Wiebe et al v. National Security Agency et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-03245
District Judge Richard D Bennett, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 27, 2017 at 12:32 AM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Diane S. Roark, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Diane S. Roark

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diane S. Roark +1 503 767 2490
No Logo Edward F. Loomis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward F. Loomis
No Logo John K. Wiebe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John K. Wiebe
No Logo Thomas A. Drake, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas A. Drake
No Logo William E. Binney, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William E. Binney
v.
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
United States National Security Agency United States National Security Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "National Security Agency"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas H Barnard +1 410 209 4873 +1 410 962 2310 thomas.barnard@usdoj.gov
Citation Motion for Return of Property
Nature of Suit 690 - Forfeiture/Penalty: Other
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/16/14. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Letter ORDER re Remaining Issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 10/2/14. (c/m chambers)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Correspondence re: Status Update (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re 98 request to set deadline to be September 30, 2014 for the review and return of all information to Petitioner Drake. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/23/14. (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Correspondence re: Status Update (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            PAPERLESS ORDER re 96 CONFIRMING the results of our conference call this morning. The government shall provide a revised estimated completion date by June 13, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/6/14. (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 96 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Correspondence re: Status Update (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER on or before Friday, May 23, 2014, please provide a reasonable date by which the government will have completed its review of all remaining materials and will have returned appropriate items to Mr. Drake. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 5/15/14. (c/m 5/16/14 chambers) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Correspondence re: Status Update (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Correspondence re: Status Report (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Correspondence re: Status Update (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER DISMISSING case as to John K. Wiebe with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 9/26/13. (c/m:Wiebe)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/26/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER DISMISSING case as to Edward F. Loomis with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 9/5/13. (c/m:Loomis)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                            STATUS REPORT by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER DISMISSING case as to William E. Binney with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 7/16/13. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 87 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                Status Report Submitted by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER re delay in schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/11/13. (c/m chambers)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: None
                                    Correspondence re: Status Update (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None
                                      Correspondence re: Update for Petitioner Drake (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                        Correspondence re: Drake Update (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: None
                                          Correspondence re: Estimates for Mr. Binney, Wiebe, and Loomis (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                            Correspondence re: Conference on April 24, 2013 (Attachments: # 1 Enclosure 1)(Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
                                              Correspondence re: Upcoming Conferences on 4-18-13 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER DIRECTING USA contact each Petitioner and the Court to schedule conference calls. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 3/28/13. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 46 Motion of Respondents to Dismiss; DENYING 49 Motion of Binney for Summary Judgment; DENYING 53 Motion of Wiebe for Summary Judgment; ADOPTING AND APPROVING 67 Report and Recommendations; OVERRULING 73 Objections of Petitioners; OVERRULING 75 Objections of Respondents; Entering JUDGMENT in favor of the Government as to the information that it deems to be classified. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 3/27/13. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE re 75 Response re 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by William E. Binney, Thomas A. Drake, Edward F. Loomis, John K. Wiebe. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                      RESPONSE re 73 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE re 67 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Referral)(Barnard, Thomas) Modified on 10/9/2012 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Marginal ORDER granting 71 Motion of defendants for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 10/1/12. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE to 67 Report and Recommendations by William E. Binney, Thomas A. Drake, Edward F. Loomis, John K. Wiebe. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER GRANTING 66 Motion to Unseal Search Warrant, Warrant Affidavit and Accompanying Documents. DIRECTING respondents mail a copy of the approved redacted warrant to petitioner Loomis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 9/28/12. (Attachments: # 1 Search Warrant) (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency Responses due by 10/15/2012 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 68 Motion for Extension of Time and Request for Ex Parte Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 9/21/12. (c/m)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Proposed Correspondence re: Proposed Order (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 66 MOTION to Unseal and Motion for Extension of Time for In Camera Review filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. Replies due by 10/9/2012. (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 46 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William E. Binney, 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John K. Wiebe. Objections to R&R due by 10/1/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 9/14/12. (c/m:plaintiffs)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Unseal Search Warrant, Warrant Affidavit and Accompanying Documents by Edward F. Loomis. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Motions Hearing held on 8/23/2012 re 46 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William E. Binney, 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John K. Wiebe before Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher - ARGUED (In Proper Person) held subcuria. (Recorded: FTRgold) (CRD: bma) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support of Search Warrant Application by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 50 & 54 Motion of Binney and Wiebe to Unseal Affidavit used to justify search warrants executed on 7/26/07. DIRECTING respondents to mail to Binney, Wiebe and the Clerk's office a redacted copy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/20/12. (c/m) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Letter ORDER re Hearing on Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 7/25/12. (c/m chambers)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/25/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    Correspondence re: Diane Roark (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      Correspondence from Diane Roark (vals, Chambers) (Entered: 07/02/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; granting 39 Motion of Defendants to Dismiss for Improper Venue; denying 41 Motion of Roark for Waiver of Venue. