The Power of Few LLC v. Does 1-11
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00839

Tags
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 4:52 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit Copyright
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations re 18 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge James L Graham on 10/30/2014. (ds)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION for Default Judgment against Dennis Martini filed by The Power of Few LLC. Objections to R&R due by 10/27/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 10/8/2014. (pes1)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: 12/26/2013 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Effect Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 12/26/2013. (pes1)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: 12/24/2013 Motion for Extension of Time
            MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 4/25/2014. For Additional Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff The Power of Few LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Leon Bass, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 Order on Motion for DiscoveryCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [3] Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 8/30/2013. (er1)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Motion for Discovery
                Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery Applicaition for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff The Power of Few LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Text of Proposed Order) (Bass, Leon)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The Power of Few LLC. (Bass, Leon)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against John Does 1-11 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-4237423), filed by The Power of Few LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B) (Bass, Leon)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 74 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?