TCYK, LLC v. Doe
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06770
District Judge Marvin E. Aspen, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 5:32 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (Attachments: # 1 Order) (ao,) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Case called for status, parties failed to appear. This case is dismissed. Civil case terminated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Doe Defendant (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Status hearing held on 4/3/2014, and continued to 5/29/2014 at 10:30 AM. Counsel for both sides are to appear for the status hearing.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/6/2014 status hearing
          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Status hearing held on 3/6/2014, and continued to 4/3/2014 at 10:30 AM., for report on settlement. Counsel for both sides are to be present for the 4/3/14 status hearing if the case does not settle.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Status hearing held on 1/30/2014, and continued to 3/6/2014 at 10:30 AM.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed the case is returned to the assigned District Judge. Mailed notice (ma,) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Young B. Kim. (ma, ) (Main Document 23 replaced on 1/24/2014) (ma, (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Defendant Doe's motion to quash or modify subpoena 14 is granted in part and denied in part. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Comcast Cable is permitted to disclose the names and addresses of those subscribers associated with the IP address 98.227.162.28. Comcast is not to disclose any other information. Comcast is ordered to comply with this order and the subpoena dated October 11, 2013, by no later than February 7, 2014. Mailed notice (ma,) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:The Status hearing set for 1/914 is stricken and reset to 1/30/2014 at 10:30 AM.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE by TCYK, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Doe to quash or modify subpoena 14 Plaintiff's Response to Motion of Doe to Quash Subpoena [Dkt. No. 14] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:The Status hearing set for 12/19/13, before Judge Aspen, is stricken and reset to 1/9/2014 at 10:30 AM.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: Defendant's motion to quash subpoena 14 is entered and continued. Plaintiff is ordered to file its response to Defendant's motion by December 30, 2013, and Defendant is ordered to file a reply thereto by January 13, 2014. The court will rule electronically. Mailed notice (ma,) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None
                            EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Young B. Kim pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Executive Committee on December 3, 2013. (ao,) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: John Doe #68's motion to quash subpoena is referred to Magistrate Judge Kim. The motion hearing set for 12/5/13 is stricken.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Motion by Wesley E. Johnson for presentment of motion to quash 14 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/5/2013 at 10:30 AM. (Johnson, Wesley) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION by Defendant Doe to quash or modify subpoena (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Wesley) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Doe by Wesley E. Johnson (Johnson, Wesley) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:The Status hearing set for 11/21/13 is stricken and reset to 12/19/2013 at 10:30 AM.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Plaintiff's Motion for leave to take discovery 8 prior to Rule 26(f) conference is granted. The motion hearing scheduled for 10/17/13 is stricken.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery 8 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 10/17/2013 at 10:30 AM. (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                            MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in support of motion for discovery 8 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                              MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Status hearing set for 11/21/2013 at 10:30 AM., in Courtroom 2525. The plaintiff is to notify the defendants of status date.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                    MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ao,) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                          CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8752663. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 139 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?