The Power of Few, LLC v. Does 1-28
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-02645

Tags
Last Updated August 19, 2016 at 10:46 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013 Terminated Party
Party Doe 3, Doe 13 and Doe 19 terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 11/11/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: 11/11/2013 Status Report
    Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The. (Kannady, Scott)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/11/2013, Entered: 11/11/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 3, John Doe 13 and John Doe 19 by Plaintiff Power of Few, LLC, The (Kannady, Scott)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: 11/8/2013 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
        MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice [12] John Doe's (#26) Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/8/2013. (mehcd)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
          MEMORANDUM regarding [12] MOTION to Quash filed by Doe 26. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/6/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/5/2013 Motion to Quash
            MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena by Defendant Doe 26. (jjhsl, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Restricted Document - Level 2
              RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2 (jjhsl, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: 10/8/2013 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                MINUTE ORDER: The above captioned case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a status report within five (5) days of the date of this order, then on the tenth day of each month thereafter, informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, the Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, the Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/8/2013. Text Only Entry (mehcd, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 10/4/2013, Entered: 10/4/2013 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [2] Motion to Expedite. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/4/2013.(trlee, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                    MEMORANDUM regarding [2] MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Power of Few, LLC, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/3/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                      ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (5) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/3/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Summons IssuedCourt Filing
                        SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # (1) Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
                          REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (dbera, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                            Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kannady, Scott)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Motion to Expedite
                                MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff The Power of Few, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against Does 1-28 (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3553485), filed by The Power of Few, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Summons, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Kannady, Scott)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?