AMTI, Inc
Bankruptcy Case New Jersey Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 04-ap-1552
District Judge Novalyn L. Winfield, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 17, 2016 at 11:14 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo AMTI, Inc, Debtor

Represented by Frier & Levitt, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frier & Levitt +1 973 535 1660

Represented by Ravin Greenberg, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chad Brian Friedman +1 973 226 1500 +1 973 226 6888 cfriedman@ravingreenberg.com
Space Howard Greenberg +1 973 226 1500 +1 973 226 6888 hgreenberg@ravingreenberg.com

Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen B. Ravin +1 973 286 6714 +1 973 286 6814 sravin@saul.com
No Logo Charles M. Forman, Trustee

Represented by Forman Holt Eliades & Ravin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles M. Forman +1 201 845 1000 +1 201 845 9112 cformantrustee@formanlaw.com
Space Kim R. Lynch +1 201 845 1000 +1 201 845 9112 klynch@formanlaw.com

Represented by Otterbourg, Steindler, Houston & Rosen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jordan Aaron Wishnew +1 201 845 9112
No Logo Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditor, Creditor Committee

Represented by Scura, Mealey, Wigfield & Heyer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JOHN J. SCURA, III +1 973 696 8391 +1 973 696 8571 jscura@scuramealey.com
Space Scura, Mealey, Wigfield & Heyer +1 973 696 8391 +1 973 696 8671
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martha R. Hildebrandt +1 973 645 3014 +1 973 645 5993 martha.hildebrandt@usdoj.gov
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: None
Application for Compensation for Scura, Mealey & Scura, Creditor Comm. Aty, period: to, fee: $6,360.00, expenses: $76.79. Filed by Scura, Mealey & Scura. Hearing scheduled for 9/10/2002 at 02:00 PM at NLW - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order 2 Certificate of Service) (smz, ) (Entered: 08/13/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/4/2002, Entered: None
    BNC Certificate of Service - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 217. Service Date 08/04/02. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/05/2002)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None
      Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay re: 2000 Dodge Durango (Related Doc # 51) The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney And Movant. Signed on 7/31/2002. (dlr, ) (Entered: 08/02/2002)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: None
        Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to November 27, 2002 , re: To File A Plan Of Reorganization And Obtain Acceptances Thereof. (Related Doc # 52) The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney. Signed on 7/29/2002. (dlr, ) (Entered: 07/30/2002)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None
          Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period May 2002 filed by AMTI, Inc. (sdm, ) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: None
            Motion for Adequate Protection, Motion to Compel Compliance for an Administrative Claim, Motion for Relief from Stay re: Leases Filed by Quarles & Brady Streich Lang on behalf of Steel Case Financial Services, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 8/19/2002 at 09:00 AM at NLW - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Support2 Affidavit Of Stephen W. Downs3 Proposed Order To Compel, For Adequate Protection and Vacate Stay) (sdm, ) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None
              Order re: Further Extending Use Of Cash Of Collateral. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney And Movant. Signed on 7/26/2002. (dlr, ) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/26/2002, Entered: None
                Motion for Relief from Stay re: Yoyota Cushion Tire Forklift Filed by John R. Morton Jr. on behalf of Toyota Motor Credit Corporation. Hearing scheduled for 8/19/2002 at 09:00 AM at NLW - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Certification in support of motion of Toyota Motor Credit Corp.for relief from stay2 Certificate of Service Notice of motion,certification) (ccg, ) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: None
                  Order re: Furhter Extending Use Of Cash Collateral. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney. Signed on 7/17/2002. (dlr, ) (Entered: 07/19/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: None
                    Order re: Order Extending Time To Assume Or Reject Leases Of Nonresidential Real Property. The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney. Signed on 7/16/2002 (related document(s)50). (dlr, ) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: None
                      Order Granting Motion For Relief From Stay re: 1999 Chrysler LHS (Related Doc # 47) The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney And Movant. Signed on 7/15/2002. (dlr, ) (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: None
                        Document re: Proposed Order filed by Chad Brian Friedman on behalf of AMTI, Inc (related document(s)41). (Friedman, Chad) (ENTERED IN ERROR) Modified on 7/17/2002 (cag, ). (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                          Motion to Extend Time re: Exclusivity Filed by Chad Brian Friedman on behalf of AMTI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 7/29/2002 at 10:00 AM at NLW - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Application 2 Proposed Order) (Friedman, Chad) (Entered: 07/09/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: None
                            Motion for Relief from Stay re: 2000 Dodge Durango Filed by Deily, Dautel & Mooney, LLP on behalf of Daimler Chrysler Services North America LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/29/2002 at 09:00 AM at NLW - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Certification of motion for relief from stay2 Proposed Order vacating automatic stay as to personal property3 Certificate of Service notice of motion, certification and order) (ccg, ) (Entered: 07/03/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: None
                              Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to September 27, 2002 , re: To Assume Or Reject Lease Of Nonresidential Real Property. (Related Doc # 41) The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney And Movant. Signed on 6/26/2002. (dlr, ) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: None
