United States of America et al v. Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-07891

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 29, 2019 at 12:36 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Plaintiff
No Logo States of Illinois, Florida, and Georgia, Plaintiff
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
No Logo Yury Grenadyor, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Law Offices, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Sean Krzak +1 312 899 9090 +1 312 251 1160 msk@cliffordlaw.com
Space Courtney A. Marincsin +1 312 899 9090 cbm@cliffordlaw.com
Space Shannon McNulty +1 312 899 9090 +1 312 251 1160 smm@cliffordlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alastair John Findeis +1 212 594 5300 afindeis@milberg.com
Space Barry A. Weprin +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 bweprin@milberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shefsky & Froelich, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett +1 312 527 4000 khowlett@shefskylaw.com
Space Judith Schwartz Sherwin +1 312 527 4000 jsherwin@shefskylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams, Montgomery & John, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary Joanne Bortscheller +1 312 443 3228 mjb@willmont.com
Space C. Barry Montgomery +1 312 443 3200 cbm@willmont.com
Space Edward Roy Moor +1 312 443 3200 +1 312 630 8567 erm@willmont.com
v.
No Logo Aaron Greenspan, Defendant
No Logo Abram Starr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary M. Rowland +1 312 580 0100 +1 312 580 1994 mrowland@hsplegal.com
Space Donna Kaner Socol +1 312 580 0100
No Logo Alla Brodech, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller, Robert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Valentine Kern +1 847 808 0400 +1 847 243 2233 mvkernlaw@att.net

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of John C. Vojta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Charles Vojta +1 847 963 0099
No Logo Bella Zarubinsky, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Stuart G. Brecher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rod Radjenovich +1 312 256 7377 rradjenovich@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonough, Marcus, Cohn & Tretter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Strange +1 312 256 7377 jstrangelaw@aol.com
No Logo BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eduard Bogachek, Defendant
No Logo Eduard Zinger, Defendant
No Logo Emily Chatskis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stahl Cowen Crowley, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trent P. Cornell +1 312 641 0060 +1 312 423 8173 tcornell@stahlcowen.com
Space Jeremy Paul Kreger +1 312 641 0060 jkreger@stahlcowen.com
No Logo Galina Sabir, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kralovec, Jambois & Schwartz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander M Sukhman +1 312 782 2525 +1 312 855 0068 asukhman@kjs-law.com
No Logo Global PharmaLife, LLC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Demchenko & Kashuba LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nazar Kashuba +1 773 732 3543 nkashuba@dk-attorneys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert M. Karton, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert M. Karton +1 312 214 0900 +1 815 301 9114 robert@karton.us
No Logo Iouri Melnik, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McDonough, Marcus, Cohn & Tretter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard S. Jalovec +1 312 829 2300 rsj1021@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rishor Simone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel G Austin +1 312 829 2300 daustin@1stcounsel.com
No Logo John Does 1-50, Defendant
No Logo John Does 15-200, Defendant
No Logo Malecon Pharmacy, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Keenan Ryan +1 312 704 3000 dryan@hinshawlaw.com
Space Adam L. Saper +1 312 704 3000 asaper@hinshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kahan & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Alden Kahan +1 561 999 5999 bkahan@kahanshir.com
Space Joel Victor Lumer +1 561 999 5999 +1 561 893 0999 jlumer@kahanshir.com
No Logo Mei Services, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Martin, Brown, Sullivan, Roadman & Hartnett, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mason N. Floyd +1 312 360 5000 +1 312 360 5026 floyd@mbslaw.com
Space Leigh D. Roadman +1 312 360 5000 +1 312 360 5026 roadman@mbsrhlaw.com
Space William Gibbs Sullivan +1 312 360 5000 +1 312 360 5026 sullivan@mbslaw.com
No Logo Mikhail Bogachek, Defendant
No Logo PharmaLife Atlanta, Defendant
No Logo PharmaLife Boston, Defendant
No Logo PharmaLife Columbus, Defendant
No Logo PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc, Defendant
No Logo PharmaLife Minnesota, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard, O'Brien, Spencer, Gale & Sayre, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C Atmore +1 612 332 1030 +1 612 332 2740 tatmore@losgs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Martin, Brown, Sullivan, Roadman & Hartnett, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Keith McQueen +1 312 360 5025 +1 312 360 5026 tmcqueen@mbslaw.com
No Logo Pharmalife, LLC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Spiegel & Utrera, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melody Rae Ashby +1 312 443 1500 attorneyashby@amerilawyer.com
No Logo Rima Polotskaya, Defendant
No Logo Semen Dinkevich, Defendant
No Logo Storchak Pharmacy, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Storchak, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Svitlana Kharlamova, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Svitlana Kharlamova

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Svitlana Kharlamova +1 773 957 9849
No Logo Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Tom Weathered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen David Scallan +1 312 201 8969 stevescallan@covad.net
Space Andrew Theodore Staes +1 312 201 8969 +1 312 201 9233 andrewstaes@covad.net
No Logo Vasily Shevchuk, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vasily Shevchuk

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vasily Shevchuk +1 630 215 5582
No Logo Vladimir Storchak, Defendant
No Logo Walter Brodech, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gardiner Koch & Weisberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry C. Owen +1 312 362 0000 bowen@gkwwlaw.com
No Logo Yaroslaw Bandura, Defendant
No Logo Yevgeny Tsyrulnikov, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carl Peter Clavelli +1 312 922 5460 carlclavelli@netscape.net
No Logo Yuri Cherny, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kamensky, Rubinstein, Hochman & Delott, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael B. Brohman +1 847 982 1776 mbrohman@kr-law.com
Space Alon Stein +1 847 982 1776 astein@kr-law.com
Space Dorothy Voss Ward +1 847 982 1776 dvossward@kr-law.com
No Logo Yuri Shapiro, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BIRG & MELTSER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gene Meltser +1 847 444 9000 +1 847 444 1478 meltser@bmlaw.com
No Logo CVS Caremark Corporation, Movant
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (467) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Set Aside Default
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 7/26/2019, Entered: None Set Aside Default
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Judgment - AO450
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 537 Filed: 7/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Vacate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: None Vacate
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: None Alter Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Alter Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 515 Filed: 4/17/2019, Entered: None Alter Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion in Limine
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Voir Dire Held
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Strike
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Strike
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None In Limine
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None In Limine
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None order on motion to set a briefing schedule
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: 1/4/2017 response
                                                                    RESPONSE by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to order on motion for judgment on the pleadings,,,,, [431] Response to the Court's Direction to Show Cause (Coler, Susan)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016 terminate hearings
                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Ruling date on defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings set for 12/1/2016 is stricken. The court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 order on motion for leave to file
                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Motion hearing held on 11/9/2016. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file surreply [426] is granted. Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: 11/10/2016 Sur-Reply
                                                                              SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to reply to response to motion[425] in Opposition to Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: 11/7/2016 notice of motion
                                                                                Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor's NOTICE of Motion by Susan M. Coler for presentment of motion for leave to file[426] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/9/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 reply to response to motion
                                                                                    REPLY by Svitlana Kharlamova to memorandum in opposition to motion[424], MOTION by Defendant Svitlana Kharlamova for judgment on the pleadings [418] (Opatken, Gabriel)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: 10/21/2016 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Yury Grenadyor in Opposition to motion for judgment on the pleadings[418] (Attachments: # (1) Supplement)(Coler, Susan)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: 10/3/2016 order on motion to set a briefing schedule
