Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd et al
Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 4:13-mc-80209-YGR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 27, 2016 at 11:27 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Affinity Labs Of Texas, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Germer Gertz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Louis Germer +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 llgermer@germer.com
Space Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wesley Wei-Liang Lew +1 310 552 0130 +1 310 229 5800 wlew@robinskaplan.com
Space David Martinez +1 310 552 0130 +1 310 229 5800 dmartinez@robinskaplan.com
Space Kristine Tietz +1 612 349 8492 ktietz@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins, Kaplan, Miller & Ciresi LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel R Burgess +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 drburgess@rkmc.com
Space Cyrus A. Morton +1 612 349 8722 +1 612 339 4181 camorton@rkmc.com
Space Ronald J Schutz +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 rjschutz@rkmc.com
Space Shira T Shapiro +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 stshapiro@rkmc.com
LG Electronics, Inc. LG Electronics, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Vodavi Technology, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Mulcahy +1 571 203 2751 +1 202 408 4400 john.mulcahy@finnegan.com
v.
No Logo High Tech Computer Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Elizabeth Powley +1 214 296 0156 +1 214 302 0471 spowley@pattersonsheridan.com
Space Jerry Robin Selinger +1 214 272 0957 +1 214 296 0246 jselinger@pattersonsheridan.com
No Logo HTC America Inc, Defendant
Lg Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc. Lg Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., Defendant
LG Electronics USA, Inc. LG Electronics USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin Christopher Wheeler +1 202 626 7771 +1 202 738 2331 kwheeler@fr.com
LG Electronics, Inc. LG Electronics, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Vodavi Technology, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank A DeCosta, III +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 frank.decosta@finnegan.com
Space Christopher M Kurpinski +1 202 408 4225 +1 202 408 4400 christopher.kurpinski@finnegan.com
Space Lily Lim +1 650 849 6600 +1 650 849 6666 lily.lim@finnegan.com
Space John Mulcahy +1 571 203 2751 +1 202 408 4400 john.mulcahy@finnegan.com
Space Cecilia Sanabria +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 cecilia.sanabria@finnegan.com
Space Andrew C. Sonu +1 571 203 2765 +1 202 408 4400 andy.sonu@finnegan.com
Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd"

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher M. Bonny +1 650 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 christopher.bonny@ropesgray.com
Space Gabrielle E. Higgins +1 415 617 4000 +1 650 617 4090 gabrielle.higgins@ropesgray.com
Space Kathryn N. Hong +1 212 596 9000 +1 650 566 4124 kathryn.hong@ropesgray.com
Space Jesse J. Jenner +1 212 596 9019 +1 212 596 9090 jesse.jenner@ropesgray.com
Space Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com
Space Carolyn L. Redding +1 650 617 4013 +1 650 566 4269 Carolyn.Redding@ropesgray.com
Space Stephen J. Rosenman +1 202 508 4600 +1 202 508 4650 stephen.rosenman@ropesgray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Heartfield Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J Thad Heartfield +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 thad@jth-law.com
Space M. Dru Montgomery +1 409 866 3318 +1 409 866 5789 dru@jth-law.com
No Logo Samsung Telecommunications America LLC, Defendant
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Order 48 this case has now been opened as civil case C-14-02717-YGR. All future filing shall be done in the New Civil Case and reflect case number C-14-2717-YGR. ***This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.*** (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER RE: Conditional Transfer and Assignment of Civil Case Number. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/11/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Michael Bonny (Bonny, Christopher) (Filed on 6/10/2014) (Entered: 06/10/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
        NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC of Transfer to the Northern District of California (Attachments: # 1 Tab A)(Redding, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/6/2014) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
          CLERKS NOTICE VACATING THE MAY 9, 2014 AT 9:01AM COMPLIANCE HEARING. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 43 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice All Claims between Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC and the LG Defendants. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2014) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AND AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN AFFINITY LABS OF TEXAS, LLC AND THE LG DEFENDANTS filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING AGREED MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE ALL CLAIMS BETWEEN AFFINITY LABS OF TEXAS, LLC AND THE LG DEFENDANTS)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 4/15/2014) Modified on 4/16/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/15/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                AMENDED ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING re 40 Order, Terminate Hearings, Set Hearings. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/3/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2014) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF CLARIFICATION by HTC America, Inc., High Tech Computer Corp., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC re 40 Order. (Higgins, Gabrielle) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified on 4/3/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER VACATING DATES AND SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING. Compliance Hearing is set for Friday, 5/9/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/2/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014) Modified on 4/2/2014 (fs, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/3/2014 (fs, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Between Affinity Labs of Texas and the LG Defendants filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lim, Lily) (Filed on 3/14/2014) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Transcript of Proceedings held on January 6, 2014, before Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2014. (Related documents(s) 36 , 37 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 2/21/2014) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Redding, Carolyn) (Filed on 1/22/2014) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Tietz, Kristine) (Filed on 1/21/2014) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                              Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/6/2014 before Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers (Date Filed: 1/6/2014). (Recording #FTR 3:47pm-5:00pm.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/6/2014) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Julian Moore representing Defendants Samsung Electronics, Co., LTD, Samsung Electronics America,Inc. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ronald R. Burgess representing Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cyrus A. Morton representing Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Ronald J. Schutz representing Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kristine Tietz representing Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Shira T. Shapiro representing Plaintiff Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to John Mulcahy representing LG Electronics, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jesse J. Jenner representing Defendant Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Frank A. Decosta representing LG Electronics, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Sonu representing LG Electronics, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Kurpinski representing LG Electronics, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kathryn Hong representing Defendants Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd; Samsung Electronics America, Inc. and Samsung Telecommunications America LLC. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Cecilia Sanabria representing LG Electronics, Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8269138.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Moore, Julian) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel R. Burgess ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8268766.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Cyrus A. Morton ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8265725.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Ronald J. Schutz ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8265708.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Kristine A. Tietz ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8265661.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Shira T. Shapiro ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8265572.) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 1/2/2014) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (JOINT) filed by Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by David Martinez (Martinez, David) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley Wei-Liang Lew (Lew, Wesley) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8260195.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mulcahy, John) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lily Lim (Lim, Lily) (Filed on 12/30/2013) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8259438.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Jenner, Jesse) (Filed on 12/27/2013) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8254277.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(De Costa, Frank) (Filed on 12/24/2013) (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8253032.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sonu, Andrew) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8252760.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Kurpinski, Christopher) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8252639.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd, Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (Hong, Kathryn) (Filed on 12/23/2013) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8247906.) filed by LG Electronics Mobilecomm USA, Inc., LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Sanabria, Cecilia) (Filed on 12/20/2013) (Entered: 12/20/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jerry R. Selinger representing Defendants HTC Corporation and HTC America Inc. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8235883.) filed by HTC America, Inc., High Tech Computer Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Selinger, Jerry) (Filed on 12/17/2013) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2013. Case Management Conference set for Monday, 1/6/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Eastern District of Texas (Beaumont) re 1:12-cv-00557 RC signed by Judge Ron Clark. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from the Eastern District of Texas (Beaumont) re 1:12-cv-00557 RC signed by Judge Ron Clark. (farS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?