TCYK, LLC v. Doe
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06965

Tags
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 5:25 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Hierl +1 312 580 0100 mhierl@hsplegal.com
Space Todd Sheldon Parkhurst +1 312 604 2626 +1 312 604 2729 tparkhurst@hsplegal.com
v.
No Logo Doe, Defendant
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Terminate Hearings
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4l(a)(1), Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses with prejudice all cause of action against the Doe defendant associated with IP address 98.213.62.111. Status hearing date of 5/15/2014 is stricken. Mailed notice (tbk, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Doe Defendant (Hierl, Michael)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: 3/4/2014 status hearing
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 3/4/2014. Status hearing set for 5/15/2014 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: 1/29/2014 status hearing
        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 1/29/2014. Status hearing set for 3/4/2014 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (tbk, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Status Report
          STATUS Report Initial Status Report by TCYK, LLC (Hierl, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: 12/6/2013 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial Status hearing is set for 1/29/2014 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Parties to prepare and submit a joint status report at least two days prior to set status. (See Judges web page for status report). Mailed notice (tbk, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Order
              ENTER ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DISCOVERY PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 10/11/2013. Mailed notice(tbk, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Order on Motion for Discovery
                MINUTE entry before Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference [7] is granted. Order to follow. Mailed notice (tbk, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Notice of Motion
                  NOTICE of Motion by Michael A. Hierl for presentment of motion for discovery[7] before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 10/10/2013 at 09:15 AM. (Hierl, Michael)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                    MEMORANDUM by TCYK, LLC in support of motion for discovery[7] Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 Motion for Discovery
                      MOTION by Plaintiff TCYK, LLC for discovery Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Hierl, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: 10/7/2013 notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2
                        NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TCYK, LLC Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 and Local Rule 3.2 (Hierl, Michael)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Copyright Report
                          MAILED Copyright report to Registrar, Washington DC. (ea, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Attorney Appearance
                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Todd Sheldon Parkhurst (Parkhurst, Todd)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Attorney Appearance
                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCYK, LLC by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 civil cover sheet
                                CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT filed by TCYK, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8776913. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Hierl, Michael)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?