                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Motion hearing held on 9/28/2016. Plaintiffs' response to Kharlamova's Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to be filed by 10/21/2016. Kharlamova's reply brief to be filed by 10/28/2016. The court will rule orally on 12/1/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing stricken. (wp, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: 9/29/2016 Notice of Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE by Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. (Clark, Aaron)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 notice of motion
                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Susan M. Coler for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule[420] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/28/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: 9/26/2016 motion by filer to set a briefing schedule
                                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to set a briefing schedule and Amend Case Schedule (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: 9/22/2016 notice of motion
                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Gabriel I Opatken for presentment of motion for judgment on the pleadings[418] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/28/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Opatken, Gabriel)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 attorney appearance
                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Svitlana Kharlamova by Gabriel I Opatken (Opatken, Gabriel)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: 8/10/2016 terminate hearings
                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: The Motion hearing on Staes & Scallan, P.C.'s Motion to withdraw and the Joint Motion to amend is reset for 8/17/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: 8/9/2016 terminate hearings
                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Staes & Scallan, P.C.'s Motion to withdraw now noticed for 8/11/2016 is reset by the court for 8/16/2016. The Joint motion to amend now set for 8/11/2016 is reset for 8/16/2016 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 notice of motion
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Susan M. Coler for presentment of motion to amend/correct[412] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/11/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to amend/correct Case Schedule (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 notice of motion
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Stephen David Scallan for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney[410] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/11/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Scallan, Stephen)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: 7/26/2016 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                  MOTION by Attorney Staes & Scallan, P.C. to withdraw as attorney for Svitlana Kharlamova. No party information provided (Scallan, Stephen)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: 3/24/2016 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. (Clark, Aaron)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Status Hearing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing held on 1/21/2016. Fact discovery to close 9/12/2016. Status hearing set for 9/8/2016 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. by Aaron Clark (Clark, Aaron)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: 1/12/2016 notice of change of address
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Leigh D. Roadman of Change of Address (Roadman, Leigh)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Sur-Reply
                                                                                                                              SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to motion for leave to file[402] Surreply In Opposition to Defendant Svitlana Kharlamova's and Defendnat Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc.'s Amended Motion for Summary Judgment (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Susan M. Coler for presentment of motion for leave to file[402] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/6/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 reply
                                                                                                                                    REPLY by Defendant Svitlana Kharlamova to motion for summary judgment[383] (Scallan, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015 Certificate
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service Vasily Shevchuk (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015 statement
                                                                                                                                          Counter Statement of Material Facts in Opposition to Defendant Kharlamova's and Defendant Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc.'s Amended Motions for Summary Judgment STATEMENT by Yury Grenadyor (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Susan M. Coler regarding response in opposition to motion[396] for summary judgment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G)(Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Yury Grenadyorin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Svitlana Kharlamova for summary judgment Amended[383], MOTION by Defendant Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. for summary judgment [390] (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Susan M. Coler for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule[393] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/4/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Keith A. Vogt for presentment of motion for summary judgment[390] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/3/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Vogt, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to amended complaint (Second) by Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc.(Vogt, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: 10/22/2015 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/14/2015 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Motion hearing held on 10/14/2015. The Motion to set briefing schedule is granted. Plaintiffs response to the motions for summary judgment to be filed by 11/4/2015/ Reply brief to be filed by 12/2/2015. The court will rule orally on 1/14/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: 10/12/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor's NOTICE of Motion by Susan M. Coler for presentment of motion by filer to set a briefing schedule[385] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/14/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 order on motion to vacate
                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Motion hearing held on 10/6/2015. Kharlamova's Motion to vacate is granted. Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 statement
                                                                                                                                                                            L.R.56.1 (a)(3) Statement Of Material Facts In Support Of Her SUmmary Judgment Motion STATEMENT by Svitlana Kharlamova (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Scallan, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Stephen David Scallan for presentment of motion for summary judgment[380] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/14/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Scallan, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint Second Amended by Svitlana Kharlamova(Scallan, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by Defendant Svitlana Kharlamova to motion to vacate[375] (Scallan, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Yury Grenadyor to MOTION by Defendant Svitlana Kharlamova to vacate Pursuant To Rule 55(c)[375] (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Theodore Staes for presentment of motion to vacate[375] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/6/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Staes, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: 9/24/2015 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Motion hearing held on 9/24/2015. Attorney Meltzer of the Meltzer Law Group is granted leave to appear and answer by 10/23/2015 on behalf of defendant Ukranian Village Pharmacy. Plaintiff's Motion for Default against Defendants Svitlana Kharlamova and Vasily Shevchuk for failure to appear or answer [366] is granted. Status hearing set for 11/4/2015 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 09/15/2015 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: Judith A. Walsh, CSR, RDR, CRR. 312-702-8865. judith_walsh@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2015. (Walsh, Judy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Yury Grenadyor regarding sur-reply[371] In Opposition to Defendants Michael Bogacheck's and Semen Dinkevich's Motion to Enforce Settlement (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: 9/17/2015 Sur-Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to motion to enforce[353] (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Enforce
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/16/2015 Order on Motion to Enforce
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Motion hearing held on 9/15/2015. Defendants' Motion to enforce the settlement agreement is granted, for the reasons stated in open court. Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 order on motion for leave to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Motion hearing held on 9/10/2015. Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file sur reply[365] is granted. Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 other