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 6/22/12. (c/m Roark)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Letter ORDER GRANTING 57 Motion for Extension of Time and Request for Ex Parte Conference. SCHEDULING hearing on defendants' motion to dismiss/summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/22/12. (c/m chambers) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Lift Seal and Request for Ex Parte Conference by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency Responses due by 7/5/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 46 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment. RESPONSE in Opposition re 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. ( Replies due by 7/5/2012.)(Barnard, Thomas) Modified on 6/19/2012 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 06/18/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Edward F. Loomis. Replies due by 6/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Unseal Affidavit used to justify search warrants executed on 7/26/07 by John K. Wiebe. Responses due by 6/18/2012. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by John K. Wiebe. Responses due by 6/18/2012. (THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED, SEE 51 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FOR THIS MOTION) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by John K. Wiebe. Replies due by 6/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas A. Drake. Replies due by 6/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Unseal Affidavit used to justify search warrants executed on 7/26/07 by William E. Binney. Responses due by 6/18/2012. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/31/2012 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by William E. Binney. Responses due by 6/18/2012. (THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED, SEE 48 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION FOR THIS MOTION) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/31/2012 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by William E. Binney. Replies due by 6/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/31/2012 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Rule 12/56 letter mailed to John Wiebe, William Binney, Edward Loomis, Thomas Drake. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency Responses due by 5/29/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Memorandum of Law, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7)(Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 41 REQUEST for Waiver of Venue filed by Diane S. Roark, 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 5/11/12. (c/m:Roark)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      MARGINAL ORDER granting 43 Motion by respondents for a Limited Extension of Time to respond to claims by petitioners. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 5/8/12 (c/m 5/8/12 - cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency Responses due by 5/25/2012 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          FILED IN ERROR PER COUNSEL, WILL RE-FILE - MOTION for Extension of Time by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency Responses due by 5/25/2012 (Barnard, Thomas) Modified on 5/8/2012 (cags, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 05/08/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Letter REQUEST for Waiver of Venue by Diane S. Roark. Responses due by 5/24/2012. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Diane S. Roark. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/23/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency Responses due by 5/10/2012 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Letter ORDER re Jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 4/17/12. (c/m Chambers)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Correspondence re: Briefing Schedule (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Letter ORDER GRANTING 32 Motion of USA for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 4/9/12. (c/m:chambers) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 29 Order by Diane S. Roark. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 29 Order by William E. Binney. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 29 Order by Thomas A. Drake. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency Responses due by 4/26/2012 (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 04/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 29 Order by Edward F. Loomis. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 29 Order by John K. Wiebe. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Letter ORDER DIRECTING plaintiffs respond on or before 4/9/12 as therein set forth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 4/2/12. (c/m chambers)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Status Report Submitted Re: Petitioners Wiebe, Binney and Loomis by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Status Report Submitted Supplemental by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re Scheduling Conference, 19 Status Report by Thomas A. Drake. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re Scheduling Conference, 19 Status Report by Diane S. Roark. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to 19 Status Report Submitted filed by John K. Wiebe. (apls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 3/16/12. (apls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Status Report Submitted by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to 19 Status Report by Edward F. Loomis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter ORDER confirming deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 3/12/12. (c/m:plaintiffs by chambers)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Status Report Submitted by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          PAPERLESS ORDER granting 17 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 02/28/2012. (c/m:plaintiffs 2/29/12) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Consolidate by William E. Binney. Responses due by 3/15/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Correspondence re Settlement)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Marginal ORDER GRANTING 15 Motion to Consolidate. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/21/12. (c/m:plaiintiffs) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate by Diane S. Roark. Responses due by 3/5/2012. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE re Statement of Claim for Consolidation by Thomas A. Drake. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter ORDER confirming the results of the telephone conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 2/15/12. (c/m chambers)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      PAPERLESS ORDER granting 11 Motion of Loomis to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 02/15/2012. (c/m:Wiebe & Loomis) Modified on 2/15/2012 (hmls, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate with RDB-10-0181 by Edward F. Loomis. Responses due by 3/2/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION to Clarify re Parties filed by John K. Wiebe. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            PAPERLESS ORDER CONFIRMING that a telephonic scheduling conference has been set for February 15, 2012 at 3:00 p.m. EST. The government has set up the teleconference and all parties are directed call-in at 202-353-0880. Enter the passcode 63332813 when prompted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 2/13/12. (Entered: 02/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher to conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings if necessary, and to submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of this matter. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/9/12 (c/m 2/9/12 - cags, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/9/2012 (cags, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER FINDING AS MOOT 5 Motion to Clarify and GRANTING 6 Motion for Extension of Time as therein set forth. Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 2/9/12. (c/m:plaintiff) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 5 MOTION to Clarify re Parties and Motion for Extension of Time filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency. Replies due by 2/24/2012. (Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Clarify re Additional Plaintiffs by John K. Wiebe. Responses due by 2/9/2012.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 2 Order and Request for Magistrate Judge filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Barnard, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Signature Pages to 1 Complaint filed by John Wiebe. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DIRECTING respondent file a response within 60 days re 1 Complaint (Motion for Return of Property). Signed by Judge Richard D Bennett on 11/17/11. (c/m:plaintiff & emailed:AUSA Pearson)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT (Motion for return of seized property) against National Security Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation by John K. Wiebe. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 14637055446) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 217 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?