompliance with LR 5.2(f) will result in the imposition of a $200.00 fine payable to the Clerk of the Court, 219 South Dearborn Street, 20th Floor, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Parties are directed to discuss settlement of case, consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, and a proposed discovery plan. See Judge Gottschalls civil case management information regarding pretrial case management procedures @ http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Signed by the Honorable Joan B. Gottschall on 9/18/2013. (kj, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 Copyright Report
                  MAILED copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (kj, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Attorney Appearance
                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Attorney Appearance
                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 civil cover sheet
                        CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8739636. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 128 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?