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit 1 to ECF#366-1 Declaration of Susan M. Coler by Yury Grenadyor (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Susan M. Coler for presentment of motion for entry of default[366] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/24/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: 9/8/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendants Michael Bogachek's and Semen Dinkevich's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement [365] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/10/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Coler, Susan) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/9/2015 (jh, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: 9/3/2015 reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by Defendants Mikhail Bogachek, Semen Dinkevich to response in opposition to motion, [358] to enforce settlement agreement (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Floyd, Mason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/13/2015 Order on motion to stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Motion hearing held on 8/11/2015. Under the conditions set forth in open court, Defendants Motion for leave to issue limited discovery and to stay briefing on defendants' motion to enforce settlement agreement [359] is granted. Defendants reply brief on its motion to enforce is now due by 9/3/2015. Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: 8/7/2015 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PLAINTIFF Yury Grenadyor's Opposition to Defendats Michael Bogacheck's and Semen Dinkevich's Motion for Limited Discovery and to Stay Briefing on Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement (Coler, Susan) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 8/10/2015 (jh, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: 8/5/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Mason N. Floyd for presentment of motion to stay[359] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/11/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Floyd, Mason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLAINTIFF Yury Grenadyor's Opposition to Defendants Michael Bogachek's and Semen Dinkevich's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement [353]. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Susan M. Coler, # (2) Exhibit 1-7, # (3) Declaration of Plaintiff Grenadyor)(Coler, Susan) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 7/30/2015 (jh, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None order on motion to set a briefing schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: 7/6/2015 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor by Susan M. Coler (Coler, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Mason N. Floyd for presentment of motion to enforce[353] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 7/9/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Floyd, Mason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Enforce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Motion hearing held on 6/30/2015. C. Barry Montgomery's Motion to withdraw as attorney for plaintiff[342] is granted. The Unopposed Motion for leave to file appearances of Mason N. Floyd and Leigh D. Roadman on behalf of defendant Semen Dinkevich[344] is granted. Defendant Semen Dinkevich's Motion for extension of time to 6/30/2015 in which to answer Relator's Second Amended Complaint [346] is granted. Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to amended complaint by Semen Dinkevich(Floyd, Mason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Semen Dinkevich by Leigh D. Roadman (Roadman, Leigh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: 6/30/2015 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Semen Dinkevich by Mason N. Floyd (Floyd, Mason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: 6/24/2015 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to amended complaint by Mikhail Bogachek(Floyd, Mason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: 6/24/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Mason N. Floyd for presentment of extension of time[346] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Floyd, Mason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Mason N. Floyd for presentment of motion for leave to file[344] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Floyd, Mason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015 notice of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by C. Barry Montgomery for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney[342] before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/30/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Montgomery, C.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: 6/10/2015 Status Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing held on 6/10/2015. Defendants to answer complaint by 6/24/2015. Status hearing set for 8/12/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: 4/30/2015 Status Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing held on 4/28/2015.All parties who are not named in the remanded retaliation count are dismissed. Status hearing set for 6/10/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: 4/24/2015 attorney appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor by Michael Alan Johnson (Johnson, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: 3/2/2015 appeal record returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-3383 consisting of ten sealed envelopes. (ks, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: 2/25/2015 Status Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing held on 2/25/2015. Plaintiff given until 4/28/2015 in which to obtain counsel. Status hearing set for 4/28/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 2/25/2015 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE of USCA dated 12/3/14 regarding notice of appeal [321]; USCA No. 13-3383; The Judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED in Part, REVERSED in Part, and REMANDED, in accordance with the decision of this court entered on this date. Costs are awarded to the defendants. (mjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 opinion from appellate court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPINION from the USCA for the 7th Circuit; Argued 10/3/14; Decided 12/3/14 in USCA case no. 13-3383. (mjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 appeal record returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER from the Seventh Circuit returning the record on appeal in USCA no. 13-3383 consisting of 10 sealed envelopes. (mjc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Designation of Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DESIGNATION by Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., MEI Services, Inc., PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 13-3383 (Floyd, Mason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA RECEIVED on 11/12/13 the long record regarding notice of appeal 321 (dj ) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSMITTED to the USCA for the 7th Circuit the long record on appeal 321 (USCA no. 13-3383).(dj ) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by plaintiff Yury Grenadyor of Filing re designation of record on appeal 328 . (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DESIGNATION by plaintiff Yury Grenadyor of record on appeal : USCA Case No. 13-3383. (mjc, ) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 327 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTER AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/7/2013:Mailed notice(wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 327 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTER AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/7/2013:Mailed notice(wp, ) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Pursuant to the Court's 10/2/13 Ruling [ECF No. 316] granting Defendants Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. and Svetlana Kharlamova's motion to modify the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order of 9/26/2013 [ECF No. 312], the Court hereby enters a Amended Memorandum Opinion striking the language that was the subject of Defendants' motion.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 11/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEVENTH CIRCUIT transcript information sheet by Yury Grenadyor. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(mjc, ) (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal 321 ; USCA Case No. 13-3383. (mjc, ) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal 321 . Notified counsel (dj ) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (dj ) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of appeal by Yury Grenadyor regarding orders 266 , 312 , 313 , 267 Filing fee $ 455.00. Receipt #4624108961. (dj ) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:United States' Motion to Amend Judgment 317 is denied. Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Defendant Svitlana Kharlamova to motion to amend/correct, motion for relief 317 (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Katherine Ellen Beaumont for presentment of motion to amend/correct, motion for relief 317 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/17/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Beaumont, Katherine) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to amend/correct entered judgment 313 (Beaumont, Katherine) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Motion of Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. and Svetlana Kharlamova to modify memorandum opinion and order of 9/26/2013 314 is granted. Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Theodore Staes for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 314 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/2/2013 at 09:30 AM. (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc.To Modify Memorandum Opinion And Order Of September 26, 2013 (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED JUDGMENT on 9/26/2013:Mailed notice(wp, ) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 312 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/26/2013: The Relators Third Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Court thus grants the following motions:1.Defendants Storchak Pharmacy, LLCs and Vladimir Storchaks Motion to Dismiss Relators Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 280);2.Certain Defendants Motion to Dismiss Relators Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 282);3.Global Pharmalife, LLCs Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 9(b) and Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (ECF No. 295);4.Semen Dinkevichs Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 9(b) and Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (ECF No. 296); 5.Relators Motion to Dismiss Pharmalife Massachusetts, Inc. (ECF No. 301). Pharmalife Massachusetts is dismissed with prejudice; and6.Joinder of Svetlana Kharlamova and Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc., in the Motion to Dismiss Relators Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 306).Civil case terminated.Mailed notice(wp, ) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutical Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy Inc., and MEI Services, Inc. motion for additional time to answer or otherwise respond 133 and Defendant Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc.s motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to second amended complaint 146 were granted nunc pro tunc, as modified, on 3/13/12. See Minute Entry 158 .Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Ruling date on defendants motion to dismiss is stricken. The Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor by Shannon Marie McNulty (McNulty, Shannon) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by Global PharmaLife, LLC. to response in opposition to motion, 299 (Kashuba, Nazar) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by Semen Dinkevich to response in opposition to motion, 299 to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Kashuba, Nazar) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendants Svitlana Kharlamova, Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. for joinder In Codefendants' Motions To Dismiss Relator's Third Amended Complaint (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., MEI Services, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, 299 (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Defendants Vladimir Storchak, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC. to memorandum in support of motion 287 to Dismiss (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor for order (Marincsin, Courtney) (Modified on 1/29/2013 by Clerk's Office) (mb, ). (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Yury Grenadyor re MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to dismiss 301 (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to dismiss (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Yury Grenadyor. Vladimir Storchak waiver sent on 1/10/2012, answer due 3/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Yury Grenadyorin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 282 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 280 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 295 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 296 Omnibus Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service by Nazar Kashuba on behalf of Semen Dinkevich regarding memorandum in support of motion 297 (Kashuba, Nazar) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Semen Dinkevich in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 296 (Kashuba, Nazar) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Kashuba, Nazar) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Kashuba, Nazar) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM of Law in support of its MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Kashuba, Nazar) (Modified by Clerk's Office on 1/8/2013) (mb, ). (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Defendants Semen Dinkevich and global Pharmalife's Motion for Enlargement of Time to file responsive pladings and to amend a briefing schedule is granted, without objection. Defendants Motions to Dismiss to be filed by 1/4/2013. Responses to be filed by 1/22/2013. Reply briefs to be filed by 1/29/2013. The Court's oral ruling date is reset for 2/28/2013 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Nazar Kashuba for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief,,,, 291 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/27/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Kashuba, Nazar) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendants Semen Dinkevich, Global PharmaLife, LLC. for extension of time to file answer regarding status hearing, set/reset hearings,,,, 288 and amend briefing schedule order (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Nazar Kashuba)(Kashuba, Nazar) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Semen Dinkevich, Global PharmaLife, LLC. by Nazar Kashuba (Kashuba, Nazar) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Agreed Motion to file memorandum instanter 285 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing held on 11/27/2012. Oral motion by attorney Robert Karton for leave to withdraw from representing Defendants Global Pharmalife and Semen Dinkevich is granted. Both defendants are given an extension to 12/18/12 to answer or otherwise respond to the third amended complaint. Defendants have indicated their responses will be motions to dismiss. Plaintiffs' responses to motions to dismiss are due 1/4/13; replies are due 1/11/13. The Court will rule orally on 2/20/12 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Vladimir Storchak, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC. in support of motion to file instanter 285 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Keith McQueen for presentment of motion to file instanter 285 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/11/2012 at 09:30 AM. (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendants Vladimir Storchak, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC. to file instanter (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit Exhibt A to Memorandum)(McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED notice of filing 21 Declination of Intervention and Proposed Order (Tullio, Heather) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., MEI Services, Inc., PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 282 (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 312 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/26/2013: The Relators Third Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Court thus grants the following motions:1.Defendants Storchak Pharmacy, LLCs and Vladimir Storchaks Motion to Dismiss Relators Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 280);2.Certain Defendants Motion to Dismiss Relators Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 282);3.Global Pharmalife, LLCs Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 9(b) and Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (ECF No. 295);4.Semen Dinkevichs Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 9(b) and Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (ECF No. 296); 5.Relators Motion to Dismiss Pharmalife Massachusetts, Inc. (ECF No. 301). Pharmalife Massachusetts is dismissed with prejudice; and6.Joinder of Svetlana Kharlamova and Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc., in the Motion to Dismiss Relators Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 306).Civil case terminated.Mailed notice(wp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM amended complaint, 273 by Svitlana Kharlamova Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Certian Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Relator's Third Amended Complaint (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Defendants' Agreed Motion for additional time to answer or otherwise respond 276 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Vladimir Storchak by Thomas Keith McQueen (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Mason N. Floyd for presentment of extension of time, 276 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/1/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., Semen Dinkevich, Global PharmaLife, LLC., Svitlana Kharlamova, MEI Services, Inc., PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc, Vladimir Storchak, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC., Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Vladimir Storchak. (mb, ) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re amended complaint, 273 (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Third AMENDED complaint by Yury Grenadyor against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F-1, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit F-2)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to 10/15/2012 in which to filea third amended complaint 268 is granted. Status hearing reset for 11/27/2012 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Defendant Cherry's Motion for extension of time to file answer and to vacate technical default 113 is granted nunc pro tunc to 3/13/2012. Defendants Alla Brodech, Rima Polotskaya and Edward Zinger's motion to dismiss 135 is denied as moot. Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Defendant Melnik's Motion for extension of time 104 is dismissed as moot. Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Courtney A. Marincsin for presentment of (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor for extension of time (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/5/2012:Mailed notice(wp, ) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: ENTER MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motions to Dismiss are granted and the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's Request for Leave to Replead is also granted. Plaintiff to replead by 9/28/2012. Status hearing set for 10/23/2012 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service of Discovery Documents by Courtney A. Marincsin on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The ruling date of 7/25/2012 is stricken. The Court will rule by mail.