TCYK, LLC v. Does 1-20
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-03927

Tags
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 3:35 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ross Joyner PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven E Ross +1 972 661 9400 +1 972 661 9401 sross@rossjoynerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Keith A. Vogt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith A. Vogt +1 312 583 3400 +1 312 755 4408 KVogt@takiguchiandvogt.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-20, Defendant
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: 3/5/2014 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
ORDER: The court vacates the [12] order of reference and denies as moot the [10] Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, Motion to Quash Subpoena Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45, and Motion to Sever Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 3/5/2014) (tln)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 ~Notice (other)
    Replacement NOTICE of Dismissal without Prejudice of John Doe #9 filed by TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Conference, # (2) Certificate of Service) (Vogt, Keith) Modified text and linkage on 2/26/2014 (axm).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 ~Notice (other)
      NOTICE of Dismissal of John Doe IP 72.181.214.6 filed by TCYK, LLC (Vogt, Keith)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
        ***VACATED PER [15] ORDER***Order Referring [10] Motion for Leave to Proceed Anonymously Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 8, Motion to Quash Subpoena Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 and Motion to Sever Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 20 and 21 to Magistrate Judge David L Horan. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/18/2014) (twd)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
          Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Does 1-20 re [10] First MOTION to Quash Notice (Attachments: # (1) Additional Page(s) certificate of conference) (Davis, Alex)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Motion to Quash
            First MOTION to Quash Notice filed by Does 1-20 with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Davis, Alex). Added MOTION to Sever, MOTION for Leave to Proceed Anonymously on 2/18/2014 (dsr).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [8] First Motion for Extension of Time Within Which it has to Serve Doe Defendants with a Summons and Complaint: Accordingly, the deadline for Plaintiff to serve Doe Defendants is extended to 4/17/2014. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 2/13/2014) (twd)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: 2/12/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                MOTION Additional Time to Serve Summons and Complaint filed by TCYK, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A) (Vogt, Keith)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Memorandum, Opinion & OrderCourt Filing
                  Memorandum Opinion and Order granting [4] MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference subject to the requirements of the Protective Order. (See order for specifics) (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L Horan on 12/10/2013) (mcrd)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                    Order Referring [4] Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference referred to Magistrate Judge David L Horan. (Ordered by Judge Sam A Lindsay on 11/25/2013) (axm)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: 10/17/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Report to Patent/Trademark or Copyright Office
                          Report to Copyright Office of Initiating Document. Form AO 121 e-mailed to 508filings@loc.gov. (Attachments: # (1) Additional Page(s) Complaint) (jrr)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Judge LindsayCourt Filing
                            New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to Judge Lindsay. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jrr)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 ComplaintCourt Filing
                              COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Does 1-20 filed by TCYK, LLC. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-5589026) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A, # (2) Exhibit(s) B, # (3) Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # (4) Ao 121) (Vogt, Keith)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?