MEZERHANE DE SCHNAPP v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-01461
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 3:17 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Maria Andrea Mezerhane de Schnapp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by GROSSMAN LAW, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Andrea Grossman +1 240 403 0913 sandra@grossmanlawllc.com
v.
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov
No Logo Uscis, Defendant
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Affidavit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None
                      REPLY re 31 Memorandum in Opposition filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (td, ) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Modify
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER regarding in camera review. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on July 18, 2014. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 18 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MARIA ANDREA MEZERHANE DE SCHNAPP. (Grossman, Sandra) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 18 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (For Declaration and Exhibits See ECF No. 20) filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Affidavit of Varsenik Papazian and Exhs. 1-3)(Truong, John) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 18) by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by MARIA ANDREA MEZERHANE DE SCHNAPP (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Facts Not in Dispute, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Affidavit of Attorney Sandra Grossman, # 5 Exhibit A through J)(Grossman, Sandra) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MARIA ANDREA MEZERHANE DE SCHNAPP. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts in dispute, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Grossman, Sandra) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit of Jill Eggleston, # 3 Exhibit A-I, # 4 Exhibit J (Vaughn Index), # 5 Statement of Facts)(Truong, John) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER setting briefing schedule. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/15/2014. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order Pursuant To the Court's Nov. 22, 2013 Order by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Truong, John) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER setting schedule. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/22/2013. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Proposed Order re: Parties' Proposed Schedule by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER requiring parties to confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule for the filing of dispositive motions by not later than November 22, 2013. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/30/2013. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES.(Truong, John) (Entered: 10/30/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 10/18/2013 (Grossman, Sandra) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/30/2013. (Grossman, Sandra) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/30/2013. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/30/2013. (Grossman, Sandra) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(td, ) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to D.C. Att'y Gen. Machen by MARIA ANDREA MEZERHANE DE SCHNAPP filed by MARIA ANDREA MEZERHANE DE SCHNAPP.(Grossman, Sandra) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services by MARIA ANDREA MEZERHANE DE SCHNAPP filed by MARIA ANDREA MEZERHANE DE SCHNAPP.(Grossman, Sandra) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Att'y Gen. Holder by MARIA ANDREA MEZERHANE DE SCHNAPP filed by MARIA ANDREA MEZERHANE DE SCHNAPP.(Grossman, Sandra) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF CORRECTED CIVIL COVER SHEET by MARIA ANDREA MEZERHANE DE SCHNAPP re 1 Cover Sheet, Complaint (Grossman, Sandra) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        COMPLAINT by Maria Andrea Mezerhane de Schnapp, against USCIS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3479378) filed by Maria Andrea Mezerhane de Schnapp. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grossman, Sandra) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?