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., MEI Services, Inc., PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc TO RELATOR'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by Defendant Storchak Pharmacy, LLC. to memorandum in opposition to motion,, 254 Memorandum of Law in Support (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by Defendant Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. to notice of filing, 219 In Support Of Motion Of Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. And Svetlana Kharlamova's Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6), Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Relator Yury Grenadyor's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Storchak, LLC pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) without prejudice is granted. [For further detail see separate order.] Mailed notice (mb, ) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AGREED ORDER on Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena to T. Crown Holdings II, Inc. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/5/2012:(mb, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion hearing held. Enter Agreed Order on Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena to T Crown Holdings II, Inc. [For further detail see separate order.] Mailed notice (mb, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/5/2012:(mb, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Relator Yury Grenadyor's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) with prejudice is granted. [For further detail see separate order.] Mailed notice (mb, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/17/12 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: Gayle A. McGuigan, CSR, RMR, CRR, (312) 435-6047, Gayle_McGuigan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 6/27/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2012. (McGuigan, Gale) (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Yury Grenadyor in Opposition to motion to dismiss, 225 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 238 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 226 , motion to dismiss 183 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 154 , motion for leave to file 155 , motion for leave to file excess pages, 224 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/31/2012:(mb, ) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: The Relator's Rule 41(a)(2) Motion to Dismiss without prejudice, is Granted. [For further detail see separate order.] Mailed notice (mb, ) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Edward Roy Moor for presentment of motion to compel 250 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/6/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to compel Compliance with Subpona (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Moor, Edward) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Robert M. Karton on behalf of Semen Dinkevich, Global PharmaLife, LLC. (Karton, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Initial Disclosures Of Svetlana Kharlamova And Ukranian Village Pharmacy Pursuant To Rule 26(a)(1) by Svitlana Kharlamova and Ukranian Village (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Edward Roy Moor for presentment of motion to dismiss 246 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/5/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to dismiss Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. with prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Moor, Edward) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          GENERAL PROTECTIVE Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/18/2012.(tg, ) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Enter General Protective Order.Mailed notice (tg, ) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Motions to stay are denied. Parties to proceed with discovery. Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:CVS Caremark Corporation and CVS Pharmacy Inc.'s Motion for protective order 231 is granted. ; Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 05/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Edward Roy Moor for presentment of motion to dismiss 240 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/23/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to dismiss defendant Storchak LLC Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) with Proposed Order attached (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Semen Dinkevich, Global PharmaLife, LLC. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 238 (Karton, Robert) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Second Amended Complaint (Karton, Robert) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/10/2012:(mb, ) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Relator's Rule 41(a)(2) Motion to Dismiss Defendants Yaroslaw Bandura, Alla Brodech, Walter Brodech, Emily Chatskis, Yuri Cherny, Aaron Greenspan, Iouri Melnik, Rima Polotskaya, Galina Sabir, Yuri Shapiro, Abram Starr, Yevgeny Tsyrulnikov, Bella Zarubinsky, and Eduard Zinger without prejudice is granted. [For further detail see separate order.] Mailed notice (mb, ) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. to MOTION by Movant CVS Caremark Corporation for protective order 231 (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., MEI Services, Inc., PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc in support of motion to dismiss, 225 Relator's Second Amended Complaint (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENT to In Support Of Request To Stay Discovery (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 05/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Aaron H. Stanton for presentment of motion for protective order 231 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/15/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Stanton, Aaron) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Movant CVS Caremark Corporation for protective order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Stanton, Aaron) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by PharmaLife Minnesota, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC., Storchak, LLC. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 226 (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Defendants Demen Kinkevich and Global Pharmalife by Robert M. Karton, Robert M. Karton Ltd Agreed Motion for extension of time to 5/14/2012 in which to its motion to dismiss 222 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Mason N. Floyd for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, 224 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants MEI Services, Inc., Mikhail Bogachek, PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc, Eduard Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc. to dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 9(b) and 12(b)(6) (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendants MEI Services, Inc., Mikhail Bogachek, PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc, Eduard Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc. for Leave to File Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Relator's Second Amended Complaint in Excess of Fifteen Pages Instanter (Floyd, Mason) (Docket Text modified by Clerks' Office.) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Karton for presentment of extension of time 222 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Karton, Robert) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendants Semen Dinkevich, Global PharmaLife, LLC. for extension of time Extend Time to File Motion to Dismiss to May 14, 2012 (Karton, Robert) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Edward Roy Moor for presentment of motion to dismiss 220 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to dismiss Certain Defendants Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Moor, Edward) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. Notice of Filing Of Ukranian Village Pharmacy, Inc., and Svetlana Kharlamova's Motion To Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant To Rules 9(b) and 12(b)(6), Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/17/12 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Court Reporter Contact Information: Gayle A. McGuigan, CSR, RMR, CRR (312) 435-6047, Gayle_McGuigan@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 5/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2012. (McGuigan, Gale) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Motion to compel [Dkt. No. 164] is granted. Motions to stay [Dkt. No's 168, 181 and 193] are continued generally to 5/17/2012 at 9:00 a.m. Motion to vacate technical defaults [Dkt. No.175] is granted. Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Refiling of ECF #19 - ORDER Granting Extension until 5/2/2011 Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 2/24/2011 pursuant to the Courts March 13, 2012 Order (Docket #158) by Yury Grenadyor (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Refiling of ECF #33 - MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor for a timely filed amended complaint pursuant to the Courts March 13, 2012 Order (Docket #158) by Yury Grenadyor (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Refiling of ECF #31 - MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor for leave to appear pro hac vice pursuant to the Courts March 13, 2012 Order (Docket #158) by Yury Grenadyor (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Refiling of ECF #28 - EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor for extension of the seal pursuant to the Courts March 13, 2012 Order (Docket #158) by Yury Grenadyor (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Refiling of ECF #16 - ORDER Granting Extension of Seal until 3/1/2011 Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 2/3/2011 pursuant to the Courts March 13, 2012 Order (Docket #158). by Yury Grenadyor (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. by Adam L. Saper (Saper, Adam) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., MEI Services, Inc., PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Certain Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Until Resolution of Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants Semen Dinkevich, Global PharmaLife, LLC. to stay regarding notice of motion 208 (Karton, Robert) (Entered: 04/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Robert M. Karton for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief,, 193 , motion to stay, 168 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/17/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Karton, Robert) (Entered: 04/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 