                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by John R. Morton Jr. on behalf of Tpyota Motor Credit Corp.. (ccg, ) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
                                  Order re: Further Extending Use Of Cash Collateral. The following parties were served: Movant, Debtor. Signed on 6/21/2002. (dlr, ) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: None
                                    Motion for Relief from Stay re: 1999 Chrysler LHS Filed by Deily, Dautel & Mooney, LLP on behalf of Daimler Chrysler Services North America LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/15/2002 at 09:00 AM at NLW - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order vacating automatic stay as to personal property2 Certificate of Service of Notice of motion and order) (ccg, ) (Entered: 06/18/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: None
                                      Opposition of Joann Moon Lessor in Opposition to of debtors for entry of an order extending time to assume or reject leases of non residential real property Filed by Fox, Rothschild, O'Brien & Frankel on behalf of Joann Moon (related document(s)41). (ccg, ) (Entered: 06/13/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: None
                                        Order re: Further Extending Cash Collateral. Signed on 6/4/2002 (related document(s)2). (dlr, ) (Entered: 06/05/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
                                          Missing Document(s): Sch A-J, Summary of Schedules, and Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by AMTI, Inc. (djv, ) (Entered: 06/04/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/1/2002, Entered: None
                                            Order re: Authorizing Employment Of Scura, Mealey & Scura, LLP, Nunc Pro Tunc As Attorneys For The Official Committees Of Unsecured Creditors. Signed on 6/1/2002. (dlr, ) (Entered: 06/03/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: None
                                              Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 29, 2002 thru April 30, 2002 filed by AMTI, Inc. (djv, ) (Entered: 05/30/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                Motion to Extend Time re: Extend Time to Assume/Reject Leases of Non-Residential Property Filed by Chad Brian Friedman on behalf of AMTI, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 6/24/2002 at 10:00 AM at NLW - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Application 2 Proposed Order 3 Certificate of Service) (Friedman, Chad) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                  Order Granting Application to Employ Cambridge Fiancial Corporation as Financial Advisor (Related Doc # 25) Signed on 5/28/2002. (dlr, ) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                    Order re: Order Extending Use Of Cash Collateral. Signed on 5/24/2002. (dlr, ) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                      Order re: Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed on 5/24/2002. (dlr, ) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                        Certificate of Service re: Cambridge Financial Corp. Retention filed by Chad Brian Friedman on behalf of AMTI, Inc (related document(s)25). (Friedman, Chad) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/14/2002, Entered: None
                                                          Document re: Letter that states the Debtor has submitted an Order authorizing the Debtor to utilize cash collateral and attached to the letter is corrected budgets for AMI, Inc. filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of AMTI, Inc (related document(s)26). (djv, ) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of Service re: Notice of Motion, Order and Certification filed by Helfand & Helfand on behalf of The CIT Group/Equipment Financing, Inc.. (djv, ) (Entered: 05/24/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                              Motion to Compel Compelling the debtor to immediately assume or reject the lease, Motion re: Vacating the Automatic Stay, Motion for Relief from Stay re: Leased Equipment Filed by Helfand & Helfand on behalf of The CIT Group/Equipment Financing, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2002 at 09:00 AM at NLW - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Motion in Support of2 Affidavit In Support of3 Proposed Order) (zs, ) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Deily, Dautel & Mooney, LLP on behalf of Daimler Chrysler Services North America LLC. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (djv, ) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                  Certificate of Service re: Notice of Application and Application of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Employ Scura, Mealey & Scura, Nunc Pro Tunc, as Counsel for the Official Committees of Unsecured Creditors filed by Scura, Mealey & Scura on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditor (related document(s)28). (djv, ) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Scura, Mealey & Scura on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditor. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (djv, ) (Entered: 05/22/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                      Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Fox, Rothschild, O'Brien & Frankel on behalf of Joann Moon. (ccg, ) (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                        Motion to Extend Time re: Extend Time to File Schedules and Statement of Financial Affair Filed by Chad Brian Friedman on behalf of AMTI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order 2 Certificate of Service) (Friedman, Chad) (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None
                                                                          Application to Employ Scura Mealey & Scura as Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Scura, Mealey & Scura on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditor. Objection deadline is 5/10/2002. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order Authorizing employment of Scura Melaley & Scura Nunc Pro Tunc as attorney for Official Committee of Unsecured creditors) (ccg, ) (Entered: 05/10/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: None
