Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia Inc v. Lodsys Group LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-01074-NJ
Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 22, 2016 at 6:18 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven M Lieberman +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 slieberman@rfem.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Whyte Hirschboeck Dudek, SC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugenia G. Carter +1 608 234 6058 +1 608 258 7138 gcarter@whdlaw.com
v.
No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Defendant
Office Milwaukee
Filed 9/25/2013
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 145 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ATTYOPEN
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Disclosure Statement
    DISCLOSURE Statement by Martha Stewart Living Omnimedia Inc. (Carter, Eugenia)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner
        Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (blr)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Complaint
          COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Lodsys Group LLC by MARTHA STEWART LIVING OMNIMEDIA INC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-1761952) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A U.S. Patent #5,999,908, # (2) Exhibit B U.S. Patent #7,133,834, # (3) Exhibit C U.S. Patent #7,222,078, # (4) Exhibit D U.S. Patent #7,620,565, # (5) Exhibit E July 15, 2011 Lodsys Letter, # (6) Exhibit F July 22, 2013 Burns Email, # (7) Exhibit G August 8, 2013 Burns Email, # (8) Exhibit H August 23, 2013 Burns Email, # (9) Exhibit I September 10, 2013 Burns Email, # (10) Exhibit J September 18, 2013 MSLO Email, # (11) Summons, # (12) Civil Cover Sheet)(Carter, Eugenia)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Summons Issued
          Summons Issued as to Lodsys Group LLC. (blr)
            LREF
            Blank  Notice Of Judge Assignment
            NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our web site ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 122 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?