4/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Global PharmaLife, LLC. by Robert M. Karton (Karton, Robert) (Entered: 04/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service by Courtney A. Marincsin on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service by Courtney A. Marincsin on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service by Courtney A. Marincsin on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service by Courtney A. Marincsin on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service by Jeremy Paul Kreger on behalf of Emily Chatskis (Kreger, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Rule 26 Disclosure and Certificate of Service by Iouri Melnik (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Jalovec, Richard) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to compel Rule 26(f) Conference 164 (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Refiling of ECF #14 - NOTICE by United States of America of election to decline intervention pursuant to the Courts March 13, 2012 Order (Docket #158) by Yury Grenadyor (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Refiling of ECF #13 - MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman:Enter order signed by Judge Holderman on 2/11/10 granting extension of time until March 1, 2011 pursuant to the Courts March 13, 2012 Order (Docket #158) by Yury Grenadyor (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Refiling of ECF #12 - MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for extension of time to consider election to intervene and of time during which the complaint and other documents shall remain under seal pursuant to the Courts March 13, 2012 Order (Docket #158) by Yury Grenadyor (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Refiling of ECF #11 - SEALED MOTION pursuant to the Courts March 13, 2012 Order (Docket #158) by Yury Grenadyor (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Keith McQueen for presentment of motion to stay, motion for relief,, 193 , motion to stay, 168 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/17/2012 at 09:30 AM. (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 26 Disclosures and Certificate of Service by Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. (Lumer, Joel) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants PharmaLife Minnesota, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC., Storchak, LLC. to stay regarding MOTION by Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., MEI Services, Inc., PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc to stay Discovery Until Resolution of Motions to Dismiss 168 (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service of Discovery Document by Alexander Sukhman on behalf of Galina Sabir (Sukhman, Alexander) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Abram Starr (Rowland, Mary) (Entered: 04/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service Discovery Document - Defendant Eduard Zinger's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Michael Valentine Kern on behalf of Eduard Zinger (Kern, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service Discovery Document - Defendant Rimma Polotskaya's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Michael Valentine Kern on behalf of Rima Polotskaya (Kern, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE Service of Discovery Document Defendant Alla Brodech's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Kern, Michael) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosure by Gene Meltser on behalf of Yuri Shapiro (Meltser, Gene) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosure by Carl Peter Clavelli on behalf of Yevgeny Tsyrulnikov (Clavelli, Carl) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. to MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to compel Rule 26(f) Conference 164 (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Keenan Ryan for presentment of motion to dismiss 183 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/17/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. to dismiss SECOND Amended Complaint (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Daniel Keenan Ryan for presentment of motion to stay 181 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/17/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendant Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. to stay discovery until resolution of pending motion to dismiss (Ryan, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Service of Discovery Document - Relator's First Amended Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Mary Joanne Bortscheller on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service of Discovery Document - Relator's Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Edward Roy Moor on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Yury Grenadyorin Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., MEI Services, Inc., PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc to stay Discovery Until Resolution of Motions to Dismiss 168 including Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Moor, Edward) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Trent P. Cornell for presentment of motion to vacate 175 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/17/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Cornell, Trent) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant Emily Chatskis to vacate Motion to Vacate Technical Defaults and to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Cornell, Trent) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Emily Chatskis re attorney appearance 173 , attorney appearance 172 Notice of Filing (Cornell, Trent) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Emily Chatskis by Trent P. Cornell Attorney Appearance for Defendant Emily Chatskis by Jeremy P. Kreger (Cornell, Trent) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Emily Chatskis by Trent P. Cornell (Cornell, Trent) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants PharmaLife Minnesota, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC., Storchak, LLC. by Thomas Charles Atmore (Atmore, Thomas) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by William Gibbs Sullivan for presentment of motion to stay, 168 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/17/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Certain Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery Until Resolution of Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sullivan, William) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., MEI Services, Inc., PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc to stay Discovery Until Resolution of Motions to Dismiss (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bella Zarubinsky by Rod Radjenovich (Radjenovich, Rod) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bella Zarubinsky by Jeffrey Strange (Strange, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Edward Roy Moor for presentment of motion to compel 164 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/17/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to compel Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Moor, Edward) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:As stated in open court on 3/13/2012, the parties may hold their conference in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f).Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor by Michael Sean Krzak (Krzak, Michael) (Entered: 03/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service of Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Permit Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action to CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Courtney A. Marincsin on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Thomas C. Atmore's Application to appear pro hac vice 123 on behalf of Pharmalife Minnesota, Storchak Pharmacy LLC and Storchak LLC, is granted. Barry A. Weprin's Application to appear pro hac vice 157 on behalf of Yury Grenadyor, is granted.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 03/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      HIPAA Qualified Protective Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/13/2012:(mb, ) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: All motions to dismiss are to be filed by 5/8/12. Defendants are to consolidate filings as much as possible. plaintiff's consolidated response is due by 6/5/12. Defendants replies are due by 6/19/12. Again, the Defendants are encouraged to consolidate filings. Oral ruling is tentatively scheduled for 7/25/12 at 9 a.m.. Plaintiff's motion for a protective order 138 is granted. As discussed in open court on 3/13/12, Plaintiff is directed to refile documents with the following document numbers to replace those lost by the Clerk's office. [ 11 ] [ 12 ] [ 13 ] [ 14 ] [ 16 ] [ 17 ] [ 18 ] [ 19 ] [ 20 ] [ 24 ] [ 25 ] [ 27 ] [ 28 ] [ 30 ] [ 31 ] [ 32 ] [ 33 ]. [For further details see separate order.] Mailed notice (mb, ) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Barry a. Weprin's Application to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Yury Grenadyor 71 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor regarding Subpoena to Produce Documents, etc. served on CVS Pharmacy, Inc. - Legal Department on March 1, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service of Discovery Document)(Moor, Edward) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant Yevgeny Tsyrulnikov for leave to file his Motion To Dismiss (Clavelli, Carl) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Clavelli, Carl) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc by Mason N. Floyd (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc by Leigh D. Roadman (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc by William Gibbs Sullivan (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service of Proof of Service of Subpoena by Edward Roy Moor on behalf of Yury Grenadyor regarding certificate of service 128 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service on T Crown Holdings, II)(Moor, Edward) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Service and accompanying Subpoena to Produce Documents directed to Self Reliance Ukrainian American Federal Credit Union by Courtney A. Marincsin