                                                                            Certificate of Service re: Application re: Official Committee of unsecured creditors committee filed by AMTI, Inc. (ccg, ) (Entered: 05/10/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                              Order extending use of cash collateral. Signed on 4/30/2002. (ccg, ) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                Application to Employ Cambridge Financial Corporation as Financial Advisor Filed by Chad Brian Friedman on behalf of AMTI, Inc. Objection deadline is 5/14/2002. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order 2 Affidavit) (Friedman, Chad) (Entered: 05/07/2002)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                  Order For admission of Rosetta B. Packer Pro Hac Vice. Signed on 4/24/2002 (related document(s)16). (ccg, ) (Entered: 05/03/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                    Order for an extension of time for filing schedules and statement of financial affairs.Until May 15, 2002 Signed on 4/23/2002 (related document(s)7). (ccg, ) (Entered: 05/02/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                      Order re: authorizing leave to retain accountants Nunc Pro Tunc April 2, 2002. Signed on 4/17/2002 (related document(s)8). (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/30/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                        Notice Re: Creditors' Committee. Creditors Committee Appointed. Filed by United States Trustee. (United States Trustee, by Roberta A. DeAngelis, Assistant United States Trustee, ) (Entered: 04/24/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                          Amended Certificate of Service re: Application for admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Sovereign Bank (related document(s)16). (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/22/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                            Certificate of Service re: re: Interim order authorizing use of cash collateral Nunc Pro Tunc March 29, 2002 filed by AMTI, Inc (related document(s)9). (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/19/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                              Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Steel Case Financial Services, Inc.. (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                Certificate of Service re: Application to Retain Frier & Levitt, LLC filed by Sheryll S. Tahiri on behalf of AMTI, Inc (related document(s)14). (Tahiri, Sheryll) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Application re: For admission Pro Hac Vice of Rosetta B Packer Esq. Filed by Stevens & Witmer, P.C. on behalf of Sovereign Bank. Objection deadline is 4/22/2002. (ccg, ) Modified on 4/19/2002 (dmd, ). (Entered: 04/18/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/18/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Application to Employ Frier & Levitt, LLC as Special Counsel Filed by Sheryll S. Tahiri on behalf of AMTI, Inc. Objection deadline is 4/24/2002. (Attachments: 1 Affidavit 2 Proposed Order) (Tahiri, Sheryll) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Objection to To Debtors application authorizing leave to retain accountants Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Stevens & Lee on behalf of Sovereign Bank (related document(s)8). (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Service Noitce of order granting motion to substantively consolidate case. Number of notices mailed: 203 (related document(s)5). (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion re: authorizing leave to retain accountants Nunc Pro Tunc. (Related Doc # 8) Signed on 4/12/2002. (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Order Granting Motion re: authorizing leave to retain counsel Nun Pro Tunc. (Related Doc # 6) Signed on 4/12/2002. (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/17/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral Nunc pro Tunc March 29, 2002 (Related Doc # 2) Signed on 4/8/2002. (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/10/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Motion re: authorizing leave to retain accountants Nunc Pro Tunc April 2, 2002 Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of AMTI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Affidavit Of Leo J. Zatta in support of application2 Proposed Order Authorizing leave to retain accountants Nunc Pro Tunc April 2, 2002) (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/10/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Motion to Extend Time re: For entry of an order extending time for filing schedules and statements of financial affairs Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of AMTI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order For an extension of time for filing schedules and statements of financial affairs) (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/10/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Motion re: To retain counsel Nunc Pro Tunc March 29, 2002 Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of AMTI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Affidavit 2 Proposed Order) (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/10/2002)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Order authorizing Joint Administration for procedural purposes Signed on 4/2/2002. (ccg, ) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application to Shorten Time to Use Cash Collateral re: Notice of Motion (Related Doc # 3) Signed on 4/4/2002. Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2002 at 11:00 AM at NLW - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (dlr, ) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Application to Shorten Time re: Use Of Cash Collateral Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of AMTI, Inc (related document(s)2). (dlr, ) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Stephen B. Ravin on behalf of AMTI, Inc. (Attachments: 1 Application In Support2 Proposed Order) (dlr, ) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Stephen Ravin on behalf of AMTI, Inc. (sm) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2002 (bh, ). (Entered: 04/02/2002)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 195 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?