Super Micro Computer, Inc. v. Phillip M. Adams & Associates, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00978
District Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 6, 2016 at 2:10 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Super Micro Computer, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED randris@rmkb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lael David Andara +1 650 780 1714 +1 650 780 1701 landara@rmkb.com
v.
No Logo AFTG-TG, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Phillip M. Adams, Defendant
No Logo Phillip M. Adams & Associates LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dumke Law, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ezekiel R. Dumke, IV +1 801 935 4929 +1 801 935 4936 EDumke@DumkeLaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; Each side to bear costs; Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/25/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    CONSENT to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by AFTG-TG LLC, Phillip M. Adams, Phillip M. Adams & Associates, LLC.. (Dumke, Ezekiel) (Filed on 7/22/2011) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      CONSENT to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Super Micro Computer, Inc.. (Andris, Robert) (Filed on 7/22/2011) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
        STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal Between Adams & Super Micro Computer, Inc. filed by Super Micro Computer, Inc.. -Amendment to re 11 Stipulation Document 11 was an error-. (Andris, Robert) (Filed on 7/20/2011) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
          STIPULATION for Order of Dismissal Between Adams and Super Micro Computer, Inc. by Super Micro Computer, Inc.. (Andris, Robert) (Filed on 7/20/2011) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
            CLERKS NOTICE of FILING OF CONSENTS (not later than 7/18/2011) (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES (not related). Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/3/2011. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re 7 Joint Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Conference to 8/9/2011 at 10:00AM.. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by AFTG-TG LLC, Phillip M. Adams, Phillip M. Adams & Associates, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2011 03:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order Proposed Order for Extension of ADR and other Deadlines)(Dumke, Ezekiel) (Filed on 4/18/2011) (Entered: 04/18/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Ezekiel R Dumke, IV (Dumke, Ezekiel) (Filed on 4/13/2011) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                      REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Patent Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Related Case to C-10-4458-EMC filed by Plaintiff Super Micro Computer, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                          ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 5/31/2011 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 6/7/2011 at 3:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Summons Issued
                            SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants AFTG-TG LLC, Phillip M. Adams & Phillip M. Adams & Associates, LLC.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement & Invalidity of U.S. Patents Nos. 5,983,002; 6,401,222; 6,687,858; 7,251,752; 7,069,475; 7,409,601; 6,691,181; 7,249,203; 7,472,207; 6,842,802; 7,366,804 & 7,653,766 and Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against AFTG-TG LLC, Phillip M. Adams and Phillip M. Adams & Associates, LLC, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611056985] Filed by Plaintiff Super Micro Computer, Inc.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2011: # 1 Complaint) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2011: # 2 Exhibits A - E) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2011: # 3 Exhibits F - H) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2011: # 4 Exhibits I - K) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2011: # 5 Exhibits L -N) (tn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 105 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?