on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: All motions that were scheduled for 3/8/2012 are reset for 3/13/2012 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Theodore Staes for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 146 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/13/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Plead To Second Amended Complaint (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Vasily Shevchuk. (mb, ) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Plaintiff Grenadyor's Motion to Dismiss Defendants Pharmalife Columbus, Pharmalife Boston, Pharmalife Atlanta and Pharmalife LLC is granted without prejudice. Mailed notice (mb, ) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. by Stephen David Scallan (Scallan, Stephen) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. by Andrew Theodore Staes (Staes, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/23/2012:(mb, ) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion hearing held. The Agreed Motion to extend time to 3/2/2012 to respond to the Plaintiffs' complaint is granted. Mailed notice (mb, ) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Edward Roy Moor for presentment of motion for protective order 138 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/13/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor for protective order (HIPAA Qualified Protective Order) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Moor, Edward) (Entered: 03/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alla Brodech, Rima Polotskaya, Eduard Zinger by John Charles Vojta (mb, ) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Alla Brodech, Rima Polotskaya, Eduard Zinger for presentment of motion to strike and dismiss 135 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/8/2012 at 09:00 AM. (mb, ) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendants Alla Brodech, Rima Polotskaya, Eduard Zinger to strike and dismiss. (mb, ) (Entered: 03/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Leigh D. Roadman for presentment of (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., MEI Services, Inc. for extension of time (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing stricken. Defendants Motion to Strike and Dismiss is reset to 3/13/2012 at 9:30 a.m.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Defendant Walter Brodech's Agreed Motion for extension of time to 3/19/2012 in which to answer or other plead 115 is granted. The Agreed Motion to withdraw Defendant Pharmalife, LLC's Motion to Dismiss or alternatively, for summary judgment 120 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Galina Sabir, M.D.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Galina Sabir(Sukhman, Alexander) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Service of Discovery Document re Subpoena to Produce Documents to CVS Pharmacy, Inc. by Mary Joanne Bortscheller on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Service of Discovery Document re Subpoena to Produce Documents to T Crown Holdings II, Inc. by Mary Joanne Bortscheller on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Service of Discovery Document re Subpoena to Produce Documents to CVS Caremark Corporation by Mary Joanne Bortscheller on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc. by Mason N. Floyd (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc. by William Gibbs Sullivan (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc. by Leigh D. Roadman (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6882990. (Atmore, Thomas) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Alla Brodech by Michael Valentine Kern (Kern, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor by C. Barry Montgomery with Certificate of Service attached. (Montgomery, C.) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendant Pharmalife, LLC. to withdraw motion to dismiss 101 or Alternatively, for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ashby, Melody) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Alexander Sukhman for presentment of motion to extend 118 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/23/2012 at 09:30 AM. (mb, ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant Galina Sabir for extension of time (Exhibit). (mb, ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Galina Sabir by Alexander Sukhman. (mb, ) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Barry C. Owen for presentment of extension of time 115 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/22/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Owen, Barry) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant Walter Brodech for extension of time Agreed motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading (Owen, Barry) (Entered: 02/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Alon Stein for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion to vacate, motion for relief 113 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/8/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Stein, Alon) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant Yuri Cherny for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 6 , MOTION by Defendant Yuri Cherny to vacate Technical Defaults (Stein, Alon) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Edward Roy Moor for presentment of motion to dismiss 111 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/23/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to dismiss Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2) with Exhibits A & B attached hereto. (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yury Grenadyor as to BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc. on 1/31/2012, answer due 2/21/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walter Brodech by Barry C. Owen (Owen, Barry) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Yuri Cherny by Dorothy Voss Ward (Ward, Dorothy) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Yuri Cherny by Alon Stein (Stein, Alon) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Yuri Cherny by Michael B. Brohman (Brohman, Michael) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Service and NOTICE of Motion by Richard S. Jalovec for presentment of extension of time 104 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/8/2012 at 09:00 AM. (Jalovec, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendant Iouri Melnik for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Jalovec, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Iouri Melnik by Richard S. Jalovec (Jalovec, Richard) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Iouri Melnik by Daniel G Austin (Austin, Daniel) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendant Pharmalife, LLC. to dismiss or Alternatively Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ashby, Melody) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor by Mary Joanne Bortscheller with certificate of service attached (Bortscheller, Mary) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Yevgeny Tsyrulnikov by Carl Peter Clavelli (Clavelli, Carl) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Yuri Shapiro by Gene Meltser (Meltser, Gene) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Yuri Shapiro (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit appearance, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Meltser, Gene) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pharmalife, LLC. by Melody Rae Ashby (Ashby, Melody) (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yury Grenadyor as to Iouri Melnik on 1/24/2012, answer due 2/14/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 02/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abram Starr by Donna Kaner Socol (Socol, Donna) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Abram Starr by Mary M. Rowland (Rowland, Mary) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Defendant Dr. Abram Starr's Answer to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Abram Starr(Rowland, Mary) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Rima Polotskaya, Eduard Zinger by Michael Valentine Kern (Kern, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yury Grenadyor as to Alla Brodech on 1/26/2012, answer due 2/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yury Grenadyor as to Eduard Zinger on 1/27/2012, answer due 2/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yury Grenadyor as to Yuri Shapiro on 1/21/2012, answer due 2/13/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yury Grenadyor as to Rima Polotskaya on 1/20/2012, answer due 2/10/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yury Grenadyor as to Yuri Cherny on 1/26/2012, answer due 2/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yury Grenadyor as to Global PharmaLife, LLC. on 1/25/2012, answer due 2/15/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yury Grenadyor as to Pharmalife, LLC. on 1/26/2012, answer due 2/16/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor as to Abram Starr on January 23, 2012 answer due 2/13/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ea, ). (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor as to Linda Dryzhakova (Substitute Service) on January 23, 2012, answer due 2/13/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ea, ). (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor as to Emily Chatskis on January 23, 2012, answer due 2/13/12. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office.) Modified on 1/31/2012 (ea, ). (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor regarding Complaint and Summons NOT served on Aaron Greenspan (Attempted Service) on January 23, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor regarding Complaint and Summons served on Galina Sabir on January 23, 2012 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Defendants Motion for Additional 60 days in which to answer or otherwise plead is granted.Plaintiffs Motion for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Add Additional Parties is granted. Status hearing reset for 3/8/2012 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor regarding Summons (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 01/18/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 76 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND AMENDED complaint by Yury Grenadyor against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Service by Leigh D. Roadman on behalf of Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., Semen Dinkevich, MEI Services, Inc., Malecon Pharmacy, Inc., PharmaLife Minnesota, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC., Storchak, LLC. regarding notice of motion 74 , MOTION by Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., Semen Dinkevich, MEI Services, Inc., Malecon Pharmacy, Inc., PharmaLife Minnesota, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC., Storchak, LLC.for Additional Time to Answer or 73 (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Leigh D. Roadman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 73 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., Semen Dinkevich, MEI Services, Inc., Malecon Pharmacy, Inc., PharmaLife Minnesota, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC., Storchak, LLC.for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 01/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Courtney A. Marincsin for presentment of motion for leave to file 64 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/10/2012 at 09:30 AM. (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-6704831. (Weprin, Barry) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/13/2011:(mb, ) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: The Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to 1/13/2012 in which to answer or otherwise plead is granted. [For further detail see separate order.] Mailed notice (mb, ) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Svitlana Kharlamova. Svitlana Kharlamova waiver sent on 11/18/2011, answer due 1/17/2012. (mb, ) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRO SE Appearance by Defendant Svitlana Kharlamova. (mb, ) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Service for Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Add Additional Parties AND Memorandum in Support of Relator's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by Courtney A. Marincsin on behalf of Yury Grenadyor (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Yury Grenadyor in support of motion for leave to file 64 Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor for leave to file Second Amended Complaint and Add Additional Parties (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 12/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Leigh D. Roadman for presentment of extension of time, 62 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/13/2011 at 09:30 AM. (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., Semen Dinkevich, MEI Services, Inc., Malecon Pharmacy, Inc., PharmaLife Minnesota, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC., Storchak, LLC. for extension of time in which to answer or otherwise plead [AGREED] (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PharmaLife Minnesota by Thomas Keith McQueen (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Storchak, LLC. by Thomas Keith McQueen (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Storchak Pharmacy, LLC. by Thomas Keith McQueen (McQueen, Thomas) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eduard Bogachek by Mason N. Floyd (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mikhail Bogachek by Mason N. Floyd (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc. by Mason N. Floyd (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MEI Services, Inc. by Mason N. Floyd (Floyd, Mason) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eduard Bogachek by William Gibbs Sullivan (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mikhail Bogachek by William Gibbs Sullivan (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc. by William Gibbs Sullivan (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MEI Services, Inc. by William Gibbs Sullivan (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Eduard Bogachek by Leigh D. Roadman (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mikhail Bogachek by Leigh D. Roadman (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc. by Leigh D. Roadman (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MEI Services, Inc. by Leigh D. Roadman (Roadman, Leigh) (Entered: 12/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor by Edward Roy Moor (Moor, Edward) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. by Brian Alden Kahan (Kahan, Brian) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. by Joel V. Lumer (Lumer, Joel) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 1/26/2012 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 12/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Semen Dinkevich by Robert M. Karton. (mb, ) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/21/2011.(mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. by Daniel Keenan Ryan. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: Attorney Joel V. Lumer's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Malecon Pharmacy Inc. is granted. Telephoned notice. [For further detail see separate order.] (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. for leave to appear pro hac vice. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: Attorney Brian A. Kahan's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Malecon Pharmacy Inc. is granted. Telephoned notice. [For further detail see separate order.] (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendant Malecon Pharmacy, Inc. for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Eduard Bogachek, Mikhail Bogachek, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., Semen Dinkevich, Global PharmaLife, LLC., John Does 1-50, Svitlana Kharlamova, MEI Services, Inc., Malecon Pharmacy, Inc., PharmaLife Atlanta, PharmaLife Boston, PharmaLife Columbus, PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc, PharmaLife Minnesota, Pharmalife, LLC., Vasily Shevchuk, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC., Storchak, LLC., Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED complaint by Yury Grenadyor against Pharmalife, LLC., Ukrainian Village Pharmacy, Inc., States of Illinois, Florida, and Georgia, Commonwealth Of Massachusetts, MEI Services, Inc., PharmaLife Atlanta, PharmaLife Minnesota, Storchak Pharmacy, LLC., Storchak, LLC., Global PharmaLife, LLC., BuckHead Pharmacy, Inc., PharmaLife Columbus, BuckHead Pharmaceutial Association, Inc., PharmaLife Boston, PharmaLife Massachusetts, Inc, Malecon Pharmacy, Inc., Mikhail Bogachek, Eduard Bogachek, Semen Dinkevich, Svitlana Kharlamova, Vasily Shevchuk, John Does 1-50 (Poor Quality Original-Document on File). (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor for a timely filed amended complaint. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman:Minute order dated 8/2/11 granting application. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor for leave to appear pro hac vice. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Granting extension of seal until 9/29/11 and giving until 8/1/11 to file an amended complaint Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 4/28/2011.(mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: Relator's ex parte motion for extension of the seal is granted. ENTER ORDER: It is ordered that the Relator shall have until August 1, 2011 to file an amended complaint. Further, the complaint and all other filings in this matter shall remain under seal until and including September 29, 2011. Telephoned notice. [For further detail see separate order.] (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            EX PARTE MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor for extension of the seal. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Yury Grenadyor. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman:Enter minute order dated 4/20/11 granting motion to withdraw appearances. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor to withdraw appearances of Judith S. Sherwin and Kathleen F. Howlett. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Yury Grenadyor of Attorney's Lien. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 3/18/2011.(mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: ENTER ORDER: It is ordered that as to the State of Illinois only, the seal be lifted on the complaint. All other contents, except for this Order and the Illinois' Notice of Declination of Intervention shall remain under seal. Telephoned notice. [For further detail see separate order.] (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by State Of Illinois of Declination of Intervention. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Yury Grenadyor of Attorney's Lien. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting Extension until 5/2/2011 Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 2/24/2011.(mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Yury Grenadyor. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Granting Extension of Seal until 3/1/2011 Signed by the Honorable James F. Holderman on 2/3/2011.(mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman: ENTER ORDER: It is ordered that the case remain under seal until March 1, 2011, during which the State of Illinois may notify the court regarding its decision whether to intervene. The United States Declines intervention. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by United States of America of election to decline intervention. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable James F. Holderman:Enter order signed by Judge Holderman on 2/11/10 granting extension of time until March 1, 2011. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America for extension of time to consider election to intervene and of time during which the complaint and other documents shall remain under seal. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor by Judith Schwartz Sherwin. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Yury Grenadyor by Kathleen Fitzgerald Howlett. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CIVIL Cover Sheet (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed by United States of America, Yury Grenadyor. (mr, ) (Entered: 11/23/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Plaintiff Suppressed for extension of time (Marincsin, Courtney) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 711 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?